FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION et al v. STAPLES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION and DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Defendant: OFFICE DEPOT, INC. and STAPLES, INC.
Petitioner: DETROIT REGIONAL CHAMBER, RENT-A-CENTER, INC., GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY, MCDONALD'S USA, LLC, WINDFALL. INC., JOHN DOE II CORPORATION, KINDRED HEALTHCARE, AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORPORATION, BEST BUY CO., INC., CORPORATE UNITED, INC., ESSENDANT, INC., HITOUCH BUSINESS SERVICES LLC, EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY, GEORGIA-PACIFIC, LLC and SAVANNAH RIVER NUCLEAR SOLUTIONS, LLC
Interested Party: JOHN DOE, LOWE'S COMPANIES, INC., NEW YORK PRESBYTERIAN HEALTH CARE SYSTEM, ECOLAB INC, CANON U.S.A., INC., AMERICAN AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION (INC.), AMAZON.COM, INC., AMERICAN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY, INC., FIFTH THIRD BANK and BOSTON CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL
Undetermined: GUY BROWN
Intervenor: JOHN DOE CORPORATION III
Case Number: 1:2015cv02115
Filed: December 7, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Emmet G Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:0053
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2017 Filing 512 STIPULATION of Dismissal by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Loughlin, Charles)
April 11, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties To Show Cause Why This Case Should Not Be Dismissed With Prejudice due by 4/17/2017. (mac)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties are directed to show cause why this case should not be dismissed with prejudice by no later than April 17, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/10/2017. (lcegs4)
March 1, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion For Reconsideration due by 4/1/2017. (mac)
February 28, 2017 Filing 511 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/28/2017. (lcegs4)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 510 ORDER denying #456 motion for attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/28/2017. (lcegs4)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of the Court's #454 , #455 memorandum opinion and #453 order, the FTC's #462 sealed motion for reconsideration of the Court's decision regarding admission of testimony is denied as moot, subject to a motion for reconsideration, by any party, for good cause shown by no later than April 1, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 2/28/2017. (lcegs4)
June 30, 2016 Filing 509 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to STAPLES, INC.. Attorney Ronald F. Wick terminated. (Wick, Ronald)
June 30, 2016 Filing 508 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad E. Kurtz on behalf of STAPLES, INC. (Kurtz, Chad)
June 27, 2016 Filing 507 SURREPLY to re #456 Joint MOTION for Attorney Fees and MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC.. (jf)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #506 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 27, 2016. (lcegs4)
June 23, 2016 Filing 506 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Surreply, #2 Defendants' Surreply in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs, #3 Certificate of Service)(Perry, Jeffrey)
June 23, 2016 Filing 505 SEALED DOCUMENT re #487 Transcript. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj)
June 23, 2016 Filing 504 SEALED DOCUMENT re #492 Transcript. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj)
June 23, 2016 Filing 503 SEALED DOCUMENT re #490 Transcript. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj)
June 23, 2016 Filing 502 SEALED DOCUMENT re #488 Transcript. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj)
June 23, 2016 Filing 501 SEALED DOCUMENT re #476 Transcript. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj)
June 23, 2016 Filing 500 SEALED DOCUMENT re #474 Transcript. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj)
June 23, 2016 Filing 499 SEALED DOCUMENT re #491 Transcript. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj)
June 23, 2016 Filing 498 SEALED DOCUMENT re #489 Transcript. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj)
June 23, 2016 Filing 497 SEALED DOCUMENT re #486 Transcript. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj)
June 23, 2016 Filing 496 SEALED DOCUMENT re #485 Transcript. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj)
June 23, 2016 Filing 495 SEALED DOCUMENT re #483 Transcript. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj)
June 23, 2016 Filing 494 SEALED DOCUMENT re #477 Transcript. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj)
June 23, 2016 Filing 493 SEALED DOCUMENT re #475 Transcript. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj)
June 21, 2016 Filing 492 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan held on 4-19-16; Page Numbers: (3547-3787). Date of Issuance:4-19-16. Court Reporter/Transcriber Scott Wallace, Telephone number 202-354-3196, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 7/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2016.(Wallace, Scott)
June 21, 2016 Filing 491 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan held on April 5, 2016; Page Numbers: 2977-3064. Date of Issuance:April 6, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 7/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2016.(Dickman, Janice)
June 21, 2016 Filing 490 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan held on 4-5-16; Page Numbers: (2883-2975). Date of Issuance:4-6-16. Court Reporter/Transcriber Scott Wallace, Telephone number 202-354-3196, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 7/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2016.(Wallace, Scott)
June 21, 2016 Filing 489 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan held on April 4, 2016; Page Numbers: 2730-2855. Date of Issuance:April 5, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 7/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2016.(Dickman, Janice)
June 21, 2016 Filing 488 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan held on 4-4-16; Page Numbers: (2561-2725). Date of Issuance:4-5-16. Court Reporter/Transcriber Scott Wallace, Telephone number 202-354-3196, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 7/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2016.(Wallace, Scott)
June 21, 2016 Filing 487 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan held on 4-1-16; Page Numbers: (2210-2390). Date of Issuance:4-4-16. Court Reporter/Transcriber Scott Wallace, Telephone number 202-354-3196, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 7/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2016.(Wallace, Scott)
June 21, 2016 Filing 486 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan held on April 1, 2016; Page Numbers: 2391-2531. Date of Issuance:April 2, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 7/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2016.(Dickman, Janice)
June 21, 2016 Filing 485 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan held on March 31, 2016; Page Numbers: 1975-2209. Date of Issuance:April 1, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 7/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2016.(Dickman, Janice)
June 21, 2016 Filing 484 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan held on 3-31-16; Page Numbers: (1873-1974). Date of Issuance:4-1-16. Court Reporter/Transcriber Scott Wallace, Telephone number 202-354-3196, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 7/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2016.(Wallace, Scott)
June 21, 2016 Filing 483 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan held on March 30, 2016; Page Numbers: 1652-1840. Date of Issuance:March 31, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 7/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2016.(Dickman, Janice)
June 21, 2016 Filing 482 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan held on 3-30-16; Page Numbers: (1556-1651). Date of Issuance:4-1-16. Court Reporter/Transcriber Scott Wallace, Telephone number 202-354-3196, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 7/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2016.(Wallace, Scott)
June 21, 2016 Filing 481 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan held on March 29, 2016; Page Numbers: 1356-1555. Date of Issuance:March 30, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 7/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2016.(Dickman, Janice)
June 21, 2016 Filing 480 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan held on 3-29-16; Page Numbers: (1170-1354). Date of Issuance:3-30-16. Court Reporter/Transcriber Scott Wallace, Telephone number 202-354-3196, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 7/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2016.(Wallace, Scott)
June 21, 2016 Filing 479 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan Page Numbers: 1058-1169. Date of Issuance:March 25, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 7/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2016.(Dickman, Janice)
June 21, 2016 Filing 478 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan held on 3-24-16; Page Numbers: (888-1057). Date of Issuance:3-25-16. Court Reporter/Transcriber Scott Wallace, Telephone number 202-354-3196, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 7/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2016.(Wallace, Scott)
June 21, 2016 Filing 477 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS (REDACTED - Not Sealed) before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan held on March 23, 2016; Page Numbers: 796-873. Date of Issuance:March 24, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 7/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2016.(Dickman, Janice) Modified on 11/29/2016 (znmw).
