HISPANIC AFFAIRS PROJECT , et al v. PEREZ, et al
Plaintiff: HISPANIC AFFAIRS PROJECT, RODOLFO LLACUA and JOHN DOE
Defendant: THOMAS E. PEREZ, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, PORTIA WU, JEH JOHNSON, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY and WESTERN RANGE ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 1:2015cv01562
Filed: September 22, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Beryl A. Howell
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the government's 100 Motion to Strike; the plaintiffs' 93 Motion for Summary Judgment; the government's 101 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; and the defendant-intervenors' 99 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 7, 2017. (lcbah1)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the plaintiffs' 84 Motion for Clarification or Reconsideration of Order on Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 23, 2016. (lcbah1)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the Federal Defendants' 64 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and (6); the Association Defendants' 63 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and (6), Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f), Motions to Sever and Transfer Venue, and Motion to Reconsider Order on Motion to Proceed Under a Pseudonym; and the plaintiffs' 77 Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 9, 2016. (lcbah1)
October 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the plaintiffs' 1 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 31, 2015. (lcbah1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HISPANIC AFFAIRS PROJECT , et al v. PEREZ, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HISPANIC AFFAIRS PROJECT
Represented By: Nina E. DiSalvo(Designation Pro Bono)
Represented By: Alexander Hood(Designation Pro Bono)
Represented By: Dermot Lynch(Designation Pro Bono)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RODOLFO LLACUA
Represented By: Nina E. DiSalvo(Designation Pro Bono)
Represented By: Alexander Hood(Designation Pro Bono)
Represented By: Dermot Lynch(Designation Pro Bono)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE
Represented By: Nina E. DiSalvo(Designation Pro Bono)
Represented By: Alexander Hood(Designation Pro Bono)
Represented By: Dermot Lynch(Designation Pro Bono)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS E. PEREZ
Represented By: Glenn M. Girdharry
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Represented By: Glenn M. Girdharry
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PORTIA WU
Represented By: Glenn M. Girdharry
Represented By: Erez Reuveni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEH JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTERN RANGE ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?