LEWIS et al v. PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION
Plaintiff: ROGER JOSEPH WILLIS, ELY CHEN, GEORGE J. BARR, CHARLES A. CARLON, GEORGE L. GIBSON, JR., KENNETH M. HAYES, LESTER M. BYRD, ESTATE OF KENNETH C. JAMES, THOMAS HENRY MORRIS, DAVID E. HANSEN, DENNIS W. SCHEPMAN, GEORGE V. MCNEILL, JOHN B. MORGAN, JR., WILLIAM C. BUERGEY, ALAN H. YOUNG, ROBERT C. RUDY, WILLIAM C. HINES, CHRISTOPHER F. WAGNER, CLINTON BERNARD JOHNSON, JAMES ROY WELLS, RICHARD E. GLANTZ, KENNETH M. PARR, PERRY E. WILLIAMS, EDWARD M. SNIFFIN, JOHN C. ANDERSON, GLEN H. SMITH, MICHAEL J. HICHAK, DONALD L. HOBERT, MICHAEL J. PRICE, BRIAN J. EATON, STEVEN J. WHITE, DANIEL H. COURTNEY, ROBERT E. ADAM, JAMES P. STARKEY, TRYGGVE F. LARSEN, BRYAN R. CLARK, DWIGHT R. WAIT, HENRY G. CARRINGTON, ROBERT G. DECKER, CHARLES A. DIXON, CHARLES M. PINKSTON, RICHARD X. KAUFFMANN, JR., WILLIAM A. PANKEY, III, BERRYMAN EDWARDS WOODRUFF, III, DAVID M. SMITH, PHILLIP J. KELLEY, WILLIAM W. ETHERINGTON, WALTER T. MORGAN, JR., WILLIAM M. FELDMAN, STEPHEN V. HOPKINS, THOMAS N. SOODSMA, RICHARD C. CHABOT, ROBERT A. GOODMAN, DAVE A. MILLER, NICHOLAS L. AMABILE, CAL W. TAX, THOMAS W. GROVE, DWIGHT E. GRANDIA, CHRISTOPHER S. BLACK, ESTATE OF DONN L. FRYMAN, JOSEPH C. POE, NEIL A. ROBERTSON, GERALD A. KNAPP, JAMES J. HOURIN, CRESTON D. HALL, FRANK M. BOTTOMS, SR., CARL D. LANGAS, MARY K. REAGOR, CLAUDE B. EISON, III, ROBERT T. ALLEN, JAMES B. JOHNSON, DAVID W. SKJERVEN, MARK H. MATHERNE, CLAUDIA A. BLAZ, DANIEL B. MCMAHON, GERALD M. FOGARTY, ROBERT W. BRUSHWYLER, WILLIAM T. SONNENBERG, DAVID S. PLEWES, NICHOLAS E. GRYNKEWICH, MARK B. MACOMBER, EDWARD NELSON CAYLOR, NATHAN L. MASON, LEWIS H. DICKSON, STEPHEN LEE SACHS, WILLIAM WALTER WILLIAMS, ERNEST W. HIGGINS, JAMES CARROLL BRASHER, KIM B. KILGORE, THEODORE F. LANGWORTHY, PETER J. WILLETTS, RICHARD I. FONDE, STEVEN D. BERMAN, ESTATE OF WILLIAM G. GOFF, JR., LARRY A. MOORE, ROBERT M. BURNS, ROBERT F. KLAUER, DAVID J. CANN, MAURICE CLOUTIER, JOHN R. WITTMEYER, CHARLES T. TULLY, SR., PATRICK VIRTUE, RICHARD N. HOLMES, MARION D. HINDMAN, ONEAL L. SISSON, JOHN W. FLOYD, DAVID M. DAVIS, ALFRED W. LEISTIKOW, ROGER R. SUNDBERG, JAMES T. QUARLES, JAMES W. DYE, JOHN D. MORAN, THOMAS B. GOODMAN, GEORGE JETTON, THOMAS J. JACOBUS, WARREN S. STOVALL, THOMAS W. SHEEHY, ROBERT R. RIOUX, DAVID T. MASON, HAROLD B. WALLACE, ROBERT E. MITCHELL, THOMAS P. ROAN, MICHAEL N. SHORT, STEPHEN L. SMITH, CHARLES R. BUMGARNER, ESTATE OF RONALD A. KOLB, MICHAEL W. SENIOR, GERALD G. SIMPSON, HARRY F. RUE, DENNIS A. DEGUIRE, SAMUEL J. MURRAY, BENJAMIN B. BARRETT, REUBEN BLACK, LAWRENCE M. KOCISKO, MICHAEL W. BROWN, THOMAS A. BRENNISON, JESSE V. KUKIER, EDWARD R. SHIPLEY, EDWARD LEE HIBBARD, JOEL R. HEDLUND, JOHN K. PELL, DONALD R. SCREWS, ROGER MARTIN, THOMAS J. GILMER, LOUIS P. ANICH, ANTHONY R. PAPANDREA, JAMES S. COLBY, ROBERT H. LEE, MICHAEL D. WARD, ANDREW J. ANDERSON, ESTATE OF WILLIAM D. NELSON, JAMES P. DRAFFIN, LONNIE RAY WILLIAMS, GARY WAYNE RITTER, JOHN USKOVICH, THEODORE A. TWEET, JEFFREY N. HORNFECK, BERTRAM L. HAMBLETON, JAMES V. CAGLE, GEORGE L. SUTTLER, JOHN A. STAUTER, JR., DENNIS M. EBERHARDT, ROBERT C. SHEPHERD, WILLAIM B. HOUSEMAN, JAMES A. INGHAM, DENNIS A. JOHNSON, BRUCE A. WILLIAMSON, ROBERT J. MACKEY, STEVEN D. HALL, ROBERT AUSTIN STOTHART, JAMES HARDY FIELDS, CARL R. SCIURBA, DENNIS J. SHIELDS, JAMES H. MCCANN, RICHARD A. SHUTACK, ROBERT O. WEAVER, JR., FARRIS FRANKLIN YATES, ESTATE OF LEON M. JONES, ROBERT J. MORRISON, JOHNNY HARREL HINES, PAUL A. WERNER, WILLIAM G. ROBERTSON, GEORGE P. TERWILLIGER, CHARLES DAVID CERASO, WILLIAM S. HEIDT, JAMES AVERETT, CHARLES L. LUCAS, GREGORY CHARLES MORGAN, JAMES R. JONES, JOHN H. HONSINGER, JACK S. KELLY, RONALD R. MONTOYA, GUSTAV S. HERTZ, JOHN T. FORD, JR., CHARLES P. DAWSON, DANIEL E. KOERNER, JR., FREDERICK G. SWAIN, KAY BRAXTON PEARCE, MICHAEL J. BOBER, GEORGE L. PERRY, CHARLES PATTON NIVEN, JACK W. SHINN, THOMAS D. KINDER, WAYNE B. LARUE, JR., ROBERT J. ONEAL, KERIN LOUIS SHAUGHNESSEY, III, ESTATE OF ANDREW P. BROWN, JOHN S. PERRY, JR., EDMUND R. JONES, WILLIAM R. BUNTIN, MICHAEL R. KELLY, RONALD L. KORTHALS, JAMES A. CROOKSTON, RAYMOND D. COMPTON, PHILIP J. HARDY, GEORGE L. BILES, JR., GEORGE L. PETRITZ, JAMES LEE ARMSTRONG, JOHN T. ARGO, JR., DEAN H. BERK, JERRY L. TATE, PHILIP M. NARDECCHIA, DAVID N. LUCAS, THOMAS E. GANTT, JR., JOHN A. ZIMMERMAN, RICHARD C. HARRIS, JOHN H. FOOTE, SAMUEL THOMAS PEACE, III, DANIEL A. KOPACK, JOHN C. HARRISON, CHRISTIAN M. CLAUSEN, ESTATE OF JAMES T. PRUCHA, JR., ELMER E. HINKLE, JR., WALTER R. CURRY, EDWARD T. ZIMMER, THOMAS S. MARTIN, DARRYL L. STOCKTON, HOBART M. HARMON, PHILIP TEAL, FRED J. DAMBRIE, RODNEY S. HINDS, WAYNE E. WARE, DOUGLAS MORGAN PADGETT, ANDREW J. THOMPSON, III, ANDRE E. LOVAS, JAMES F. ARNOLD, II, FRANCIS P. ERCKMANN, STEPHEN T. GRICE, CURTIS R. NORRED, BARRY C. BOUSTEAD, STEWART W. THOMPSON, JOSEPH C. ELLIS, JAMES W. ORTMAN, PHILIP A. MESSIER, JAMES L. WHITE, BARRY P. YUNES, MICHAEL J. WELLS, ARTHUR L. CAMPBELL, THOMAS G. THOMPSON, PAUL H. BARRETT, JR., EDWARD C. CRONIN, WILLIAM E. BOYLE, GEORGE ROBERT RICKLEY, GREGG H. AVERETT, ESTATE OF SCOTT R. JONES, DAVID R. SKOOG, JAMES W. REESE, RICHARD R. HAYES, ROBERT J. CASTER, HAROLD W. COUSAR, JERRY K. REED, JOHN PAUL CERAK, CHAD N. KOPPIE, FREDERICK B. PAYNE, FREDERICK B. HARRIS, ROGERS PATTON WARREN, WILLIAM M. HART, ROBERT D. ASKINS, WILLIAM G. JUMP, KURT ALBRECHT, PAUL G. SCIBONA, DAVID E. BLUBAUGH, THOMAS F, KANALEY, EDWIN F. MADIGAN, CHARLES M. KNUDSON, WILLIAM VORDERBRUGGEN, RONALD G. BRUNDRIDGE, DAVID C. DRESSLER, MICHAEL J. MULLIN, GERALD GRIESER, BILLY HOWARD KELLUM, PHILLIP S. MARZOLINO, DONALD FARRELL, JOE H. HUGHES, ALBERT L. PIERCE, JR., ESTATE OF CLAYTON N. CASTLE, RICHARD A. FREEDING, ROBERT W. THOME, GUY B. SNODGRASS, STEPHEN R. GRAY, RICHARD HOHLOWSKI, PETER D. ANDERSON, GEORGE TRENT DAVIS, III, BRUCE M. BEAVERS, HARRY C. PAPINEAU, ROBERT F. LINDLEY, BURNETT A. HERNES, THOMAS C. FIFE, MICHAEL H. MESSMORE, WILLIAM F. MCBRIDE, HERBERT L. ENTREKIN, WILLIAM F. KLUMPP, RONALD V. BUTLER, CHARLES D. BURNFIELD, EARL JAY MARTIN, JR., KEITH D. SANDER, JERRY A. CHURCH, EDWARD S. STOKES, III, ROBERT LOWERY MOORE, GREGORY L. RHYNE, WILLIAM L. STEVENS, JAMES BYRON PASCAL, ROBERT W. KESLER, WILLIAM W. DOONAN, JR., DOUGLAS E. BARON, LARRY W. MARR, PATRICK ROBB, MICHAEL R. FLOYD, MARK L. KING, JOHN M. KARLOVICH, JERRY L. FARQUHAR, RONALD K. KOBERNIK, RICHARD I. SELBERG, FRED P. HODGE, JOHN W. CROTTY, PHIL E. COLSTON, CHARLES S. FISHER, ROBERT D. BURNS, WILLIAM E. CALLAWAY, ESTATE OF CREIGH W. TAYLOR, ROGER W. TAYLOR, LINWOOD C. KORNEGAY, DARWIN F. COOK, WILLIAM PICKENS JONES, DONALD J. ALLEN, ESTATE OF JAMES M. MANGHAM, WILLIAM DENNIS WALSH, RICHARD A. BECK, DON P. SPIVEY, JOHN D. OWENS, SR., JOHN C. FOW, MARTY J. CAVATO, TRAVIS H. FOSTER, MICHAEL D. DUGGIN, GARY N. PRESSLER, RICHARD E. COE, WILLIAM P. ZIPSE, RODNEY L. WELLS, DANIEL W. BRIDGES, JR., EUGENE W. KEY, JR., RICHARD L. CURTIS, DAN W. ROBERTSON, CLARENCE W. CALLAHAN, JR., JEROME G. SMITH, II, GERALD D. WOHLFORD, MARK J. BROWN, DAVID B. ASHWORTH, CARL LOWRY, JR. and DAVID G. HICKOX
Defendant: ESTATE OF NICHOLAS L. AMABILE, ESTATE OF DANIEL H. COURTNEY, ESTATE OF LAWRENCE D. OLBRIGHT, ESTATE OF JAMES BRYON PASCAL and ESTATE OF DEAN E. ROBNETT
Case Number: 1:2015cv01328
Filed: August 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Reggie B Walton
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER. In accordance with the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the stay imposed by this Court on February 4, 2019, pending resolution of the plaintiffs' petition for a writ of certiorari, see Order at 1 (Feb. 4, 2019), ECF No. 110, is LIFTED. It is further ORDERED that the Consented Motion by Plaintiffs to Dismiss Claim One and for Entry of Final Judgment, ECF No. 114, is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Count One of the plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that this Order, in combination with the Court's previous Order granting summary judgment in favor of the defendant on Counts Two through Five of the plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint and dismissing Count Six of the plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, see Order at 1 (June 11, 2018), ECF No. 106, constitutes the Court's final judgment in this case. It is further ORDERED that this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 29, 2019. (lcrbw3)