June 21, 2016 Filing 476 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan held on 3-23-16; Page Numbers: (626-784). Date of Issuance:3-24-16. Court Reporter/Transcriber Scott Wallace, Telephone number 202-354-3196, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 7/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2016.(Wallace, Scott)
June 21, 2016 Filing 475 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan held on March 22, 2016; Page Numbers: 450-601. Date of Issuance: March 23, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 7/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2016.(Dickman, Janice)
June 21, 2016 Filing 474 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan held on 3-22-16; Page Numbers: (270-447). Date of Issuance:3-23-16. Court Reporter/Transcriber Scott Wallace, Telephone number 202-354-3196, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 7/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2016.(Wallace, Scott)
June 21, 2016 Filing 473 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan held on March 21, 2016; Page Numbers: 137-269. Date of Issuance:March 22, 2016. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 7/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2016.(Dickman, Janice)
June 21, 2016 Filing 472 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan held on 3-21-16; Page Numbers: (1-136). Date of Issuance:3-22-16. Court Reporter/Transcriber Scott Wallace, Telephone number 202-354-3196, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 7/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2016.(Wallace, Scott)
June 20, 2016 Filing 471 REPLY to opposition to motion re #456 Joint MOTION for Attorney Fees and MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Marden, Norman)
June 10, 2016 Filing 470 RESPONSE re #456 Joint MOTION for Attorney Fees and MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Lacy, Andrew)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER vacating the June 6, 2016 Minute Order finding #398 and #399 as moot. Motions #398 and #399 are hereby GRANTED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 8, 2016. (lcegs4)
June 6, 2016 Filing 469 SEALED Exhibits filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (See Docket Entry #447 to view document)(zjf)
June 6, 2016 Filing 468 SEALED Exhibits re #442 Response to motion filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf)
June 6, 2016 Filing 467 SEALED Exhibits re #440 Reply to opposition to Motion filed by STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf)
June 6, 2016 Filing 466 SEALED Response to John Doe Corporation III's Motion for Protective Order filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC.. re #399 SEALED MOTION filed by John Doe Corporation III filed by JOHN DOE CORPORATION III, Order,,. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf)
June 6, 2016 Filing 465 SEALED Letter to Judge Sullivan filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf)
June 6, 2016 Filing 464 SEALED Attachments filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (See Docket Entry #414 thru #420 to view document)(zjf) .
June 6, 2016 Filing 463 SEALED Exhibit A to the Declaration of Carrie C. Mahan filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf)
June 6, 2016 Filing 462 SEALED MOTION filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf)
June 6, 2016 Filing 461 SEALED SURREPLY filed by AMAZON.COM, INC. re #302 MOTION for Order to Unseal with Limited Exception the March 23, 2016 Unofficial Transcript of the Examination of Prentis Wilson (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf)
June 6, 2016 Filing 460 SEALED OPPOSITION filed by AMAZON.COM, INC. re #302 MOTION for Order to Unseal with Limited Exception the March 23, 2016 Unofficial Transcript of the Examination of Prentis Wilson (zjf)
June 6, 2016 Filing 459 SEALED OPPOSITION filed by STAPLES, INC. re #276 SEALED MOTION filed by AMAZON.COM, INC. (zjf)
June 6, 2016 Filing 458 NOTICE of filing of Sealed Attachments by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (See Docket Entry #281 to view documents (zjf)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER finding as moot #400 Motion for Protective Order; finding as moot #401 Motion to Intervene; granting #406 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting #414 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting #436 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting #437 Motion to Withdraw ; granting #439 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting #441 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting #443 Sealed Motion; granting #447 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 6, 2016. (lcegs4)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #351 Sealed Motion; granting #351 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; finding as moot #360 Sealed Motion; finding as moot #378 Sealed Motion; finding as moot #395 Motion to Intervene; finding as moot #398 Sealed Motion; finding as moot #399 Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 6, 2016. (lcegs4) .....VACATED AS TO #398 and #399 PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 6/8/2016.....Modified on 6/9/2016 (znmw).
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #283 Sealed Motion; granting in part and denying in part #302 Motion for Order; granting #303 Motion to Unseal Document ; granting in part and denying in part #306 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting #310 Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 6, 2016. (lcegs4)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #281 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 6, 2016. (lcegs4)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #177 Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on June 6, 2016. (lcegs4)
May 24, 2016 Filing 457 MEMORANDUM re #456 Joint MOTION for Attorney Fees and MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Marden, Norman)
May 24, 2016 Filing 456 Joint MOTION for Attorney Fees and, MOTION for Bill of Costs by COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B District of Columbia, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Marden, Norman)
May 17, 2016 Filing 455 REDACTED MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on May 17, 2016. (lcegs4)
May 10, 2016 Filing 454 MEMORANDUM OPINION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 05/10/2016.(zmac)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on May 10, 2016. (lcegs4)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Due to the high volume of calls received by chambers, the parties are hereby advised that the Court's ruling on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction will not be issued prior to 4:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on May 10, 2016. (lcegs4)
April 25, 2016 Filing 452 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT by STAPLES, INC. (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Staples' Closing PowerPoint Presentation, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
April 25, 2016 Filing 451 REDACTED DOCUMENT- FTC Closing Presentation by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Colwell, Peter)
April 22, 2016 Filing 450 REPLY to opposition to motion re #400 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order filed by EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY. (Neeley, Steven)
April 22, 2016 Filing 449 REPLY to opposition to motion re #395 MOTION to Intervene and Motion for Protective Order filed by AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bernasconi, Andrew)
April 22, 2016 Filing 448 SEALED REPLY TO OPPOSITION filed by JOHN DOE CORPORATION III re #399 SEALED MOTION filed by John Doe Corporation III (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kavanagh, John)
April 20, 2016 Filing 447 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Sealed Exhibit Set 1, #4 Sealed Exhibit Set 2, #5 Sealed Exhibit Set 3, #6 Sealed Exhibit Set 4, #7 Sealed Exhibit Set 5, #8 Sealed Exhibit Set 6, #9 Sealed Exhibit Set 7)(Reinhart, Tara)
April 20, 2016 Filing 446 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT (Corrected) by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit Set 19, #3 Exhibit Set 20, #4 Exhibit Set 21, #5 Exhibit Set 22, #6 Exhibit Set 23, #7 Exhibit Set 24, #8 Exhibit Set 25, #9 Exhibit Set 26, #10 Exhibit Set 27, #11 Exhibit Set 28, #12 Exhibit Set 29, #13 Exhibit Set 30, #14 Exhibit Set 31, #15 Exhibit Set 32, #16 Exhibit Set 33, #17 Exhibit Set 34, #18 Exhibit Set 35, #19 Exhibit Set 36)(Reinhart, Tara)
April 20, 2016 Filing 445 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT (Corrected) by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit Set 1, #3 Exhibit Set 2, #4 Exhibit Set 3, #5 Exhibit Set 4, #6 Exhibit Set 5, #7 Exhibit Set 6, #8 Exhibit Set 7, #9 Exhibit Set 8, #10 Exhibit Set 9, #11 Exhibit Set 10, #12 Exhibit Set 11, #13 Exhibit Set 12, #14 Exhibit Set 13, #15 Exhibit Set 14, #16 Exhibit Set 15, #17 Exhibit Set 16, #18 Exhibit Set 17, #19 Exhibit Set 18)(Reinhart, Tara)
