November 6, 2023 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #401 the parties' combined joint status report and request to extend current stay, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that further proceedings in this case are STAYED through January 12, 2024; and it is further ORDERED that the parties shall provide the Court with a status report by not later than January 5, 2024. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 11/6/2023. (lcjdb3)
|
November 3, 2023 |
Filing 402
MOTION to Extend Stay by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (See Docket Entry #401 to view document) (zjm) Modified on 11/6/2023 (zjm).
|
November 3, 2023 |
Filing 401
Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quarcoo, Stephen)
|
September 1, 2023 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/3/2023. (zed)
|
September 1, 2023 |
Filing 399
MOTION to Stay by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (See Docket Entry #398 to view document) (zjm) Modified on 9/5/2023 (zjm).
|
September 1, 2023 |
Filing 398
Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quarcoo, Stephen)
|
September 1, 2023 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #398 the parties' combined joint status report and request to extend current stay, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that further proceedings in this case are STAYED through November 10, 2023; and it is further ORDERED that the parties shall provide the Court with a status report by not later than November 3, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 9/1/2023. (lcjdb3)
|
August 31, 2023 |
Filing 400
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #384 MOTION for Leave to File filed by EMMANUEL OGEBE. (Attachment: #1 Appendix)(zjm)
|
July 14, 2023 |
Filing 397
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to IBRAHIM BAGUDU. Attorney Matthew Cowherd terminated. (Cowherd, Matthew)
|
July 5, 2023 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #395 the joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is stayed until September 8, 2023; it is further ORDERED that, by not later than September 1, 2023, the parties shall file a joint status report advising the Court on whether (i) the stay should be extended beyond September 8, 2023 because the parties have made substantial progress towards finalizing the settlement, or (ii) the stay should expire on September 8, 2023 and the litigation should resume because the parties are unable to finalize the settlement; and in the event the parties advise the Court that the stay should expire, the joint status report shall include a proposed schedule for the remaining proceedings in this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/5/2023. (lcjdb3)
|
July 5, 2023 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/1/2023. (jth)
|
June 30, 2023 |
Filing 396
MOTION to Stay by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (See Docket Entry #395 to view document) (zjm)
|
June 30, 2023 |
Filing 395
Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quarcoo, Stephen)
|
June 8, 2023 |
Filing 394
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #384 MOTION for Leave to File filed by EMMANUEL OGEBE. (zjm)
|
April 6, 2023 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/30/2023. (tb)
|
April 4, 2023 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #392 the parties' joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is stayed until July 7, 2023; it is further ORDERED that, by not later than June 30, 2023, the parties shall file a joint status report advising the Court on whether (i) the stay should be extended beyond July 7, 2023 because the parties have made substantial progress towards finalizing the settlement, or (ii) the stay should expire on July 7, 2023 and the litigation should resume because the parties are unable to finalize the settlement; and in the event the parties advise the Court that the stay should expire, the joint status report shall include a proposed schedule for the remaining proceedings in this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/4/2023. (lcjdb3)
|
April 3, 2023 |
Filing 393
MOTION to Stay by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (See Docket Entry #392 to view document) (zjm) Modified on 4/5/2023 (zjm).
|
April 3, 2023 |
Filing 392
Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quarcoo, Stephen)
|
March 8, 2023 |
Filing 391
NEW Pro Se Consent To Receive Notices of Electronic Filing by EMMANUEL OGEBE (zjm)
|
February 27, 2023 |
Filing 390
REPLY to opposition to motion re #384 MOTION for Leave to File filed by EMMANUEL OGEBE. (zjm)
|
February 21, 2023 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 389 the appendices to the proposed amicus brief, the Court's understanding that it may contain sensitive information, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the clerk of the court shall seal 389 the appendices, and it is further ORDERED that any party with a copy of the document shall not review it and shall immediately delete or destroy all copies. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 2/21/2023. (lcjdb3)
|
February 8, 2023 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/3/2023. (tb)
|
February 3, 2023 |
Filing 388
Memorandum in opposition to re #384 Motion for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae Brief filed by IBRAHIM BAGUDU. (New, Jonathan)
|
February 3, 2023 |
Filing 387
RESPONSE re #384 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Sohn, Joshua)
|
February 1, 2023 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #385 the parties' joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is stayed until April 10, 2023; it is further ORDERED that, by not later than April 3, 2023, the parties shall file a joint status report advising the Court on whether (i) the stay should be extended beyond April 10, 2023 because the parties have made substantial progress towards finalizing the settlement, or (ii) the stay should expire on April 10, 2023 and the litigation should resume because the parties are unable to finalize the settlement; and in the event the parties advise the Court that the stay should expire, the joint status report shall include a proposed schedule for the remaining proceedings in this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 2/1/2023. (lcjdb3)
|
February 1, 2023 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/3/2023. (tb)
|
January 31, 2023 |
Filing 386
MOTION for Extension of Current Stay by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (See Docket Entry #385 to view document) (zjm)
|
January 31, 2023 |
Filing 385
Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Plaintiff, #2 Text of Proposed Order Claimant)(Quarcoo, Stephen)
|
January 20, 2023 |
Filing 384
MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by EMMANUEL OGEBE. (zjm)
|
November 8, 2022 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/7/2023. (tb)
|
November 7, 2022 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #382 the parties' joint motion to extend the current stay, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that this matter will be STAYED until February 7, 2023; and it is further ORDERED that, by not later than January 31, 2023, the parties shall file a joint status report either requesting that the stay be extended beyond February 7, 2023 because the parties have made substantial progress towards finalizing the settlement, or advising the court that the stay should expire on February 7, 2023 because the parties are unable to finalize a settlement and proposing a joint schedule for the remaining proceedings in this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 11/7/2022. (lcjdb3)
|
November 2, 2022 |
Filing 383
STATUS REPORT by IBRAHIM BAGUDU. (See Docket Entry #382 to view document) (zjm)
|
November 2, 2022 |
Filing 382
Joint MOTION to Stay and Status Report by IBRAHIM BAGUDU. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Campbell, Patrick)
|
August 3, 2022 |
Filing 381
Joint MOTION to Stay by IBRAHIM BAGUDU. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Joint Motion to Stay, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion to Stay)(Campbell, Patrick)
|
August 3, 2022 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #381 the parties' joint motion for stay, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that this matter will be STAYED until November 9, 2022; it is further ORDERED that, by not later than November 2, 2022, the parties shall submit a joint status report advising the Court of the status of settlement negotiations and, if appropriate, proposing a schedule for further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/3/2022. (lcjdb3)
|
August 3, 2022 |
Set/Reset Deadline: Joint Status Report due by 11/2/2022. (jth)
|
June 8, 2022 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 10/12/2022. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/12/2022. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/12/2023. (tb)
|
June 6, 2022 |
Filing 380
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #85 Scheduling Order (Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order) by IBRAHIM BAGUDU. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(New, Jonathan)
|
June 6, 2022 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #380 the parties' joint motion to amend scheduling order, and the entire record herein, the motion is hereby GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that expert witness depositions may be conducted until and including August 12, 2022; it is further ORDERED that motions for summary judgment shall be filed by not later than October 12, 2022; it is further ORDERED that any memoranda in opposition to summary judgment shall be filed by not later than December 12, 2022; and it is further ORDERED that any reply memoranda in support of a motion for summary judgment shall be filed by not later than January 12, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 6/6/2022. (lcjdb3) Modified on 6/8/2022 (tb).
|
May 27, 2022 |
Filing 379
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Cowherd on behalf of IBRAHIM BAGUDU (Cowherd, Matthew)
|
May 27, 2022 |
Filing 378
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Feil on behalf of IBRAHIM BAGUDU (Feil, Matthew)
|
May 2, 2022 |
Filing 377
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Matthew K. Cowherd, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9208119. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by IBRAHIM BAGUDU. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew K. Cowherd, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
May 2, 2022 |
Filing 376
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Matthew D. Feil, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9208071. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by IBRAHIM BAGUDU. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew D. Feil, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
May 2, 2022 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #376 claimant's motion for the admission of Matthew D. Feil pro hac vice, and the entire record herein, the motion is hereby GRANTED. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) #Click for instructions. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 5/2/2022. (lcjdb3)
|
May 2, 2022 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #376 claimant's motion for the admission of Matthew K. Cowherd pro hac vice, and the entire record herein, the motion is hereby GRANTED. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a) #Click for instructions. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 5/2/2022. (lcjdb3)
|
April 22, 2022 |
Filing 375
NOTICE of Appearance by Alison Yewdell on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Yewdell, Alison)
|
March 3, 2022 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #374 claimant's unopposed motion for extension of rebuttal expert discovery deadline, and the entire record herein, the motion is hereby GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that claimant shall make his rebuttal expert disclosure in opposition to plaintiff's expert opinion on the applicability of Nigerian law by not later than March 22, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/3/2022. (lcjdb3)
|
March 2, 2022 |
Filing 374
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Motion for an Extension of Rebuttal Expert Discovery Deadline) by IBRAHIM BAGUDU. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(New, Jonathan)
|
March 2, 2022 |
Filing 373
Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Quarcoo, Stephen)
|
December 28, 2021 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/2/2022 Summary Judgment motion due by 8/1/2022. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/30/2022. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/31/2022. (tb)
|
December 28, 2021 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #372 the parties' joint status report, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that proceedings in this action are STAYED through March 4, 2022; it is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report by not later than March 2, 2022; it is further ORDERED that rebuttal expert reports shall be served on or before March 8, 2022; it is further ORDERED that the parties shall conclude the further deposition of claimant pursuant to #329 the Court's Dec. 23, 2019 Order on or before April 15, 2022; it is further ORDERED that expert witness depositions may be conducted between April 15, 2022 and June 10, 2022; it is further ORDERED that motions for summary judgment shall be filed by no later than August 1, 2022; it is further ORDERED that any memoranda in opposition to summary judgment shall be filed by not later than September 30, 2022; and it is further ORDERED that any reply memoranda in support of a motion for summary judgment shall be filed by not later than October 31, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/28/2021. (lcjdb3)
|
December 17, 2021 |
Filing 372
Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quarcoo, Stephen)
|
September 28, 2021 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/17/2021. (tb)
|
September 28, 2021 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #370 the parties' joint status report and 371 the United States's motion to extend the stay in this matter, and the entire record herein, the United States's motion is GRANTED; it is hereby ORDERED that proceedings in this action are STAYED through January 4, 2022; it is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report by not later than December 17, 2021, which shall advise the Court as to whether the stay should be extended beyond January 4, 2022, or should expire on that date and which shall, if the parties agree that the stay should expire, propose a timeframe for remaining proceedings in this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 9/28/2021. (lcjdb3)
|
September 27, 2021 |
Filing 371
MOTION to Extend Stay by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (See Docket Entry #370 to view document). (znmw)
|
September 27, 2021 |
Filing 370
Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quarcoo, Stephen)
|
August 4, 2021 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/27/2021. (tb)
|
August 3, 2021 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #368 the parties' joint status report and 369 the United States's motion to extend the stay in this matter, and the entire record herein, the United States's motion is GRANTED nunc pro tunc; it is hereby ORDERED that proceedings in this action are STAYED through October 4, 2021; it is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report by not later than September 27, 2021, which shall advise the Court as to whether the stay should be extended beyond October 4, 2021, or should expire on that date and which shall, if the parties agree that the stay should expire, propose a timeframe for remaining proceedings in this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/3/2021. (lcjdb3).
|
July 26, 2021 |
Filing 369
MOTION to Extend Stay by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (See Docket Entry #368 to view document). (znmw)
|
July 26, 2021 |
Filing 368
Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quarcoo, Stephen)
|
March 29, 2021 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/26/2021. (tb)
|
March 26, 2021 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #366 the parties' Combined Joint Status Report and Request to Extend Current Stay, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that proceedings in this case shall remain STAYED for a period of time up to and including August 2, 2021; it is further ORDERED that, by not later than July 26, 2021, the parties shall file a joint status report that will advise the Court on whether (i) the stay should be extended beyond August 2, 2021, because either a settlement has been reached or substantial progress has been made towards settlement, or (ii) the stay should expire on August 2, 2021, and the litigation should resume because the parties are unable to reach settlement; and it is further ORDERED that if the parties advise the Court that the stay should expire on August 2, 2021, the joint status report shall include a proposed timeframe for the remaining proceedings in this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 03/26/2021. (lcjdb3)
|
March 25, 2021 |
Filing 367
MOTION to Stay by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (ztd); (See docket entry no. #366 to view.)
|
March 25, 2021 |
Filing 366
Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quarcoo, Stephen)
|
December 17, 2020 |
Filing 365
TRANSCRIPT OF MOTIONS HEARING before Judge John D. Bates held on 06/24/2020. Page Numbers: 1-59. Date of Issuance: 12/17/2020. Court Reporter: Sara Wick, telephone number 202-354-3284. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 1/7/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/17/2021.(Wick, Sara)
|
November 24, 2020 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/25/2021. (ztg)
|
November 24, 2020 |
NOTICE OF ERROR re #363 Status Report; emailed to michael.khoo@usdoj.gov, cc'd 30 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Two-part docket entry, 2. DO NOT REFILE - For future filings, you must make two entries (zjf, )
|
November 23, 2020 |
Filing 364
MOTION to Extend Current Stay by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (See Docket Entry #363 to view document) (zjf)
|
November 23, 2020 |
Filing 363
Joint STATUS REPORT and Motion to Extend Stay by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED Order)(Khoo, Michael)
|
November 23, 2020 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #363 the parties' Joint Status Report and Joint Motion to Extend Current Stay, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that all proceedings in this case shall be STAYED for a period of time up to and including April 1, 2021; it is further ORDERED that, by not later than March 25, 2021, the parties shall file a joint status report that will advise the Court on whether (i) the stay should be extended beyond April 1, 2021, because either a settlement has been reached or substantial progress has been made towards settlement, or (ii) the stay should expire on April 1, 2021, and the litigation should resume because the parties are unable to reach settlement; and it is further ORDERED that if the parties advise the Court that the stay should expire on April 1, 2021, the joint status report shall include a proposed timeframe for the remaining proceedings in this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 11/23/2020. (lcjdb3)
|
August 21, 2020 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/23/2020. (zjd)
|
August 21, 2020 |
Filing 362
Joint MOTION to Stay by IBRAHIM BAGUDU (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Joint Motion for Stay, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Campbell, Patrick)
|
August 21, 2020 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #362 the parties' Joint Motion for Stay, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is STAYED for a period of time up to and including November 30, 2020; it is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report, by not later than November 23, 2020, to advise the Court on whether (i) the stay should be extended beyond November 30, 2020, because either a settlement has been reached or substantial progress has been made towards settlement, or (ii) the stay should expire on November 30, 2020 and the litigation should resume because the parties are unable to reach settlement; and it is further ORDERED that if the parties advise the Court that the stay should expire on November 30, 2020, the joint status report shall include a joint proposed schedule for further proceedings in this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 08/21/20. (lcjdb3)
|
July 9, 2020 |
Filing 361
ORDER denying #339 the United States's motion for reconsideration and #353 claimant's motion to dismiss, and denying as moot #351 claimant's motion for leave to supplement the record. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/9/2020. (lcjdb3)
|
July 9, 2020 |
Filing 360
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/9/2020. (lcjdb3)
|
July 6, 2020 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(2) due by 7/31/2020. Defendant Rule 26(a)(2) due by 9/14/2020. (tb)
|
July 3, 2020 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #359 the United States's unopposed motion for an extension of expert discovery deadlines, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the discovery schedule is AMENDED as follows: expert disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) shall be made by not later than July 31, 2020; rebuttal expert disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) shall be made by not later than September 14, 2020; and expert depositions shall be completed by not later than November 2, 2020. All other provisions and requirements from the Court's April 29, 2015 Scheduling Order, as amended, shall remain in effect. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/3/2020. (lcjdb3)
|
July 2, 2020 |
Filing 359
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Quarcoo, Stephen)
|
June 24, 2020 |
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/24/2020 before Judge John D. Bates: re #353 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by IBRAHIM BAGUDU and #339 MOTION for Reconsideration re #215 Memorandum & Opinion filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Motions heard and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Sara Wick) (tb)
|
June 16, 2020 |
Filing 358
REPLY to opposition to motion re #351 MOTION for Leave to File /Supplement the Record filed by IBRAHIM BAGUDU. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(New, Jonathan)
|
June 15, 2020 |
Filing 357
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by IBRAHIM BAGUDU re #356 Reply to opposition to Motion . (New, Jonathan)
|
June 15, 2020 |
Filing 356
REPLY to opposition to motion re #353 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by IBRAHIM BAGUDU. (New, Jonathan)
|
June 9, 2020 |
Filing 355
Memorandum in opposition to re #351 MOTION for Leave to File /Supplement the Record filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Sohn, Joshua)
|
June 8, 2020 |
Filing 354
Memorandum in opposition to re #353 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Sohn, Joshua)
|
June 1, 2020 |
Filing 353
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by IBRAHIM BAGUDU (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Patrick T. Campbell in Support, #3 Exhibit A - First Witness Statement of William Thomas Christopher, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(New, Jonathan)
|
May 29, 2020 |
Filing 352
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #339 MOTION for Reconsideration re #215 Memorandum & Opinion (United States' Response to Claimant's Supplemental Brief) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael W. Khoo, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Sohn, Joshua)
|
May 29, 2020 |
Filing 351
MOTION for Leave to File /Supplement the Record by IBRAHIM BAGUDU (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Patrick T. Campbell in Support, #3 Exhibit A - Letter dated 5/25/20 (Redacted), #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(New, Jonathan)
|
May 28, 2020 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing reset for 6/24/2020 at 02:30 PM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge John D. Bates. (tb)
|
May 27, 2020 |
MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the hearing regarding this Court's mootness concern and #339 the United States's motion for reconsideration previously set for June 15, 2020 is hereby RESCHEDULED for June 24, 2020 at 2:30pm. The hearing will take place telephonically. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 5/27/2020. (lcjdb3)
|
May 15, 2020 |
Filing 350
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by IBRAHIM BAGUDU re #349 Response to Order of the Court, . (New, Jonathan)
|
May 15, 2020 |
Filing 349
RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #347 Order, filed by IBRAHIM BAGUDU. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick T. Campbell, #2 Exhibit A- Letter from Mahmud Abubakar Magaji Dated May 8, 2020, #3 Exhibit B- Letter from Juliet Ibekaku-Nwagwu Dated May 15, 2020, #4 Exhibit C- Consent Order Dated February 28, 2020, #5 Exhibit D- United States First Set of Special Interrogatories to Ibrahim Bagudu Dated July 28, 2014)(New, Jonathan)
|
May 15, 2020 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(2) due by 7/10/2020. Defendant Rule 26(a)(2) due by 7/10/2020. (tb)
|
May 13, 2020 |
Filing 348
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Quarcoo, Stephen)
|
May 13, 2020 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #348 the United States' unopposed motion for an extension of expert discovery deadlines, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the discovery schedule is AMENDED as follows: expert disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) shall be made by not later than July 10, 2020; rebuttal expert disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) shall be made by not later than August 24, 2020; and expert depositions shall be completed by not later than October 12, 2020. All other provisions and requirements from the Court's April 29, 2015 Scheduling Order, as amended, shall remain in effect. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 5/13/2020. (lcjdb3)
|
May 1, 2020 |
Filing 347
ORDER requiring supplemental briefing on issue of mootness and setting hearing for June 15, 2020, at 2:30pm in Courtroom 30 regarding this Court's mootness concern and #339 the United States's motion for reconsideration. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 5/1/2020. (lcjdb3) Modified on 5/1/2020 (tb).