August 21, 2019 Filing 115 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ALL PLAINTIFFS. Attorney Michael N. Khalil terminated. (Khalil, Michael)
July 24, 2019 Filing 114 Consent MOTION to Dismiss Claim One and for, MOTION for Entry of Final Judgment by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shelley, Anthony)
June 25, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion due by 7/25/2019. (gdf)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the #113 Plaintiffs' Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before July 25, 2019, the plaintiffs shall file their motion for an order dismissing their fiduciary breach claim and entering final judgment in this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 25, 2019. (lcrbw3)
June 24, 2019 Filing 113 STATUS REPORT by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Shelley, Anthony)
May 24, 2019 Filing 112 STATUS REPORT Regarding Status of Petition for Certiorari by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Shelley, Anthony)
February 5, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Status Report due by 5/24/2019 (hs)
February 5, 2019 Filing 111 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Reggie B. Walton held on January 30, 2019; Page Numbers: 1 - 8. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cathryn Jones, Telephone number 202 354-3246, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 2/26/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/8/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2019.(Jones, Cathryn)
February 4, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/24/2019. (gdf)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER. In accordance with the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is STAYED pending resolution of the plaintiffs' petition for a writ of certiorari. It is further ORDERED that, on or before May 24, 2019, and every thirty days thereafter, the plaintiffs shall file with the Court a report indicating the status of their petition. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 4, 2019. (lcrbw3)
January 30, 2019 Minute Entry; for proceedings held before Judge Reggie B. Walton: Scheduling Conference held on 1/30/2019. Scheduling Order to issue via Chambers. (Court Reporter Cathryn Jones) (hs)
January 29, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference reset for 1/30/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (hs)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. To avoid conflict due to potential weather delays, it is hereby ORDERED that the status conference currently scheduled for Wednesday, January 30, 2019, at 9 a.m., is RESCHEDULED to 11 a.m. on the same date. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 29, 2019. (lcrbw3)
January 17, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/30/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (hs) Modified on 1/17/2019 to reflect Courtroom 16 not 26A(hs).
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER. In accordance with the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference on Wednesday, January 30, 2019, at 9:00 a.m., to address how this case shall proceed. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 17, 2019. (lcrbw3)
December 31, 2018 Filing 108 MANDATE of USCA as to #97 Notice of Appeal, filed by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION ; USCA Case Number 17-5068. (Attachments: #1 USCA Judgment)(zrdj)
June 11, 2018 Filing 107 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 11, 2018. (lcrbw1)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER. In accordance with the Memorandum Opinion issued on this same day, it is hereby ORDERED that the #99 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that #101 Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to the Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that summary judgment is entered in favor of Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation on Counts Two through Five of the plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. It is further ORDERED that Count Six of the First Amended Complaint is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 11, 2018. (lcrbw1)
September 8, 2017 Filing 105 REPLY re #101 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment // Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to the Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment // Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation's Reply Memorandum in Support of its Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION. (Snyder, Mark)
August 4, 2017 Filing 104 Memorandum in opposition to re #101 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment // Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to the Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 KPMG Report re Plan Asset Evaluation, #2 Exhibit 2 Letter from PBGC to K. Lewis, #3 Exhibit 3 Letter from PBGC to K. Lewis, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Shelley, Anthony)
August 4, 2017 Filing 103 REPLY to opposition to motion re #99 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 KPMG Report re Plan Asset Evaluation, #2 Exhibit 2 Letter from PBGC to K. Lewis, #3 Exhibit 3 Letter from PBGC to K. Lewis)(Shelley, Anthony)
July 20, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Cross Motion due by 8/4/2017. Reply to Cross Motion due by 9/8/2017. (hs)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the #102 Plaintiffs' Consented Motion for Extension of Time, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiffs' opposition to the defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of their motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before August 4, 2017. It is further ORDERED that the defendant's reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before September 8, 2017. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 7/19/2017. (lcrbw3)
July 19, 2017 Filing 102 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Def's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Reply in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shelley, Anthony)
June 27, 2017 Filing 101 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment // Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to the Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Snyder, Mark)
June 27, 2017 NOTICE OF ERROR re #100 Memorandum in Opposition; emailed to snyder.mark@pbgc.gov, cc'd 10 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Your Cross Motion needs to be filed. Please remember to file all parts of your document(s) when filing. (ztd, )
June 26, 2017 Filing 100 Memorandum in opposition to re #99 MOTION for Summary Judgment // Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to the Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Snyder, Mark)
April 25, 2017 Filing 99 MOTION for Summary Judgment by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - July 2014 Letter, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Shelley, Anthony)
April 12, 2017 USCA Case Number 17-5068 for #97 Notice of Appeal, filed by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION. (td)
April 4, 2017 Filing 98 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. Pursuant to Order filed in 17-8001 re #97 Notice of Appeal. (zrdj)
April 4, 2017 Filing 97 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #53 Memorandum & Opinion, #52 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Strike, by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (zrdj) (Pursuant to USCA Order filed 02/02/2017 in 17-8001).