April 20, 2016 Filing 444 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Public Version of Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #2 Certificate of Service)(Reinhart, Tara)
April 20, 2016 Filing 443 SEALED MOTION filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
April 20, 2016 Filing 442 RESPONSE re #400 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
April 20, 2016 Filing 441 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
April 20, 2016 Filing 440 REPLY to opposition to motion re #395 MOTION to Intervene filed by STAPLES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carrie C. Mahan, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
April 20, 2016 Filing 439 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Defendants' Response to John Doe Corporation III's Motion for Protective Order, #3 Declaration of Carrie C. Mahan, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
April 20, 2016 Filing 438 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Public Version of Defendants' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
April 20, 2016 Filing 437 Emergency MOTION to Withdraw AND REFILE DOCKET ENTRIES 407-413 by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Reinhart, Tara)
April 20, 2016 Filing 436 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Letter to Judge Sullivan, #3 Certificate of Service)(Reinhart, Tara)
April 20, 2016 Filing 435 LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Public Exhibits to Defendants' Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Defendants' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by STAPLES, INC. #199 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC., #380 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Sullivan, Diane)
April 20, 2016 Filing 434 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sullivan, Diane)
April 20, 2016 Filing 433 NOTICE of Filing Public Documents by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit)(Sullivan, Diane)
April 19, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan: Preliminary Injunction Hearing Resumed and Held on 4/19/2016. Parties Presented Closing and Rebuttal Arguments. (Court Reporter SCOTT WALLACE.) (mac)
April 19, 2016 Filing 432 LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Public Exhibits to Defendants' Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Defendants' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by STAPLES, INC. #199 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC., #380 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit, #51 Exhibit, #52 Exhibit, #53 Exhibit, #54 Exhibit, #55 Exhibit, #56 Exhibit, #57 Exhibit, #58 Exhibit, #59 Exhibit, #60 Exhibit, #61 Exhibit, #62 Exhibit, #63 Exhibit, #64 Exhibit, #65 Exhibit)(Sullivan, Diane)
April 19, 2016 Filing 431 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Sullivan, Diane)
April 19, 2016 Filing 430 LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Public Exhibits to Defendants' Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Defendants' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by STAPLES, INC. #199 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC., #380 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Errata, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Errata, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit, #51 Exhibit, #52 Exhibit, #53 Errata, #54 Exhibit, #55 Exhibit, #56 Exhibit, #57 Exhibit, #58 Exhibit, #59 Exhibit, #60 Exhibit, #61 Exhibit, #62 Exhibit, #63 Exhibit, #64 Exhibit, #65 Exhibit, #66 Exhibit)(Sullivan, Diane)
April 19, 2016 Filing 429 LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Public Exhibits to Defendants' Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Defendants' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by STAPLES, INC. #199 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC., #380 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit, #51 Exhibit, #52 Exhibit, #53 Exhibit, #54 Exhibit, #55 Exhibit, #56 Exhibit, #57 Exhibit, #58 Exhibit, #59 Exhibit, #60 Exhibit)(Sullivan, Diane)
April 19, 2016 Filing 428 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit)(Sullivan, Diane)
April 19, 2016 Filing 427 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit)(Sullivan, Diane)
April 19, 2016 Filing 426 LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Public Exhibits to Defendants' Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Defendants' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by STAPLES, INC. #199 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC., #380 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit)(Sullivan, Diane)
April 19, 2016 Filing 425 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit)(Sullivan, Diane)
April 19, 2016 Filing 424 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit)(Sullivan, Diane)
April 19, 2016 Filing 423 LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Public Exhibits to Defendants' Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Defendants' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by STAPLES, INC. #199 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC., #380 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit, #51 Exhibit, #52 Exhibit, #53 Exhibit, #54 Exhibit, #55 Exhibit)(Sullivan, Diane)
April 19, 2016 Filing 422 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit)(Sullivan, Diane)
April 19, 2016 Filing 421 LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) Public Exhibits to Defendants' Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Defendants' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by STAPLES, INC. #199 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC., #380 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit)(Sullivan, Diane)
April 19, 2016 Filing 420 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION re #414 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 PX07001-PX07006, #2 PX07008-PX07043, #3 PX07044, #4 PX07047-PX07055, #5 PX07066-PX07067, #6 PX07071, #7 PX07078-PX07222, #8 PX07302-PX07576, #9 PX09001)(Reinhart, Tara)
April 19, 2016 Filing 419 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION re #414 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 PX05421 (1 of 2), #2 PX05421 (2 of 2), #3 PX05424-PX05514, #4 PX05518-PX05586, #5 PX06001-PX06400, #6 PX06500)(Reinhart, Tara)
April 19, 2016 Filing 418 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION re #414 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 PX05222-PX05225, #2 PX05229 (1 of 5), #3 PX05229 (2 of 5), #4 PX05229 (3 of 5), #5 PX05229 (4 of 5), #6 PX05229 (5 of 5), #7 PX05231-PX05320, #8 PX05321-PX05393, #9 PX05419)(Reinhart, Tara)
April 19, 2016 Filing 417 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION re #414 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 PX04483-PX04484, #2 PX04485-PX04501, #3 PX04548-PX04607, #4 PX04625, #5 PX04629-PX04641, #6 PX04668-PX04714, #7 PX04763 (1 of 3), #8 PX04763 (2 of 3), #9 PX04763 (3 of 3), #10 PX05016-PX05221)(Reinhart, Tara)
April 19, 2016 Filing 416 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION re #414 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 PX04011-PX04062, #2 PX04064-PX04177, #3 PX04187-PX04280, #4 PX04294-PX04376, #5 PX04377-PX04412, #6 PX04416-PX04422, #7 PX04425-PX04466, #8 PX04468-PX04469, #9 PX04470-PX04475, #10 PX04478-PX04482)(Reinhart, Tara)
April 19, 2016 Filing 415 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 PX02001-PX02131, #2 PX02134-PX02171)(Reinhart, Tara)
April 19, 2016 Filing 414 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 DX00033-DX5285, #4 PX03000-PX03014, #5 PX03018-PX03029, #6 PX03030-PX03040, #7 PX03041-PX03075, #8 PX03079-PX03093)(Reinhart, Tara)
April 19, 2016 Filing 413 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED ON 06/06/2016.....NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 PX02116-PX02119, #3 PX02120-PX02126, #4 PX02130-PX02147, #5 PX02157-PX02170)(Reinhart, Tara) Modified on 6/14/2016 (zjf).
April 19, 2016 Filing 412 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED ON 06/06/2016.....NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 PX07000-PX07022, #3 PX07028-PX07047, #4 PX07055-PX07067, #5 PX07071-PX07518, #6 PX07572-PX07576, #7 PX08051-PX08176, #8 PX09001)(Reinhart, Tara) Modified on 6/14/2016 (zjf).
April 19, 2016 Filing 411 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 PX05284-PX05427, #3 PX05428, #4 PX05432-PX05536, #5 PX06008, #6 PX06100 (1 of 2), #7 PX06100 (2 of 2), #8 PX06200-PX06400, #9 PX06500)(Reinhart, Tara)
April 19, 2016 Filing 410 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED ON 06/06/2016.....NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 PX04280-PX04302, #3 PX04304-PX04401, #4 PX04414-PX04463, #5 PX04468, #6 PX04473-PX04635, #7 PX05013-PX05039, #8 PX05042, #9 PX05046-PX05155, #10 PX05156, #11 PX05158-PX05283)(Reinhart, Tara) Modified on 6/14/2016 (zjf).
