BARTKO v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
Plaintiff: GREGORY BARTKO
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION and UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case Number: 1:2013cv01135
Filed: July 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: James E. Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Civil Rights (Other)
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 285 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 284 Order on Motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 08/02/2019. (lcjeb3)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 261 MEMORANDUM OPINION re: 260 Order. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/26/16. (lcjeb3)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 240 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 239 Order on Plaintiff and Defendant USPIS's Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's Motion for Discovery. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/3/16. (lcjeb3)
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 225 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 224 Order granting in part and denying in part Defendant FBI's 180 Motion for Summary Judgment and granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 182 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/18/15. (lcjeb1)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 199 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 198 Order. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/18/15. (lcjeb1)
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re 178 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/6/15. (lcjeb2)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re 146 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/9/15. (lcjeb2)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 90 Order. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/5/14. (lcjeb1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BARTKO v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY BARTKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Claire M. Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Represented By: Claire M. Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Represented By: Claire M. Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Represented By: Claire M. Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE PROFESSIONAL RESPONSIBILITY
Represented By: Claire M. Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?