February 24, 2017 Filing 96 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION re #90 Sealed Document, #89 Sealed Document, #92 Sealed Document, #91 Sealed Document, #87 Sealed Document, #95 Sealed Document, #93 Sealed Document, #94 Sealed Document, #88 Sealed Document . (Snyder, Mark)
February 23, 2017 Filing 95 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Snyder, Mark)
February 23, 2017 Filing 94 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Snyder, Mark)
February 23, 2017 Filing 93 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Snyder, Mark)
February 23, 2017 Filing 92 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Snyder, Mark)
February 23, 2017 Filing 91 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Snyder, Mark)
February 23, 2017 Filing 90 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Snyder, Mark)
February 23, 2017 Filing 89 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Snyder, Mark)
February 23, 2017 Filing 88 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Snyder, Mark)
February 23, 2017 Filing 87 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Snyder, Mark)
February 23, 2017 Filing 86 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Part 17 of 17 by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION. (Snyder, Mark)
February 23, 2017 Filing 85 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Part 16 of 17 by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION. (Snyder, Mark)
February 23, 2017 Filing 84 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Part 15 of 17 by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION. (Snyder, Mark)
February 23, 2017 Filing 83 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Part 14 of 17 by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION. (Snyder, Mark)
February 23, 2017 Filing 82 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Part 13 of 17 by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION. (Snyder, Mark)
February 23, 2017 Filing 81 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Part 12 of 17 by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION. (Snyder, Mark)
February 23, 2017 Filing 80 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Part 11 of 17 by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION. (Snyder, Mark)
February 23, 2017 Filing 79 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Part 10 of 17 by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION. (Snyder, Mark)
February 23, 2017 Filing 78 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Part 9 of 17 by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION. (Snyder, Mark)
February 23, 2017 Filing 77 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Part 8 of 17 by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION. (Snyder, Mark)
February 23, 2017 Filing 76 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Part 7 of 17 by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION. (Snyder, Mark)
February 23, 2017 Filing 75 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Part 6 of 17 by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION. (Snyder, Mark)
February 23, 2017 Filing 74 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Part 5 of 17 by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION. (Snyder, Mark)
February 23, 2017 Filing 73 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Part 4 of 17 by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION. (Snyder, Mark)
February 23, 2017 Filing 72 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Part 3 of 17 by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION. (Snyder, Mark)
February 23, 2017 Filing 71 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Part 2 of 17 by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION. (Snyder, Mark)
February 23, 2017 Filing 70 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD Part 1 of 17 by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION. (Snyder, Mark)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the #68 Plaintiffs' Motion to Join Additional Plaintiff, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall add Gerald M. McMillan to the list of plaintiffs in this action. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 2/22/2017. (lcrbw3)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER; granting #67 Motion to Substitute Party. Upon consideration of the plaintiffs' Suggestion of Death on Record and Motion for Substitution, and in light of the defendant's consent, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall substitute the parties as detailed in the plaintiffs' motion. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 2/16/2017. (lcrbw3) Modified on 2/16/2017 (hs).
February 14, 2017 Filing 69 SEALED DOCUMENT (Administrative Record Table of Contents of Administrative Record) filed by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION. re #65 Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd)
February 14, 2017 Filing 68 MOTION for Joinder for Additional Plaintiff Gerald M. McMillan and Statement of Facts and Law in Support by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shelley, Anthony)
February 14, 2017 Filing 67 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party in Accordance with Suggestion of Death on the Record by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shelley, Anthony)
February 14, 2017 Filing 66 NOTICE of Suggestion of Death on the Record by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Shelley, Anthony)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #64 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 2/9/2017. (lcrbw3)
February 9, 2017 Filing 64 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -Table of Contents of Administrative Record, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Snyder, Mark)
February 8, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion to file under seal due by 2/14/2017. Administrative Record due by 2/24/2017. Summary Judgment motions due by 4/25/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/26/2017. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/26/2017. (hs)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' joint proposed briefing schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendant's motion to file under seal shall be filed on or before February 14, 2017. The Court anticipates that such motion will be resolved expeditiously. Accordingly, it is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file the administrative record in this case on or before February 24, 2017. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before April 25, 2017. It is further ORDERED that the defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition to the plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before June 26, 2017. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiffs' opposition to the defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment and reply in support of their motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before July 26, 2017. It is further ORDERED that the defendant's reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before August 25, 2017. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 2/7/2017. (lcrbw3)
February 6, 2017 Filing 63 PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE re #61 Order on Motion for Reconsideration,,,,, Order on Motion for Certification for Interlocatory Appeal,,,,, Order on Motion to Stay,,,, Joint Proposed Schedule re Filing of Admin. Record and Dispositive Motions of Claims 2-6 of Am. Compl. by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Shelley, Anthony)
January 23, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint proposed schedule due by 2/6/2017. (hs)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER CERTIFYING INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1292(B). Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 1/23/2017. (lcrbw3)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER. For the reasons stated in the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the Corporation's motion for reconsideration is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that the Corporation's motion for certification to file an immediate appeal of the Court's order denying dismissal of the plaintiffs' breach of fiduciary duty claim is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Corporation's request for a stay of the proceedings before this Court pending the resolution of the appeal is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The request is GRANTED with respect to the breach of fiduciary duty claim, and DENIED with respect to the plaintiffs' other claims. It is further ORDERED that, on or before February 6, 2017, the parties shall file a joint proposed schedule for the filing of the administrative record in this case and the briefing of dispositive motions regarding the remaining claims in the First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 1/23/2017. (lcrbw3)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER; granting #59 Motion to Substitute Party, Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 10/13/2016. (hs)
October 11, 2016 Filing 59 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party in Accordance with Suggestion of Death on the Record by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shelley, Anthony)
October 11, 2016 Filing 58 NOTICE of Suggestion of Death on the Record by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Shelley, Anthony)
August 15, 2016 Filing 57 REPLY re #54 MOTION for Reconsideration re #52 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Strike,,,,,, , or in the Alternative MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal MOTION to Stay of Proceeding //PBGC's Reply in Support of its Motion for Reconsideration, or in the alternative, for Certification to File Interlocutory Appeal, and for a Stay of Proceeding filed by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION. (Snyder, Mark)
August 5, 2016 Filing 56 Memorandum in opposition to re #54 MOTION for Reconsideration re #52 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Strike,,,,,, , or in the Alternative MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal MOTION to Stay of Proceeding filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shelley, Anthony)
July 28, 2016 Filing 55 ANSWER to #45 Amended Complaint //Answer of Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION.(Snyder, Mark) Modified on 7/29/2016 (znmw).
July 19, 2016 Filing 54 MOTION for Reconsideration re #52 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Strike,,,,,, , or in the Alternative, MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal , MOTION to Stay of Proceeding by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Snyder, Mark)
July 6, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Answer to the Amended Complaint due by 7/28/2016. (hs)
July 6, 2016 Filing 53 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 7/6/2016. (lcrbw3)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER. In accordance with the Memorandum Opinion to be issued on this same day, it is hereby ORDERED that Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation's Motion to Dismiss and To Strike is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. It is further ORDERED that the defendant's motion to dismiss Claim One of the First Amended Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant's motion to strike the plaintiffs' demand for attorney's fees is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendants' motion to strike the plaintiffs' demand for a jury trial is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendants shall file their Answer to the Amended Complaint on or before July 28, 2016. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 7/6/2016. (lcrbw3)
May 31, 2016 Filing 51 RESPONSE re #50 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY // PBGC's Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplemental Authority Regarding Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Claim One filed by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION. (Snyder, Mark)
May 24, 2016 Filing 50 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Moyle Decision)(Shelley, Anthony)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It appearing unnecessary for the Court to hold a status conference in light of the pending motions to dismiss and to strike, it is hereby ORDERED that the status conference set for May 20, 2016, is VACATED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 5/11/2016. (lcrbw3)
April 21, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference reset for 5/20/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (hs)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Due to the Court requiring additional time to consider the pending motion to dismiss in this case, it is hereby ORDERED that the status conference currently scheduled on May 6, 2016, is CONTINUED to May 20, 2016, at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 4/21/2016. (lcrbw3)
March 16, 2016 Filing 49 NOTICE of Change of Address by Anthony F. Shelley (Shelley, Anthony)
February 5, 2016 Filing 48 REPLY to opposition to motion re #46 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Strike #45 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, //Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation's Motion to Dismiss and to Strik //Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation's Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss and to Strike filed by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION. (Krettek, Joseph)
January 15, 2016 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re #46 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Strike #45 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, //Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation's Motion to Dismiss and to Strik filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shelley, Anthony) Modified on 1/19/2016 event text(td).