April 19, 2016 Filing 409 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED ON 06/06/2016.....NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 PX03000-PX03023, #3 PX03024-PX03058, #4 PX03059-PX03084, #5 PX04028-PX04094, #6 PX04096-PX04266)(Reinhart, Tara) Modified on 6/14/2016 (zjf).
April 19, 2016 Filing 408 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED ON 06/06/2016.....NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 PX02110-PX02115, #3 PX02129 (1 of 2), #4 PX02129 (2 of 2), #5 PX02148-PX02155)(Reinhart, Tara) Modified on 6/14/2016 (zjf).
April 19, 2016 Filing 407 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED ON 06/06/2016.....NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 DX00033-DX5285, #3 PX0001-PX0009, #4 PX02001-PX02007, #5 PX02008-PX02009, #6 PX02010 (1 of 3), #7 PX02010 (2 of 3), #8 PX02010 (3 of 3), #9 PX02011, #10 PX02100, #11 PX02101-PX02109)(Reinhart, Tara) Modified on 6/14/2016 (zjf).
April 19, 2016 Filing 406 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Carrie C. Mahan, #3 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
April 19, 2016 Filing 405 AFFIDAVIT in Response to Court's April 18, 2016 Minute Order by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
April 19, 2016 Filing 404 AFFIDAVIT re Order, by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Xenakis, Stelios S.)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER directing the parties to file a declaration no later than 9:00 a.m. Tuesday, April 19, 2016 informing the Court of the process through which Plaintiffs and Defendants gave notice to all third parties of the briefing deadlines for any objection to public disclosure of non-party information included in the parties' Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. See April 14, 2016 Minute Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 18, 2016. (lcegs4)
April 18, 2016 Filing 403 NOTICE of Proposed Order by Express Scripts Holding Company re #400 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order (Neeley, Steven)
April 18, 2016 Filing 402 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A. Neeley, Jr on behalf of Express Scripts Holding Company (Neeley, Steven)
April 18, 2016 Filing 401 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene by Express Scripts Holding Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Neeley, Steven)
April 18, 2016 Filing 400 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by Express Scripts Holding Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Neeley, Steven)
April 18, 2016 Filing 399 SEALED MOTION filed by John Doe Corporation III (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1-6)(Kavanagh, John)
April 18, 2016 Filing 398 SEALED MOTION filed by John Doe Corporation III (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kavanagh, John)
April 18, 2016 Filing 397 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Kavanagh, III on behalf of John Doe Corporation III (Kavanagh, John)
April 18, 2016 Filing 396 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward B. Schwartz on behalf of John Doe Corporation III (Schwartz, Edward)
April 18, 2016 Filing 395 MOTION to Intervene by AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I - Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit II - Motion for Protective Order)(Bernasconi, Andrew)
April 15, 2016 Filing 394 SEALED Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Certain Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf)
April 15, 2016 Filing 393 SEALED Reply Bench Memorandum Regarding Defendants Latest Unilateral Remedial Proposal filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #390 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting #391 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 15, 2016. (lcegs4)
April 15, 2016 Filing 392 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. Jacobovitz on behalf of Kindred Healthcare (Jacobovitz, Jeffrey)
April 15, 2016 Filing 391 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, #2 Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Certain Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert, #3 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
April 15, 2016 Filing 390 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to File a Document Under Seal, #2 Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Further Support of Plaintiffs Bench Memorandum Regarding Defendants Latest Unilateral Remedial Proposal, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File a Reply, #4 Plaintiffs Reply Bench Memorandum Regarding Defendants Latest Unilateral Remedial Proposal, #5 Certificate of Service)(Reinhart, Tara)
April 15, 2016 Filing 389 SEALED OPPOSITION filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION re #378 SEALED MOTION to Strike Certain Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (zjf)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #385 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 15, 2016. (lcegs4)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #386 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiffs shall deliver the hyperlinked version of their Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to the Court Security Officers at the Third Street entrance between 10:00 a.m. and 12:00 p.m. on Saturday, April 16, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 15, 2016. (lcegs4)
April 15, 2016 Filing 386 Emergency MOTION to Amend/Correct Order,,, by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Reinhart, Tara)
April 14, 2016 Filing 385 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to Strike Certain Opinions of Plaintiffs Expert Professor Carl Shapiro, #3 Certificate of Service)(Reinhart, Tara)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Any third parties that object to the publication of documents used by the parties in their Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law briefs shall file a Motion for Protective Order no later than Monday, April 18, 2016 at 12:00 p.m. The parties' responses shall be filed no later than Wednesday April 20, 2016 at 5:00 p.m. Any replies shall be filed no later than Friday, April 22, 2016 at 5:00 p.m. Any third party who files a motion prior to meeting and conferring in good faith with the parties to reach an agreement on redactions that are justified under United States v. Hubbard, 650 F.2d 293, 317-22 (D.C. Cir. 1980) will be subject to sanctions. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 14, 2016. (lcegs4)
April 13, 2016 Filing 388 ENTERED IN ERROR.....SEALED REPLY by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(zjf) Modified on 4/15/2016 to enter in error as duplicate of #382 .(ztnr)
April 13, 2016 Filing 387 SEALED RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS APRIL 8, 2016 BENCH MEMORANDUM filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf)
April 13, 2016 Filing 384 SEALED DOCUMENT (Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law) filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(znmw)
April 13, 2016 Filing 383 SEALED DOCUMENT (Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law) filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(znmw)
April 13, 2016 Filing 382 SEALED REPLY TO OPPOSITION re #351 SEALED MOTION filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(znmw)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER directing Plaintiffs to file any response to Defendants' #378 Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Expert Testimony no later than 4:00 p.m. Thursday, April 14, 2016. Defendants reply shall be filed no later than 4:00 p.m. Friday, April 15, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 13, 2016. (lcegs4)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER directing Plaintiffs to file any reply to Defendants' Opposition to #360 Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Amazon data no later than 12:00 p.m. Friday, April 15, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 13, 2016. (lcegs4)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Final argument will be held from 10:00 a.m. - 12:00 p.m and 1:30 p.m. - 3:30 p.m. on April 19, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 13, 2016. (lcegs4)
April 13, 2016 Filing 381 SEALED REPLY TO OPPOSITION filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION re #352 SEALED MOTION filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSIONSEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.), #360 SEALED MOTION filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Motion to Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Seal)(Colwell, Peter)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #379 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting #380 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 13, 2016. (lcegs4)
April 13, 2016 Filing 380 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, #2 Defendants' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
April 13, 2016 Filing 379 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, #3 Certificate of Service)(Reinhart, Tara)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #372 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting #373 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 13, 2016. (lcegs4)
April 12, 2016 Filing 373 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit Exhibit to Reply, #4 Certificate of Service)(Agostinho, Helder)
April 12, 2016 Filing 372 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, #2 Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' April 8, 2016 Bench Memorandum, #3 Certificate of Service)(Sullivan, Diane)
