BURGESS v. NAVISTAR INTERNATIONAL, LLC et al
Plaintiff: DUQUOIN BURGESS
Defendant: NAVISTAR DEFENSE, LLC and NAVISTAR INTERNATIONAL, LLC
Intervenor Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2013cv01463
Filed: September 25, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin H. Sharp on behalf of DUQUOIN BURGESS (Sharp, Kevin) (Main Document 80 replaced on 4/6/2020) (ztd).
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting #79 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Kevin Hunter is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiff/Relator Duquoin Burges. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 3/25/2020. (DJS)
February 25, 2020 Filing 79 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kevin Hunter Sharp, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6861883. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DUQUOIN BURGESS (McKnight, H.)
January 31, 2020 Filing 78 REPLY to opposition to motion re #71 MOTION to Transfer Case (Motion to Transfer Venue) filed by NAVISTAR DEFENSE, LLC, NAVISTAR INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration, #5 Declaration, #6 Declaration)(Robinson, Anne)
January 28, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Willem Jacob Van Someren Greve on behalf of DUQUOIN BURGESS (Van Someren Greve, Robert)
January 24, 2020 Filing 76 Memorandum in opposition to re #71 MOTION to Transfer Case (Motion to Transfer Venue) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Valdez, Darrell)
January 24, 2020 Filing 75 RESPONSE re #71 MOTION to Transfer Case (Motion to Transfer Venue) filed by DUQUOIN BURGESS. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Relator's Declaration, #2 Declaration Counsel's Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McKnight, H.)
January 21, 2020 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean M. Berkowitz on behalf of NAVISTAR DEFENSE, LLC, NAVISTAR INTERNATIONAL, LLC (Berkowitz, Sean)
January 17, 2020 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Henson Miller on behalf of DUQUOIN BURGESS (Miller, Andrew)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part #72 Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Defendants' deadline to respond to the two Complaints in this action are hereby stayed pending resolution of Plaintiffs' motion to transfer venue #71 . Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/16/2020. (DJS)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting #69 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Sean M. Berkowitz is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Defendants. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). #Click for instructions. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/15/2020. (DJS)
January 13, 2020 Filing 72 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaints and Request for Expedited Consideration by NAVISTAR DEFENSE, LLC, NAVISTAR INTERNATIONAL, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Concurrence)(Robinson, Anne). Added MOTION to Expedite on 1/14/2020 (ztd). Modified on 1/14/2020 (znmw).
January 10, 2020 Filing 71 MOTION to Transfer Case (Motion to Transfer Venue) by NAVISTAR DEFENSE, LLC, NAVISTAR INTERNATIONAL, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Mary J. Gillie, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Anne W. Robinson, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Robinson, Anne)
December 27, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE of Exhibits by NAVISTAR DEFENSE, LLC, NAVISTAR INTERNATIONAL, LLC re #57 Amended Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5 to First Amended Complaint (Redacted), #2 Exhibit 10 to First Amended Complaint (Redacted), #3 Exhibit 11 to First Amended Complaint (Redacted))(Robinson, Anne)
December 23, 2019 Filing 69 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sean M. Berkowitz, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6673114. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NAVISTAR DEFENSE, LLC, NAVISTAR INTERNATIONAL, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Sean Berkowitz, #2 Exhibit B - Text of Proposed Order)(Hazelton, David)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Denying without prejudice #63 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for failing to fully comply with Local Civil Rule 83.2(d)(6). Affiants with offices located outside of the District of Columbia are still required to provide sufficient information for the court to determine whether the affiant engages in the practice of law from an office located in the District of Columbia. SO ORDERED. By Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/23/2019. (jth)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting Defendant Navistar Defense, Inc.'s motion #64 to seal three exhibits attached to Relator Duquoin Burgesss First Amended Complaint. The Court therefore orders that Exhibits 5, 10, and 11 to Relators First Amended Complaint (ECF Nos. 57-6, 57-11, 57-12) shall be placed under seal indefinitely. Defendant Navistar Defense, LLC shall file as a Notice of Exhibits on the Docket with redacted versions of these three exhibits. SO ORDERED. By Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/23/2019. (jth)
December 19, 2019 Filing 68 WAIVER OF SERVICE by DUQUOIN BURGESS; NAVISTAR DEFENSE, LLC waiver sent on 12/3/2019, answer due 2/1/2020. (ztnr)
December 19, 2019 Filing 67 WAIVER OF SERVICE by DUQUOIN BURGESS; NAVISTAR INTERNATIONAL, LLC waiver sent on 12/3/2019, answer due 2/1/2020. (ztnr)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Granting USAs Unopposed Motion #66 to Lift Seal. The seal is lifted on the USAs Complaint in Partial Intervention (ECF No. #60 ) and the document shall be placed on the public docket. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/18/19.(tb) Modified on 1/7/2020 (tb). Modified on 1/8/2020 (tb).