December 7, 2015 Filing 46 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Strike #45 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, ,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, //Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation's Motion to Dismiss and to Strike by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Snyder, Mark)
November 6, 2015 Filing 45 AMENDED COMPLAINT - FIRST against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by DARRELL L. ABBY, JACK L. ABERNATHY, JR, CHARLES F. ACKER, FRANK A. ACQUAVELLA, ROBERT E. ADAM, ERICH H. ADAMS, RANDALL R. ADAMS, ROBERT A. ADAMS, WALTER A. ADAMS, JAMES T. ADDINGTON, PAUL R. ADLINGTON, FRANK L. AHERN, STEVEN A. AIGNER, MARTIN D. ALBANG, KURT ALBRECHT, JOHN P. ALDERMAN, ALL PLAINTIFFS, DONALD J. ALLEN, JAMES R. ALLEN, ROBERT T. ALLEN, RONALD E ALLEN, ROBERT R. ALLEN, JR, RONALD J. ALLEN, RICHARD E. ALVAREZ, NICHOLAS L. AMABILE, DONALD L. AMES, ALAN J. ANDERSON, ANDREW J. ANDERSON, CLYDE A. ANDERSON, J. ERIC ANDERSON, JOHN C. ANDERSON, JOHN M. ANDERSON, PETER D. ANDERSON, HARRY W. ANDREWS, FRANCIS C. ANGLIN, LOUIS P. ANICH, GREGG B. ARCHER, JOHN T. ARGO, JR, JAMES LEE ARMSTRONG, ROGER F. ARNDT, JAMES D. ARNEW, JAMES F. ARNOLD, II, WILLIAM E. ARNOLD, DONALD E. ASAY, DAVID P. ASCHER, VERNON G. ASH, DAVID B. ASHWORTH, ROBERT D. ASKINS, LAWRENCE F. AUCIN, BERNARD J. AUER, DAVID S. AUSTIN, THOMAS W. AVANT, GREGG H. AVERETT, JAMES AVERETT, JAMES R. AVERSMAN, WILLIAM U. AVIRETT, JIM L. AVRAMOVICH, MYRON J. BABLER, LEROY R. BACHMAN, L. M. BAGGETT, DAVID W. BAILEY, JAMES G. BAIRD, JR, CARSON V. BAKER, LARRY W. BAKER, MARVIN C. BAKER, SAMUEL WINN BAKER, ARTHUR W. BALES, III, JOHN D. BALL, HARRY G. BALLANCE, JR, GREGORY W. BARBER, RAYMOND E. BARBER, THOMAS ROY BAREFOOT, GEORGE D. BARLOW, JR, DOUGLAS E. BARON, GEORGE J. BARR, BENJAMIN B. BARRETT, PAUL H. BARRETT, JR, CHELSEA LEVONE BARTENFELD, JERRY N. BARTLETT, JON H. BARTON, LESLIE E. BATES, GERALD H. BAUER, FREDERICK J. BEARDSLEY, JAMES W. BEAUBIEN, III, BRUCE M. BEAVERS, RICHARD A. BECK, THOMAS V. BECK, GEORGE L. BECKER, ROBERT W. BECKMAN, WILLIAM P. BEEDE, EARL H. BEHRENS, RAYMOND L. BELL, LOUIS A. BELLINE, TIMOTHY W. BELLURY, ROBERT B. BENHAM, STERLING N. BENNETT, CHARLES A. BENSON, TOMMY RAY BENTLEY, ROY B. BENTSON, GEORGE E. BERG, DEAN H. BERK, STEVEN D. BERMAN, DAMON R. BERRY, RONALD J. BERRY, DOUGLAS E. BEST, CHARLES E. BETHEL, JAMES R. BETTCHER, LEO D. BEZDEK, CHARLES L. BIBLE, GEORGE L. BILES, JR, JOSEPH P. BILOTTA, ALBERT C. BINIASZ, JACK L. BIRCHALL, JOHN HEFLIN BIRGE, MICHAEL W. BIRMINGHAM, JOSEPH H. F. BISSELL, CHRISTOPHER S. BLACK, REUBEN BLACK, JOHNNY H. BLACKMON, BYRON R. BLACKWELL, STEVEN L. BLACKWOOD, ROBERT A. BLANTON, MICHAEL S. BLASKOVICH, CLAUDIA A. BLAZ, JACK G. BLAZ, ROBERT J. BLOINK, ROY E. BLOMGREN, WADE D. BLOOM, GEORGE E. BLOSSER, DAVID E. BLUBAUGH, ROBERT H. BLUHM, RALPH N. BOATWRIGHT, MICHAEL J. BOBER, WILLIAM R. BODINE, JR, JOHN A. BODMER, KENNETH J. BOGLE, MICHAEL R. BOLIER, DUANE A. BOLIN, RONALD O. BOLTZ, JAMES S. BOMAR, WILLIAM PHILIP BOMMER, ROBERT F. BONACCORSO, ROSS F. BONNY, JR, FREDERICK O. BOONE, JR, LLOYD D. BOONE, FREDERICK C. BORCHERT, BRUCE BORLAND, LELAND R. BOS, DOUGLAS M. BOSTON, FRANK M. BOTTOMS, SR, BARRY C. BOUSTEAD, MICHAEL M. BOWEN, CONNIE J. BOWLIN, ALLEN W. BOYCE, DAN L. BOYD, JR, JAN K. BOYD, JOHN E. BOYD, WILLIAM E. BOYLE, DONALD O. BRADFORD, RICHARD J. BRADLEY, BYRCE L. BRAMSEN, ROBERT A. BRANDON, WILLIAM C. BRANT, JAMES CARROLL BRASHER, JAMES CARROLL BRASWELL, OSCAR D. BRASWELL, RALPH M. BRASWELL, III, CHARLES M. BRATTON, CHARLES B. BRAY, III, JAMES A. BREKKE, THOMAS A. BRENNISON, DANIEL W. BRIDGES, JR, W. CHARLES BRIDGES, WILLIAM F. BRINDELL, WILLIAM E. BRINTNALL, LARRY W. BRISTOW, HAROLD S. BRITO, PENNY L. BROCK, CHARLES BROCKWAY, RALPH S. BRODERICK, WILLIAM BRONSON, WILLIAM CHARLES BROOKS, STEPHEN P. BROSS, CHARLES E. BROWN, DAVID A. BROWN, FRED M. BROWN, MARK J. BROWN, MELVIN BROWN, MICHAEL W. BROWN, RANDALL H. BROWN, ROBERT G. BROWN, ROBERT CRAIG BROWN, ROBERT K. BRUBAKER, DAVID W. BRUCE, LEONARD C. BRUNASSO, RONALD G. BRUNDRIDGE, ROBERT W. BRUSHWYLER, ROBERT M. BRYANT, SR, WILLIAM G. BUCKLIN, THOMAS C. BUDD, WILLIAM C. BUERGEY, CARL R. BUETTNER, ANDREW L. BUKATY, JOHN F. BULGER, CHARLES R. BUMGARNER, MYRL W. BUNDRICK, WILLIAM R. BUNTIN, CLARENCE M. BURCH, JAMES LEE BURGE, JERALD C. BURGESS, LARRY J. BURGY, EDWARD DEVIN BURKE, PATRICK J. BURKE, JR, W. D. BURKHARDT, FERREE R. BURKHEAD, GERALD R. BURNETT, RAYMOND C. BURNETT, CHARLES D. BURNFIELD, JOHN F. BURNS, ROBERT M. BURNS, ROBERT D. BURNS, DENNIS E. BURTON, GEREN E. BURTON, DONALD J. BUSHEY, RONALD V. BUTLER, SAMUEL B. BUTLER, III, THOMAS P. BUTT, RAYMOND S. BYDE, JAMES B. BYRD, LESTER M. BYRD, JOHN CHARLES BYRNE, PHILLIP J. BYRNES, JAMES V. CAGLE, MICHAEL J. CAHILL, ALBERT W. CAIAZZA, JOHN B. CAIN, JOHN CALDWELL, CLARENCE W. CALLAHAN, JR, DANA A. CALLANAN, WILLIAM E. CALLAWAY, THOMAS J. CALVANELLI, BENJAMIN M. CAMP, JR, DONALD L. CAMP, ALAN D. CAMPBELL, ARTHUR L. CAMPBELL, ROBERT K. CAMPBELL, THERMAN L. CAMPBELL, BUDDY W. CANDELARIO, DAVID J. CANN, CHARLES MILNER CANNON, PATRICK A. CARDINALE, CHARLES A. CARLON, TIMOTHY L. CARMAN, ROBERT L. CARMICHAEL, JR, WALTER C. CARMICHAEL, CRAIG W. CARPENTER, JAMES D. CARPENTER, JACK E. CARR, HENRY G. CARRINGTON, ROBERT A. CARSON, JAMES L. CARTER, JOHN R. CARTER, TIMOTHY J. CARTER, FRANCIS T. CARUSO, LAURENCE L. CASADA, LAWRENCE CASALE, ROBERT J. CASTER, JOHN P. CATCHINGS, FREDERIC N. CATONI, JOHN S. CAUGMAN, MALCOLM D. CAULDWELL, OLIN H. CAUSEY, MICHAEL B. CAVANAGH, MARTY J. CAVATO, EDWARD NELSON CAYLOR, JOHN PAUL CERAK, CHARLES DAVID CERASO, RICHARD C. CHABOT, MARK S. CHAFFIN, EDWARD L. CHAMBLESS, DAVID A. CHAMPA, THOMAS A. CHAMPLEY, CHARLES E. CHAUVIN, ROBERT TRACY CHEATHAM, III, ELY CHEN, KENNETH G. CHIRHART, NOBLE C. CHRISTENSEN, JERRY A. CHURCH, JAMES J. CIANCI, ROBERT CINIBULK, JR, ERIC L. CINTRON, DION F. CLANCY, BRYAN R. CLARK, DAVID J. CLARK, FORREST C. CLARK, GEORGE B. CLARK, RICHARD L. CLARK, CHRISTIAN M. CLAUSEN, STUART M. CLAY, CRAIG D. CLEVELAND, ALAN RICHARD CLICK, TIMOTHY C. CLIFFORD, GLENN D. CLOES, SPENCER W. CLOSSON, JR, JAMES DWIGHT CLOUDT, MAURICE CLOUTIER, JAMES C. COCHRAN, MAC H. COCHRAN, EDWARD E. CODY, RICHARD E. COE, JOHN E. COFFIN, JAMES S. COLBY, RICHARD E. COLBY, CLIFFORD I. COLE, JR, WILLIAM D. COLEGROVE, CRAIG S. COLEMAN, GEORGE S. COLEY, DONALD B. COLLINS, SR, GLEN H. COLLINS, ERIC M. COLONEY, PHIL E. COLSTON, RAYMOND D. COMPTON, MICHAEL J. CONABOY, EDWIN L. CONRAD, DALE M. CONTENT, DARWIN F. COOK, JOHN E. COOLEY, JOHN B. COOPER, JR, RONALD T. COOPER, WILLIAM A. COOPER, DAVID J. COPELAND, HENRY N. COPPOLA, ROBERT D. CORDER, DENISE B. CORDERO, PAT A. COSTA, JOHN N. H. COSTAS, BOBBY W. COSTILOW, JOSEPH A. COUGHLIN, DANIEL H. COURTNEY, HAROLD W. COUSAR, MICHAEL L. COX, MICHAEL C. CRABTREE, JAMES R. CRAIG, RICHARD P. CRAINE, DOHRMAN G. CRAWFORD, JR, STEPHEN R. CRAWFORD, STEPHEN M. CRAWFORD, RONALD E. CRISPE, KENTON W. CROCKETT, JOHN D. CROFTON, EDWARD C. CRONIN, JAMES A. CROOKSTON, JOHN W. CROTTY, RICHARD D. CROW, SAMUEL W. CROW, JR, ROBERT L. CUDDEBACK, BRUCE J. CULLEN, MARK S. CULLINGS, DAVID G. CULPEPPER, WILLIAM S. CUNNINGHAM, WILLIAM TOLLIVER CUNNINGHAM, WALTER R. CURRY, GARY L. CURTIS, RICHARD L. CURTIS, CLARK A. CURTISS, TERRY L. CUSICK, JOHN MACKAY DALEY, FRED J. DAMBRIE, RAY A. DANIEL, BRUCE E. DANTZLER, FRANK W. DAUGHERTY, DAVID M. DAVIS, GEORGE TRENT DAVIS, III, GUY W. DAVIS, JAMES W. DAVIS, JR, ROBERT W. DAVIS, THOMPSON HENRY DAVIS, CHARLES P. DAWSON, THOMAS DAY, ANDREW M. DEANE, REX L. DEARDEN, JOHN R. DEARIE, WILLIAM C. DEAUGUSTINIS, ROBERT G. DECKER, JAMES E. DEGNAN, DENNIS A. DEGUIRE, WILLIAM R. DELINE, JAMES R. DELUCA, MICHAEL E. DEMARINO, BRUCE H. DEMENT, BRUCE T. DEMOSS, DAVID D. DEMPSEY, ROBERT J. DERR, JOHN A. DERRICK, PATRICK L. DESCHNER, THOMAS M. DESTEFANO, JR, MARK J. DETWILER, JOSEPH A. DEVELIS, GARY D. DICKE, LEWIS H. DICKSON, JOHN F. DISOSWAY, CHARLES A. DIXON, FRANCIS A. DOHERTY, DENNIS J. DOLAN, SR, RICHARD M. DOLAN, AURELIO O. DONATO, WILLIAM W. DOONAN, JR, BERNARD J. DOUBLER, JAMES P. DRAFFIN, ROGER E. DRAKE, GERARD F. DREILING, PAUL F. DRESSER, DAVID C. DRESSLER, GLENN FRANK DROVER, SR, GEORGE F. DUBICK, ROGER A. DUCLOS, STUART T. DUERSON, MICHAEL D. DUGGIN, JAMES V. DUNLAP, BOWMAN ASHE DUNN, CECIL J. DURANT, WILLIAM C. DVORACEK, ROBERT J. DWYER, JAMES W. DYE, DONALD J. EADIE, JOHN G. EARLEY, JR, RICHARD J. EASLEY, WILLIAM M. EASTERLIN, DAVID W. EASTIS, BRIAN J. EATON, DENNIS M. EBERHARDT, LARRY D. ECCARD, JOHN E. ECKERT, JOSEPH F. EDMONDSON, ROBERT A. EDSON, ERIC ALAN EDSTROM, JAMES S. EHMER, MARCY M. EISENBURG, JR, CLAUDE B. EISON, III, JOSEPH M. ELDER, WILLIAM