COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD. et al v. FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD. and ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC.
Defendant: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION, BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY and THOMAS J. CURRY
Case Number: 1:2014cv00953
Filed: June 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Gladys Kessler
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MEMORANDUM OPINION to the Motion for Summary Judgment and the Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 7/5/17. (CL)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MEMORANDUM OPINION to the Order denying Community Financial Services Association of America's Motion for Entry of Final Judgment. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 4/25/17. (CL)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMORANDUM OPINION to the Order granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 12/19/16. (CL)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM OPINION to the Motions to Dismiss, et al.. Signed by Judge Gladys Kessler on 9/25/15. (CL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD. et al v. FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMUNITY FINANCIAL SERVICES ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, LTD.
Represented By: Charles J. Cooper
Represented By: David Henry Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVANCE AMERICA, CASH ADVANCE CENTERS, INC.
Represented By: Charles J. Cooper
Represented By: David Henry Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF THE COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS J. CURRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?