KING v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Plaintiff: RICHARD ALAN KING
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Case Number: 1:2015cv01445
Filed: September 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Randolph D. Moss
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, Dkt. 68 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/23/2018. (lcrdm2, )
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants' motion for summary judgment 26 is hereby GRANTED in part and DENIED in part without prejudice. See opinion for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/28/2017. (lcrdm2, )
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time 41 and his motion to modify the Court's Minute Order of January 26, 2017, and for judicial notice 43 are hereby DENIED. See attached document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/7/2017. (lcrdm2, ) Modified on 3/8/2017 (kt).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KING v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD ALAN KING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Jodi George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?