BAGINSKI v. LYNCH et al
Plaintiff: MARK BAGINSKI
Defendant: THOMAS BRANDON and LORETTA E. LYNCH
Case Number: 1:2015cv01225
Filed: July 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2017 Filing 33 STIPULATION of Dismissal by MARK BAGINSKI. (Gura, Alan)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of #32 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that proponents of expert testimony, if any, shall make the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(2) on or before September 1, 2017. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, to the extent that any party wishes to offer expert testimony to contradict or rebut proffered experts, pursuant to Rule 26(a)(2)(D), such disclosures shall be made by October 6, 2017. It is FURTHER ORDERED that all discovery in this case shall conclude by November 8, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/11/2017. (lcrc3)
July 10, 2017 Filing 32 Joint STATUS REPORT by THOMAS BRANDON, LORETTA E. LYNCH. (Powell, Amy)
June 26, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/10/2017 (tj)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying as moot #24 Defendants' Motion to Stay. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/26/2017. (lcrc3)
June 26, 2017 Filing 30 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by MARK BAGINSKI (Gura, Alan)
June 19, 2017 Filing 29 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by THOMAS BRANDON, LORETTA E. LYNCH. Related document: #5 Amended Complaint filed by MARK BAGINSKI.(Powell, Amy)
March 1, 2017 Filing 28 REPLY to opposition to motion re #24 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Supreme Court Review of Attorney General v. Binderup filed by THOMAS BRANDON, LORETTA E. LYNCH. (Powell, Amy)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #27 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file a reply in support of the Motion to Stay Proceedings on or before March 1, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/22/2017. (lcrc3)
February 22, 2017 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in support of Defendants' Motion to Stay by THOMAS BRANDON, LORETTA E. LYNCH (Powell, Amy)
February 16, 2017 Filing 26 Memorandum in opposition to re #24 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Supreme Court Review of Attorney General v. Binderup filed by MARK BAGINSKI. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A: Brief in Opposition, Supreme Ct 16-847)(Gura, Alan)
February 2, 2017 Filing 25 Joint STATUS REPORT by THOMAS BRANDON, LORETTA E. LYNCH. (Powell, Amy)
February 2, 2017 Filing 24 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Supreme Court Review of Attorney General v. Binderup by THOMAS BRANDON, LORETTA E. LYNCH (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Binderup Cert Petition, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Powell, Amy)
January 25, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Meet & Confer Statement due by 2/2/2017. (tj)
January 23, 2017 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part #10 Defendants' motion to dismiss; denying without prejudice #13 Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/23/2017. (lcrc2)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #10 Defendants' motion to dismiss; denying without prejudice #13 Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/23/2017. (lcrc2)
January 10, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Rudolph Contreras: Status Conference held on 1/10/2017. Order to follow. (Court Reporter: Patricia Kaneshiro Miller.) (tj)
January 9, 2017 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/10/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (tj)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference on January 10, 2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/29/2016. (lcrc1)
December 22, 2016 Filing 21 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by MARK BAGINSKI (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Hatfield v. Lynch, SD Ill. 16-383)(Gura, Alan)
September 26, 2016 Filing 20 RESPONSE re #19 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by THOMAS BRANDON, LORETTA E. LYNCH. (Powell, Amy)
September 14, 2016 Filing 19 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by MARK BAGINSKI (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Binderup v. Atty General, 3d Cir. en banc)(Gura, Alan)
August 17, 2016 Filing 18 NOTICE of Firm Change by MARK BAGINSKI (Gura, Alan)
January 29, 2016 Filing 17 REPLY to opposition to motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by THOMAS BRANDON, LORETTA LYNCH. (Powell, Amy)
January 22, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 1/25/2016. (tj)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #16 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their reply in support of #10 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss on or before January 29, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/21/2016. (lcrc3)
January 21, 2016 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by THOMAS BRANDON, LORETTA LYNCH (Powell, Amy)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting in part #15 Defendants' Motion to Stay Summary Judgment Briefing and for an Extension of Time to File a Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their reply in support of #10 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss on or before January 25, 2016. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for Defendants' opposition to #13 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is VACATED until further Order of the Court upon the Court's assessment, based upon the full briefing of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, of whether a stay of summary judgment briefing pending resolution of the Motion to Dismiss is warranted. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/15/2016. (lcrc3)
January 14, 2016 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Stay re #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment by THOMAS BRANDON, LORETTA LYNCH (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Powell, Amy)
January 11, 2016 Filing 14 ERRATA Corrected Statement of Facts by MARK BAGINSKI #13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by MARK BAGINSKI. (Gura, Alan)
January 11, 2016 Filing 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment by MARK BAGINSKI (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Declaration of Mark Baginski, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Gura, Alan)
January 11, 2016 Filing 12 Memorandum in opposition to re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by MARK BAGINSKI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gura, Alan)
November 25, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file his opposition to #10 Defendants' motion to dismiss on or before January 11, 2016. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/25/2015. (lcrc3)
November 25, 2015 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss by MARK BAGINSKI (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gura, Alan)
November 24, 2015 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by THOMAS BRANDON, LORETTA LYNCH (Powell, Amy)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #9 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on or before November 24, 2015. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/13/2015. (lcrc3)
October 13, 2015 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Amended Complaint by THOMAS BRANDON, LORETTA LYNCH (Powell, Amy)
September 30, 2015 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy E. Powell on behalf of All Defendants (Powell, Amy)
August 26, 2015 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/17/2015., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/17/2015. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/16/2015.) (See Docket Entry #6 to view document). (znmw)
August 26, 2015 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. THOMAS BRANDON served on 8/19/2015; LORETTA LYNCH served on 8/17/2015 (Gura, Alan)
August 10, 2015 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by MARK BAGINSKI.(Gura, Alan)
July 30, 2015 Filing 4 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney. (znmw)
July 29, 2015 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE by MARK BAGINSKI re #1 Complaint, Summons Not Issued filed by MARK BAGINSKI. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by MARK BAGINSKI, Summons Not Issued. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Gura, Alan)
July 29, 2015 SUMMONS Not Issued as to U.S. Attorney. (SUMMONS NOT FILED AT THE TIME THE COMPLAINT WAS FILED) (md)
July 29, 2015 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to THOMAS BRANDON, LORETTA LYNCH. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (md)
July 29, 2015 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (md)
July 29, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4191846) filed by MARK BAGINSKI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Gura, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAGINSKI v. LYNCH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK BAGINSKI
Represented By: Alan Gura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS BRANDON
Represented By: Amy E. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORETTA E. LYNCH
Represented By: Amy E. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?