F. ELDRIDGE, JOSEPH C. ELLIS, PAUL CANDLER ELLIS, JIMMY D. ELMORE, DONALD J. ENGELBRECHT, LEWIS W. ENGLISH, DOUGLAS G. ENGREN, HERBERT L. ENTREKIN, FRANCIS P. ERCKMANN, WAYNE ERICKSON, CHARLES E. ERVIN, III, GEORGE D. ESSELMAN, ESTATE OF WILLIAM W. KELLNER, ESTATE OF ANDREW P. BROWN, ESTATE OF CALVIN W. TINSLEY, ESTATE OF CLAYTON N. CASTLE, ESTATE OF CREIGH W. TAYLOR, ESTATE OF DAVID L. WHITLEY, ESTATE OF DAVID M. REMLEY, ESTATE OF DAVID W. CLIFFORD, ESTATE OF DENNIS W. HARVISON, ESTATE OF DONALD W. LEWIS, ESTATE OF DONN L. FRYMAN, ESTATE OF EDWARD BOWLIN, ESTATE OF EDWARD J. HINDLE, ESTATE OF GENE E. CHURCHEL, ESTATE OF GEORGE JEROME TOWNSEND, ESTATE OF HENRY T. BUCZEK, ESTATE OF HERBERT D. HULL, ESTATE OF HERBERT SUMMERS, ESTATE OF JAMES M. MANGHAM, ESTATE OF JAMES T. PRUCHA, JR., ESTATE OF JOHN E. PARSONS, ESTATE OF KENNETH C. JAMES, ESTATE OF KURT H. BROWN, ESTATE OF LEON M. JONES, ESTATE OF PAT K. PORTER, ESTATE OF PETER G. JUST, ESTATE OF RICHARD C. FONTAINE, ESTATE OF ROBERT A. MILLER, ESTATE OF ROBERT D. CRAFT, ESTATE OF RONALD A. KOLB, ESTATE OF RONALD S. DAVIS, ESTATE OF STEVEN M. RUBLE, ESTATE OF TOM C. TALTON, ESTATE OF TOMMY V. PATTON, ESTATE OF WILLIAM D. NELSON, ESTATE OF WILLIAM D. RUTLEDGE, ESTATE OF WILLIAM G. GOFF, JR., ESTATE OF WILLIAM P. SWEETAY, WILLIAM W. ETHERINGTON, GEORGE W. ETTER, BENJAMIN R. EULENFELD, ROY R. EVELAND, THOMAS GORDON EVENS, PETER D. EVERILL, KENDALL W. EVERSON, JR, EMMET ROBERT EVERY, JOSEPH M. FAGUNDES, WILLIAM J. FALCONER, PETER J. FALLON, JR, GEORGE G. FARINAS, GARY M. FARNSWORTH, JERRY L. FARQUHAR, DONALD FARRELL, JOSEPH A. FATUZZO, JOHN H. FAUNCE, III, CARL W. FEIERABEND, WILLIAM M. FELDMAN, LARRY W. FENTON, JAMES T. FERGUSON, III, RALPH J. FERNANDEZ, GARY L. FICHTER, JAMES HARDY FIELDS, THOMAS C. FIFE, JAMES O. FINK, STEPHEN C. FINKEN, JOHN W. FINLEY, CHARLES S. FISHER, JAMES TIMOTHY FITZGERALD, ROBERT J. FITZGIBBONS, JOHN J. FITZPATRICK, DAVID E. FLEMING, CLAUDE F. FLETCHER, JAMES FLOCCO, JO
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Leave to File. In accordance with the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave To File Amended Complaint is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiffs shall docket their amended complaint on November 6, 2015. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its motion to dismiss the amended complaint on or before December 7, 2015. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiffs' opposition to the motion to dismiss shall be filed on or before January 15, 2016. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file any reply in support of its motion to dismiss on or before February 5, 2016. If is further ORDERED that the pending motion to dismiss filed while this case was pending in the Northern District of Georgia, ECF No. 13, is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. It is further ORDERED that a status hearing shall be held on May 6, 2016. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 11/6/2015. (lcrbw3)
November 6, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Reggie B. Walton: Status Conference held on 11/6/2015. Motions due by 12/7/2015, Opposition due by 1/15/2016, Replies due by 2/5/2016. Further Status Conference set for 5/6/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (Court Reporter Cathryn Jones) (mpt)
October 21, 2015 Filing 43 REPLY to opposition to motion re #40 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Shelley, Anthony)
October 19, 2015 Filing 42 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Reggie B. Walton held on September 11, 2015; Page Numbers: 1 - 9. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cathryn Jones, Telephone number 202 354-3246, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 11/9/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/17/2016.(Jones, Cathryn)
October 16, 2015 Filing 41 Memorandum in opposition to re #40 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint //Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation's Limited Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Nicole Williams, #2 Exhibit B - Transcript of March 23, 2015 Proceedings, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Snyder, Mark)
September 25, 2015 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - PROPOSED Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Redline Comparison, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit List of Exhibits to Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit A to First Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit B to First Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit C to First Amended Complaint, #8 Exhibit D to First Amended Complaint Part 1, #9 Exhibit D to First Amended Complaint Part 2, #10 Exhibit D to First Amended Complaint Part 3, #11 Exhibit D to First Amended Complaint Part 4, #12 Exhibit D to First Amended Complaint Part 5, #13 Exhibit D to First Amended Complaint Part 6, #14 Exhibit D to First Amended Complaint Part 7, #15 Exhibit E to First Amended Complaint, #16 Exhibit F to First Amended Complaint, #17 Exhibit G to First Amended Complaint, #18 Exhibit H to First Amended Complaint Part 1, #19 Exhibit H to First Amended Complaint Part 2, #20 Exhibit H to First Amended Complaint Part 3, #21 Exhibit I to First Amended Complaint)(Shelley, Anthony)
September 14, 2015 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Paula June Connelly on behalf of PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION (Connelly, Paula)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In accordance with the oral rulings issued by the Court at the hearing held on September 11, 2015, it is ORDERED that this case shall proceed as follows: (1) the plaintiffs shall file their motion to amend the complaint on or before September 25, 2015; (2) the defendant shall file its opposition to the plaintiffs' motion to amend the complaint on or before October 16, 2015; and (3) the plaintiffs shall file their reply in support of the motion to amend the complaint on or before October 21, 2015. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a status conference on November 6, 2015, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 9/11/2015. (lcrbw3)
September 11, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Reggie B. Walton: Status Conference held on 9/11/2015. Motions due by 9/25/2015, Opposition due by 10/16/2015, Reply due by 10/21/2015. Further Status Conference set for 11/6/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (Court Reporter Cathryn Jones) (mpt)
August 25, 2015 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael N. Khalil on behalf of ALL PLAINTIFFS (Khalil, Michael)
August 25, 2015 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Patrick O'Toole on behalf of ALL PLAINTIFFS (O'Toole, Timothy)
August 25, 2015 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony F. Shelley on behalf of ALL PLAINTIFFS (Shelley, Anthony)
August 21, 2015 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 9/11/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (mpt)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear before the Court on September 11, 2015 at 2:00 p.m. for a status hearing. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 8/20/2015. (lcrbw3)
August 20, 2015 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark R. Snyder on behalf of PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION (Snyder, Mark)
August 20, 2015 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph M. Krettek on behalf of PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION (Krettek, Joseph)
August 12, 2015 Filing 33 NOTICE to Counsel/Party re #32 Case Transferred In - District Transfer (jf)
August 12, 2015 Filing 32 Case transferred in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:14-cv-03838. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2015: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jf).
August 11, 2015 Civil Case Terminated. (kdw) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: This matter appears before the Court on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' complaint under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(3). Doc. No. #13 . For the following reasons, Defendant's motion is GRANTED, and the Clerk is DIRECTED to TRANSFER this action to the District Court for the District of Columbia. Signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 8/11/15. (kdw) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
