BAYALA v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Plaintiff: FLORENT BAYALA
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Case Number: 1:2014cv00007
Filed: January 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 50 Defendant's renewed motion for summary judgment and granting Plaintiff partial summary judgment sua sponte. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/1/2017. (lcrc1)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 28 Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment, granting in part and denying in part 36 Defendant's motion to dismiss, granting 38 Plaintiff's motion to strike, granting 42 Plaintiff's motion for leave to file supplemental memorandum, and ordering in camera review. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/30/2017. (lcrc1)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting 14 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment; and denying 18 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. See document for details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/04/2014. (lcrc1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAYALA v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLORENT BAYALA
Represented By: David Laundon Cleveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?