April 11, 2016 Filing 378 SEALED MOTION to Strike Certain Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(zjf)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #371 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 11, 2016. (lcegs4)
April 11, 2016 Filing 371 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, #2 Motion to Strike Certain Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Strike Certain Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert, #4 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #362 Sealed Motion; granting #366 Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 11, 2016. (lcegs4)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part #341 Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 11, 2016. (lcegs4)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #257 Motion for Order; granting #259 Motion for Order; granting #276 Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 11, 2016. (lcegs4)
April 11, 2016 Filing 370 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Colwell, Peter)
April 11, 2016 Filing 369 REDACTED DOCUMENT- FTC's Summation (Redacted) Presentation Slides by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Colwell, Peter)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER directing the parties to file public and sealed versions of all exhibits cited in their findings of fact and conclusions of law no later than Tuesday, April 19, 2016. The parties may contact ECF Coordinator Tiffany Gough at 202.354.3064 regarding any problems uploading sealed exhibits. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 11, 2016. (lcegs4)
April 11, 2016 Filing 368 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICE DEPOT'S SUMMATION PRESENTATION by OFFICE DEPOT, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service)(Lacy, Andrew)
April 11, 2016 Filing 367 RESPONSE re #352 SEALED MOTION filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSIONSEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.), #360 SEALED MOTION filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by STAPLES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
April 8, 2016 Filing 377 SEALED Bench Memorandum Regarding Defendants Latest Unilateral Remedial Pro filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf)
April 8, 2016 Filing 376 SEALED Bench Memorandum Regarding the Courts Authority to Consider Remedial filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf)
April 8, 2016 Filing 375 SEALED Bench Memorandum Regarding the Court's Authority to Consider the Recently filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf)
April 8, 2016 Filing 374 SEALED Statement of Position in Response to the Cour filed by AMAZON.COM, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER directing Plaintiffs to file any reply to Defendants' #359 Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration no later than 12:00 p.m. Tuesday, April 13, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 8, 2016. (lcegs4)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER directing Defendants to file any reply to Plaintiffs' #361 Bench Memorandum Regarding Defendants' Remedial Proposal no later than 12:00 p.m. Tuesday, April 12, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 8, 2016. (lcegs4)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER directing Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs' #360 Motion to Exclude or Permit Expert Opinion no later than 12:00 p.m. Monday, April 11, 2016. Plaintiffs reply shall be filed no later than 12:00 p.m. Wednesday, April 13, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 8, 2016. (lcegs4)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #317 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting #337 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting #347 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting #361 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 8, 2016. (lcegs4)
April 8, 2016 Filing 361 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to File a Document Under Seal, #2 Plaintiffs Bench Memorandum Regarding Defendants Latest Unilateral Remedial Proposal, #3 Certificate of Service)(Reinhart, Tara)
April 8, 2016 Filing 359 RESPONSE re #351 SEALED MOTION filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSIONSEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by STAPLES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
April 7, 2016 Filing 360 SEALED MOTION TO EXCLUDE OR PERMITEXPERT OPINION filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf)
April 7, 2016 Filing 357 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT by STAPLES, INC. (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Staples' Redacted Closing PowerPoint Presentation, #2 Exhibit DDX018, #3 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
April 7, 2016 Filing 356 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT Admitted Hearing Exhibit by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PX06500 (Redacted))(Colwell, Peter)
April 7, 2016 Filing 355 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PX06500)(Colwell, Peter)
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER finding as moot #352 Sealed Motion; granting #352 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 7, 2016. (lcegs4)
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #354 Motion to Modify. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 7, 2016. (lcegs4, )
April 6, 2016 Filing 354 Joint MOTION to Modify the April 6, 2016 Minute Order by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Reinhart, Tara)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Section I. 6 of the Final Pre-Hearing Order is hereby amended as follows: The parties' findings of fact and conclusions of law briefs, not to exceed 100 pages, shall be filed no later than Wednesday, April 13, 2016 at 12:00 p.m. The briefs shall be double spaced and shall use 12 -point Times New Roman font. The parties' shall deliver to chambers two hard copies of their briefs and two copies of all authorities relied upon in three ring binders, appropriately tabbed and labeled. The parties shall also deliver two thumb drives with hyperlinked versions of their briefs to chambers. Binders and thumb drives shall be delivered to chambers no later than 4:00 p.m. Wednesday, April 13, 2016. The Court shall hear final argument from the parties on April 19, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 6, 2016. (lcegs4)
April 6, 2016 Filing 353 NOTICE of Filing Bench Memorandum Regarding Scope of Rebuttal and Expert Non-Discussion Orders by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs Bench Memorandum Regarding Scope of Rebuttal and Expert Non-Discussion Orders, #2 Certificate of Service)(Reinhart, Tara)
April 5, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan: Preliminary Injunction Hearing Resumed and Held on 4/5/2016. Defense Rest Case. Plaintiff Summarized Case and Defendants Rebutted. Preliminary Injunction Hearing Concluded. Finding of Facts of no more than 100 pages due by 12:00PM on 4/13/2016. Arguments Will Be Heard on 4/19/2016 at 10:00AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan.). (Court Reporter AM - SCOTT WALLACE; PM - JANICE DICKMAN.) (mac)
April 5, 2016 Filing 352 SEALED MOTION filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Motion, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Motion, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Motion, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(Agostinho, Helder)
April 5, 2016 Filing 351 SEALED MOTION filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(Agostinho, Helder)
April 5, 2016 Filing 350 NOTICE of Filing a Bench Memorandum Regarding Scope of Permitted Rebuttal Testimony by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sullivan, Diane)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Due to the Court's schedule, the Court must recess at 4:15 p.m. today, Tuesday April 5. The Court regrets any inconvenience to the parties. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 5, 2016. (lcegs4)
April 4, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan: Preliminary Injunction Hearing Resumed and Held on 4/4/2016. Preliminary Injunction Hearing will resume on 4/5/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (Plaintiff Witness: Carl Shapiro)(Court Reporter AM - SCOTT WALLACE; PM - JANICE DICKMAN.) (mac)
April 4, 2016 Filing 349 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT Admitted Hearing Exhibits by STAPLES, INC. (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DDX004, #2 Exhibit DDX100, #3 Exhibit DDX104, #4 Exhibit DDX105, #5 Exhibit DDX110, #6 Exhibit DDX111, #7 Exhibit DDX112, #8 Exhibit DDX113, #9 Exhibit DX0098, #10 Exhibit DX1096, #11 Exhibit DX4171, #12 Exhibit DX5036-OUTCNSL, #13 Exhibit DX5046, #14 Exhibit DX5168-OUTCNSL, #15 Exhibit DX5175, #16 Exhibit DX5327, #17 Exhibit PX8064, #18 Certificate of Service)(Sullivan, Diane)
April 4, 2016 Filing 348 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by STAPLES, INC.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DX2433, #2 Exhibit DX2437 Part 1, #3 Exhibit DX2437 Part 2, #4 Exhibit DX2450, #5 Exhibit DX5033, #6 Exhibit DX5036-OUTCNSL, #7 Exhibit DX5168-OUTCNSL, #8 Exhibit DX5175, #9 Exhibit DX5327, #10 Exhibit PX3039, #11 Certificate of Service)(Sullivan, Diane)
April 4, 2016 Filing 347 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Plaintiffs Bench Memorandum Regarding the Courts Authority to Consider Remedial Proposals, #3 Certificate of Service)(Reinhart, Tara)
April 4, 2016 Filing 346 NOTICE of Amended Order of Witnesses by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Court will resume at 2:15 p.m. in closed session. After Plaintiffs' confidential redirect examination, which is expected to last for approximately 20 minutes, the Court will reopen to the public. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on April 4, 2016. (lcegs4)
