SMITH et al v. ERGO SOLUTIONS, LLC

Plaintiff: TWILA SMITH, DEIDRA GILLIAM and ALEXIS DIXON
Defendant: ERGO SOLUTIONS, LLC, GEORGE BROWNLEE and JASON HENDERSON
Case Number: 1:2014cv00382
Filed: March 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Beryl A. Howell
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 7/12/19. (lcjdb1)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 1/9/19. (lcjdb1)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 11/6/18. (lcjdb1)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION granting 73 plaintiffs' motion to compel. See text for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 6/20/17. (lcjdb2)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/30/15. (lcjdb1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH et al v. ERGO SOLUTIONS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TWILA SMITH
Represented By: Samuel Bailey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEIDRA GILLIAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXIS DIXON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERGO SOLUTIONS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE BROWNLEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASON HENDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?