June 5, 2015 Submission of the #30 MOTION to Supplement #14 Response in Opposition to Motion, Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief Regarding Location of Plan's Principal Office on Dec. 2, 2014 to District Judge Steve C Jones. (kdw) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
May 18, 2015 Filing 30 MOTION to Supplement #14 Response in Opposition to Motion, Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief Regarding Location of Plan's Principal Office on Dec. 2, 2014 with Brief In Support by K. Wendell Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - CyQuest Contract, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - HGI Contract, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - cyQuest Dixon Deposition, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - HGI August Monthly Report, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5 Part 1 -March 2010 Actuarial Case Memo, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5 Part 2 - March 2010 Actuarial Case Memo, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Sarasoca FBA, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - total Calls, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 8 Part 1- Service Requests, #11 Exhibit Part 2 - Service Requests, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 9 Part 1 - Redacted Emails, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Redacted Emails, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - CyQuest Invoices, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - PBGC OIG Flawed report, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 12 - May 2009 Plan Asset audit Memo, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 13 - July 2014 PBGC FOIA Response Ltr, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 14 - Privilege Log, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 15 - Vicknair Deposition)(Bevis, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
May 18, 2015 Filing 29 REPLY BRIEF re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint // Supplemental Brief of Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation Regarding the Location of the Principal Office of the Plan on December 2, 2014 filed by Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - C. Vicknair Deposition Transcript, #2 Exhibit 2 - G. Dixon Deposition Transcript, #3 Exhibit 3 - HGI Contract, #4 Exhibit 4 - CyQuest Contract, #5 Exhibit 5 - Excerpts from Vicknair Deposition Exhibit)(Snyder, Mark) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting in part and denying in part the #24 Motion to Immediately Continue Pending Depositions and the #24 Motion to Modify Plaintiff's Third-Party Subpoenas. Signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 5/4/15. (kdw) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
May 4, 2015 Notification of Docket Correction on #27 edited to reflect Notice of Filing. (kdw) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
May 1, 2015 Filing 27 NOTICE OF FILING OF EXHIBIT LIST to Plaintiff's Opposition to the #24 MOTION to Continue //Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation's Motion to Modify Plaintiffs' Third-Party Subpoenas and to Immediately Continue Pending Depositions Exhibits 8-14 to Plaintiffs' Opposition to PBGC's Motion to Modify and Continue Plaintiffs' Subpoenas and Proposed Order filed by K. Wendell Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 8 - April 27, 2015 Email, #2 Exhibit Ex 9 - April 24, 2015 Letter Connelly to Khalil, #3 Exhibit Ex 10 - April 27, 2015 Email re- response to letter, #4 Exhibit Ex 11 - April 27, 2015 Letter Khalil to Connelly, #5 Exhibit Ex 12 - April 28, 2015 Email, #6 Exhibit Ex 13 - April 29, 2015 Email, #7 Exhibit Ex 14 - Objection to Deposition and Subpoena, #8 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bevis, John) Modified on 5/4/2015 to edit event text (kdw). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
May 1, 2015 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Continue //Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation's Motion to Modify Plaintiffs' Third-Party Subpoenas and to Immediately Continue Pending Depositions Plaintiffs' Opposition to PBGC's Motion to Modify and Continue Plaintiffs' Subpoenas filed by K. Wendell Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit Ex 1 - April 15, 2015 Email, #3 Exhibit Ex 2 - April 21, 2015 Email, #4 Exhibit Ex 3 - April 22, 2015 Email Khalil to Snyder, #5 Exhibit Ex 4 - April 22, 1015 Email Connelly to MNK, #6 Exhibit Ex 5 - April 23, 2015 Email re- subpoenas, #7 Exhibit Ex 6 - April 23, 2015 Pl's Rule 45 Subpoena to CyQuest, #8 Exhibit Ex 7 - April 23, 2015 Pl's Rule 45 Subpena to HGI)(Bevis, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
May 1, 2015 Filing 25 NOTICE Of Filing //Supplemental Exhibit to PBGC's Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Modify Plaintiffs' Third-Party Subpoenas by Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation re #24 MOTION to Continue //Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation's Motion to Modify Plaintiffs' Third-Party Subpoenas and to Immediately Continue Pending Depositions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E - Notice of Objection to Subpoena)(Snyder, Mark) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER re #24 MOTION to Continue //Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation's Motion to Modify Plaintiffs' Third-Party Subpoenas and to Immediately Continue Pending Depositions filed by Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation: Plaintiffs are hereby ORDERED to file a response to Defendant's motion by Friday, May 1st at 4:00 p.m. Entered by Judge Steve C Jones on 4/30/2015. (pdw) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
April 28, 2015 Filing 24 MOTION to Modify Plaintiffs' Third-Party Subpoenas and MOTION to Immediately Continue Pending Depositions with Brief In Support by Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Modify Plaintiffs' Third-Party Subpoenas and to Immediately Continue Pending Depositions, #2 Exhibit A - Subpoena to Hammerman & Gainer, Inc., #3 Exhibit B - Subpoena to Cyquest Business Solutions Inc., #4 Exhibit C - Letter from P. Connelly to M. Khalil (April 24, 2015), #5 Exhibit D - Letter from M. Khalil to P. Connelly (April 27, 2015), #6 Text of Proposed Order - Proposed Order Continuing Depositions, #7 Text of Proposed Order - Proposed Order Modifying Subpoenas)(Snyder, Mark) . Added MOTION to Modify on 4/29/2015 (kdw). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER for parties to engage in limited discovery related solely to determining where the principal office of the Delta Pilots Retirement Plan was located on December 2, 2014, the date the complaint was filed. This discovery period shall last until 5:00 PM on May 11,2015. Plaintiffs and Defendant must file a supplemental brief by 5:00 PM on May 18,2015, related solely to where the principal office of the Delta pilots Retirement plan was located on December 2, 2014. The briefs shall be fifteen pages or less, and no response or reply briefs are permitted. Signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 4/9/2015. (anc) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
April 6, 2015 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Support re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint //Supplemental Brief of Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation in Support of its Motion to Dismiss filed by Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. (Snyder, Mark) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
April 6, 2015 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by K. Wendell Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit C - (Answer of the Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation to Plaintiffs' 2nd Amended Complaint))(Bevis, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
March 23, 2015 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C Jones: Motion Hearing held on 3/23/2015. Oral argument heard on defendant PBGC's #13 Motion to dismiss #13 . The matter was taken under advisement, with order to follow. (Court Reporter David Ritchie)(aaq) Modified on 4/3/2015 to correct date of hearing to 3/23/2015(pdw). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER suspending deadlines for mandatory filings until the pending Motion to Dismiss is decided and granting the #18 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 03/19/15. (aaq) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
March 19, 2015 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Extend Deadlines for Mandatory Filings by K. Wendell Lewis, Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bevis, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