April 1, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan: Preliminary Injunction Hearing Resumed and Held on 4/1/2016. Preliminary Injunction Hearing will resume on 4/4/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (Plaintiff Witness: Carl Shapiro)(Court Reporter AM - SCOTT WALLACE; PM - JANICE DICKMAN.) (mac)
April 1, 2016 Filing 339 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DX02970 (part 1), #2 Exhibit DX02970 (part 2), #3 Exhibit DX02970 (part 3), #4 Exhibit DX04053)(Lacy, Andrew)
April 1, 2016 Filing 338 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT OF ADMITTED HEARING EXHIBITS by OFFICE DEPOT, INC. (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 DX02970 (part 1), #2 DX02970 (part 2), #3 DX02970 (part 3), #4 DX04053, #5 DX04057)(Lacy, Andrew)
April 1, 2016 Filing 337 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, #2 Bench Memorandum Regarding the Court's Authority to Consider the Recently Proposed Remedy, #3 Certificate of Service)(Sullivan, Diane)
March 31, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan: Preliminary Injunction Hearing Resumed and Held on 3/31/2016. Preliminary Injunction Hearing will continue on 4/1/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan.(Plaintiff Witnesses: Allen Wright, Carl Shapiro) (Court Reporter AM - SCOTT WALLACE; PM - JANICE DICKMAN.) (mac)
March 31, 2016 Filing 336 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT of Admitted Hearing Exhibits by STAPLES, INC. (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DX05167-OUTCNSL, #2 Exhibit DDX014, #3 Exhibit DDX015, #4 Exhibit DDX016, #5 Exhibit DDX017, #6 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
March 31, 2016 Filing 335 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by STAPLES, INC.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DX05167-OUTCNSL, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
March 31, 2016 Filing 334 NOTICE of Filing Admitted Hearing Exhibit by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PX03020)(Colwell, Peter)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall appear at 9:15 a.m. Friday, April 1, 2016 for a brief confidential session. The Plaintiffs' expert testimony shall resume at 9:30 a.m. in public session. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 31, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 31, 2016 Filing 333 NOTICE of Order of Defendants' Witnesses by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
March 31, 2016 Filing 332 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Designated Deposition Transcript [PX02122])(Colwell, Peter)
March 30, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan: Preliminary Injunction Hearing Resumed and Held on 3/30/2016. Preliminary Injunction Hearing will resume on 3/31/2016 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (Plaintiff Witness: Leo Meehan)(Court Reporter AM - SCOTT WALLACE; PM - JANICE DICKMAN.) (mac)
March 30, 2016 Filing 331 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT Regarding Admitted Hearing Exhibits by STAPLES, INC. (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DDX006, #2 Exhibit DDX008, #3 Exhibit DDX010, #4 Exhibit DDX011, #5 Exhibit DX00068, #6 Exhibit DX00411, #7 Exhibit DX00577, #8 Exhibit DX00600, #9 Exhibit DX02679, #10 Exhibit DX03998, #11 Exhibit DX05314, #12 Exhibit DX05316, #13 Exhibit DX05317, #14 Exhibit DX05328, #15 Exhibit DX05329, #16 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
March 30, 2016 Filing 330 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by STAPLES, INC.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DX03998, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
March 30, 2016 Filing 329 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PX03021)(Colwell, Peter)
March 30, 2016 Filing 328 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT Admtited Hearing Exhibits by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PX03021, #2 Exhibit PX09000, #3 Exhibit PX09001)(Colwell, Peter)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER directing the Clerk's Office to remove Docket No. 323. Staples shall refile the exhibits forthwith. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 30, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Due to the Court's calendar, the evidentiary hearing will resume on March 30, 2016 at 11:00 am in Courtroom 24A. PLEASE NOTE THE TIME CHANGE. The Court regrets any inconvenience to the parties. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/30/2016. (lcegs1)
March 30, 2016 Filing 327 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Statement of Position on Staples' Motion to Unseal Testimony of Prentis Wilson on Behalf of Non-Party Amazon.com by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION re #326 Meet and Confer Statement, #325 Notice of Proposed Order, (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Reinhart, Tara)
March 30, 2016 Filing 326 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order REGARDING STAPLES, INC.S MOTION TO UNSEAL THE SEALED UNOFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT OF THE MARCH 23, 2016 TESTIMONY OF PRENTIS WILSON ON BEHALF OF NON-PARTY AMAZON.COM, INC., #2 Certificate of Service)(Monts, William)
March 30, 2016 Filing 325 NOTICE of Proposed Order Granting and Denying in Part the Motion to Unseal the March 23, 2016 Transcript of the Examination of Prentis Wilson by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
March 29, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan: Preliminary Injunction Hearing Resumed and Held on 3/29/2016. Preliminary Injunction Hearing will continue on 3/30/2016 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (Plaintiff Witnesses: Tim Meester, Paul-David Morrison)(Court Reporter AM - SCOTT WALLACE; PM - JANICE DICKMAN.) (mac)
March 29, 2016 Filing 324 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PX07047, #2 Exhibit PX05333, #3 Exhibit PX03009, #4 Exhibit PX07536, #5 Exhibit PX03018)(Colwell, Peter)
March 29, 2016 Filing 323 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT of Admitted Hearing Exhibits by STAPLES, INC. (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DX00068, #2 Exhibit DX00577, #3 Exhibit DX05314, #4 Exhibit DX05316, #5 Exhibit DX05317, #6 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
March 29, 2016 Filing 322 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by STAPLES, INC.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DX00068, #2 Exhibit DX00577, #3 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
March 29, 2016 Filing 321 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT Admitted Hearing Exhibits by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PX07047, #2 Exhibit PX05333, #3 Exhibit PX03009, #4 Exhibit PX07536, #5 Exhibit PX03018)(Colwell, Peter)
March 29, 2016 Filing 320 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by GUY BROWN re #291 SEALED MOTION filed by GUY BROWN. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Harris, Ronald)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER notifying the parties that Court will sit from 8:30 a.m. - 5:00 p.m. Tuesday, March 29, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 29, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 28, 2016 Filing 319 NOTICE of Amended Order of Witnesses by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
March 28, 2016 Filing 318 Joint STATUS REPORT Pursuant to the Court's March 27, 2016 Minute Order by STAPLES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
March 28, 2016 Filing 317 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by AMAZON.COM, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Amazon.com, Inc.'s Motion to File Statement of Position in Response to the Court's Minute Order of March 27, 2016, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #3 Non-Party Amazon.com, Inc.'s Statement of Position in Response to the Court's Minute Order of March 27, 2016)(Monts, William)
March 27, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In order to efficiently resolve Defendants' Motion to Unseal portions of Mr. Wilson's March 23, 2016 testimony, the Court sent lead counsel for the parties and non-party Amazon a transcript that indicates the Court's view about what portions of Mr. Wilson's testimony should be sealed and what portions should be public. The Court agrees with Amazon that discussion of certain products not yet released should remain confidential. However, all items discussed by Mr. Wilson during his presentation in Baltimore, including invoicing capabilities, should be public as those topics have already been discussed in a public forum. The parties are hereby ordered to meet and confer based on the transcript received from the Court, with the goal of reaching further agreement on the content that should be sealed in accordance with the Hubbard factors. The parties shall file a joint status report indicating further agreement no later than 5:00 p.m. Monday, March 28, 2016. If no further agreement can be reached, the parties shall be prepared to make specific arguments based on the transcript received from the Court. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 27, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 26, 2016 Filing 316 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT by OFFICE DEPOT, INC. (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Office Depot's Redacted Opening Presentation, #2 Certificate of Service)(Lacy, Andrew)
March 26, 2016 Filing 315 NOTICE of Second Amended Order of Witnesses by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Loughlin, Charles A.)
