WHARF, INC. et al v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
Plaintiff: WHARF, INC., BRW, INC. and SALT WATER SEAFOOD, INC.
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, HOFFMAN-MADISON WATERFONT, LLC and WHARF HORIZONTAL REIT LEASEHOLDER, LLC
Case Number: 1:2015cv01198
Filed: July 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 218 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding Defendant District of Columbia's 190 Motion for Summary Judgment and Developer Defendants' [192 (sealed)/193 (redacted)] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See Executive Summary for a summary of the findings herein. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 3/30/2021. (DM)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the Motion to Dismiss Claims Asserted in the Third Amended Complaint against Defendants Wharf District GP Joint Venture LLP, Wharf Horizontal Reit LLC, Hoffman-Struever Waterfront LLC, and Wharf District Joint Venture LP. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/14/2017. (DM)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MEMORANDUM OPINION with regard to 92 Motion to Dismiss the Claims Asserted in the Second Amended Complaint against Defendants Wharf District GP Joint Venture LLC, Wharf Horizontal Reit LLC, Hoffman-Struever Waterfront LLC, and Wharf District Joint Venture LP. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 07/05/2017. (DM)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 12, 2017. (NS)
September 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on September 28, 2015. (NS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WHARF, INC. et al v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Matthew Robert Blecher
Represented By: William Frederick Causey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOFFMAN-MADISON WATERFONT, LLC
Represented By: Robert Boyd(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Clare M. Cavaliero(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Michael S. McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHARF HORIZONTAL REIT LEASEHOLDER, LLC
Represented By: Robert Boyd(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Clare M. Cavaliero(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Michael S. McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WHARF, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Herman Lasken
Represented By: Wendell Landray Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRW, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Herman Lasken
Represented By: Wendell Landray Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SALT WATER SEAFOOD, INC.
Represented By: Jonathan Herman Lasken
Represented By: Wendell Landray Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?