|
May 1, 2020 |
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Brief due by 5/15/2020. Response due by 5/29/2020. Motion Hearing set for 6/15/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 30A before Judge John D. Bates. (tb)
|
April 21, 2020 |
Filing 346
ORDER denying #332 the Federal Government of Nigeria's motion for reconsideration of #329 , #330 the Court's December 23, 2019 order and accompanying memorandum opinion. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/21/2020. (lcjdb3)
|
April 13, 2020 |
Filing 345
AFFIDAVIT re #344 Reply to opposition to Motion, Supplemental Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn, by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B)(Sohn, Joshua)
|
April 13, 2020 |
Filing 344
REPLY to opposition to motion re #339 MOTION for Reconsideration re #215 Memorandum & Opinion filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Sohn, Joshua)
|
April 3, 2020 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #343 the United States' unopposed motion for an extension of time to file a reply in support of its motion for reconsideration regarding Claimant Ibrahim Bagudu's Article III standing, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the United States shall file its reply in support of its motion for reconsideration by not later than April 13, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/3/2020. (lcjdb3)
|
March 31, 2020 |
Filing 343
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #339 MOTION for Reconsideration re #215 Memorandum & Opinion by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sohn, Joshua)
|
March 30, 2020 |
Filing 342
Memorandum in opposition to re #339 MOTION for Reconsideration re #215 Memorandum & Opinion filed by IBRAHIM BAGUDU. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick T. Campbell, #2 Exhibit A-Government's Supplemental Brief, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(New, Jonathan)
|
March 17, 2020 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(2) due by 5/26/2020. Defendant Rule 26(a)(2) due by 5/26/2020. (tb)
|
March 16, 2020 |
ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .NOTICE OF ERROR re #341 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; emailed to stephen.quarcoo@usdoj.gov, cc'd 30 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. Please refile document, 3. If you are electronically filing, your signature must be on the signature line of documents and vice versa. (ztd, ) Modified on 3/16/2020 (ztd).
|
March 13, 2020 |
Filing 341
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Quarcoo, Stephen) Modified on 3/16/2020 (ztd).
|
March 13, 2020 |
Filing 340
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's March 5, 2018 Ruling by IBRAHIM BAGUDU (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(New, Jonathan) Modified relief on 3/13/2020 (ztd).
|
March 13, 2020 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #341 the United States' motion for an extension of expert discovery deadlines, the lack of opposition thereto, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the discovery schedule is AMENDED as follows: expert disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) shall be made by not later than May 26, 2020; rebuttal expert disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) shall be made by not later than July 8, 2020; and expert depositions shall be completed by not later than August 26, 2020. All other provisions and requirements from the Court's April 26, 2015 Scheduling Order, as amended, shall remain in effect. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/13/2020. (lcjdb3)
|
March 13, 2020 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #340 claimant's unopposed motion for an extension of time to file an opposition to the government's motion for reconsideration, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that claimant shall file his opposition by not later than March 30, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/13/2020. (lcjdb3)
|
March 9, 2020 |
Filing 339
MOTION for Reconsideration re #215 Memorandum & Opinion by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (2018 Agreement), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sohn, Joshua)
|
February 19, 2020 |
NOTICE OF ERROR re #338 Response to motion; emailed to joshua.sohn@usdoj.gov, cc'd 30 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Docket entry 332 was entered in error. You can not respond to something that is an error. (ztd, )
|
February 19, 2020 |
NOTICE OF ERROR re #334 Response to Order of the Court; emailed to info@aoelaw.com, cc'd 30 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Counsel must contact Attorney Admissions (202) 354-3110 regarding status. (ztd, )
|
February 18, 2020 |
Filing 338
RESPONSE re #332 MOTION for Reconsideration re #330 Sealed Memorandum Opinion filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Sohn, Joshua)
|
February 14, 2020 |
Filing 337
Unopposed MOTION to Modify for Extension of Expert Discovery Deadlines by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Claman, Daniel)
|
February 14, 2020 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #337 the United States' motion for an extension of expert discovery deadlines, the lack of opposition thereto, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the discovery schedule is AMENDED as follows: expert disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) shall be made by not later than March 26, 2020; rebuttal expert disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) shall be made by not later than May 8, 2020; and expert depositions shall be completed by not later than June 26, 2020. All other provisions and requirements from the Court's April 29, 2015 Scheduling Order, as amended, shall remain in effect. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 2/14/2020. (lcjdb3)
|
February 14, 2020 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Expert Disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) shall be made by 3/26/2020; Rebuttal Expert Disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) shall be made by 5/8/2020; Expert Depositions shall be completed by 6/26/2020. (jth)
|
February 12, 2020 |
Filing 336
RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #333 Order, Regarding Trilateral Agreement Among Nigeria, Jersey and the United States filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Nigeria-Jersey-U.S. Trilateral Agreement)(Claman, Daniel)
|
February 12, 2020 |
Filing 335
RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #333 Order, filed by IBRAHIM BAGUDU. (New, Jonathan)
|
February 12, 2020 |
Filing 334
RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #333 Order, Interested Party, Federal Government of Nigeria's Response to Court Order Dated February 04, 2020 filed by ALL ASSETS HELD IN ACCOUNT NUMBER 80020796, IN THE NAME OF DORAVILLE PROPERTIES CORPORATION, AT DEUTSCHE BANK INTERNATIONAL, LIMITED IN JERSEY, CHANNEL ISLANDS, AND ALL INTEREST, BENEFITS OR ASSETS TR. (Egbase, Anthony)
|
February 6, 2020 |
NOTICE OF ERROR re #332 Motion for Reconsideration; emailed to info@aoelaw.com, cc'd 30 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. Counsel must contact Attorney Admissions (202) 354-3110 regarding status. (ztd, ) .
|
February 5, 2020 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Memoranda due by 2/12/2020. (tb)
|
February 4, 2020 |
Filing 333
ORDER requiring the parties to inform the Court by not later than February 12, 2020 of the impact, if any, on this case of the United States' recent trilateral agreement to repatriate certain assets to Nigeria. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 2/4/2020. (lcjdb3)
|
February 3, 2020 |
Filing 332
ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .MOTION for Reconsideration re #330 Sealed Memorandum Opinion by FEDERAL GOVERNMENT OF NIGERIA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Egbase, Anthony) Modified on 2/6/2020 (ztd).
|
January 23, 2020 |
Filing 331
RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #329 Order on Sealed Motion,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,,,,,, filed by IBRAHIM BAGUDU. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(New, Jonathan)
|
December 23, 2019 |
Filing 330
UNSEALED PURSUANT TO ORDER #329 . . . . . MEMORANDUM OPINION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons). Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/23/2019. (zjth) Modified on 1/24/2020 (ztd).
|
December 23, 2019 |
Filing 329
ORDER that the United States' #308 Motion to Re-Open the Deposition of Claimant Ibrahim Bagudu for an additional three hours is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that the United States may re-open its deposition of claimant for an additional three hours. The subject matter of the re-opened deposition shall be limited to (a) claimant's communication(s) with Mr. Yakubu; (b) any other steps that may have been taken to impede depositions in this case; and (c) the documents produced since claimant's 2018 deposition, including the 2019 production; it is further ORDERED that the United States' #307 Sealed Motion to de-designate documents as confidential is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that Exhibits A and B to plaintiff's motion to de-designate [ECF Nos. 307-2, 307-3] are hereby DE-DESIGNATED as confidential and shall be unsealed on January 23, 2020; it is further ORDERED that the Memorandum Opinion issued on this date shall be UNSEALED on January 23, 2020; and it is further ORDERED that both parties shall review court filings related to the motions to re-open claimant's deposition and de-designate documents as confidential, including briefs and accompanying exhibits at ECF Nos. 302, 304, 307, 308, 311, 314, 316, 318, 322, 325, 326, and 327, and inform the Court by not later than January 23, 2020 whether, in light of this Court's decision, any information in the parties' briefs and supporting exhibits should remain under seal. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/23/2019. (jth)
|
December 23, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #328 the parties joint motion for an extension of expert discovery deadlines, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the discovery schedule is AMENDED as follows: expert disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) shall be made by not later than February 26, 2020; rebuttal expert disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) shall be made by not later than April 8, 2020; and expert depositions shall be completed by not later than May 27, 2020. All other provisions and requirements from the Courts April 29, 2015 Scheduling Order, last amended on September 30, 2019, shall remain in effect. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/23/2019. (lcjdb3)
|
December 23, 2019 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Expert Disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) shall be made by 2/26/2020; Rebuttal Expert Disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) shall be made by 4/8/2020; Expert Depositions shall be completed by 5/27/2020. (jth)
|
December 19, 2019 |
Filing 328
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Expert Discovery by IBRAHIM BAGUDU (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(New, Jonathan)
|
December 3, 2019 |
Filing 326
SEALED REPLY TO OPPOSITION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #307 SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd)
|
December 3, 2019 |
Filing 325
SEALED DOCUMENT filed by IBRAHIM BAGUDU re #305 MOTION for Discovery to Re-Open Deposition of Claimant Ibrahim Bagudu (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(New, Jonathan)
|
December 3, 2019 |
Filing 324
STIPULATION re #323 Surreply Concerning Filing of Confidential Material Under Seal in Connection with Claimant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Re-Open Deposition of Claimant Ibrahim Bagudu for an Additional Three Hours by IBRAHIM BAGUDU. (New, Jonathan)
|
December 3, 2019 |
Filing 323
SURREPLY to re #305 MOTION for Discovery to Re-Open Deposition of Claimant Ibrahim Bagudu filed by IBRAHIM BAGUDU. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(New, Jonathan)
|
December 3, 2019 |
Filing 322
SEALED DOCUMENT filed by IBRAHIM BAGUDU re #320 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Re-Open Deposition of Claimant Ibrahim Bagudu for an Additional Three Hours (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Sur-Reply, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit, #5 Certificate of Service)(New, Jonathan)
|
December 3, 2019 |
Filing 321
STIPULATION re #320 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Re-Open Deposition of Claimant Ibrahim Bagudu for an Additional Three Hours (Concerning Filing of Confidential Material Under Seal in Connection with Claimant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Re-Open Deposition of Claimant Ibrahim Bagudu for an Additional Three Hours) by IBRAHIM BAGUDU. (New, Jonathan)
|
December 3, 2019 |
Filing 320
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Re-Open Deposition of Claimant Ibrahim Bagudu for an Additional Three Hours by IBRAHIM BAGUDU (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Patrick T. Campbell (Redacted), #3 Exhibit A-Proposed Sur-Reply (Redacted), #4 Exhibit B-Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit C-Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit D-Filed Under Seal, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(New, Jonathan)
|
December 3, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #318 plaintiff's unopposed motion for leave to file under seal its reply in support of its motion to re-open deposition of claimant Ibrahim Bagudu, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file plaintiff's reply in support of its motion to re-open deposition of claimant Ibrahim Bagudu and its attached exhibits under seal. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/3/2019. (lcjdb3)
|
December 3, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #320 claimant's unopposed motion for leave to file a sur-reply in further opposition to plaintiff's motion to re-open deposition of claimant Ibrahim Bagudu, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that claimants motion to file its sur-reply is GRANTED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/3/2019. (lcjdb3)
|
December 3, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #316 plaintiff's unopposed motion for leave to file under seal its reply in support of its motion to de-designate documents, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file plaintiff's reply in support of its motion to de-designate documents under seal. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/3/2019. (lcjdb3)
|
November 26, 2019 |
Filing 319
REPLY to opposition to motion re #305 MOTION for Discovery to Re-Open Deposition of Claimant Ibrahim Bagudu filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration S. Chartey Quarcoo, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Quarcoo, Stephen)
|
November 26, 2019 |
Filing 318
SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Reply re Motion to Re-Open, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D)(Quarcoo, Stephen)
|
November 26, 2019 |
Filing 317
REPLY to opposition to motion re #303 MOTION to Unseal Document (Redacted for Public Filing) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Quarcoo, Stephen)
|
November 26, 2019 |
Filing 316
SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Reply re Motion to De-Designate)(Quarcoo, Stephen)
|
November 26, 2019 |
Filing 315
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen C Quarcoo on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Quarcoo, Stephen)
|
November 19, 2019 |
Filing 314
SEALED OPPOSITION filed by IBRAHIM BAGUDU. re #303 MOTION to Unseal Document (Redacted for Public Filing) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan B. New, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit I, #9 Exhibit J, #10 Exhibit L, #11 Certificate of Service)(New, Jonathan)
|
November 19, 2019 |
Filing 313
STIPULATION re #312 Response to motion,,, Concerning Filing of Confidential Material Under Seal in Connection with Claimant's Opposition to United States' Motion to De-Designate Documents by IBRAHIM BAGUDU. (New, Jonathan)
|
November 19, 2019 |
Filing 312
RESPONSE re #303 MOTION to Unseal Document (Redacted for Public Filing) filed by IBRAHIM BAGUDU. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan B. New (Redacted), #2 Exhibit A-Court Documents, #3 Exhibit B-September 23, 2019 Letter, #4 Exhibit C-Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit D-Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit E-Filed Under Seal, #7 Exhibit F-Filed Under Seal, #8 Exhibit G-Filed Under Seal, #9 Exhibit H- Filed Under Seal, #10 Exhibit I-Filed Under Seal, #11 Exhibit J-First Witness Statement of David Templeman (Redacted), #12 Exhibit K-UK Prohibition Order, #13 Exhibit L-Filed Under Seal, #14 Exhibit M-July 24, 2017 Letter from Malami to U.S. Ambassador, #15 Text of Proposed Order, #16 Certificate of Service)(New, Jonathan)
|
November 19, 2019 |
Filing 311
SEALED OPPOSITION filed by IBRAHIM BAGUDU. re #305 MOTION for Discovery to Re-Open Deposition of Claimant Ibrahim Bagudu (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick T. Campbell, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit I, #9 Exhibit J, #10 Exhibit K, #11 Exhibit L, #12 Exhibit M, #13 Exhibit N, #14 Exhibit P, #15 Exhibit Q, #16 Exhibit R, #17 Exhibit S, #18 Exhibit T, #19 Exhibit U, #20 Certificate of Service)(New, Jonathan)
|
November 19, 2019 |
Filing 310
STIPULATION re #309 Response to motion,,,,, Concerning Filing of Confidential Material Under Seal in Connection with Claimant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Re-Open Deposition of Claimant Ibrahim Bagudu for an Additional Three Hours by IBRAHIM BAGUDU. (New, Jonathan)
|
November 19, 2019 |
Filing 309
RESPONSE re #305 MOTION for Discovery to Re-Open Deposition of Claimant Ibrahim Bagudu filed by IBRAHIM BAGUDU. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick T. Campbell (Redacted), #2 Exhibit A-Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit B-July 24, 2017 letter from Nigeria to U.S., #4 Exhibit C-Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit D-Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit E-Filed Under Seal, #7 Exhibit F-Filed Under Seal, #8 Exhibit G-Filed Under Seal, #9 Exhibit H-May 14, 2019 letter from Nigeria to the U.S, #10 Exhibit I-Filed Under Seal, #11 Exhibit J-Filed Under Seal, #12 Exhibit K-Filed Under Seal, #13 Exhibit L-Filed Under Seal, #14 Exhibit M-Excerpts from September 25, 2019 Yakubu, Surajuddeen Balarabe Deposition, #15 Exhibit N-September 10, 2019 email from Claman to Baker (Redacted), #16 Exhibit O- September 4, 2019 Letter from FRN to U.S., #17 Exhibit P-Filed Under Seal, #18 Exhibit Q-Filed Under Seal, #19 Exhibit R-Email from Umar to IB (Redacted), #20 Exhibit S-Text exchange (Redacted), #21 Exhibit T-Filed Under Seal, #22 Exhibit U-Filed Under Seal, #23 Exhibit V-September 23, 2019 Letter from U.S. to FRN, #24 Text of Proposed Order, #25 Certificate of Service)(New, Jonathan)
|
November 12, 2019 |
Filing 308
SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(ztd)
|
November 12, 2019 |
Filing 307
SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(ztd) Modified on 1/24/2020 (ztd). (EXHIBITS 2 AND 3 UNSEALED PURSUANT TO 12/23/19 ORDER).
