FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION et al v. SYSCO CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF IOWA, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF NEBRASKA, STATE OF OHIO, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, STATE OF TENNESSEE and COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA
Defendant: SYSCO CORPORATION, USF HOLDING CORP. and US FOODS, INC.
Intervenor: REINHART FOODSERVICE, L.L.C. and SHAMROCK FOODS COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2015cv00256
Filed: February 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Amit P. Mehta
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:53
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 190 REDACTED MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/26/2015. (lcapm3)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 98 100 101 Motions for a Protective Order. Exhibit A, which accompanies this Memorandum Opinion and Order, shall be filed separately under seal. The FTC is directed to serve this Memorandum Opinion and Order, excluding Exhibit A, to the moving declarants. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/31/2015. (lcapm3)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 60 Defendants' Motion to Make Public Declarant Names and Affiliations. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/18/2015. (lcapm3)
March 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Memorandum Opinion and Order granting in part and denying in part 68 Defendants' Motion to Modify the Protective Order. Please see the attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/12/2015. (lcapm3)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION et al v. SYSCO CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
Represented By: Christopher Abbott
Represented By: Thomas H. Brock
Represented By: Krisha A. Cerilli
Represented By: Melissa Davenport
Represented By: Michael DeRita
Represented By: Alexis Gilman
Represented By: David J. Laing(Designation Assistant U.S. Attorney)
Represented By: Matthew McDonald
Represented By: Stephen Mohr
Represented By: Jeanne Nichols
Represented By: Ryan Quillian
Represented By: Kristian Sjoberg Rogers
Represented By: Catherine Sanchez
Represented By: Mark Seidman
Represented By: Sophia Vandergrift
Represented By: Stephen Weissman(Designation Assistant U.S. Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Nicholas Alan Bush(Designation State Attorney General/Designee)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Represented By: Natalie S. Manzo(Designation State Attorney General/Designee)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF ILLINOIS
Represented By: Robert W. Pratt(Designation State Attorney General/Designee)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF IOWA
Represented By: Layne M. Lindebak(Designation State Attorney General/Designee)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF MARYLAND
Represented By: Gary Honick(Designation State Attorney General/Designee)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF MINNESOTA
Represented By: James William Canaday
Represented By: Benjamin Jack Velzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEBRASKA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF OHIO
Represented By: Kimberly Rae Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: James A. Donahue, III
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF TENNESSEE
Represented By: Victor J. Domen, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA
Represented By: Sarah Oxenham Allen
Represented By: Stephen John Sovinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYSCO CORPORATION
Represented By: Edward D. Hassi(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Richard G. Parker
Represented By: Katrina M. Robson
Represented By: Haidee L. Schwartz
Represented By: Ian Simmons
Represented By: Joseph F. Tringali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USF HOLDING CORP.
Represented By: Peter C. Herrick(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Andrea B. Levine(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Philip Mirrer-Singer
Represented By: Haidee L. Schwartz
Represented By: Peter Coyne Thomas
Represented By: Joseph F. Tringali(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US FOODS, INC.
Represented By: Peter C. Herrick(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Andrea B. Levine(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Philip Mirrer-Singer
Represented By: Haidee L. Schwartz
Represented By: Peter Coyne Thomas
Represented By: Joseph F. Tringali(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: REINHART FOODSERVICE, L.L.C.
Represented By: Justin P. Hedge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: SHAMROCK FOODS COMPANY
Represented By: Laura M. Kam(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Paolo Morante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?