December 13, 2019 Filing 65 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NAVISTAR DEFENSE, LLC, NAVISTAR INTERNATIONAL, LLC (Hazelton, David)
December 13, 2019 Filing 64 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Certain Exhibits re #57 Amended Complaint, and Request for Expedited Consideration by NAVISTAR DEFENSE, LLC, NAVISTAR INTERNATIONAL, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin Thomas, #2 Exhibit 5 (Redacted), #3 Exhibit 10 (Redacted), #4 Exhibit 11 (Redacted), #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Robinson, Anne)
December 12, 2019 Filing 66 SEALED Consent MOTION to Lift the Seal on the United States' Complaint in Partial Intervention filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf)
December 12, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sean M. Berkowitz, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-6641907. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NAVISTAR DEFENSE, LLC, NAVISTAR INTERNATIONAL, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Sean M. Berkowitz, #2 Exhibit B - Text of Proposed Order)(Hazelton, David)
December 12, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Wylde Robinson on behalf of NAVISTAR DEFENSE, LLC, NAVISTAR INTERNATIONAL, LLC (Robinson, Anne)
December 12, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by David Rex Hazelton on behalf of NAVISTAR DEFENSE, LLC, NAVISTAR INTERNATIONAL, LLC (Hazelton, David)
December 6, 2019 Filing 60 Intervenor COMPLAINT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (ztd). Modified on 12/11/2019 (ztd); (Nunc Pro Tunc to 12/3/19)
December 4, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary J. Newkirk on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Newkirk, Gary)
December 3, 2019 Filing 59 SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/4/2019: #1 Exhibit) (ztd).
December 2, 2019 ***Case and certain documents Unsealed pursuant to Minute Order #56 . See Order for details. (ztd)
November 1, 2019 Filing 57 AMENDED COMPLAINT against NAVISTAR DEFENSE, LLC, NAVISTAR INTERNATIONAL, LLC with Jury Demand filed by DUQUOIN BURGESS. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)(ztd) Modified to seal exhibits per chambers on 12/16/2019 (ztd).
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: Having considered the United States Notice of Election to Intervene in Part #55 , it is hereby ordered that: the USAs Complaint in intervention due 12/2/19; the US shall serve its Complaint upon defendants by 1/3/20; the Relator shall serve his Amended Complaint on defendant by 1/3/20; this action will remain under seal until December 2, 2019, after which the seal shall be lifted for this Order, the relators Amended Complaint, the United States Notice, and all other matters filed after the filing of the United States Notice. All other matters filed with this Court prior to the filing of the United States Notice shall remain under seal. (See order for further details). Counsel have been notified by first class mail.(tb) Modified ( Chambers wanted entry to read this way) on 10/8/2019 (tb).
September 11, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE OF ELECTION TO INTERVENE IN PART and DECLINE INTERVENTION IN PART by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(zjf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BURGESS v. NAVISTAR INTERNATIONAL, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DUQUOIN BURGESS
Represented By: Andrew Henson Miller
Represented By: Robert Willem Jacob Van Someren Greve
Represented By: Kevin H. Sharp
Represented By: H. Vincent McKnight, Jr.
Represented By: Altomease Rucker Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAVISTAR DEFENSE, LLC
Represented By: Anne Wylde Robinson
Represented By: David Rex Hazelton
Represented By: Sean M. Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAVISTAR INTERNATIONAL, LLC
Represented By: Anne Wylde Robinson
Represented By: David Rex Hazelton
Represented By: Sean M. Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Gary J. Newkirk
Represented By: Darrell C. Valdez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?