|
November 12, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #304 plaintiff's unopposed motion for leave to file under seal its motion to re-open deposition of claimant Ibrahim Bagdu, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file plaintiff's motion to re-open deposition of claimant Ibrahim Bagdu and its exhibits under seal. SO ORDERED by Judge John D. Bates on 11/12/19. (nbn)
|
November 12, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #302 plaintiff's unopposed motion for leave to file under seal its motion to de-designate documents, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file plaintiff's motion to de-designate documents and its exhibits under seal. SO ORDERED by Judge John D. Bates on 11/12/19. (znbn)
|
November 5, 2019 |
Filing 306
AFFIDAVIT re #305 MOTION for Discovery to Re-Open Deposition of Claimant Ibrahim Bagudu (Supplemental Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D (cont.))(Sohn, Joshua)
|
November 5, 2019 |
Filing 305
MOTION for Discovery to Re-Open Deposition of Claimant Ibrahim Bagudu by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Sohn, Joshua)
|
November 5, 2019 |
Filing 304
SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order re: Motion to Seal, #2 Motion to Re-Open Deposition, #3 Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Text of Proposed Order re: Motion to Re-Open Deposition)(Sohn, Joshua)
|
November 5, 2019 |
Filing 303
MOTION to Unseal Document (Redacted for Public Filing) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Sohn, Joshua)
|
November 5, 2019 |
Filing 302
SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order re: Motion to Seal, #2 Motion to De-designate, #3 Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Text of Proposed Order re: Motion to De-designate)(Sohn, Joshua)
|
October 31, 2019 |
Filing 301
ORDER regarding government's forthcoming motions to de-designate as confidential two documents and to reopen a deposition. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 10/31/2019. (lcjdb3)
|
October 22, 2019 |
Filing 300
SEALED DOCUMENT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(ztd)
|
October 22, 2019 |
SEALED MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #299 the governments sealed motion for leave to file document under seal, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the Governments Status Report [Dkt. #299-1] and Exhibit A [Dkt. #299-2] shall be filed under seal. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) SO ORDERED. By Judge John D. Bates on 10/22/2019. (zjth)
|
October 18, 2019 |
Filing 299
SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Status Report, #2 Exhibit A)(Sohn, Joshua)
|
September 30, 2019 |
Filing 298
SEALED ORDER. See the order for complete details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 9/27/2019. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons). (zjth)
|
September 26, 2019 |
Filing 297
SEALED OPPOSITION filed by IBRAHIM BAGUDU. re #296 SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Text of Proposed Order, #18 Certificate of Service)(New, Jonathan)
|
September 24, 2019 |
Filing 296
SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ztd)
|
September 23, 2019 |
Filing 295
SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Motion to Extend), #2 Text of Proposed Order (re Motion to Extend), #3 Text of Proposed Order (re Motion to Seal))(Sohn, Joshua)
|
August 5, 2019 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(2) due by 12/13/2019. Defendant Rule 26(a)(2) due by 12/13/2019. (tb)
|
August 2, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #293 the parties' joint status report, #294 the government's unopposed motion for an extension of time to complete discovery, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that #294 the government's motion for an extension of time is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the discovery schedule is AMENDED as follows: the fact depositions of three Nigerian witnesses noticed by the United States as of August 1, 2019 shall be completed by no later than September 27, 2019; requests for admission pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 36 shall be served by not later than October 15, 2019; expert disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) shall be made by not later than December 13, 2019; rebuttal expert disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) shall be made by not later than January 24, 2020; and expert depositions shall be completed by not later than March 13, 2020. All other provisions and requirements from #85 the Court's April 29, 2015 Scheduling Order, as amended, shall remain in effect. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 08/02/2019. (lcjdb3)
|
August 1, 2019 |
Filing 294
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Khoo, Michael)
|
August 1, 2019 |
Filing 293
Joint STATUS REPORT re Nigerian Depositions by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Khoo, Michael)
|
July 1, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #292 the government's unopposed motion for an extension of time to complete discovery, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that #292 the government's motion for an extension of time is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report by not later than August 1, 2019; and it is further ORDERED that the discovery scheduled is AMENDED as follows: all depositions (excluding expert depositions) pursuant to Federal Rules 30, 31, and 45 shall be completed by August 1, 2019; fact discovery shall close on August 1, 2019; requests for admission pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 36 shall be served by not later than August 15, 2019; expert disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) shall be made by not later than October 14, 2019; rebuttal expert disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) shall be made by not later than November 26, 2019; and expert depositions shall be completed by not later than January 13, 2020. All other provisions and requirements from #85 the Court's April 29, 2015 Scheduling Order, as amended, shall remain in effect. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 07/01/2019. (lcjdb3)
|
July 1, 2019 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 8/1/2019. Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(2) due by 10/14/2019. Defendant Rule 26(a)(2) due by 10/14/2019. Joint Status Report due by 8/1/2019 (tb)
|
June 30, 2019 |
Filing 292
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Khoo, Michael)
|
June 30, 2019 |
Filing 291
Joint STATUS REPORT re Nigerian Depositions by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Khoo, Michael)
|
June 18, 2019 |
Filing 290
Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re #288 Order on Motion to Compel; USCA Case Number 18-5267. (jf)
|
June 13, 2019 |
Filing 289
MANDATE of USCA as to #248 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by GODSON M. NNAKA ; USCA Case Number 18-5267. (Attachments: #1 USCA Order)(zrdj)
|
June 12, 2019 |
Filing 288
ORDER granting #271 claimant's motion to compel an additional deposition pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 30(b)(6). See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 06/12/2019. (lcjdb3)
|
May 15, 2019 |
Filing 287
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #285 Supplemental Memorandum United States' Response to Claimant's Supplemental Memorandum Regarding Claimant's Motion to Compel an Additional Three-Hour Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Claman, Daniel)
|
May 15, 2019 |
Filing 286
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by IBRAHIM BAGUDU re #277 MOTION to Compel The Production of Six Responsive Documents Regarding Foreign Meetings (New, Jonathan)
|
May 13, 2019 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(2) due by 10/25/2019. Defendant Rule 26(a)(2) due by 10/25/2019. Joint Status Report due by 7/1/2019. (tb)
|
May 13, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #284 the government's unopposed motion for extension of time to complete discovery, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that #284 the government's unopposed motion for extension of discovery deadlines is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report by not later than July 1, 2019, regarding the status of the noticed depositions in Nigeria and what additional time is needed to conduct those depositions, if any; and it is further ORDERED that the discovery schedule is AMENDED as follows: all depositions (excluding expert depositions) pursuant to Federal Rules 30, 31, and 45 shall be completed by July 1, 2019; fact discovery shall close on July 1, 2019; requests for admission pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 36 shall be served by not later than July 15, 2019; expert disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) shall be made by not later than September 13, 2019; rebuttal expert disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) shall be made by not later than October 25, 2019; and expert depositions shall be completed by not later than December 13, 2019. All other provisions and requirements from #85 the Court's April 29, 2015 Scheduling Order, as amended, shall remain in effect. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 05/13/2019. (lcjdb3)
|
May 10, 2019 |
Filing 285
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #271 MOTION to Compel an Additional Three-Hour Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition filed by IBRAHIM BAGUDU. (ztd)
|
May 10, 2019 |
Filing 284
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sohn, Joshua)
|
May 10, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #283 claimant's unopposed motion for leave to file supplemental briefing in support of #272 his motion to compel an additional three-hour Rule 30(b)(6) deposition, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that #283 claimant's unopposed motion for leave to file supplemental briefing is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that [283-3] claimant's supplemental memorandum is hereby deemed filed as of the date of this Order; and it is further ORDERED that the government shall file any response to the supplemental memorandum by not later than May 15, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 05/10/2019. (lcjdb3)
|
May 10, 2019 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Government shall file any response to the supplemental memorandum by not later than 5/15/2019. (tb)
|
May 10, 2019 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Government response due by 5/20/2019. (tb)
|
May 9, 2019 |
Filing 283
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Memorandum in Further Support of Claimant's Motion to Compel an Additional Three-Hour Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition by IBRAHIM BAGUDU (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Patrick T. Campbell, #3 Proposed Supplemental Memorandum, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(New, Jonathan)
|
May 9, 2019 |
Filing 282
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #277 MOTION to Compel The Production of Six Responsive Documents Regarding Foreign Meetings by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sohn, Joshua)
|
May 9, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #282 the government's unopposed motion for extension of time to file a response to #277 claimant's motion to compel, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that #282 the government's unopposed motion for extension of time is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the government shall file any response to claimant's motion to compel by not later than May 20, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 05/09/2019. (lcjdb3)
|
May 6, 2019 |
Filing 281
SEALED REPLY TO OPPOSITION filed by IBRAHIM BAGUDU re #271 MOTION to Compel an Additional Three-Hour Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3-Letter Dated October 12, 2018, #2 Certificate of Service)(New, Jonathan)
|
May 6, 2019 |
Filing 280
REPLY to opposition to motion re #271 MOTION to Compel an Additional Three-Hour Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition filed by IBRAHIM BAGUDU. (Attachments: #1 Reply Declaration of Jonathan B. New, #2 Exhibit 1-E-Mails Dated April 9, 2019 and April 12, 2019, #3 Exhibit 2-Letter Dated October 31, 2018, #4 Exhibit 3-Letter Dated October 12, 2018 (Redacted), #5 Certificate of Service)(New, Jonathan)
|
April 29, 2019 |
Filing 279
SEALED DOCUMENT filed by IBRAHIM BAGUDU re #277 MOTION to Compel The Production of Six Responsive Documents Regarding Foreign Meetings (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Letter dated February 7, 2019 from Patrick Campbell, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter dated February 15, 2019 from Joshua Sohn, #3 Exhibit 3 - Letter dated March 1, 2019 from Patrick Campbell, #4 Exhibit 4 - Letter datged March 14, 2019 from Joshua Sohn, #5 Exhibit 6 - Plaintiff's Third Supplemental Response to Fourth Set of Interrogatories, #6 Exhibit 7 - Excepts of Videotaped Deposition Transcript, #7 Exhibit 8 - Excerpts of Videotaped Deposition Transcript, #8 Exhibit 9 - Plaintiff's First Supplemental Response to Fourth Set of Interrogatories, #9 Exhibit 10 - Excerpts of Videotaped Deposition Transcript, #10 Exhibit 11 - Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Response to Fourth Set of Interrogatories, #11 Exhibit 12 - Privilege Logs, #12 Certificate of Service)(New, Jonathan)
|
April 29, 2019 |
Filing 278
STIPULATION re #277 MOTION to Compel The Production of Six Responsive Documents Regarding Foreign Meetings (Stipulation Concerning Filing of Confidential Materials Under Seal) by IBRAHIM BAGUDU. (New, Jonathan)
|
April 29, 2019 |
Filing 277
WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO DOCKET ENTRY NO. #286 . . . . .MOTION to Compel The Production of Six Responsive Documents Regarding Foreign Meetings by IBRAHIM BAGUDU (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support (Redacted), #2 Declaration of Jonathan B. New in Support, #3 Exhibit 1 - Letter dated February 7, 2019 from Patrick Campbell (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit 2 - Letter dated February 15, 2019 from Joshua Sohn (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit 3 - Letter dated March 1, 2019 from Patrick Campbell (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit 4 - Letter dated March 14, 2019 from Joshua Sohn (Filed Under Seal), #7 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts from Plaintiff's Privilege Log, #8 Exhibit 6 - Plaintiff's Third Supplemental Response to Fourth Set of Interrogatories (Filed Under Seal), #9 Exhibit 7 - Excerpts of Videotaped Deposition Transcript (Filed Under Seal), #10 Exhibit 8 - Excerpts of Videotaped Deposition Transcript (Filed Under Seal), #11 Exhibit 9 - Plaintiff's First Supplemental Response to Fourth Set of Interrogatories (Filed Under Seal), #12 Exhibit 10 - Exceprts of Videotaped Deposition Transcript (Filed Under Seal), #13 Exhibit 11 - Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Response to Fourth Set of Interrogatories (Filed Under Seal), #14 Exhibit 12 - Plaintiff's Fourt Supplemental Response to Fourth Set of Interrogatories (Filed Under Seal), #15 Exhibit 13 - Privilege Log Entries, #16 Text of Proposed Order, #17 Certificate of Service)(New, Jonathan) Modified on 5/16/2019 (ztd).
|
April 29, 2019 |
Filing 276
RESPONSE re #271 MOTION to Compel an Additional Three-Hour Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition [Public Redacted Version] filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Sohn, Joshua)
|
April 29, 2019 |
Filing 275
SEALED OPPOSITION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. re #271 MOTION to Compel an Additional Three-Hour Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Sohn, Joshua)
|
April 26, 2019 |
Filing 274
STIPULATION for Filing Under Seal by IBRAHIM BAGUDU, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Sohn, Joshua)
|
April 16, 2019 |
Filing 273
SEALED DOCUMENT filed by IBRAHIM BAGUDU re #271 MOTION to Compel an Additional Three-Hour Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - Videotaped deposition transcript, #2 Exhibit 3 - Videotaped deposition transcript, #3 Exhibit 4 - Objections and Responses to Sixth Set of Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit 5 - Letter dated April 21, 2017, #5 Exhibit 6 - Letter dated April 24, 2017, #6 Exhibit 7 - Letter dated December 5, 2018, #7 Exhibit 8 - Document produced by Plaintiff, #8 Exhibit 9 - Document produced by Plaintiff, #9 Exhibit 10 - Document produced by Plaintiff, #10 Exhibit 11 - Selected pages from 2002 day planner, #11 Exhibit 12 - May 3, 2001 correspondence, #12 Exhibit 13 - August 21, 2000 letter, #13 Exhibit 14 - August 7, 2001 message, #14 Exhibit 15 - January 29, 2004 letter, #15 Exhibit 16 - September 8, 2003 email, #16 Exhibit 18 - Letter dated May 11, 2018, #17 Exhibit 19 - Plaintiffs Second Supplemental Response to Fourth Set of Interrogatories, #18 Exhibit 20 - Videotaped deposition transcript, #19 Exhibit 21 - Videotaped deposition transcript, #20 Exhibit 22 - Plaintiffs Fourth Supplemental Response to Fourth Set of Interrogatories, #21 Exhibit 23 - September 11, 2003 email, #22 Exhibit 24 - August 27, 2003 email, #23 Exhibit 25 - Videotaped deposition transcript, #24 Exhibit 26 - September 4, 2003 email, #25 Exhibit 27 - Notes concerning a June 2001 meeting, #26 Certificate of Service)(New, Jonathan)
|
April 16, 2019 |
Filing 272
STIPULATION re #271 MOTION to Compel an Additional Three-Hour Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition (Stipulation Concerning Filing of Confidential Material Under Seal) by IBRAHIM BAGUDU. (New, Jonathan)
|
April 16, 2019 |
Filing 271
MOTION to Compel an Additional Three-Hour Rule 30(B)(6) Deposition by IBRAHIM BAGUDU (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support (Redacted), #2 Declaration of Jonathan B. New, #3 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Deposition dated May 15, 2018, #4 Exhibit 2 - August 14, 2018 videotaped deposition transcript (Redacted), #5 Exhibit 3 - Excerpts of the July 23, 2018 videotaped deposition transcript (Redacted), #6 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiffs Objections and Responses to Sixth Set of Interrogatories (Redacted), #7 Exhibit 5 - Letter from Patrick Campbell to Elizabeth Aloi, dated April 21, 2017 (Redacted), #8 Exhibit 6 - Letter from Elizabeth Aloi to Patrick Campbell, dated April 24, 2017 (Redacted), #9 Exhibit 7 - Letter from Patrick Campbell to Joshua Sohn, dated December 5, 2018 (Redacted), #10 Exhibit 8 - Filed Under Seal, #11 Exhibit 9 - Filed Under Seal, #12 Exhibit 10 - Filed Under Seal, #13 Exhibit 11 - Filed Under Seal, #14 Exhibit 12 - Filed Under Seal, #15 Exhibit 13 - Filed Under Seal, #16 Exhibit 14 - Filed Under Seal, #17 Exhibit 15 - Filed Under Seal, #18 Exhibit 16 - Filed Under Seal, #19 Exhibit 17 - Plaintiffs Response to Claimants Fourth Set of Interrogatories, #20 Exhibit 18 - Letter from Elizabeth Aloi to Patrick Campbell, dated May 11, 2018 (Redacted), #21 Exhibit 19 - Filed Under Seal, #22 Exhibit 20 - Filed Under Seal, #23 Exhibit 21 - Filed Under Seal, #24 Exhibit 22 - Filed Under Seal, #25 Exhibit 23 - Filed Under Seal, #26 Exhibit 24 - Filed Under Seal, #27 Exhibit 25 - Excerpts of September 27, 2018 videotaped deposition transcript (Redacted), #28 Exhibit 26 - Filed Under Seal, #29 Exhibit 27 - Filed Under Seal, #30 Text of Proposed Order, #31 Certificate of Service)(New, Jonathan)
|
February 7, 2019 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(2) due by 7/29/2019. Defendant Rule 26(a)(2) due by 7/29/2019. (tb)
|
January 30, 2019 |
Filing 270
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by IBRAHIM BAGUDU, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sohn, Joshua)
|
January 30, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #270 the parties' joint motion to extend discovery deadlines, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that the discovery schedule is AMENDED as follows: all depositions (excluding expert depositions) pursuant to Federal Rules 30, 31, and 45 shall be completed by May 15, 2019; requests for admission pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 36 shall be served by not later than May 29, 2019; expert disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) shall be made by not later than July 29, 2019; rebuttal expert disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) shall be made by not later than September 10, 2019; and expert depositions shall be completed by not later than October 29, 2019. All other provisions and requirements from #85 the Court's April 29, 2015 Scheduling Order, as amended, shall remain in effect. No further extensions will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 01/30/2019. (lcjdb3)
|
January 8, 2019 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Godson M. Nnaka's failure to respond to the Court's December 7, 2018 Order to show cause why #259 his motion for waiver of notice of appeal filing fee should not be denied, and #266 Nnaka's notice of payment of the filing fee, which rendered his waiver motion moot, it is hereby ORDERED that #259 Nnaka's motion for waiver of filing fee is DENIED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 01/08/2019. (lcjdb3)
|
January 3, 2019 |
Filing 269
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 01/03/2019. (lcjdb3)
|
January 3, 2019 |
Filing 268
ORDER granting #258 the government's motion for a protective order to preclude the deposition of Daniel Claman. See text of Order and accompanying Memorandum Opinion issued on this date for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 01/03/2019. (lcjdb3)
|
December 26, 2018 |
Filing 267
Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re #266 NOTICE OF PAYMENT re #248 APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT; USCA Case Number 18-5267. (jf)
|
December 21, 2018 |
Filing 266
NOTICE OF PAYMENT re #248 APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT by GODSON M. NNAKA. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-5855021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Amadi, Benneth) Modified on 12/26/2018 to correct docket text (jf).