March 19, 2015 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by K. Wendell Lewis, Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation by K. Wendell Lewis, Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation.(Bevis, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
March 19, 2015 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicole Williams)(Snyder, Mark) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
March 12, 2015 Submission of the #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint to District Judge Steve C Jones. (aaq) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
March 9, 2015 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2015 at 03:00 PM in ATLA Courtroom 1907 before Judge Steve C Jones. Each side will be alloted 30 minutes for argument and/or presentation of evidence. (pdw) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #15 Plaintiffs' Motion for Oral Argument. Entered by Judge Steve C Jones on 3/9/2015. (pdw) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
March 6, 2015 Filing 15 MOTION for Oral Argument re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, #14 Response in Opposition to Motion, Plaintiffs' Request for Hearing by K. Wendell Lewis. (Barnes, Roy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
March 6, 2015 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion To Dismiss filed by K. Wendell Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Declaration of Thomas R. Seever, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Declaration of William C. Brant)(Barnes, Roy) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
February 20, 2015 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint with Brief In Support by Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint, #2 Exhibit A-Agreement for Appointment of Trustee and Termination of Plan, #3 Exhibit B-Declaration of Jeffrey Donahue, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Snyder, Mark) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mark R. Snyder; and granting #12 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph M. Krettek. Entered by Judge Steve C Jones on 1/29/2015. (pdw) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
January 29, 2015 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #12 APPLICATION for Admission of Joseph M. Krettek Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Joseph Krettek added appearing on behalf of Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation (pb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
January 29, 2015 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #11 APPLICATION for Admission of Mark R. Snyder Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Mark R. Snyder added appearing on behalf of Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation (pb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
January 23, 2015 Filing 12 APPLICATION for Admission of Joseph M. Krettek Pro Hac Vice by Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. (Beranek, Lori) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
January 23, 2015 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Admission of Mark R. Snyder Pro Hac Vice by Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation. (Beranek, Lori) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
January 6, 2015 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed by K. Wendell Lewis. Eric H holder served on 12/22/2014, answer due 2/20/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Holder Certified Mail Green Card Receipt)(Bevis, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
January 6, 2015 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed by K. Wendell Lewis. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Connelly Certified Mail Green Card)(Bevis, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
January 6, 2015 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed by K. Wendell Lewis. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Holder Certified Mail Green Card Receipt)(Bevis, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #4 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael N. Khalil; granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Anthony F. Shelley; and granting #6 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Timothy P. O'Toole. Entered by Judge Steve C Jones on 1/5/2015. (pdw) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
January 2, 2015 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Timothy P. O'Toole Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-5562154). Attorney Timothy P. O'Toole added appearing on behalf of K. Wendell Lewis (pb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
January 2, 2015 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Anthony F. Shelley Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-5562135). Attorney Anthony F. Shelley added appearing on behalf of K. Wendell Lewis (pb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
January 2, 2015 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #4 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael N. Khalil Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-5562109). Attorney Michael N. Khalil added appearing on behalf of K. Wendell Lewis. (pb) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
December 19, 2014 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint , as to Sally Quillian Yates, U.S. Attorney for the NDGA., Return of Service Executed by K. Wendell Lewis. All Defendants. (Bevis, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
December 18, 2014 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Admission of Timothy P. O'Toole Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-5562154)by K. Wendell Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Bar Admissions)(Bevis, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
December 18, 2014 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Anthony F. Shelley Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-5562135)by K. Wendell Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Bar Admissions)(Bevis, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
December 18, 2014 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Admission of Michael N. Khalil Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-5562109)by K. Wendell Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Bar Admissions)(Bevis, John) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
December 15, 2014 Filing 3 COURT'S NOTICE Of Filing INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES. (pdw) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
December 2, 2014 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation, Eric Holder and Sally Yates. (Attachments: #1 Eric Holder, #2 Sally Yates)(eop) [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]
December 2, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by ALL Plaintiffs. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-5528584.) (Attachments: #1 Appendix List, #2 Ex. A - 2006.05.24 Docket, #3 Ex. B - BDL Letter, #4 Ex. C - List of Plaintiffs, #5 Ex. D - 1 - Pilot Working Agreement, #6 Ex. D - 2 - Pilot Working Agreement, #7 Ex. D - 3 - Pilot Working Agreement, #8 Ex. D - 5 - Pilot Working Agreement, #9 Ex. D-5 - Pilot Working Agreement)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/12/2014: #10 Ex. D - 6 - Pilot Working Agreement, #11 Ex. D - 7 - Pilot Working Agreement, #12 Ex. D - 8 - Pilot Working Agreement, #13 Ex. D - 9 - Pilot Working Agreement, #14 Ex. D - 10 - Pilot Working Agreement, #15 Ex. D - 11 - Pilot Working Agreement, #16 Ex. D - 12 - Pilot Working Agreement, #17 Ex. D - 13 - Pilot Working Agreement, #18 Ex. E - Actuarial Case Memo, #19 Ex. F - Letters - Good Cause, #20 Ex. G - Administrative Appeal, #21 Ex. H - 1 - Appeal Decision, #22 Ex. H - 2 -Appeal Decision, #23 Ex. H - 3 - Appeal - Attachment List, #24 Ex. H - 4 - Enclosures, #25 Ex. H - 5 - Enclosures, #26 Ex. H - 6 - Enclosures, #27 Ex. 7 - Enclosures, #28 Ex. I - Memo, #29 Civil Cover Sheet) (eop). [Transferred from Georgia Northern on 8/19/2015.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEWIS et al v. PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROGER JOSEPH WILLIS
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELY CHEN
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE J. BARR
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES A. CARLON
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE L. GIBSON, JR.