March 26, 2016 Filing 314 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT by STAPLES, INC. (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Staples' Redacted Opening Presentation, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
March 25, 2016 Filing 313 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PX07152, #2 Exhibit PX07159, #3 Exhibit PX07055)(Colwell, Peter)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court will hear 60 minutes of argument from the parties at the close of Plaintiffs' case in chief. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 25, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 25, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court will hear brief oral argument from the parties and non-party Amazon regarding Defendants' Motion to Unseal Portions of Mr. Wilson's testimony on Tuesday, March 29, 2016 at 8:30 a.m. The argument will be open to the public. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 25, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 25, 2016 Filing fee Paid: $ 100, receipt number 4616076747 pursuant to #284 Order on Pro Hac Vice Motion. (md)
March 25, 2016 Filing 312 NOTICE of Amended Order of Witnesses by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Loughlin, Charles A.)
March 25, 2016 Filing 311 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AMAZON.COM, INC. re #310 SEALED MOTION filed by AMAZON.COM, INC. . (Monts, William)
March 25, 2016 Filing 310 SEALED MOTION filed by AMAZON.COM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal Surreply, #2 Memorandum in Support Surreply in Opposition to Staples's Motion to Unseal With Limited Exception)(Monts, William)
March 25, 2016 Filing 309 NOTICE OF FILING OF ADMITTED HEARING EXHIBIT by OFFICE DEPOT, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DX05500, #2 Certificate of Service)(Lacy, Andrew)
March 25, 2016 Filing 308 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT Admitted Hearing Exhibits by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PX07159, #2 Exhibit PX07152, #3 Exhibit PX03013, #4 Exhibit PX07055)(Colwell, Peter)
March 24, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan: Preliminary Injunction Hearing Resumed and Held on 3/24/2016. Preliminary Injunction Hearing will continue on 3/29/2016 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (Plaintiff Witnesses: James Moise, Kenneth Wilson)(Court Reporter AM - SCOTT WALLACE; PM - JANICE DICKMAN.) (mac)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER directing Amazon to file a surreply to Staples' Motion to Unseal Portions of Mr. Wilson's March 23, 2015 testimony no later than 3:00 p.m. Friday, March 25, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 24, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 24, 2016 Filing 307 REPLY to opposition to motion re #302 MOTION for Order to Unseal with Limited Exception the March 23, 2016 Unofficial Transcript of the Examination of Prentis Wilson filed by STAPLES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
March 24, 2016 Filing 306 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by AMAZON.COM, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Non-Party Amazon.com, Inc.'s Motion to Seal, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #3 Memorandum in Support Non-Party Amazon.com, Inc.'s Memorandum in Support of Its Opposition to Staples, Inc.'s Motion to Unseal With Limited Exceptions)(Monts, William)
March 24, 2016 Filing 305 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT of Admitted Hearing Exhibits by STAPLES, INC. (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DX00198, #2 Exhibit DX00200, #3 Exhibit DX00288, #4 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
March 24, 2016 Filing 304 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by STAPLES, INC.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DX00198, #2 Exhibit DX00200, #3 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
March 24, 2016 Filing 303 MOTION to Unseal Document , in part, by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Reinhart, Tara)
March 24, 2016 Filing 302 MOTION for Order to Unseal with Limited Exception the March 23, 2016 Unofficial Transcript of the Examination of Prentis Wilson by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
March 24, 2016 Filing 301 NOTICE of Order of Witnesses by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Defendants and Plaintiffs shall file their motions to make public additional portions of Mr. Wilson's March 23, 2016 testimony on behalf of Amazon Business no later than 5:00 p.m. today, March 24, 2016. The parties shall not file additional copies of the transcript, but rather identify the page and line numbers of the testimony they advocate should be public. Any response, by opposing counsel or Amazon, shall be filed no later than 7:00 p.m. today, March 24, 2016. All replies shall be filed no later than 10:00 p.m. March 24, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 24, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 24, 2016 Filing 300 ERRATA to Public Filing of Redacted Portions of Sealed Transcript from March 23, 2016 by STAPLES, INC. #299 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by STAPLES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 March 23, 2016 Redacted Hearing Transcript, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
March 24, 2016 Filing 299 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT March 23, 2016 Hearing Transcript by STAPLES, INC. (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 March 23, 2016 Redacted Hearing Transcript, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
March 24, 2016 Filing 298 NOTICE of Order of Witnesses by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Loughlin, Charles A.)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In accordance with the Court's March 23, 2016 bench order, non-party Amazon.com, Inc., ("Amazon"), by March 25, 2016, must produce data sufficient to show total spend annually from 2014 through 2017 (based on actual or estimated sales) for each of the seven product groups in DX05158 by business customers of all types through Amazon.com (e.g., employees of companies), as well as those business customers purchasing through Amazon.com that Amazon Business has identified for possible conversion to a registered account through Amazon Business. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 24, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 23, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan: Preliminary Injunction Hearing Resumed and Held on 3/23/2016. Preliminary Injunction Hearing will continue on 3/24/2016 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (Plaintiff Witnesses: Prentis Wilson, Tiffany Eubanks-Saunders)(Court Reporter AM - SCOTT WALLACE; PM - JANICE DICKMAN) (mac)
March 23, 2016 Filing 297 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to #185 Sealed Order by STAPLES, INC. (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Staples' Redacted Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Compliance with the Court's Sealed Order of March 1, 2016, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
March 23, 2016 Filing 296 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT Admitted Hearing Exhibits by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PX03014, #2 Exhibit PX07386, #3 Exhibit PX07518)(Colwell, Peter)
March 23, 2016 Filing 295 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT Regarding Admitted Hearing Exhibits by STAPLES, INC. (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DX0030, #2 Exhibit DX0033, #3 Exhibit DX2684, #4 Exhibit DX2855, #5 Exhibit DX5035, #6 Exhibit DX5036, #7 Exhibit DX5168, #8 Exhibit DX5175, #9 Exhibit DX5192, #10 Exhibit DX5193, #11 Exhibit DX5196, #12 Exhibit DX5212, #13 Exhibit DX5284, #14 Exhibit DX5302, #15 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
March 23, 2016 Filing 294 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by STAPLES, INC.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DX0030, #2 Exhibit DX0033, #3 Exhibit DX5033, #4 Exhibit DX5035, #5 Exhibit DX5036, #6 Exhibit DX5040, #7 Exhibit DX5113, #8 Exhibit DX5158, #9 Exhibit DX5168, #10 Exhibit DX5175, #11 Exhibit DX5192, #12 Exhibit DX5263, #13 Exhibit DX5270, #14 Exhibit DX5272, #15 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
March 23, 2016 Filing 293 NOTICE of Filing Previously Sealed Document by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION re #189 Sealed Document, (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff FTC's Briefing Regarding Wilson Declaration, #2 Certificate of Service)(Quillian, Ryan)
March 23, 2016 Filing 292 NOTICE of Proposed Order Requiring Non-Party Amazon.com, Inc. to Produce Certain Additional Information by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. (Sullivan, Diane)
March 23, 2016 Filing 291 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED 3/29/2016..... SEALED MOTION filed by GUY BROWN. "Let this be filed" by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf) Modified on 3/24/2016 (znmw). Modified on 3/30/2016 (znmw).