|
December 11, 2018 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by 12/21/2018. Government's response due by 1/7/2019. (tb)
|
December 7, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Godson M. Nnaka shall show cause by not later than December 21, 2018 why #259 his motion for waiver of appeal filing fee should not be denied for failure to adhere to the requirements of Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 24; and it is further ORDERED that the government shall file any response by not later than January 7, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/7/2018. (lcjdb3)
|
November 20, 2018 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 2/15/2019. Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(2) due by 4/29/2019. Defendant Rule 26(a)(2) due by 4/29/2019. (tb)
|
November 16, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #265 the parties' joint motion to extend the discovery schedule, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED than the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the discovery schedule is AMENDED as follows: all depositions (excluding expert depositions) pursuant to Federal Rules 30, 31, and 45 shall be completed by the close of fact discovery; fact discovery shall close on February 15, 2019; requests for admission pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 36 shall be served by not later than February 28, 2019; expert disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) shall be made by not later than April 29, 2019; rebuttal expert disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) shall be made by not later than June 10, 2019; and expert depositions shall be completed by not later than July 29, 2019. All other provisions and requirements from the #85 Court's April 29, 2015 Scheduling Order, as amended, shall remain in effect. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 11/16/2018. (lcjdb3)
|
November 15, 2018 |
Filing 265
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Deadlines by IBRAHIM BAGUDU (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Remaining Discovery Deadlines, #3 Certificate of Service)(New, Jonathan)
|
October 16, 2018 |
Filing 264
REPLY to opposition to motion re #258 MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Deposition of Plaintiff's Trial Counsel Daniel H. Claman filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Sohn, Joshua)
|
October 15, 2018 |
Filing 263
NOTICE of Letter from the Tribunal of First Instance (Central Authority of the Republic and Canton of Geneva) in Connection with Request for International Judicial Assistance pursuant to The Hague Convention of 18 March 1970 on the taking of Evidence Abroad in Civil or Commercial Matters by IBRAHIM BAGUDU (Attachments: #1 Certification of Translation)(New, Jonathan)
|
October 9, 2018 |
Filing 262
SEALED DOCUMENT filed by IBRAHIM BAGUDU re #260 Memorandum in Opposition,,,,,,,,,, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - Decl. 01 - Excerpts of Hicks, Pamela J. 081418 Condensed, #2 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - Decl. 02 - Excerpts of Carter, Jason Edward 092718 Condensed, #3 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - Decl. 03 - Excerpts of Harris, John 080118 Condensed, #4 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - Decl. 04 - 2018-04-18 US Supp Response to Fourth Set of Interrogatories (fully under seal), #5 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - Decl. 05 - Swiss Meeting Notes (fully under seal), #6 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - Decl. 06 - July 6 Fax from Baker to Claman (fully under seal), #7 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - Decl. 07 - July 30, 2001 Email from Claman to Baker (fully under seal), #8 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - Decl. 08 - December 3, 2002 email from Klein to Harris (fully under seal), #9 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - Apr. 17, 2007 email from Baker to Claman, DOJ_00152345 (fully under seal), #10 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - Email from OMahony to Samuel, Claman, and Kluiver (June 4, 2007), #11 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - Email from OMahony to Claman (June 6, 2007), #12 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - Email from Claman to OMahony and Thompson (June 15, 2007), #13 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - Email from Claman to OMahony and Thompson and Attachment (June 20, 2007), #14 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - Email from Claman to Monfrini (July 12, 2007), #15 Exhibit 16 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - Email from Claman to Monfrini and Klein (Apr. 28, 2007), #16 Exhibit 17 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - Email from Claman to OMahony (July 2, 2008), #17 Exhibit 21 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - Letter from Day to Malami (Dec. 6, 2017), #18 Exhibit 22 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - Hicks Exhibit 05 (partially redacted), #19 Certificate of Service)(New, Jonathan)
|
October 9, 2018 |
Filing 261
STIPULATION re #260 Memorandum in Opposition,,,,,,,,,, Concerning Filing of Confidential Materials Under Seal by IBRAHIM BAGUDU. (New, Jonathan)
|
October 9, 2018 |
Filing 260
Memorandum in opposition to re #258 MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Deposition of Plaintiff's Trial Counsel Daniel H. Claman (Redacted) filed by IBRAHIM BAGUDU. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan B. New, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - Excerpts of 8/14/18 Deposition Transcript of Pamela J. Hicks, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - Excerpts of 9/27/18 Deposition Transcript of Jason E. Carter, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - Excerpts of 8/1/18 Deposition Transcript of John Harris, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - Plaintiff First Supplemental Response, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - Notes of 6/11/18 Meeting in Bern Switzerland, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - 7/6/01 Facsimile Transmission from Stephen Baker, #8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - 7/30/01 Facsimile Transmission from Daniel Claman, #9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - 12/3/02 E-mail from Yves Klein, #10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - 4/17/07 E-Mail from Stephen Baker, #11 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - 6/4/07 E-Mail from David O'Mahony, #12 Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - 6/6/07 E-Mail from David O'Mahony, #13 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - 6/20/07 to 7/12/07 E-Mail Exchanges, #14 Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - 6/20/07 E-Mail from Daniel H. Claman, #15 Exhibit 14 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - 7/12/07 to 7/25/07 E-Mail Exchanges, #16 Exhibit 15 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - Excerpts to 6/25/18 Deposition Transcripts of Debra Lynn LaPrevotte Griffith, #17 Exhibit 16 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - 4/28/08 to 4/29/08 E-Mail Exchanges, #18 Exhibit 17 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - 7/1/06 to 7/2/06 E-Mail Exchanges, #19 Exhibit 18 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - Plaintiff's Response to 4th Set of Interrogatories, #20 Exhibit 19 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - Excerpts of Plaintiff's Response to Interrogatories, #21 Exhibit 20 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - Excerpts of Plaintiff's Response to 2nd Set of Interrogatories, #22 Exhibit 21 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - 12/6/17 Letter from M. Kendall, #23 Exhibit 22 to Declaration of Jonathan B. New - Exhibit 5 of 8/14/18 Depositon of Pamela J. Hicks, #24 Text of Proposed Order, #25 Certificate of Service)(New, Jonathan)
|
October 6, 2018 |
Filing 259
MOTION for Waiver of Notice of Appeal Fee by GODSON M. NNAKA (Amadi, Benneth)
|
September 25, 2018 |
Filing 258
MOTION for Protective Order to Preclude Deposition of Plaintiff's Trial Counsel Daniel H. Claman by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua L. Sohn, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Sohn, Joshua)
|
September 14, 2018 |
Filing 257
RESPONSE TO LETTER FROM TRIBUNAL OF FIRST INSTANCE ( CENTRAL AUTHORITY OF THE REPUBLIC AND CANTON OF GENEVA) IN CONNECTION WITH REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE PURSUANT TO HAGUE CONVENTION OF 18 MARCH 1970. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 09/13/18. (Attachments: #1 Translation)(tb)
|
September 13, 2018 |
Filing 256
RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #255 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, filed by IBRAHIM BAGUDU. (Attachments: #1 Certified Translation, #2 Certificate of Service)(New, Jonathan)
|
September 12, 2018 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Claimant shall submit translation to Court by 9/13/2018. (tb)
|
September 11, 2018 |
Filing 255
ORDER denying #254 claimant Ibrahim Bagudu's motion for issuance of his proposed response to the letter from the Tribunal of First Instance in the Republic and Canton of Geneva. Claimant shall submit to the Court a French translation of this Court's attached response to the letter by not later than September 13, 2018. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 09/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Letter) (lcjdb3)
|
September 7, 2018 |
Filing 254
Unopposed MOTION for Issuance of a Response to Letter from Tribunal of First Instance (Central Authority of the Republic and Canton of Geneva) in Connection with Request for International Judicial Assistance pursuant to The Hague Convention of 18 March 1970 on the taking of Evidence Abroad in Civil or Commercial Matters by IBRAHIM BAGUDU (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A to Memorandum of Law in Support, #3 Declaration of Patrick T. Campbell in Support, #4 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Patrick T. Campbell, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(New, Jonathan)
|
September 5, 2018 |
USCA Case Number 18-5267 for #248 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by GODSON M. NNAKA. (zrdj)
|
September 4, 2018 |
Filing 253
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 9/4/2018. (lcjdb3)
|
September 4, 2018 |
Filing 252
ORDER granting in part and denying in part #226 the government's motion for default and final judgment. See text of Order and accompanying Memorandum Opinion issued on this date for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 9/4/2018. (lcjdb3)
|
August 30, 2018 |
Filing 251
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aloi, Elizabeth)
|
August 30, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #251 the government's unopposed motion to amend the discovery schedule, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED than the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the discovery schedule is AMENDED as follows: contention-based interrogatories shall be served by not later than the close of fact discovery; all depositions (excluding expert depositions) pursuant to Federal Rules 30, 31, and 45 shall be completed by the close of fact discovery; fact discovery shall close on November 15, 2018; requests for admission pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 36 shall be served by not later than November 29, 2018; expert disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) shall be made by not later than January 28, 2019; rebuttal expert disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) shall be made by not later than March 8, 2019; and expert depositions shall be completed by not later than April 29, 2019. All other provisions and requirements from the Court's April 29, 2015 Scheduling Order #85 as amended shall remain in effect. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 08/30/2018. (lcjdb3)
|
August 29, 2018 |
Filing 250
ORDER granting #245 claimant Ibrahim Bagudu's unopposed motion for issuance of a letter of request for international judicial assistance. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 08/29/2018. (lcjdb3)
|
August 29, 2018 |
Filing 249
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The fee remains to be paid and another notice will be transmitted when the fee has been paid in the District Court re #248 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (ztd)
|
August 28, 2018 |
Filing 248
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #244 Memorandum & Opinion by GODSON M. NNAKA. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Amadi, Benneth)
|
August 27, 2018 |
Filing 247
SEALED DOCUMENT filed by IBRAHIM BAGUDU re #245 Unopposed MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Letter Rogatory)(New, Jonathan)
|
August 27, 2018 |
Filing 246
STIPULATION re #245 Unopposed MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory (Stipulation Concerning Filing of Confidential Material Under Seal) by IBRAHIM BAGUDU. (New, Jonathan)
|
August 27, 2018 |
Filing 245
Unopposed MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by IBRAHIM BAGUDU (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support (Redacted), #2 Exhibit A-Proposed Letter Rogatory (Redacted), #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(New, Jonathan)
|
August 6, 2018 |
Filing 244
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 08/06/2018. (lcjdb3)
|
August 6, 2018 |
Filing 243
ORDER denying #237 Godson Nnaka's motion for reconsideration and #239 Nnaka's motion for a preliminary injunction. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 08/06/2018. (lcjdb3)
|
July 31, 2018 |
Filing 242
REPLY to opposition to motion re #239 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by GODSON M. NNAKA. (Amadi, Benneth)
|
July 26, 2018 |
Filing 241
Memorandum in opposition to re #239 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aloi, Elizabeth)
|
July 25, 2018 |
Filing 240
MANDATE of USCA as to #205 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by GODSON M. NNAKA. USCA Case Number 17-5273. (Attachments: #1 USCA Order)(zrdj)
|
July 24, 2018 |
Filing 239
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by GODSON M. NNAKA (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, in Support of Motion, #4 Exhibit B, in Support of Motion)(Amadi, Benneth)
|
June 18, 2018 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Fact Discovery due by 10/15/2018. Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(2) due by 12/28/2018. Defendant Rule 26(a)(2) due by 2/8/2019. (tb)
|
June 15, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #238 claimant Ibrahim Bagudu's unopposed motion to amend the discovery schedule, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED than the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the discovery schedule is AMENDED as follows: fact-based interrogatories pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 33 shall be served by not later than August 27, 2018; requests for admission pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 36 shall be served by not later than October 29, 2018; all depositions (excluding expert depositions) pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 30, 31, and 45 shall be noticed by deposition notice or subpoena by not later than August 27, 2018, and shall be completed by the close of fact discovery; fact discovery shall close on October 15, 2018; expert disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) shall be made by not later than December 28, 2018; rebuttal expert disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) shall be made by not later than February 8, 2019; and expert depositions shall be completed by not later than March 29, 2019. All other provisions and requirements from the Court's April 29, 2015 Scheduling Order #85 as amended shall remain in effect. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 06/15/2018. (lcjdb3)
|
June 14, 2018 |
Filing 238
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by IBRAHIM BAGUDU (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Patrick T. Campbell, #3 Exhibit 1 to Campbell Declaration - Email Correspondence Dated May 23, 2018, #4 Exhibit 2 to Campbell Declaration - Email Correspondence Dated June 5, 2018, #5 Exhibit 3 to Campbell Declaration - Email Correspondence from June 6, 2018 to June 12, 2018, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(New, Jonathan)
|
June 13, 2018 |
Filing 237
MOTION FOR HEARING and Ruling on his Rule 60(b) Motion (Doc. #198), by GODSON M. NNAKA (Attachments: #1 Appendix (Doc. #198), The Motion Claimant Requests to be Acted Upon)(Amadi, Benneth) Modified event and text on 6/15/2018 (ztd).
|
June 5, 2018 |
Filing 236
REPLY to opposition to motion re #226 MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Aloi, Elizabeth)
|
June 1, 2018 |
Filing 235
SEALED DOCUMENT filed by IBRAHIM BAGUDU re #234 Notice (Other), (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B-Request for Union Bank UK Plc., #2 Exhibit C-Request for Commerzbank AG's London Branch, #3 Exhibit D-Request for HSBC Bank Plc., #4 Exhibit E-Request for Bank of International Settlements, #5 Exhibit F-Request for Union Bancaire Privee)(New, Jonathan)
|
June 1, 2018 |
Filing 234
NOTICE of Submission Under Seal of Complete Unredacted Letters of Request for International Judicial Assistance Pursuant to May 4, 2018 Order by IBRAHIM BAGUDU re #228 Order on Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(New, Jonathan)
|
May 29, 2018 |
Filing 233
SEALED DOCUMENT filed by IBRAHIM BAGUDU re #231 Memorandum in Opposition, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(New, Jonathan)
|
May 29, 2018 |
Filing 232
STIPULATION re #231 Memorandum in Opposition, Concerning Filing of Confidential Materials Under Seal by IBRAHIM BAGUDU. (New, Jonathan)
|
May 29, 2018 |
Filing 231
Memorandum in opposition to re #226 MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment MOTION for Default Judgment as to filed by IBRAHIM BAGUDU. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick T. Campbell, #2 Exhibit 1 to Campbell Declaration - Unpublished Memorandum Order, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(New, Jonathan)
|
May 8, 2018 |
Filing 230
NOTICE That Claimant Nnaka's Appeal No. 17-5273 is a Separate Appeal, and it is still pending in the Appeals Court, and Not yet Concluded by GODSON M. NNAKA re #229 USCA Mandate (Amadi, Benneth)
|
May 7, 2018 |
Filing 229
MANDATE of USCA as to #102 Notice of Appeal filed by GODSON M. NNAKA ; USCA Case Number 16-5025. (Attachments: #1 USCA Judgment)(td)
|
May 4, 2018 |
Filing 228
ORDER granting #221 claimant Ibrahim Bagudu's unopposed motion for issuance of letters of request for international judicial assistance. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 05/04/2018. (lcjdb3)
|
May 4, 2018 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Claimant Ibrahim Bagudu response due by 5/29/2018. (tb)
|
May 4, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #227 claimant Ibrahim Bagudu's consent motion for extension of time, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that claimant Ibrahim Bagudu shall file any opposition to the government's motion for entry of default judgment and final judgment by not later than May 29, 2018. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 05/04/2018. (lcjdb3)
|
May 3, 2018 |
Filing 227
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #226 MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment MOTION for Default Judgment as to by IBRAHIM BAGUDU (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order for Extension of Time to File Opposition)(New, Jonathan)
|
May 1, 2018 |
Filing 226
MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment , MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aloi, Elizabeth) Modified event on 5/2/2018 (td).
|
April 18, 2018 |
Filing 225
NOTICE of Proposed Order by IBRAHIM BAGUDU re #221 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory (New, Jonathan)
|
April 2, 2018 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to motion for issuance of letters of rogatory due by 4/16/2018. (tb)
|
March 29, 2018 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Government's Response to #227 due by 4/16/2018. (dot)
|
March 29, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the government shall file any response to #221 claimant IBRAHIM BAGUDU'S motion for issuance of letters rogatory by not later than April 16, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/29/2018. (lcjdb3) Modified on 4/2/2018 (tb).
|
March 26, 2018 |
Filing 224
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by IBRAHIM BAGUDU re #221 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory , #223 Sealed Document,,, #222 Stipulation . (New, Jonathan)
|
March 26, 2018 |
Filing 223
SEALED DOCUMENT filed by IBRAHIM BAGUDU re #221 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick T. Campbell, #2 Exhibit 2 to Campbell Declaration-Debit Advice, #3 Exhibit 3 to Campbell Declaration-Debit Advice, #4 Exhibit 4 to Campbell Declaration-Confirmation, #5 Exhibit 5 to Campbell Declaration-Confirmation, #6 Exhibit 6 to Campbell Declaration-Confirmation, #7 Exhibit 8 to Campbell Declaration, #8 Exhibit A-Letter Rogatory to First City Monument Bank Ltd., #9 Exhibit B-Request for Union Bank UK Plc., #10 Exhibit C-Request for Commerzbank AG's London Branch, #11 Exhibit D-Request for HSBC Bank Plc., #12 Exhibit E-Request for Bank for International Settlements, #13 Exhibit F-Request for Union Bancaire Privee)(New, Jonathan)
|
March 26, 2018 |
Filing 222
STIPULATION Concerning Filing of Confidential Documents Under Seal in Connection with Claimant's Motion for Issuance of Letters of Request for International Judicial Assistance by IBRAHIM BAGUDU. (New, Jonathan)
|
March 26, 2018 |
Filing 221
MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by IBRAHIM BAGUDU (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support (Redacted), #2 Declaration of Patrick T. Campbell (Redacted, #3 Exhibit 1 to Campbell Declaration-Letter, #4 Exhibit 2 to Campbell Declaration-Debit Advice (Redacted), #5 Exhibit 3 to to Campbell Declaration-Debit Advice (Redacted), #6 Exhibit 4 to Campbell Declaration-Confirmation (Redacted), #7 Exhibit 5 to Campbell Declaration-Confirmation (Redacted), #8 Exhibit 6 to Campbell Declaration-Confirmation (Redacted), #9 Exhibit 7 to Campbell Declaration-Letter, #10 Exhibit 8 to Campbell Declaration (Filed Under Seal), #11 Exhibit A-Letter Rogatory to First City Monument Bank Ltd. (Redacted), #12 Exhibit B-Request for Union Bank UK Plc. (Redacted), #13 Exhibit C-Request for Commerzbank AG's London Branch (Redacted), #14 Exhibit D-Request for HSBC Bank Plc. (Redacted), #15 Exhibit E-Request for Bank for International Settlements (Redacted), #16 Exhibit F-Request for Union Bancaire Privee (Redacted), #17 Text of Proposed Order)(New, Jonathan)
|
March 23, 2018 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 8/14/2018. Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(2) due by 10/29/2018. (tb)
|
March 20, 2018 |
Filing 220
ORDER granting #219 the parties' joint motion for extension of time to complete discovery. See text of Order for details. In light of the Court's Order granting the government's motion to strike #214 , and the numerous prior extensions to the discovery schedule, no further extensions will be granted absent exceptional circumstances. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/20/2018. (lcjdb3)
|
March 16, 2018 |
Filing 219
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by IBRAHIM BAGUDU (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(New, Jonathan)
|
March 15, 2018 |
Filing 218
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ALL ASSETS HELD IN THE INVESTMENT PORTFOLIO OF BLUE HOLDING (1) PTE. LTD., ON BEHALF OF OR TRACEABLE TO RIDLEY GROUP LIMITED, AND/OR THE RIDLEY TRUST AT JAMES HAMBRO & PARTNERS LLP AND ALL INTEREST, B (znmw)
|
March 15, 2018 |
Filing 217
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ALL ASSETS HELD IN THE INVESTMENT PORTFOLIO OF BLUE HOLDING (1) PTE. LTD., ON BEHALF OF OR TRACEABLE TO RIDLEY GROUP LIMITED, AND/OR THE RIDLEY TRUST AT J.O. HAMBRO INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT LIMITED AND A (znmw)
|
March 13, 2018 |
Filing 216
AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT Against Defendant Assets H and J by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Aloi, Elizabeth)
|
March 5, 2018 |
Filing 215
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/5/2018. (lcjdb3)
|
March 5, 2018 |
Filing 214
ORDER granting in part and denying in part #163 the motion to strike. See text of Order and accompanying memorandum opinion issued on this date for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/5/2018. (lcjdb3)
|
January 18, 2018 |
Filing 213
Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re Minute Order on Motion for Waiver; USCA Case Number 17-5273. (znmw)
|
January 18, 2018 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Fact Discovery shall close on 5/14/2018; Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(2) shall be made by 7/27/2018; Defendants Expert Disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(2) shall be made by 7/27/2018; Rebuttal Expert Disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(2) shall be made by 9/10/2018. (jth)
|
January 17, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Godson M. Nnaka's failure to respond to the Court's December 27, 2017 Order to show cause why #206 the motion for waiver of notice of appeal filing fee should not be denied, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion #206 is DENIED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/17/2018. (lcjdb3)
|
January 16, 2018 |
Filing 212
ORDER granting #211 the parties' joint motion for extension of time to complete discovery. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/16/2018. (lcjdb3)
|
January 12, 2018 |
Filing 211
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by F A B, H A B, I A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, MARYAM ATIKU BAGUDU, MOHAMMED ATIKU BAGUDU (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(New, Jonathan)
|
January 3, 2018 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's response to Show Cause due by 1/8/2018. Government's response due by 1/22/2018. (tb)
|
December 28, 2017 |
Filing 210
Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re #209 USCA Fees Received; USCA Case Number 17-5273. (znmw)
|
December 27, 2017 |
Filing 209
USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number 0090-5264378 re #205 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by GODSON M. NNAKA. (Amadi, Benneth) Modified event title on 12/28/2017 (znmw).