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH M. HAYES
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LESTER M. BYRD
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF KENNETH C. JAMES
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS HENRY MORRIS
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID E. HANSEN
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS W. SCHEPMAN
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE V. MCNEILL
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN B. MORGAN, JR.
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM C. BUERGEY
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALAN H. YOUNG
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT C. RUDY
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM C. HINES
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER F. WAGNER
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLINTON BERNARD JOHNSON
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES ROY WELLS
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD E. GLANTZ
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH M. PARR
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PERRY E. WILLIAMS
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD M. SNIFFIN
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN C. ANDERSON
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLEN H. SMITH
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL J. HICHAK
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD L. HOBERT
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL J. PRICE
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN J. EATON
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN J. WHITE
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL H. COURTNEY
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT E. ADAM
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES P. STARKEY
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRYGGVE F. LARSEN
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYAN R. CLARK
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DWIGHT R. WAIT
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRY G. CARRINGTON
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT G. DECKER
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES A. DIXON
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES M. PINKSTON
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD X. KAUFFMANN, JR.
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM A. PANKEY, III
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BERRYMAN EDWARDS WOODRUFF, III
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID M. SMITH
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILLIP J. KELLEY
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM W. ETHERINGTON
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WALTER T. MORGAN, JR.
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM M. FELDMAN
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN V. HOPKINS
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS N. SOODSMA
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD C. CHABOT
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT A. GOODMAN
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVE A. MILLER
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS L. AMABILE
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAL W. TAX
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS W. GROVE
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DWIGHT E. GRANDIA
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER S. BLACK
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF DONN L. FRYMAN
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH C. POE
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEIL A. ROBERTSON
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERALD A. KNAPP
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES J. HOURIN
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRESTON D. HALL
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK M. BOTTOMS, SR.
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARL D. LANGAS
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY K. REAGOR
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLAUDE B. EISON, III
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT T. ALLEN
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES B. JOHNSON
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID W. SKJERVEN
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK H. MATHERNE
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLAUDIA A. BLAZ
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL B. MCMAHON
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERALD M. FOGARTY
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT W. BRUSHWYLER
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM T. SONNENBERG
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID S. PLEWES
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS E. GRYNKEWICH
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK B. MACOMBER
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD NELSON CAYLOR
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATHAN L. MASON
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEWIS H. DICKSON
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN LEE SACHS
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM WALTER WILLIAMS
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERNEST W. HIGGINS
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES CARROLL BRASHER
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIM B. KILGORE
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THEODORE F. LANGWORTHY
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PETER J. WILLETTS
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD I. FONDE
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN D. BERMAN
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF WILLIAM G. GOFF, JR.
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY A. MOORE
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT M. BURNS
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT F. KLAUER
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID J. CANN
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAURICE CLOUTIER
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN R. WITTMEYER
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES T. TULLY, SR.
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK VIRTUE
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD N. HOLMES
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARION D. HINDMAN
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ONEAL L. SISSON
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN W. FLOYD
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID M. DAVIS
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALFRED W. LEISTIKOW
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROGER R. SUNDBERG
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES T. QUARLES
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES W. DYE
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN D. MORAN
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS B. GOODMAN
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE JETTON
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS J. JACOBUS
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WARREN S. STOVALL
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS W. SHEEHY
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT R. RIOUX
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID T. MASON
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAROLD B. WALLACE
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT E. MITCHELL
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS P. ROAN
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL N. SHORT
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN L. SMITH
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES R. BUMGARNER
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF RONALD A. KOLB
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL W. SENIOR
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERALD G. SIMPSON
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARRY F. RUE
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS A. DEGUIRE
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMUEL J. MURRAY
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENJAMIN B. BARRETT
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REUBEN BLACK
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE M. KOCISKO
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL W. BROWN
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS A. BRENNISON
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSE V. KUKIER
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD R. SHIPLEY
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD LEE HIBBARD
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOEL R. HEDLUND
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN K. PELL
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD R. SCREWS
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROGER MARTIN
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS J. GILMER
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOUIS P. ANICH
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY R. PAPANDREA
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES S. COLBY
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT H. LEE
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL D. WARD
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW J. ANDERSON
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF WILLIAM D. NELSON
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES P. DRAFFIN
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LONNIE RAY WILLIAMS
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY WAYNE RITTER
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN USKOVICH
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THEODORE A. TWEET
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY N. HORNFECK
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BERTRAM L. HAMBLETON
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES V. CAGLE
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE L. SUTTLER
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN A. STAUTER, JR.
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS M. EBERHARDT
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT C. SHEPHERD
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLAIM B. HOUSEMAN
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES A. INGHAM
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS A. JOHNSON
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUCE A. WILLIAMSON
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT J. MACKEY
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN D. HALL
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT AUSTIN STOTHART
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES HARDY FIELDS
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARL R. SCIURBA
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS J. SHIELDS
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES H. MCCANN
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD A. SHUTACK
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT O. WEAVER, JR.
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FARRIS FRANKLIN YATES
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF LEON M. JONES
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT J. MORRISON
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHNNY HARREL HINES
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL A. WERNER
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM G. ROBERTSON
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE P. TERWILLIGER
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES DAVID CERASO
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM S. HEIDT
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES AVERETT
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES L. LUCAS
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY CHARLES MORGAN
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES R. JONES
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN H. HONSINGER
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACK S. KELLY
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD R. MONTOYA
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GUSTAV S. HERTZ
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN T. FORD, JR.
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES P. DAWSON
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL E. KOERNER, JR.
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FREDERICK G. SWAIN
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAY BRAXTON PEARCE
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL J. BOBER
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE L. PERRY
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES PATTON NIVEN
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACK W. SHINN
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS D. KINDER
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAYNE B. LARUE, JR.
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT J. ONEAL
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KERIN LOUIS SHAUGHNESSEY, III
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF ANDREW P. BROWN
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN S. PERRY, JR.
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDMUND R. JONES
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM R. BUNTIN
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL R. KELLY
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD L. KORTHALS
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES A. CROOKSTON
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAYMOND D. COMPTON
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILIP J. HARDY
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE L. BILES, JR.
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE L. PETRITZ
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES LEE ARMSTRONG
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN T. ARGO, JR.
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEAN H. BERK
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERRY L. TATE
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILIP M. NARDECCHIA
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID N. LUCAS
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS E. GANTT, JR.
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN A. ZIMMERMAN
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD C. HARRIS
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN H. FOOTE
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMUEL THOMAS PEACE, III
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL A. KOPACK
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN C. HARRISON
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTIAN M. CLAUSEN
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF JAMES T. PRUCHA, JR.
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELMER E. HINKLE, JR.
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WALTER R. CURRY
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD T. ZIMMER
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS S. MARTIN
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARRYL L. STOCKTON
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOBART M. HARMON
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILIP TEAL
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRED J. DAMBRIE
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODNEY S. HINDS
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAYNE E. WARE
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOUGLAS MORGAN PADGETT
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW J. THOMPSON, III
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDRE E. LOVAS
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES F. ARNOLD, II
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCIS P. ERCKMANN
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN T. GRICE
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CURTIS R. NORRED
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARRY C. BOUSTEAD
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEWART W. THOMPSON
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH C. ELLIS
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES W. ORTMAN
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILIP A. MESSIER
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES L. WHITE
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARRY P. YUNES
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL J. WELLS
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARTHUR L. CAMPBELL
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS G. THOMPSON
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL H. BARRETT, JR.
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD C. CRONIN
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM E. BOYLE
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE ROBERT RICKLEY
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGG H. AVERETT
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF SCOTT R. JONES
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID R. SKOOG
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES W. REESE
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD R. HAYES
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT J. CASTER
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAROLD W. COUSAR
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERRY K. REED
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN PAUL CERAK
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHAD N. KOPPIE
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FREDERICK B. PAYNE
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FREDERICK B. HARRIS
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROGERS PATTON WARREN
Represented By: Anthony F. Shelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM M. HART
Represented By: