LEE v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Plaintiff: JUANISHA LEE
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Case Number: 1:2015cv01802
Filed: October 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Amit P. Mehta
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OPINION re: Plaintiff's 29 Second Motion for Attorneys' Fees. Please see the attached Memorandum Opinion for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/06/2018. (lcapm1)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OPINION re: Plaintiff's 22 Motion for Attorney Fees. Please see the attached Memorandum Opinion for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/12/2018. (lcapm1)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OPINION re: 11 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and 13 Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/03/2017. (lcapm3)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEE v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUANISHA LEE
Represented By: Carolyn W. Houck
Represented By: Steve Nabors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?