|
December 27, 2017 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Godson M. Nnaka shall show cause by 1/8/2018, why the #206 motion for waiver of appeal filing fee should not be denied either as a matter that is not properly before this Court, as moot, or for any other reason; the government shall file any response by 1/22/2018. (jth)
|
December 27, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Godson M. Nnaka shall show cause by not later than January 8, 2018, why #206 the motion for waiver of appeal filing fee should not be denied either as a matter that is not properly before this Court, as moot, or for any other reason; and it is further ORDERED that the government shall file any response by not later than January 22, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/27/2017. (lcjdb3)
|
December 26, 2017 |
Filing 208
NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Lee Sohn on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Sohn, Joshua)
|
December 8, 2017 |
USCA Case Number 17-5273 for #205 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by GODSON M. NNAKA. (td)
|
December 1, 2017 |
Filing 207
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The fee remains to be paid and another notice will be transmitted when the fee has been paid in the District Court re #205 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (znmw)
|
November 30, 2017 |
Filing 206
First MOTION for Waiver of Notice of Appeal Filing Fee by GODSON M. NNAKA (Attachments: #1 Appendix Notice of Appeal)(Amadi, Benneth)
|
November 30, 2017 |
Filing 205
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #203 Order on Motion for Relief from Judgment, Order on Motion to Vacate by GODSON M. NNAKA. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Amadi, Benneth)
|
November 28, 2017 |
Filing 204
ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE OF APPEAL TO THE CIRCUIT as to #203 Order on Motion for Relief from Judgment, Order on Motion to Vacate by GODSON M. NNAKA. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Amadi, Benneth) Modified on 11/28/2017 (zrdj).
|
November 28, 2017 |
NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #204 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading selecting the correct Circuit Court and pay the filing fee in the amount of $505.00. (zrdj)
|
November 15, 2017 |
Filing 203
ORDER deferring consideration of #198 motion to vacate in light of pending appeal. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 11/15/2017. (lcjdb3)
|
November 6, 2017 |
Filing 202
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM re #163 MOTION to Strike #23 Claim, #17 Claim, #24 Claim, #19 Claim, #22 Claim, #21 Claim, #25 Claim, #18 Claim filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Aloi, Elizabeth) Modified event title on 11/7/2017 (znmw).
|
November 6, 2017 |
Filing 201
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM re #163 MOTION to Strike #23 Claim, #17 Claim, #24 Claim, #19 Claim, #22 Claim, #21 Claim, #25 Claim, #18 Claim filed by F A B, H A B, I A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, MARYAM ATIKU BAGUDU, MOHAMMED ATIKU BAGUDU. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Barr, Jonathan) Modified event title on 11/7/2017 (znmw).
|
November 1, 2017 |
Filing 200
TRANSCRIPT OF 10/26/17 MOTION HEARING before Judge John D. Bates held on October 26, 2017. Page Numbers: 1-113. Date of Issuance: 11/01/2017. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the tr anscript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/22/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/2/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2018.(Wayne, Bryan)
|
October 30, 2017 |
NOTICE OF ERROR re #199 Meet and Confer Statement; emailed to bamadilaw@comcast.net, cc'd 26 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Incorrect header/caption/case number, 2. Document incomplete/illegible, 3. Incorrect event used, 4. Please refile document, 5. ENTERED IN ERROR; Document does not contain case caption or court header; Title of document does not match docket entry selected; Refile accordingly. (znmw, )
|
October 27, 2017 |
Filing 199
ENTERED IN ERROR.....MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Amadi, Benneth) Modified on 10/30/2017 (znmw).
|
October 26, 2017 |
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/26/2017 before Judge John D. Bates re #163 MOTION to Strike #23 Claim, #17 Claim, #24 Claim, #19 Claim, #22 Claim, #21 Claim, #25 Claim, #18 Claim filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA: motion heard and taken under advisement. The parties shall file, by not later than November 6, 2017, briefs of not longer than 7 pages addressing the questions whether, if claimant Ibrahim Bagudu has standing based on his annuity claim: (1) there is any monetary limit on his standing, and (2) whether his standing would be sufficient to confer standing on the other claimants. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne) (tb) Modified on 10/27/2017 to correct docket link/text (jf).
|
October 24, 2017 |
Filing 198
MOTION for Relief from Judgment Made In this Case on December 17, 2015 by GODSON M. NNAKA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Amadi, Benneth). Added MOTION to Vacate on 10/25/2017 (znmw).
|
October 20, 2017 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 10/26/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 30A before Judge John D. Bates. (tb)
|
September 26, 2017 |
Filing 197
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re #196 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (znmw)
|
September 25, 2017 |
Filing 196
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #123 Order on Motion for Order by GODSON M. NNAKA. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-5129230. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Amadi, Benneth)
|
September 19, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #195 the claimants' motion for hearing on #163 the government's motion to strike, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the claimants' motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that a motion hearing is scheduled for October 26, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 30. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 9/19/2017. (lcjdb3)
|
September 12, 2017 |
Filing 195
MOTION for Hearing re #163 MOTION to Strike #23 Claim, #17 Claim, #24 Claim, #19 Claim, #22 Claim, #21 Claim, #25 Claim, #18 Claim , #185 Memorandum in Opposition,,,,,, by F A B, H A B, I A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, MARYAM ATIKU BAGUDU, MOHAMMED ATIKU BAGUDU (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
September 8, 2017 |
Filing 194
SEALED REPLY TO OPPOSITION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #163 MOTION to Strike #23 Claim, #17 Claim, #24 Claim, #19 Claim, #22 Claim, #21 Claim, #25 Claim, #18 Claim (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14, #2 Statement of Facts)(Khoo, Michael)
|
September 8, 2017 |
Filing 193
STIPULATION re #192 Reply to opposition to Motion,, to file documents under seal by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Khoo, Michael)
|
September 8, 2017 |
Filing 192
REPLY to opposition to motion re #163 MOTION to Strike #23 Claim, #17 Claim, #24 Claim, #19 Claim, #22 Claim, #21 Claim, #25 Claim, #18 Claim filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Elizabeth Aloi, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Statement of Facts)(Khoo, Michael)
|
August 15, 2017 |
Filing 191
ORDER regarding production format for "attorney's eyes only" documents. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/15/2017. (lcjdb3)
|
July 17, 2017 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 5/14/2018. Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(2) due by 7/27/2018. Defendant Rule 26(a)(2) due by 7/27/2018. (tb)
|
July 14, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #189 the parties' joint motion to amend the discovery schedule, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED than the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that the discovery schedule is AMENDED as follows. Fact-based interrogatories pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 33 shall be served by not later than January 17, 2018; contention-based interrogatories shall be served on or after March 12, 2018, but not later than the close of fact discovery. Requests and subpoenas for documents pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 34 and 45 shall be served by not later than January 17, 2018. Requests for admission pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 36 shall be served by not later than May 28, 2018. All depositions (excluding expert depositions) pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 30, 31, and 45 shall be noticed by deposition notice or subpoena by not later than March 26, 2018, and shall be completed by the close of fact discovery. Fact discovery shall close on May 14, 2018. Expert disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) shall be made by not later than July 27, 2018. Rebuttal expert disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2)shall be made by not later than September 10, 2018. Expert depositions shall be completed by not later than October 26, 2018. All other provisions and requirements from the Court's April 29, 2015 Scheduling Order #85 shall remain in effect. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/14/2017. (lcjdb3)
|
July 13, 2017 |
Filing 190
Joint STATUS REPORT by F A B, H A B, I A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, MARYAM ATIKU BAGUDU, MOHAMMED ATIKU BAGUDU. (Barr, Jonathan)
|
July 13, 2017 |
Filing 189
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Khoo, Michael)
|
June 8, 2017 |
Filing 188
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #163 MOTION to Strike #23 Claim, #17 Claim, #24 Claim, #19 Claim, #22 Claim, #21 Claim, #25 Claim, #18 Claim by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aloi, Elizabeth)
|
June 8, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #188 the unopposed motion for extension of time to file reply, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the United States shall file its reply in support of #163 its motion to strike by not later than September 8, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 6/8/2017. (lcjdb3)
|
June 5, 2017 |
Filing 187
SEALED OPPOSITION filed by F A B, H A B, I A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, MARYAM ATIKU BAGUDU, MOHAMMED ATIKU BAGUDU. re #163 MOTION to Strike #23 Claim, #17 Claim, #24 Claim, #19 Claim, #22 Claim, #21 Claim, #25 Claim, #18 Claim (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick T. Campbell, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 9, #8 Exhibit 10, #9 Exhibit 11, #10 Exhibit 12, #11 Exhibit 13, #12 Exhibit 14, #13 Exhibit 15, #14 Exhibit 16, #15 Exhibit 17, #16 Exhibit 18, #17 Exhibit 19, #18 Exhibit 20, #19 Exhibit 21, #20 Exhibit 22, #21 Exhibit 23, #22 Exhibit 24, #23 Declaration of Professor Hans Tjio, #24 Statement of Aaron Mullins, #25 Claimants' Responsive Statement of Genuine Issues and Material Facts to Plaintiff United States of America)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
June 5, 2017 |
Filing 186
STIPULATION Concerning Filing of Confidential Documents Under Seal in Connection with Claimants' Opposition to the United States' Motion to Stirke Claims Pursuant to Rule G(8)(c) of the Supplemental Rules for Admiralty and Maritime Claims and Asset Forfeiture Actions by F A B, H A B, I A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, MARYAM ATIKU BAGUDU, MOHAMMED ATIKU BAGUDU. (Barr, Jonathan)
|
June 5, 2017 |
Filing 185
Memorandum in opposition to re #163 MOTION to Strike #23 Claim, #17 Claim, #24 Claim, #19 Claim, #22 Claim, #21 Claim, #25 Claim, #18 Claim (Redacted) filed by F A B, H A B, I A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, MARYAM ATIKU BAGUDU, MOHAMMED ATIKU BAGUDU. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick T. Campbell, #2 Exhibit 1-Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 2-Business Profile(Company) of Blue PTC Pte. Ltd., #4 Exhibit 3-Business Profile(Company) of Blue Holdings (1) Pte. Ltd., #5 Exhibit 4-Business Profile(Company) of Blue Holdings (2) Pte. Ltd., #6 Exhibit 5-Filed Under Seal, #7 Exhibit 6-Filed Under Seal, #8 Exhibit 7-Filed Under Seal, #9 Exhibit 8-Filed Under Seal, #10 Exhibit 9-Filed Under Seal, #11 Exhibit 10-Filed Under Seal, #12 Exhibit 11-Filed Under Seal, #13 Exhibit 12-Filed Under Seal, #14 Exhibit 13-Filed Under Seal, #15 Exhibit 14-Filed Under Seal, #16 Exhibit 15-Filed Under Seal, #17 Exhibit 16-Filed Under Seal, #18 Exhibit 17-Filed Under Seal, #19 Exhibit 18-Filed Under Seal, #20 Exhibit 19-Filed Under Seal, #21 Exhibit 20-Filed Under Seal, #22 Exhibit 21-Filed Under Seal, #23 Exhibit 22-Filed Under Seal, #24 Exhibit 23-Excerpts From the May15, 2017 Videotaped Deposition Transcript of Professor Tang Hang Wu, #25 Exhibit 24-Filed Under Seal, #26 Declaration of Professor Hans Tjio (Redacted), #27 Statement of Aaron Mullins (Redacted), #28 Claimants' Responsive Statement of Genuine Issues and Material Facts to Plaintiff United States of America (Redacted), #29 Text of Proposed Order, #30 Certificate of Service)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
May 23, 2017 |
Filing 184
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge John D. Bates held on May 17, 2017; Page Numbers: 1-30. Date of Issuance: May 20, 2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the < < <<
< < Redaction Request due 6/13/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2017.(Dickman, Janice)
|
May 17, 2017 |
Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 5/17/2017 before Judge John D. Bates: The government will confer with the relevant foreign law enforcement partner about sharing Exhibits 1 to 4 of the in camera documents. Thereafter, the government will provide claimants with an opportunity to conduct an "attorney's eyes only" review of the in camera documents, subject to the government's redaction of legal analysis. The government will provide the Court with copies of the redacted in camera documents. After completing this process, the parties will file with the Court a status report, of not more than 2 pages per side, detailing any remaining disputes concerning the in camera documents. (Court Reporter Janice Dickman) (tb)
|
May 10, 2017 |
Filing 183
Joint STATUS REPORT by F A B, H A B, I A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, MARYAM ATIKU BAGUDU, MOHAMMED ATIKU BAGUDU. (Barr, Jonathan)
|
May 5, 2017 |
Filing 182
ORDER granting #168 the motion for a Court Order consistent with D.C. Rule of Professional Conduct 4.2. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 5/5/2017. (lcjdb3)
|
May 1, 2017 |
Filing 181
SEALED DOCUMENT filed by F A B, H A B, I A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, MARYAM ATIKU BAGUDU, MOHAMMED ATIKU BAGUDU re #172 Order (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick T. Campbell, #2 Exhibit 1. Settlement Agreement, #3 Exhibit 2. Copy of Transcript, #4 Certificate of Service)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
May 1, 2017 |
Filing 180
STIPULATION Concerning Filing of Confidential Documents Under Seal in Connection with Claimants' Opposition to the United States' April 21, 2017 Submission in Support of Withholding Six Documents from Discovery by F A B, H A B, I A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, MARYAM ATIKU BAGUDU, MOHAMMED ATIKU BAGUDU. (Barr, Jonathan)
|
May 1, 2017 |
Filing 179
RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #172 Order (Redacted Version) filed by F A B, H A B, I A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, MARYAM ATIKU BAGUDU, MOHAMMED ATIKU BAGUDU. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick T. Campbell ( Redacted Version), #2 Exhibit 1. ( Redacted Version), #3 Exhibit 2. ( Redacted Version), #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
April 28, 2017 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Claimants list of identifying documents for in camera review due by 5/1/2017. Government's response due by 5/8/2017. (tb)
|
April 26, 2017 |
Filing 178
TRANSCRIPT OF 4/5/17 STATUS HEARING before Judge John D. Bates, held on April 5, 2017. Page Numbers: 1-30. Date of Issuance: 04/26/2017. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcr ipt may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 5/17/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/25/2017.(Wayne, Bryan)
|
April 26, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #177 the joint motion to amend the scheduling order previously entered #172 , and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED than the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that #172 the scheduling order previously entered is AMENDED as follows: by not later than the close of business on May 1, 2017, claimants may provide the Court with a list identifying up to ten additional documents for in camera review; and by not later than May 8, 2017, the government may file a response that is limited to addressing any documents that claimants may file for in camera review. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/26/2017. (lcjdb3)
|
April 25, 2017 |
Filing 177
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #172 Order by F A B, H A B, I A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, MARYAM ATIKU BAGUDU, MOHAMMED ATIKU BAGUDU (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
April 21, 2017 |
Filing 176
SEALED DOCUMENT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #175 Response to Order of the Court, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Aloi, Elizabeth)
|
April 21, 2017 |
Filing 175
RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re #172 Order filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Aloi, Elizabeth)
|
April 17, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #174 the parties' joint stipulation, and the entire record herein, the Court hereby approves the terms of #174 the parties' stipulated protective order regarding the attorneys' eyes only review of documents pursuant to #172 the Court's April 5, 2017 Order. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/17/17. (lcjdb2)
|
April 14, 2017 |
Filing 174
STIPULATION re #172 Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Aloi, Elizabeth)
|
April 7, 2017 |
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Government's brief supporting non-production of in camera documents due by 4/21/2017. Claimant's response due by 5/1/2017. Joint Status Report due by 5/10/2017. Status Conference set for 5/17/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 30A before Judge John D. Bates. (tb)
|
April 5, 2017 |
Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 4/5/2017 before Judge John D. Bates: See Scheduling Order previously entered. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne) (tb)
|
April 5, 2017 |
Filing 173
REPLY to opposition to motion re #168 MOTION for Order Consistent with D.C. Rule of Professional Conduct 4.2 filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Aloi, Elizabeth)
|
April 5, 2017 |
Filing 172
SCHEDULING ORDER. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/5/2017. (lcjdb3)
|
April 3, 2017 |
Filing 171
Joint STATUS REPORT by F A B, H A B, I A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, MARYAM ATIKU BAGUDU, MOHAMMED ATIKU BAGUDU. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick T. Campbell, #2 Exhibit 1. March 8, 2017 Letter from Elizabeth A. Aloi to Jonathan R. Barr, #3 Exhibit 2. March 13, 2017 Letter from Patrick T. Campbell to Aloi, #4 Exhibit 3. March 20, 2017 Letter from Aloi to Campbell, #5 Exhibit 4. March 24, 2017 Letter from Campbell to Aloi)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
March 29, 2017 |
Filing 170
SEALED DOCUMENT filed by FEDERAL GOVERNMENT OF NIGERIA re #168 MOTION for Order Consistent with D.C. Rule of Professional Conduct 4.2, #169 Sealed Opposition (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8, #2 Certificate of Service)(Egbase, Anthony)
|
March 29, 2017 |
Filing 169
SEALED OPPOSITION filed by FEDERAL GOVERNMENT OF NIGERIA. re #168 MOTION for Order Consistent with D.C. Rule of Professional Conduct 4.2 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Egbase, Anthony)
|
March 16, 2017 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Counsel for Nigeria shall file a response, if any, by not later than 3/29/2017. (kt)
|
March 16, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #168 the government's motion for an order consistent with D.C. Rule of Professional Conduct 4.2, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that counsel for Nigeria shall file a response, if any, by not later than March 29, 2017; and it is further ORDERED that, if the response names any government attorneys who are currently the subject of a bar complaint, the response shall be filed under seal. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/16/17. (lcjdb3)
|
March 15, 2017 |
Filing 168
MOTION for Order Consistent with D.C. Rule of Professional Conduct 4.2 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Aloi, Elizabeth)
|
March 14, 2017 |
Filing 167
TRANSCRIPT OF 3/6/17 MOTIONS HEARING before Judge John D. Bates, held on March 6, 2017. Page Numbers: 1-130. Date of Issuance: 03/14/2017. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne. Telephone number 202-354-3186. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced a bove. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/4/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/14/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/12/2017.(Wayne, Bryan)
|
March 7, 2017 |
Filing 166
ORDER requiring the parties to meet and confer regarding the scope of their discovery dispute, denying as moot #142 claimants' motion to compel an inadvertently produced document, denying without prejudice #138 & #148 claimants' motions to compel and for issuance of letters rogatory, directing the parties to file status reports by not later than close of business on April 3, 2017, requiring claimants to oppose the government's motion to strike by not later than June 5, 2017, adjusting the scheduling order in this case, and setting a status conference for April 5, 2017, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 30A. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/7/2017. (lcjdb3)
|
March 6, 2017 |
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 3/6/2017 before Judge John D. Bates: re #138 MOTION to Compel Production of Responsive Non-Privileged Documents filed by AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, I A B, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, F A B, MARYAM ATIKU BAGUDU, M A B, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, H A B.; motion heard and taken under advisement. Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne) (tb)
|
March 3, 2017 |
Filing 165
SEALED DOCUMENT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #164 Stipulation (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Declaration)(Aloi, Elizabeth)
|
March 3, 2017 |
Filing 164
STIPULATION re #163 MOTION to Strike #23 Claim, #17 Claim, #24 Claim, #19 Claim, #22 Claim, #21 Claim, #25 Claim, #18 Claim by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Aloi, Elizabeth)
|
March 3, 2017 |
Filing 163
MOTION to Strike #23 Claim, #17 Claim, #24 Claim, #19 Claim, #22 Claim, #21 Claim, #25 Claim, #18 Claim by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Declaration, #29 Text of Proposed Order)(Aloi, Elizabeth) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/17/2017) (ztd). (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/17/2017) (ztd). (Attachment 3 replaced on 3/17/2017) (ztd). (Attachment 4 replaced on 3/17/2017) (ztd). (Attachment 5 replaced on 3/17/2017) (ztd). (Attachment 6 replaced on 3/17/2017) (ztd). (Attachment 7 replaced on 3/17/2017) (ztd). (Attachment 8 replaced on 3/17/2017) (ztd). (Attachment 9 replaced on 3/17/2017) (ztd). (Attachment 10 replaced on 3/17/2017) (ztd). (Attachment 11 replaced on 3/17/2017) (ztd). (Attachment 28 replaced on 3/17/2017) (ztd). (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/29/2017) (ztd).
