ESCAMILLA v. NUYEN et al
Plaintiff: JOSE MILTON BAUTISTA ESCAMILLA
Defendant: DAVID NUYEN, OPMAX MANAGEMENT, LLC, OPMAX, LLC and USA HOME CHAMPION REALTY, INC.
Case Number: 1:2014cv00852
Filed: May 22, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: James E. Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Plaintiff's 45 Petition for Award of Attorney's Fees and Costs as untimely. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 09/25/2017. (lcrm1)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 12/30/2016. (lcak1)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION re: Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 26 . A separate Order follows. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 08/04/16. (DM)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM OPINION Re: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel 15 . A separate Order follows. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alan Kay on 07/14/15. (DM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ESCAMILLA v. NUYEN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE MILTON BAUTISTA ESCAMILLA
Represented By: Gregg Cohen Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID NUYEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPMAX MANAGEMENT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPMAX, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA HOME CHAMPION REALTY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?