|
February 1, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that a hearing on the pending discovery motions is set for March 6, 2017, at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 30A. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 2/1/2017. (lcjdb3)
|
February 1, 2017 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 30A before Judge John D. Bates. (tb)
|
January 13, 2017 |
Filing 162
SURREPLY to re #138 MOTION to Compel Production of Responsive Non-Privileged Documents filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(znmw)
|
January 13, 2017 |
Filing 161
MOTION for Leave to File Surreply re #138 MOTION to Compel Production of Responsive Non-Privileged Documents filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Surreply, #3 Exhibit to Surreply)(Aloi, Elizabeth) Modified event title on 1/17/2017 (znmw).
|
January 13, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #161 the government's motion for leave to file a surreply, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that [161-2] the government's surreply may be docketed in this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/13/17. (lcjdb3)
|
January 9, 2017 |
Filing 160
SEALED DOCUMENT filed by F A B, H A B, I A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, MARYAM ATIKU BAGUDU, MOHAMMED ATIKU BAGUDU re #157 Reply to opposition to Motion, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
January 9, 2017 |
Filing 159
SEALED REPLY TO OPPOSITION filed by F A B, H A B, I A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, MARYAM ATIKU BAGUDU, MOHAMMED ATIKU BAGUDU re #148 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory to the Appropriate Judicial Authorities of Nigeria (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
January 9, 2017 |
Filing 158
STIPULATION Concerning Filing of Confidential Documents Under Seal in Connection with Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory to the Appropriate Judicial Authorities of Nigeria by F A B, H A B, I A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, MARYAM ATIKU BAGUDU, MOHAMMED ATIKU BAGUDU. (Barr, Jonathan)
|
January 9, 2017 |
Filing 157
REPLY to opposition to motion re #148 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory to the Appropriate Judicial Authorities of Nigeria [Redacted] filed by F A B, H A B, I A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, MARYAM ATIKU BAGUDU, MOHAMMED ATIKU BAGUDU. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick T. Campbell, #2 Exhibit 1: Redacted Excerpts of Peter Gana's Direct and Cross-Examination Testimony, #3 Certificate of Service)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
January 2, 2017 |
Filing 156
Memorandum in opposition to re #148 MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory to the Appropriate Judicial Authorities of Nigeria filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aloi, Elizabeth)
|
December 28, 2016 |
Filing 155
Letters Rogatory Issued (1). (jth)
|
December 28, 2016 |
Filing 154
ORDER - Request for International Judicial Assistance (Letter Rogatory). Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/28/2016. (jth)
|
December 22, 2016 |
Filing 153
SEALED REPLY TO OPPOSITION filed by F A B, H A B, I A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, MARYAM ATIKU BAGUDU, MOHAMMED ATIKU BAGUDU re #142 SEALED MOTION filed by F A B, H A B, I A B, M A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, MARYAM ATIKU BAGUDU (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
December 22, 2016 |
Filing 152
SEALED DOCUMENT filed by F A B, H A B, I A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, MARYAM ATIKU BAGUDU, MOHAMMED ATIKU BAGUDU re #149 Reply to opposition to Motion,, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
December 22, 2016 |
Filing 151
SEALED REPLY TO OPPOSITION filed by F A B, H A B, I A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, MARYAM ATIKU BAGUDU, MOHAMMED ATIKU BAGUDU re #138 MOTION to Compel Production of Responsive Non-Privileged Documents (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
December 22, 2016 |
Filing 150
STIPULATION Concerning Filing of Confidential Documents Under Seal In Connection With Claimants' November 4, 2016 Motion to Compel by F A B, H A B, I A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, MARYAM ATIKU BAGUDU, MOHAMMED ATIKU BAGUDU. (Barr, Jonathan)
|
December 22, 2016 |
Filing 149
REPLY to opposition to motion re #138 MOTION to Compel Production of Responsive Non-Privileged Documents (REDACTED) filed by F A B, H A B, I A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, MARYAM ATIKU BAGUDU, MOHAMMED ATIKU BAGUDU. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick T. Campbell, #2 Exhibit 1. Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit 2. December 16, 2016 Sahara Reporters Article, #4 Exhibit 3. December 16, 2016 ThisDay Article, #5 Exhibit 4. Government Response to Interrogatories ( REDACTED), #6 Certificate of Service)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
December 21, 2016 |
Filing 148
MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory to the Appropriate Judicial Authorities of Nigeria by F A B, H A B, I A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, MARYAM ATIKU BAGUDU, MOHAMMED ATIKU BAGUDU (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A: Letter Rogatory as to Peter Gana, #3 Exhibit B: Letter Rogatory as to Dr. Paul A. Ogwuma, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
December 15, 2016 |
Filing 147
MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket by Substituting Claimant Mohammed Atiku Bagudu's Full Name by M A B (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
December 15, 2016 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #147 claimant's consent motion to amend, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that that the clerk will substitute the name "Mohammed Atiku Bagudu" for "M.A.B., a minor, by and through his mother Aisha Atiku Bagudu, as guardian and/or next friend" on the docket and as otherwise appropriate in this proceeding. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/15/16. (lcjdb3)
|
December 13, 2016 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #146 plaintiff's unopposed motion for an extension, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiff may seek leave to file a surreply by not later than January 13, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/13/16. (lcjdb3)
|
December 13, 2016 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff may seek leave to file a surreply by 1/13/2017. (tb)
|
December 12, 2016 |
Filing 146
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Surreply by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aloi, Elizabeth)
|
December 12, 2016 |
Filing 145
ORDER granting #144 the parties' joint motion for an extension. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/12/16. (lcjdb3)
|
December 9, 2016 |
Filing 144
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to /of Interim Discovery Deadlines by F A B, H A B, I A B, M A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, MARYAM ATIKU BAGUDU (Attachments: #1 Parties' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Joint Motion for Extension of Interim Discovery Deadlines, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
December 2, 2016 |
Filing 143
Memorandum in opposition to re #138 MOTION to Compel Production of Responsive Non-Privileged Documents filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Aloi, Elizabeth)
|
November 7, 2016 |
Filing 142
SEALED MOTION filed by F A B, H A B, I A B, M A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, MARYAM ATIKU BAGUDU (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Patrick Campbell, #3 Exhibit 1: Letter dated May 9, 2016, #4 Exhibit 2: Email Exchange, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
November 4, 2016 |
Filing 141
SEALED DOCUMENT filed by F A B, H A B, I A B, M A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, MARYAM ATIKU BAGUDU re #138 MOTION to Compel Production of Responsive Non-Privileged Documents (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 to Campbell Declaration, #2 Exhibit 4 to Campbell Declaration, #3 Exhibit 13 to Campbell Declaration, #4 Exhibit 15 to Campbell Declaration, #5 Exhibit 16 to Campbell Declaration, #6 Exhibit 20 to Campbell Declaration, #7 Exhibit 21 to Campbell Declaration, #8 Exhibit 22 to Campbell Declaration)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
November 4, 2016 |
Filing 140
SEALED DOCUMENT filed by F A B, H A B, I A B, M A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, MARYAM ATIKU BAGUDU re #138 MOTION to Compel Production of Responsive Non-Privileged Documents (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
November 4, 2016 |
Filing 139
STIPULATION Concerning Filing of Confidential Documents Under Seal in Connection with Claimants' November 4, 2016 Motion to Compel by F A B, H A B, I A B, M A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, MARYAM ATIKU BAGUDU. (Barr, Jonathan)
|
November 4, 2016 |
Filing 138
MOTION to Compel Production of Responsive Non-Privileged Documents by F A B, H A B, I A B, M A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, MARYAM ATIKU BAGUDU (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support (Redacted), #2 Declaration of Patrick T. Campbell (Redacted), #3 Exhibit 1-Claimant's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents, #4 Exhibit 2-June 10, 2015 Letter (Redacted), #5 Exhibit 3-United States' Responses to First Set of Requests for Production, #6 Exhibit 4-September 11, 2015 Letter (Redacted), #7 Exhibit 5-Notice of Filing-Government's Initial Privilege Log 1, #8 Exhibit 6-Excerpts from Government's Privilege Log 2, #9 Exhibit 7-Excerpts from Government's Privilege Log 3, #10 Exhibit 8-Excerpts from Government's Privilege Log 4, #11 Exhibit 9-Excerpts from Government's Privilege Log 5, #12 Exhibit 10-November 12, 2015 Letter, #13 Exhibit 11-December 3, 2105 Letter, #14 Exhibit 12-February 26, 2016 Letter, #15 Exhibit 13-May 9, 2016 Letter (Redacted), #16 Exhibit 14-May 27, 2016 Letter, #17 Exhibit 15-June 2, 2016 Letter (Redacted), #18 Exhibit 16-July 8, 2016 Letter (Redacted), #19 Exhibit 17-August 26, 2016 Letter, #20 Exhibit 18-Notice of Filing-Government's Updated Privilege Log 1, #21 Exhibit 19-Transcript of October 5, 2016 Status Hearing, #22 Exhibit 20-Redacted, #23 Exhibit 21-United States' Second Supplemental Response to Interrogatory 2 (Redacted), #24 Exhibit 22-United States' Response to Interrogatories (Redacted), #25 Exhibit 23-September 13, 2016 E-Mail, #26 Text of Proposed Order, #27 Certificate of Service)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
November 4, 2016 |
MINUTE ORDER: In a telephone call to chambers, the parties have outlined a dispute regarding the government's right to clawback an allegedly privileged document. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties may brief this dispute in connection with the motion to compel that claimants will file later today. Pending any decision by the Court, the parties are further instructed to comply with the provisions of the protective order. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 11/4/16. (lcjdb3)
|
October 28, 2016 |
Filing 137
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER denying #126 Godson Nnaka's motion to stay and #135 his motion for reconsideration. See text of Memorandum Opinion & Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 10/28/16. (lcjdb3)
|
October 25, 2016 |
Filing 136
REPLY to opposition to motion re #126 MOTION to Stay Further Proceedings in this Case Until the Final Determination of Claimant's (Nnaka's) Pending Meritorious Appeal, filed by GODSON M. NNAKA. (Amadi, Benneth)
|
October 19, 2016 |
Filing 135
MOTION for Reconsideration re #123 Order on Motion for Order Imposing Charging Lien; Based on Newly Discovered Evidence and on Fraud on the Court, by GODSON M. NNAKA (Amadi, Benneth)
|
October 17, 2016 |
Filing 134
Memorandum in opposition to re #126 MOTION to Stay Further Proceedings in this Case Until the Final Determination of Claimant's (Nnaka's) Pending Meritorious Appeal, filed by F A B, H A B, I A B, M A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, MARYAM ATIKU BAGUDU. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
October 14, 2016 |
Filing 133
Memorandum in opposition to re #126 MOTION to Stay Further Proceedings in this Case Until the Final Determination of Claimant's (Nnaka's) Pending Meritorious Appeal, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Khoo, Michael)
|
October 13, 2016 |
Filing 132
TRANSCRIPT OF 10/05/16 STATUS HEARING, before Judge John D. Bates, held on October 5, 2016. Page Numbers: 1-30. Date of Issuance: 10/13/16. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the trans cript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/3/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/13/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/11/2017.(Wayne, Bryan)
|
October 11, 2016 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Government may seek leave to file surreply by 12/29/2016. Motions due by 11/4/2016. Response due by 12/2/2016. Reply due by 12/22/2016. (tb)
|
October 6, 2016 |
Filing 131
ORDER setting a schedule for briefing discovery issues. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 10/6/16. (lcjdb3)
|
October 5, 2016 |
Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 10/5/2016 before Judge John D. Bates: Scheduling Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne) (tb)
|
October 5, 2016 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/5/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 30A before Judge John D. Bates. (tb)
|
October 4, 2016 |
Filing 130
NOTICE of Claimant, Godson M. Nnaka's, Assent to the Federal Republic of Nigeria's Request for the Referral of this Matter to Mediation, by GODSON M. NNAKA re #129 Notice (Other) (Amadi, Benneth)
|
October 3, 2016 |
Filing 129
NOTICE of Request by Interested Party Federal Government of Nigeria for Referral to Mediation Pursuant to LCvR 84.4 by FEDERAL GOVERNMENT OF NIGERIA re #108 Order (Egbase, Anthony)
|
October 3, 2016 |
Filing 128
MEMORANDUM by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Aloi, Elizabeth)
|
October 3, 2016 |
Filing 127
RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order, Claimants' Memorandum Seeking Relief from Government's Improper Withholding of Responsive Non-Privileged Documents filed by F A B, H A B, I A B, M A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, MARYAM ATIKU BAGUDU. (Barr, Jonathan)
|
September 30, 2016 |
Filing 126
MOTION to Stay Further Proceedings in this Case Until the Final Determination of Claimant's (Nnaka's) Pending Meritorious Appeal, by GODSON M. NNAKA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Amadi, Benneth)
|
September 30, 2016 |
USCA Case Number 16-5283 for #124 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit filed by GODSON M. NNAKA. (zrdj)
|
September 29, 2016 |
Filing 125
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Fee remains to be paid and another notice will be transmitted when the fee has been paid in the District Court re #124 Notice of Appeal to the DC CIRCUIT COURT. (zrdj)
|
September 28, 2016 |
Filing 124
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO THE DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #123 Order on Motion for Order by GODSON M. NNAKA. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Amadi, Benneth) Modified on 9/29/2016 to reflect the correct Appeals Court(zrdj).
|
September 28, 2016 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties' memorandum due by 10/3/2016. (tb)
|
September 26, 2016 |
MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that, by not later than close of business on October 3, 2016, plaintiff and claimants shall each file a memorandum, not to exceed three pages, describing the disputed discovery issue and recommending an approach for resolving it. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 9/26/16. (lcjdb3)
|
September 16, 2016 |
Filing 123
ORDER denying #117 Godson Nnaka's motion for a charging lien. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 9/16/16. (lcjdb3)
|
September 14, 2016 |
Filing 122
REPLY to opposition to motion re #117 MOTION for Order to Impose Charging Lien in the Amount of $320 Million Dollars Against Nigeria's Monetary and Financial Interest in this Case, Or 40% of any Financial and/or Monetary Award due to Nigeria in this case, to Cover for Go filed by GODSON M. NNAKA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A In Support of Claimant Nnaka's Repl to the Oppositions of Nigeria and the United States to His Motion for Imposition of Lien,)(Amadi, Benneth)
|
September 9, 2016 |
Filing 121
Memorandum in opposition to re #117 MOTION for Order to Impose Charging Lien in the Amount of $320 Million Dollars Against Nigeria's Monetary and Financial Interest in this Case, Or 40% of any Financial and/or Monetary Award due to Nigeria in this case, to Cover for Go filed by F A B, H A B, I A B, M A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, MARYAM ATIKU BAGUDU. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
September 7, 2016 |
Filing 120
TRANSCRIPT OF 4/6/16 STATUS HEARING before Judge John D. Bates held on April 6, 2016. Page Numbers: 1-11. Date of Issuance: 9/7/16. Court Reporter: Bryan A. Wayne. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript m ay be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/28/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/8/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/6/2016.(Wayne, Bryan)
|
September 7, 2016 |
Filing 119
Memorandum in opposition to re #117 MOTION for Order to Impose Charging Lien in the Amount of $320 Million Dollars Against Nigeria's Monetary and Financial Interest in this Case, Or 40% of any Financial and/or Monetary Award due to Nigeria in this case, to Cover for Go filed by FEDERAL GOVERNMENT OF NIGERIA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Egbase, Anthony)
|
September 2, 2016 |
Filing 118
Memorandum in opposition to re #117 MOTION for Order to Impose Charging Lien in the Amount of $320 Million Dollars Against Nigeria's Monetary and Financial Interest in this Case, Or 40% of any Financial and/or Monetary Award due to Nigeria in this case, to Cover for Go filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aloi, Elizabeth)
|
August 23, 2016 |
Filing 117
MOTION for Order to Impose Charging Lien in the Amount of $320 Million Dollars Against Nigeria's Monetary and Financial Interest in this Case, Or 40% of any Financial and/or Monetary Award due to Nigeria in this case, to Cover for Godson M. Nnaka's Fees in this case and his Damages and Recoveries in his Claims against Nigeria in Civil Action No. 16-cv-01400-JDB, by GODSON M. NNAKA (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Claimant Nnaka's Affidavit in Support of His Motion to Impose Charging Lien, #2 Exhibit Exibit A in Support of Claimant Nnaka's Motion, #3 Exhibit Exhibits B; C; D; E; F and G in Support of Claimant Nnaka's Motion, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Claimant Nnaka's Motion)(Amadi, Benneth)
|
August 11, 2016 |
Filing 116
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by FEDERAL GOVERNMENT OF NIGERIA. Case related to Case No. 16-cv-01400. (Egbase, Anthony)
|
July 12, 2016 |
Filing 115
NOTICE of Appearance by Benneth O. Amadi on behalf of GODSON M. NNAKA (Amadi, Benneth)
|
May 19, 2016 |
Filing 114
ORDER denying #113 Godson Nnaka's motion for reconsideration. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 5/19/16. (lcjdb3)
|
May 17, 2016 |
Filing 113
MOTION for Reconsideration re #111 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees by GODSON M. NNAKA (Amadi, Benneth) Modified party text on 5/27/2016 (td).
|
May 12, 2016 |
Filing 112
NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony O. Egbase on behalf of FEDERAL GOVERNMENT OF NIGERIA (Egbase, Anthony)
|
May 6, 2016 |
Filing 111
ORDER denying #107 Godson Nnaka's motion for attorneys' fees. See text for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 5/6/16. (lcjdb3)
|
April 25, 2016 |
Filing 110
RESPONSE re #107 MOTION for Attorney Fees Claimant's Motion for Assessment of Attorneys' Fees filed by F A B, H A B, I A B, M A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, MARYAM ATIKU BAGUDU. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
April 20, 2016 |
Filing 109
Memorandum in opposition to re #107 MOTION for Attorney Fees Claimant's Motion for Assessment of Attorneys' Fees filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aloi, Elizabeth)
|
April 7, 2016 |
USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number 4616076941 re #102 Notice of Appeal filed by GODSON M. NNAKA (jf)
|
April 6, 2016 |
Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 4/6/2016 before Judge John D. Bates: The existing scheduling order is extended by six (6) months. (Court Reporter Bryan Wayne) (tb)
|
April 6, 2016 |
Filing 108
ORDER amending #85 the Court's April 29, 2015 Scheduling Order and setting a status conference for October 5, 2016, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 30A. See text for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/6/16. (lcjdb3)
|
April 6, 2016 |
Filing 107
MOTION for Attorney Fees Claimant's Motion for Assessment of Attorneys' Fees by GODSON M. NNAKA (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Haley, Howard)
|
March 3, 2016 |
Filing 106
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Benneth O. Amadi, :Firm- :Address- 204 Blossom Street Ext. Ste. A., Lynn, MA 01901 Phone No. - 781-581-5144. Fax No. - 781-581-5145 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4435401. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by FEDERAL REPUBLIC OF NIGERIA, GODSON M. NNAKA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ubom, Uduak) Modified attorney information on 3/3/2016 (td).
|
March 3, 2016 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #106 the motion for leave for Benneth Amadi to appear pro hac vice, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Benneth Amadi is admitted to practice pro hac vice in this case on behalf of claimants. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/3/16. (lcjdb3)
|
March 2, 2016 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/6/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 30A before Judge John D. Bates. (tb)
|
February 29, 2016 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consultation with the parties, it is hereby ORDERED that a status conference is set for April 6, 2016, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 30A. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 2/29/16. (lcjdb3)
|
February 4, 2016 |
Filing 105
Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re #104 Leave to File Denied, ;USCA Case Number 16-5025. (jf)
|
February 3, 2016 |
USCA Case Number 16-5025 for #102 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by GODSON M. NNAKA. (td) Modified on 4/8/2016 (jf).
|
January 29, 2016 |
Filing 104
LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Plaintiff's Notice of Appeal ("Leave to file DENIED. The notice of appeal was signed by an individual who is not a member of the bar of this Court. Please also consult Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 4 which provides 60 days for filing a notice of appeal in a civil case where the United States is a party.") This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing.. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/29/16. (td)
|
January 28, 2016 |
NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #102 Notice of Appeal was entered in error and forwarded to chambers for leave to file. Counsel is not a member of this court.(jf)
|
January 27, 2016 |
Filing 103
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Fee remains to be paid and another notice will be transmitted when the fee has been paid in the District Court re #102 Notice of Appeal. (jf) Modified on 1/28/2016 (jf). Modified on 4/8/2016 (jf).
|
January 19, 2016 |
Filing 102
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #101 Order on Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) by GODSON M. NNAKA. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (jf) Modified on 1/28/2016 (jf). Modified on 4/8/2016 (jf).
|
December 17, 2015 |
Filing 101
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting #96 the government's motion for entry of Rule 54(b) final judgments as to certain purported claimants and certain defendants in rem. See text for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/17/15. (lcjdb3)
|
October 19, 2015 |
Filing 100
REPLY to opposition to motion re #96 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Khoo, Michael)
|
October 2, 2015 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply due by 10/19/2015. (tb)
|
September 29, 2015 |
Filing 99
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #96 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aloi, Elizabeth)
|
September 29, 2015 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #99 the government's consent motion to extend time, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the government shall file its reply by not later than October 19, 2015. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 9/29/15. (lcjdb3)
|
September 28, 2015 |
Filing 98
Memorandum in opposition to re #96 MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by F A B, H A B, I A B, M A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, M.A.B., M.A.B.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
September 10, 2015 |
Filing 97
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Wade Khoo on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Khoo, Michael)
|
September 10, 2015 |
Filing 96
MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aloi, Elizabeth)
|
July 15, 2015 |
Filing 95
MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to #68 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by GODSON M. NNAKA ; ORDERED that the motion to dismiss be granted. USCA Case Number 14-5228. (md)
|
May 14, 2015 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #94 the consent motion to correct the docket, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the clerk will substitute the name "Maryam Atiku Bagudu" for "M.A.B., a minor, by and through her mother Aisha Atiku Bagudu, as guardian and/or next friend" on the case docket and as otherwise appropriate in this proceeding. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 5/14/2015. (lcjdb3)
|
May 13, 2015 |
Filing 94
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket by Substituting Maryam Atiku Bagudu's Full Name for "M.A.B., A Minor, by and through her Mother Aisha Atiku Bagudu, as Guardian and/or Next Friend" In This Proceeding by MARYAM ATIKU BAGUDU (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
May 4, 2015 |
Filing 93
ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,, with Jury Demand by H A B.(Barr, Jonathan)
|
May 4, 2015 |
Filing 92
ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,, with Jury Demand by I A B.(Barr, Jonathan)
|
May 4, 2015 |
Filing 91
ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,, with Jury Demand by M A B.(Barr, Jonathan)
|
May 4, 2015 |
Filing 90
ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,, with Jury Demand by Maryam Atiku Bagudu.(Barr, Jonathan)
|
May 4, 2015 |
Filing 89
ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,, with Jury Demand by F A B.(Barr, Jonathan)
|
May 4, 2015 |
Filing 88
ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,, with Jury Demand by IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU.(Barr, Jonathan)
|
May 4, 2015 |
Filing 87
ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,, with Jury Demand by AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU.(Barr, Jonathan)
|
May 4, 2015 |
Filing 86
ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,, with Jury Demand by IBRAHIM BAGUDU.(Barr, Jonathan)
|
May 4, 2015 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 5/4/2015. (tb, )
|
April 29, 2015 |
Filing 85
SCHEDULING AND PROTECTIVE ORDERS: See text of Orders for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/29/2015. (lcjdb3)
|
April 29, 2015 |
Filing 84
STATUS REPORT , JOINT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Aloi, Elizabeth)
|
April 27, 2015 |
NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #82 Meet and Confer Statement was entered in error and refiled by Clerk's Office under the correct category. (See docket entry #83 to view document)(jf, )
|
April 24, 2015 |
Filing 83
Joint STATUS REPORT. (jf, )
|
April 24, 2015 |
Filing 82
ENTERED IN ERROR.....MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Aloi, Elizabeth) Modified on 4/27/2015 (jf, ).
|
March 25, 2015 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #81 claimants' unopposed motion for an extension of time to answer government's verified complaint, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that claimants shall file answers to the complaint not later than May 4, 2015. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/25/2015. (lcjdb3)
|
March 24, 2015 |
Filing 81
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,, by F A B, H A B, I A B, M A B, M A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
March 23, 2015 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/24/2015. (tb, )
|
March 20, 2015 |
MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report, or individual status reports if necessary, addressing the course of further proceedings, including any discovery. Reports shall be filed not later than April 24, 2015. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/20/2015. (lcjdb3)
|
March 19, 2015 |
Filing 80
ORDER denying #55 motion to dismiss. See text of Order and accompanying Memorandum Opinion for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/19/2015. (lcjdb3)
|
March 19, 2015 |
Filing 79
MEMORANDUM OPINION: See text for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/19/2015. (lcjdb3)
|
February 21, 2015 |
Filing 78
TRANSCRIPT OF MOTIONS HEARING before Judge John D. Bates held on February 11, 2015; Page Numbers: 1-98. Date of Issuance:2-21-2015. Court Reporter/Transcriber Annette M. Montalvo, Telephone number 202-354-3111, Court Reporter Email Address : annette.montalvo@gmail.com. <
< < Redaction Request due 3/14/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/24/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/22/2015.(Montalvo, Annette)
|
February 11, 2015 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John D. Bates: Motion Hearing held on 2/11/2015 re #55 MOTION to Dismiss Government's Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, R A B, I A B, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, F A B, ZAINAB SHINKAFI BAGUDU, M A B, H A B, IBRAHIM BAGUDU. Oral argument held and motion taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Annette Montalvo.) (tj )
|
February 9, 2015 |
Filing 77
ERRATA Notice of Misfiled Document by F A B, H A B, I A B, M A B, M A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit J to the Declaration of Patrick T. Campbell)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
January 5, 2015 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the telephonic conference held on this day with counsel for the claimants and counsel for the government, it is hereby ORDERED that the motions hearing scheduled for January 16, 2015, is CONTINUED until February 11, 2015, at 10:00 A.M. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/5/2015. (lcjdb4)
|
January 5, 2015 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 2/11/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 30A before Judge John D. Bates. (lcjdb4)
|
December 29, 2014 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: The Government's Consent Motion to Continue the 1/16/2015 Motions Hearing for six weeks is Denied. In light of the Court's calendar, the parties may contact chambers by 1/7/2015, to request that the motion hearing be continued to 1/22/2015, 1/23/2015, 2/11/2015 or 2/12/2015. (jth)
|
December 29, 2014 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #76 the government's consent motion to continue the January 16, 2015 motion hearing for six weeks, and the entire record herein, and in light of the Court's calendar, it is hereby ORDERED that #76 the government's motion is DENIED; and it is further ORDERED that the parties may contact chambers by not later than January 7, 2015, to request that the motion hearing be continued to January 22 or 23, 2015, or February 11 or 12, 2015. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/29/2014. (lcjdb4)
|
December 22, 2014 |
Filing 76
Consent MOTION to Continue January 16, 2015, Hearing by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Claman, Daniel)
|
December 22, 2014 |
Filing 75
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Hocker Claman on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Claman, Daniel)
|
November 13, 2014 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #55 the claimants' motion to dismiss the government's verified complaint for forfeiture in rem, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that a motions hearing is set for Friday, January 16, 2015, at 10 a.m. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 11/13/2014. (lcjdb4)
|
November 13, 2014 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 1/16/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 30A before Judge John D. Bates. (lcjdb4)
|
November 7, 2014 |
Filing 74
REPLY to opposition to motion re #55 MOTION to Dismiss Government's Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by F A B, H A B, I A B, M A B, M A B, R A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, ZAINAB SHINKAFI BAGUDU. (Barr, Jonathan)
|
October 17, 2014 |
Filing 73
Memorandum in opposition to re #55 MOTION to Dismiss Government's Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aloi, Elizabeth)
|
October 9, 2014 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 10/17/2014. Reply due by 11/7/2014. (tb, )
|
October 7, 2014 |
Filing 72
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss and Reply Brief by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aloi, Elizabeth)
|
October 7, 2014 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #72 the parties' joint motion to extend the briefing schedule, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the government shall respond to claimants' motion to dismiss by not later than October 17, 2014, and that claimants shall file any reply by not later than November 7, 2014. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 10/7/2014. (lcjdb4)
|
September 29, 2014 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: The Government shall Respond to Claimants' Motion to Dismiss by 10/8/2014; Claimants shall file any reply by 10/17/2014. (jth)
|
September 25, 2014 |
Filing 71
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition and Reply Brief by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aloi, Elizabeth)
|
September 25, 2014 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #71 the parties' joint motion to extend the briefing schedule, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the government shall respond to claimants' motion to dismiss by not later than October 8, 2014, and that claimants shall file any reply by not later than October 17, 2014. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 9/25/2014. (lcjdb4)
|
September 23, 2014 |
USCA Case Number 14-5228 for #68 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by GODSON M. NNAKA. (kb)
|
September 22, 2014 |
Filing 70
Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals MODIFIED ENTRY re #68 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, ; (td, )
|
September 2, 2014 |
Filing 69
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date 9/1/14 re #68 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (td, )
|
September 1, 2014 |
Filing 68
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #54 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, by GODSON M NNAKA. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-3824219. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Nnaka, Kenneth); (Per Attorney Kenneth Nnaka, Claimant Godson M. Nnaka is pro se and is not represented by Kenneth Nnaka. Attorney Kenneth Nnaka assisted with the use of his ability to electronically file this appeal.) Modified on 9/22/2014 (td, ).
|
August 19, 2014 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #66 the unopposed motion for leave to withdraw the verified claims of claimants Zainab Shinkafi Bagudu and R.A.B., and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that the verified claims filed by #20 Zainab Shinkafi Bagudu and #26 R.A.B. are WITHDRAWN AND RELEASED WITH PREJUDICE; and it is further ORDERED that Zainab Shinkafi Bagudu and R.A.B. are no longer claimants in this proceeding. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/19/2014. (lcjdb4)
|
August 18, 2014 |
Filing 67
STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Aloi, Elizabeth)
|
August 18, 2014 |
Filing 66
Unopposed MOTION Motion to Withdraw Verified Claims of Zainab Shinkafi Bagudu and R.A.B. re #20 Claim and #26 Claim by R A B, ZAINAB SHINKAFI BAGUDU (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
August 6, 2014 |
Filing 65
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting #64 plaintiff's motion for entry of default judgment and for an order of forfeiture against defendant assets (a), (b), (c), (d), (e), (f), and (g) identified in the in the plaintiff's verified complaint. See text for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/6/2014. (lcjdb4)
|
August 4, 2014 |
Filing 64
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Assets Identified in Paragraphs 4(a), 4(b), 4(c), 4(d), 4(e), 4(f) and 4(g) of the Complaint by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Aloi, Elizabeth)
|
July 31, 2014 |
Filing 63
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ALL ASSETS HELD IN ACCOUNT NUMBER 381705076, IN THE NAME OF MOHAMMED SANI AT HSBC BANK PLC., AND ALL INTEREST, BENEFITS, OR ASSETS TRACEABLE THERETO (td, )
|
July 31, 2014 |
Filing 62
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ALL ASSETS HELD AT HSBC LIFE EUROPE LIMITED, FORMERLY HELD IN ACCOUNT NUMBER 37060762 IN THE NAME OF MOHAMMED SANI AT MIDLAND LIFE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED AND ALL INTEREST, BENEFITS OR ASSETS TRACEABLE (td, )
|
July 31, 2014 |
Filing 61
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ALL ASSETS HELD IN ACCOUNT NUMBERS 100130688 AND 100138409, IN THE NAME OF MECOSTA SECURITIES, INC., AT STANDARD BANK LONDON LIMITED AND ALL INTEREST, BENEFITS OR ASSETS TRACEABLE THERETO (td, ) (Main Document 61 replaced on 7/31/2014) (td, ).
|
July 31, 2014 |
Filing 60
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ALL ASSETS HELD IN ACCOUNT NUMBER 223406510PUSD, IN THE NAME OF STANDARD ALLIANCE FINANCIAL SERVICES LIMITED AT BANQUE SBA, AND ALL INTEREST, BENEFITS, OR ASSETS TRACEABLE THERETO (td, )
|
July 31, 2014 |
Filing 59
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ALL ASSETS HELD IN ACCOUNT NUMBER 223405880IUSD, IN THE NAME OF RAYVILLE INTERNATIONAL, S.A.. AT BANQUE SBA, AND ALL INTEREST, BENEFITS, OR ASSETS TRACEABLE THERETO (td, )
|
July 31, 2014 |
Filing 58
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ALL ASSETS HELD IN ACCOUNT NUMBER S-104460, IN THE NAME OF MOHAMMED SANI, AT HSBC FUND ADMINISTRATION (JERSEY) LIMITED AND ALL INTEREST, BENEFITS, OR ASSETS TRACEABLE THERETO (td, )
|
July 31, 2014 |
Filing 57
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ALL ASSETS HELD IN ACCOUNT NUMBER 80020796, IN THE NAME OF DORAVILLE PROPERTIES CORPORATION, AT DEUTSCHE BANK INTERNATIONAL, LIMITED IN JERSEY, CHANNEL ISLANDS, AND ALL INTEREST, BENEFITS OR ASSETS TR (td, )
|
July 11, 2014 |
Filing 56
WARRANT FOR ARREST IN REM Returned Executed on 2/25/2014. filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Aloi, Elizabeth)
|
July 7, 2014 |
Filing 55
MOTION to Dismiss Government's Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support by F A B, H A B, I A B, M A B, M A B, R A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, ZAINAB SHINKAFI BAGUDU (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Patrick T. Campbell, #2 Exhibit Ex. A to the Campbell Decl., #3 Exhibit Ex. B to the Campbell Decl., #4 Exhibit Ex. C to the Campbell Decl., #5 Exhibit Ex. D to the Campbell Decl., #6 Exhibit Ex. E to the Campbell Decl., #7 Exhibit Ex. F to the Campbell Decl., #8 Exhibit Ex. G to the Campbell Decl., #9 Exhibit Ex. H to the Campbell Decl., #10 Exhibit Ex. I to the Campbell Decl., #11 Exhibit Ex. J to the Campbell Decl., #12 Exhibit Ex. K to the Campbell Decl., #13 Exhibit Ex. L to the Campbell Decl., #14 Exhibit Ex. M to the Campbell Decl., #15 Exhibit Ex. N to the Campbell Decl., #16 Exhibit Ex. O to the Campbell Decl., #17 Exhibit Ex. P to the Campbell Decl., #18 Text of Proposed Order)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
July 3, 2014 |
Filing 54
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER denying #46 Kenneth Nnaka and Jude Ezeala's motion to set aside, denying #45 Kenneth Nnaka and Jude Ezeala's motion for an enlargement of time, denying as moot #49 Kenneth Nnaka and Jude Ezeala's motion for a lien, and granting in part and denying in part as moot #52 the United States' motion to strike various documents. See text of Memorandum Opinion & Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/3/2014. (lcjdb4)
|
July 2, 2014 |
Filing 53
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by F A B, H A B, I A B, M A B, M A B, R A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, ZAINAB SHINKAFI BAGUDU (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
July 2, 2014 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #53 claimants' unopposed motion for leave to file a memorandum of points and authorities in excess of 45 pages, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that claimants may file a memorandum of points and authorities that exceeds 45 pages, but that is not more than 53 substantive pages. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/2/2014. (lcjdb4)
|
June 27, 2014 |
Filing 52
MOTION to Strike #48 Answer to Complaint, #47 Response to Document, #45 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and ECF Nos. 10-1, and 10-2 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Aloi, Elizabeth)
|
June 26, 2014 |
Filing 51
Memorandum in opposition to re #46 MOTION to Set Aside Adoke's letter of May 26, 2014 filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Aloi, Elizabeth)
|
June 26, 2014 |
Filing 50
NOTICE Declaration of Notice and Publication by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Aloi, Elizabeth)
|
June 20, 2014 |
Filing 49
MOTION for Attorney Fees Noticeof Attorney Charging Lien by ALL ASSETS HELD IN ACCOUNT NUMBER 80020796, IN THE NAME OF DORAVILLE PROPERTIES CORPORATION, AT DEUTSCHE BANK INTERNATIONAL, LIMITED IN JERSEY, CHANNEL ISLANDS, AND ALL INTEREST, BENEFITS OR ASSETS TR (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ezeala, Jude)
|
June 13, 2014 |
NOTICE OF ERROR re #45 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer; emailed to cavalawfirm@yahoo.com, cc'd 12 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. FYI for future filings: The attorney signing the documents should be the one filing and vice versa. (td, )
|
June 12, 2014 |
Filing 48
STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER FILED 07/03/14.....Federal Republic of Nigeria's ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,,,,,,, for Forfeiture by FEDERAL REPUBLIC OF NIGERIA. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Verified Claim of Federal Republic of Nigeria)(Agwumezie, Charles) Modified on 7/6/2014 (jth).
|
June 12, 2014 |
Filing 47
STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER FILED 07/03/14.....RESPONSE #44 to Plaintiff's Affidavit in Support of Default filed by FEDERAL REPUBLIC OF NIGERIA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A through D)(Agwumezie, Charles) Modified to add linkage on 6/13/2014 (td, ). Modified on 7/6/2014 (jth).
|
June 12, 2014 |
Filing 46
MOTION to Set Aside Adoke's letter of May 26, 2014 by FEDERAL REPUBLIC OF NIGERIA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhbits A thruogh G)(Agwumezie, Charles)
|
June 12, 2014 |
Filing 45
45-1 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER FILED 07/03/14.....MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by FEDERAL REPUBLIC OF NIGERIA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Answer to Complaint)(Agwumezie, Charles) Modified on 7/7/2014 (jth).
|
June 3, 2014 |
DISREGARD THIS NOTICE OF ERROR re #44 Affidavit for Default; emailed to elizabeth.aloi@usdoj.gov, cc'd 11 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please complete the default forms found on the court's website:http://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/ (td, ) Modified on 6/3/2014 (ztd, ).
|
June 2, 2014 |
Filing 44
AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Aloi, Elizabeth)
|
May 22, 2014 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #43 the motion for pro hac vice admission for Jude Chukwuma Ezeala as counsel for the Federal Republic of Nigeria, and this Court's April 25, 2014 Minute Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is granted; and it is further ORDERED that Jude Chukwuma Ezeala is admitted to practice pro hac vice in this case on behalf of the Federal Republic of Nigeria. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 5/22/2014. (lcjdb4)
|
May 21, 2014 |
Filing 43
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jude C Ezeala, :Firm- Law office of Jude C Ezeala, :Address- 5521 Hartford Road Baltimore MD 21214. Phone No. - 4109229456. Fax No. - 4109228220 by FEDERAL REPUBLIC OF NIGERIA (Agwumezie, Charles)
|
May 15, 2014 |
Filing 42
ORDER granting #30 claimants' motion for extension of time to file their response to the government's verified complaint. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 5/15/2014. (lcjdb4)
|
May 15, 2014 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Claimants shall file their response to the government's complaint by not later than 7/7/2014. (jth)
|
May 13, 2014 |
Filing 41
NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to #39 Memorandum in Opposition,, by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Attachment B)(Aloi, Elizabeth)
|
May 13, 2014 |
Filing 40
REPLY to opposition to motion re #30 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to to Government's Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem (*Expedited Review Requested) MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to to Government's Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem (*Expedited Review Requested) filed by F A B, H A B, I A B, M A B, M A B, R A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, ZAINAB SHINKAFI BAGUDU. (Barr, Jonathan)
|
May 12, 2014 |
Filing 39
Memorandum in opposition to re #30 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to to Government's Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem (*Expedited Review Requested) MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to to Government's Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem (*Expedited Review Requested) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Karen O'Hanlon, #(SEALED) (3) Exhibit Bagudu Correspondence, #4 Exhibit First Affidavit of Ibrahim Bagudu, #5 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #6 Exhibit Skeleton Argument of Blue Companies, #7 Exhibit Skeleton Argument of United States)(Aloi, Elizabeth) Modified on 5/13/2014 (td, ).
|
May 8, 2014 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 5/12/2014. (tb, )
|
May 7, 2014 |
Filing 38
AFFIDAVIT (Declaration) re #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kenneth A. Nnaka, :Firm- LAW OFFICES OF NNAKA & ASSOCIATES, PLLC, :Address- 2650 Fountain View Drive, Ste 332, Houston, TX 77057. Phone No. - (713) 266-1446. Fax No. - (713) 266-1447 by FEDERAL REPUBLIC OF NIGERIA. (td, )
|
May 6, 2014 |
Filing 37
SEALED DOCUMENT Verified Claim filed by R A B. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, )
|
May 6, 2014 |
Filing 36
SEALED DOCUMENT Verified Claim filed by H A B. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, )
|
May 6, 2014 |
Filing 35
SEALED DOCUMENT Verified filed by M A B. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, )
|
May 6, 2014 |
Filing 34
SEALED DOCUMENT Verified Claim filed by F A B. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, )
|
May 6, 2014 |
Filing 33
SEALED DOCUMENT Verified Claim filed by I A B. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, )
|
May 6, 2014 |
Filing 32
SEALED DOCUMENT Verified Claim filed by M A B. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd, )
|
May 6, 2014 |
Filing 31
MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Claimants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Government's Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem by F A B, H A B, I A B, M A B, M A B, R A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, ZAINAB SHINKAFI BAGUDU (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
May 6, 2014 |
Filing 30
MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to to Government's Verified Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem (*Expedited Review Requested) by F A B, H A B, I A B, M A B, M A B, R A B, AISHA ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM ATIKU BAGUDU, IBRAHIM BAGUDU, ZAINAB SHINKAFI BAGUDU (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan B. New, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
May 6, 2014 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #31 claimants' motion to expedite consideration of #30 claimants' motion for an extension of time to respond to the government's complaint, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that #31 claimants' motion to expedite consideration is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; it is further ORDERED that the Court will review #30 claimants' motion for an extension of time on an expedited schedule; and it is further ORDERED that the government shall file any opposition to #30 claimants' motion for an extension of time by not later than 2 p.m. on May 12, 2014. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 5/6/2014. (lcjdb4)
|
May 5, 2014 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #28 claimants' motion for leave for Jonathan B. New to appear pro hac vice, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Jonathan B. New is admitted to practice pro hac vice in this case on behalf of claimants. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 5/5/2014. (lcjdb4)
|
May 5, 2014 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #29 claimants' motion for leave for Patrick T. Campbell to appear pro hac vice, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Patrick T. Campbell is admitted to practice pro hac vice in this case on behalf of claimants. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 5/5/2014. (lcjdb4)
|
May 5, 2014 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #27 claimants' consent motion to file unredacted verified claims of minor claimants under seal, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that, pursuant to Local Rule 5.4(f), the unredacted verified claims attached as exhibits to #27 claimants' consent motion shall be SEALED and retained in the record until further order of this Court; and it is further ORDERED that counsel for the minor claimants shall be permitted to provide unredacted copies of the verified claims to the government's counsel. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 5/5/2014. (lcjdb4)
|
May 1, 2014 |
Filing 29
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Patrick T. Campbell, :Firm- Baker & Hostetler LLP, :Address- 45 Rockefeller Plaza, New York, New York 10111-0100. Phone No. - 212-589-4643. Fax No. - 212-589-4201 by F A B, H A B, I A B, M A B, M.. A B, R A B, Aisha Atiku Bagudu, Ibrahim Bagudu, Zainab Shinkafi Bagudu, ibrahim Atiku Bagudu (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick T. Campbell, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
May 1, 2014 |
Filing 28
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jonathan B. New, :Firm- Baker & Hostetler LLP, :Address- 45 Rockefeller Plaza, New York, NY 10111-0100. Phone No. - 212-589-4650. Fax No. - 212-589-4201 by F A B, H A B, I A B, M A B, M.. A B, R A B, Aisha Atiku Bagudu, Ibrahim Bagudu, Zainab Shinkafi Bagudu, ibrahim Atiku Bagudu (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan B. New, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
May 1, 2014 |
Filing 27
SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by F A B, H A B, I A B, M A B, M.. A B, R A B (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unredacted Verified Claim and Statement of Interest of M.A.B. (Doc. No. 24), #2 Exhibit Unredacted Verified Claim and Statement of Interest of I.A.B. (Doc. No. 23), #3 Exhibit Unredacted Verified Claim and Statement of Interest of F.A.B. (Doc. No. 21), #4 Exhibit Unredacted Verified Claim and Statement of Interest of M.A.B. (Doc. No. 25), #5 Exhibit Unredacted Verified Claim and Statement of Interest of H.A.B. (Doc. No. 22), #6 Exhibit Unredacted Verified Claim and Statement of Interest of R.A.B. (Doc. No. 26), #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Barr, Jonathan)
|
May 1, 2014 |
Filing 26
CLAIM Verified Claim and Statement of Interest by R A B. (Barr, Jonathan)
|
May 1, 2014 |
Filing 25
CLAIM Verified Claim and Statement of Interest by M A B. (Barr, Jonathan)
|
May 1, 2014 |
Filing 24
CLAIM Verified Claim and Statement of Interest by M.. A B. (Barr, Jonathan)
|
May 1, 2014 |
Filing 23
CLAIM Verified Claim and Statement of Interest by I A B. (Barr, Jonathan)
|
May 1, 2014 |
Filing 22
CLAIM Verified Claim and Statement of Interest by H A B. (Barr, Jonathan)
|
May 1, 2014 |
Filing 21
CLAIM Verified Claim and Statement of Interest by F A B. (Barr, Jonathan)
|
May 1, 2014 |
Filing 20
CLAIM Verified Claim and Statement of Interest by Zainab Shinkafi Bagudu. (Barr, Jonathan)
|
May 1, 2014 |
Filing 19
STRICKEN IN PART PURSUANT TO ORDER FILED 3/5/2018.....CLAIM Verified Claim and Statement of Interest by Ibrahim Bagudu. (Barr, Jonathan) Modified on 3/6/2018 (znmw).
|
May 1, 2014 |
Filing 18
CLAIM Verified Claim and Statement of Interest by ibrahim Atiku Bagudu. (Barr, Jonathan)
|
May 1, 2014 |
Filing 17
CLAIM Verified Claim and Statement of Interest by Aisha Atiku Bagudu. (Barr, Jonathan)
|
May 1, 2014 |
Filing 16
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan R. Barr on behalf of Aisha Atiku Bagudu, Ibrahim Bagudu, Zainab Shinkafi Bagudu, ibrahim Atiku Bagudu, M.. A B, I A B, F A B, M A B, H A B, R A B (Barr, Jonathan)
|
April 25, 2014 |
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #14 #15 claimant's motions for leave for Kenneth A. Nnaka and Jude Chukwuma Ezeala to appear pro hac vice, which include unsigned declarations from Kenneth A. Nnaka and Jude Chukwuma Ezeala, and in light of the Court's April 18, 2014 Orders requiring their signatures on any renewed motions for pro hac vice appearance, it is hereby ORDERED that claimant's motions for pro hac vice appearance are CONDITIONALLY GRANTED upon claimant's filing of declarations signed by Kenneth A. Nnaka and Jude Chukwuma Ezeala; and it is further ORDERED that the pro hac vice admission of Kenneth A. Nnaka and Jude Chukwuma Ezeala as counsel for claimant will be effective upon claimant's filing of declarations signed by Kenneth A. Nnaka and Jude Chukwuma Ezeala. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/25/2014. (lcjdb4)
|
April 22, 2014 |
Filing 15
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kenneth A. Nnaka, :Firm- LAW OFFICES OF NNAKA & ASSOCIATES, PLLC, :Address- 2650 Fountain View Drive, Ste 332, Houston, TX 77057. Phone No. - (713) 266-1446. Fax No. - (713) 266-1447 by FEDERAL REPUBLIC OF NIGERIA (td, )
|
April 22, 2014 |
Filing 14
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jude Chukwuma. Ezeala, :Firm- Law Office of Jude C. Ezeala, :Address- 5521 Harford Road, Baltimore, MD 21214. Phone No. - (410) 922-9456. Fax No. - (410) 922-8220 by FEDERAL REPUBLIC OF NIGERIA (td, )
|
April 18, 2014 |
Filing 13
ORDER denying #11 claimant's motion for leave for Jude Chukwuma Ezeala to appear pro hac vice. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/18/2014. (lcjdb4)
|
April 18, 2014 |
Filing 12
ORDER denying #10 claimant's motion for leave for Kenneth A. Nnaka to appear pro hac vice. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/18/2014. (lcjdb4)
|
April 17, 2014 |
Filing 10
10-1, 10-2 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER FILED 07/03/14.....MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kenneth A. Nnaka, :Firm- LAW OFFICES OF NNAKA & ASSOCIATES, PLLC, :Address- 2650 Fountain View Drive, Ste 332, Houston, TX 77057. Phone No. - (713) 266-1446. Fax No. - (713) 266-1447 by FEDERAL REPUBLIC OF NIGERIA (td, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/17/2014: #1 Exhibit Claim of Federal Republic of Nigeria, #2 Exhibit Nigeria Claim, #3 Exhibit Motion to Intervene, #4 Exhibit Appearance, #5 Exhibit Motion for Extension) (td, ). Modified on 7/7/2014 (jth).
|
April 15, 2014 |
Filing 11
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jude Chukwuma. Ezeala, :Firm- LAW OFFICE OF JUDE C. EZEALA, :Address- 5521 Harford Road, Baltimore, MD 21214. Phone No. - (410) 922-9456. Fax No. - (410) 922-8220 by FEDERAL REPUBLIC OF NIGERIA (td, )
|
March 5, 2014 |
Filing 9
ORDER: Upon consideration of #8 Motion to Vacate Sealing Order in this case filed by the United States; it is hereby ordered that the motion is GRANTED and the file in this case is no longer sealed. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 03/05/14. Counsel of record have been notified by first class mail.(tb, )
|
March 5, 2014 |
***Case Unsealed pursuant to #9 Order filed on 03/05/2014 (zjf, )
|
March 4, 2014 |
Filing 8
MOTION to Vacate sealing order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ztd, )
|
February 19, 2014 |
Filing 7
NOTICE Of Attachment A by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(ztd, )
|
February 19, 2014 |
Filing 6
ORDER granting #5 Motion for Order to Seal Notice of Attachment A and Attachement A. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 02/19/14. Counsel of record have been notified by first class mail.(tb, )
|
February 14, 2014 |
Filing 5
MOTION to seal Notice of Attachment A by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Notice of Attachment A, #2 Attachment A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ztd, )
|
December 16, 2013 |
WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM (1) issued for All ASSETS HELD IN ACCOUNT NUMBER 80020796, IN THE NAME OF DORAVILLE PROP. CORP. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 12/13/13. Counsel have been notified by first class mail.(tb, )
|
December 11, 2013 |
Filing 4
ERRATA Notice of Typographical Error by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Corrected Warrant)(ztd, )
|
November 18, 2013 |
Filing 3
ORDER granting #2 Motion to seal #1 Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Richard W. Roberts on 11/18/13. Counsel of record received certified copies from the miscellaneous clerk.(ztd, ) Modified text on 11/22/2013 (ztd, ). (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/22/2013) (ztd, ).
|
November 18, 2013 |
Filing 2
MOTION to seal by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (ztd, ) Modified text on 11/22/2013 (ztd, ).
|
November 18, 2013 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT against ALL ASSETS HELD AT HSBC LIFE EUROPE LIMITED, FORMERLY HELD IN ACCOUNT NUMBER 37060762 IN THE NAME OF MOHAMMED SANI AT MIDLAND LIFE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED AND ALL INTEREST, BENEFITS OR ASSETS TRACEABLE, ALL ASSETS HELD IN ACCOUNT NUMBER 223405880IUSD, IN THE NAME OF RAYVILLE INTERNATIONAL, S.A.. AT BANQUE SBA, AND ALL INTEREST, BENEFITS, OR ASSETS TRACEABLE THERETO, ALL ASSETS HELD IN ACCOUNT NUMBER 223406510PUSD, IN THE NAME OF STANDARD ALLIANCE FINANCIAL SERVICES LIMITED AT BANQUE SBA, AND ALL INTEREST, BENEFITS, OR ASSETS TRACEABLE THERETO, ALL ASSETS HELD IN ACCOUNT NUMBER 381705076, IN THE NAME OF MOHAMMED SANI AT HSBC BANK PLC., AND ALL INTEREST, BENEFITS, OR ASSETS TRACEABLE THERETO, ALL ASSETS HELD IN ACCOUNT NUMBER 80020796, IN THE NAME OF DORAVILLE PROPERTIES CORPORATION, AT DEUTSCHE BANK INTERNATIONAL, LIMITED IN JERSEY, CHANNEL ISLANDS, AND ALL INTEREST, BENEFITS OR ASSETS TR, ALL ASSETS HELD IN ACCOUNT NUMBER S-104460, IN THE NAME OF MOHAMMED SANI, AT HSBC FUND ADMINISTRATION (JERSEY) LIMITED AND ALL INTEREST, BENEFITS, OR ASSETS TRACEABLE THERETO, ALL ASSETS HELD IN ACCOUNT NUMBERS 100130688 AND 100138409, IN THE NAME OF MECOSTA SECURITIES, INC., AT STANDARD BANK LONDON LIMITED AND ALL INTEREST, BENEFITS OR ASSETS TRACEABLE THERETO, ALL ASSETS HELD IN THE INVESTMENT PORTFOLIO OF BLUE HOLDING (1) PTE. LTD., ON BEHALF OF OR TRACEABLE TO RIDLEY GROUP LIMITED, AND/OR THE RIDLEY TRUST AT J.O. HAMBRO INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT LIMITED AND A, ALL ASSETS HELD IN THE INVESTMENT PORTFOLIO OF BLUE HOLDING (1) PTE. LTD., ON BEHALF OF OR TRACEABLE TO RIDLEY GROUP LIMITED, AND/OR THE RIDLEY TRUST AT JAMES HAMBRO & PARTNERS LLP AND ALL INTEREST, B, ALL ASSETS HELD IN THE INVESTMENT PORTFOLIO OF BLUE HOLDING (2) PTE. LTD., ON BEHALF OF OR TRACEABLE TO RIDLEY GROUP LIMITED, AND OR THE RIDLEY TRUST AT JAMES HAMBRO & PARTNERS LLP AND ALL INTEREST, B, ALL ASSETS HELD IN THE INVESTMENT PORTFOLIO OF BLUE HOLDING (2) PTE. LTD., ON BEHALF OF OR TRACEABLE TO RIDLEY GROUP LIMITED, AND/OR THE RIDLEY TRUST AT J.O. HAMBRO INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT LIMITED AND A, DORAVILLE PROPERTIES CORPORATION, A BRITISH VIRGIN ISLANDS CORPORATION, TOGHETHER WITH ITS ASSETS AND ALL PROPERTY TRACEABLE THERETO, MECOSTA SECURITIES, INC., A BRITISH VIRGIN ISLANDS CORPORATION, TOGETHER WITH ITS ASSETS AND ALL PROPERTY TRACEABLE THERETO, RAYVILLE INTERNATIONAL, S.A., A BRITISH VIRGIN ISLANDS CORPORATION TOGETHER WITH ITS ASSETS AND ALL PROPERTY TRACEABLE THERETO, RIDLEY GROUP LIMITED, A BRITISH VIRGIN ISLANDS CORPORATION, TOGETHER WITH ITS ASSETS AND ALL PROPERTY TRACEABLE THERETO, STANDARD ALLIANCE FINANCIAL SERVICES LIMITED, A BRITISH VIRGIN ISLANDS CORPORATION, TOGETHER WITH ITS ASSETS AND ALL PROPERTY TRACEABLE THERTO filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztd, ) Modified to correct spelling on 11/22/2013 (ztd, ).
|