March 22, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan: Preliminary Injunction Hearing Resumed and held on 3/22/2016. Preliminary Injunction Hearing will continue on 3/23/2016 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (Plaintiff Witnesses: Greg O'Neill, Jason Cervone, Prentis Wilson) (Court Reporter AM - SCOTT WALLACE; PM - JANICE DICKMAN.) (mac)
March 22, 2016 Filing 290 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PX07135, #2 Exhibit PX07136, #3 Exhibit PX07365, #4 Exhibit PX07366, #5 Exhibit PX07367, #6 Exhibit PX03029, #7 Exhibit PX07219)(Colwell, Peter)
March 22, 2016 Filing 289 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT Admitted Hearing Exhibits by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PX03022, #2 Exhibit PX07136, #3 Exhibit PX07365, #4 Exhibit PX07366, #5 Exhibit PX07366, #6 Exhibit PX03029, #7 Exhibit PX07219)(Colwell, Peter)
March 22, 2016 Filing 288 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT Regarding Admitted Trial Exhibits by STAPLES, INC. (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DDX0001, #2 Exhibit DX0014, #3 Exhibit DX0015 Part 1, #4 Exhibit DX0015 Part 2, #5 Exhibit DX0015 Part 3, #6 Exhibit DX0019, #7 Exhibit DX0022, #8 Exhibit DX0024, #9 Exhibit DX0025, #10 Exhibit DX0324, #11 Exhibit DX0600, #12 Exhibit DX5263, #13 Exhibit DX5270, #14 Exhibit DX5272, #15 Certificate of Service)(Sullivan, Diane)
March 22, 2016 Filing 287 NOTICE of Second Amended Order of Witnesses by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Loughlin, Charles A.)
March 21, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan: Preliminary Injunction Hearing Begun and Held on 3/21/2016. Opening Arguments From Parties Presented. Preliminary Injunction Hearing will resume on 3/22/2016 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (Plaintiff Witness: Greg O'Neill) (Court Reporter AM - SCOTT WALLACE; PM - JANICE DICKMAN.) (mac)
March 21, 2016 Filing 286 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opening Slides)(Colwell, Peter)
March 21, 2016 Filing 285 SEALED REPLY TO OPPOSITION filed by AMAZON.COM, INC. re #283 SEALED MOTION filed by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Joel Dion, #2 Certificate of Service)(Monts, William)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER granting Guy Brown's motion to appear pro hac vice. Ronald Harris is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this matter. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 21, 2016. (lcegs4) Modified on 3/22/2016 (zmac).
March 21, 2016 Filing 283 SEALED MOTION filed by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Text of Proposed Order, #12 Certificate of Service)(Mahan, Carrie)
March 21, 2016 Filing 282 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin F. Holt on behalf of AMAZON.COM, INC. (Holt, Benjamin)
March 21, 2016 Filing 281 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.), SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit, #51 Exhibit, #52 Exhibit, #53 Exhibit, #54 Exhibit, #55 Exhibit, #56 Exhibit, #57 Exhibit, #58 Exhibit, #59 Exhibit, #60 Exhibit, #61 Exhibit, #62 Exhibit, #63 Exhibit, #64 Exhibit, #65 Exhibit, #66 Exhibit, #67 Exhibit, #68 Exhibit, #69 Exhibit, #70 Exhibit, #71 Exhibit, #72 Exhibit, #73 Exhibit, #74 Exhibit, #75 Exhibit, #76 Exhibit, #77 Exhibit, #78 Exhibit, #79 Exhibit, #80 Exhibit, #81 Exhibit, #82 Exhibit, #83 Exhibit, #84 Exhibit, #85 Exhibit, #86 Exhibit, #87 Exhibit, #88 Exhibit, #89 Exhibit, #90 Exhibit, #91 Exhibit, #92 Exhibit, #93 Exhibit, #94 Exhibit, #95 Exhibit, #96 Exhibit, #97 Exhibit, #98 Exhibit, #99 Exhibit, #100 Exhibit, #101 Exhibit, #102 Exhibit, #103 Exhibit, #104 Exhibit, #105 Exhibit, #106 Exhibit, #107 Exhibit, #108 Exhibit, #109 Exhibit, #110 Exhibit)(Colwell, Peter)
March 20, 2016 Filing 280 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit)(Colwell, Peter)
March 20, 2016 Filing 279 SEALED MOTION filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.), SEALED DOCUMENT filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Appendix, #3 Appendix, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Reinhart, Tara)
March 20, 2016 Filing 278 Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Reinhart, Tara)
March 20, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Any response to Amazon's Motion for in camera treatment of exhibits shall be filed no later than 1:00 p.m. Monday, March 21, 2016. Any reply shall be filed no later than 7:00 p.m. the same day. Going forward, all responses to third-party motions shall be filed no later than 1:00 p.m. the day after the motion is filed and all replies shall be filed no later than 7:00 p.m. the same day. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 20, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 20, 2016 Filing 277 LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT(S) by STAPLES, INC. #199 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC., #248 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by STAPLES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Exhibit DX02570 part 1, #3 Exhibit DX02570 part 2, #4 Exhibit DX02561, #5 Exhibit DX02538, #6 Exhibit DX02591, #7 Exhibit DX00737, #8 Exhibit DX01041, #9 Exhibit DX01047 part 1, #10 Exhibit DX01047 part 2, #11 Exhibit DX01048, #12 Exhibit DX01050, #13 Exhibit DX01133, #14 Exhibit DX01149, #15 Exhibit DX01213, #16 Exhibit DX01227, #17 Exhibit DX01574, #18 Exhibit DX01626, #19 Exhibit DX01671, #20 Exhibit DX01684, #21 Exhibit DX01685, #22 Exhibit DX01725, #23 Exhibit DX01733, #24 Exhibit DX01770, #25 Exhibit DX02576, #26 Exhibit DX02590 part 1, #27 Exhibit DX02590 part 2, #28 Exhibit DX02590 part 3, #29 Exhibit DX02590 part 4, #30 Exhibit DX02667 part 1, #31 Exhibit DX02667 part 2, #32 Exhibit DX02667 part 3, #33 Exhibit DX02667 part 4, #34 Exhibit DX02745, #35 Exhibit DX02745, #36 Exhibit DX04510, #37 Exhibit DX04874, #38 Exhibit PX04081, #39 Exhibit PX04082, #40 Exhibit PX04334, #41 Exhibit PX04335, #42 Exhibit PX04357, #43 Exhibit PX04567, #44 Exhibit DX01219, #45 Exhibit DX01651, #46 Exhibit DX01691, #47 Exhibit PX02003, #48 Exhibit PX02005, #49 Exhibit PX02008, #50 Exhibit PX02110, #51 Exhibit PX02127, #52 Exhibit PX02146, #53 Exhibit PX04083, #54 Exhibit PX05229, #55 Exhibit PX05233, #56 Exhibit PX05236, #57 Exhibit PX05393, #58 Exhibit PX05427, #59 Certificate of Service)(Sullivan, Diane)
March 20, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall inform the Court through a Joint Status Report, filed no later than 10:00 p.m. this evening, of any issues requiring the Court's attention prior to commencement of the preliminary injunction hearing tomorrow. Going forward, the parties shall file, no later than 9:00 p.m. each day, a Joint Status Report identifying any issues the Court must resolve the next hearing day. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 20, 2016. (lcegs4, )
March 20, 2016 Filing 276 SEALED MOTION filed by AMAZON.COM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement NON-PARTY AMAZON.COM, INC.S MOTION FOR IN CAMERA TREATMENT OF CONFIDENTIAL MATERIAL AND POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Text of Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING NON-PARTY AMAZON.COM, INC.S MOTION TO INTERVENE FOR THE LIMITED PURPOSE OF FILING A MOTION FOR IN CAMERA TREATMENT, #6 Text of Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING NON-PARTY AMAZON.COM, INC.S MOTION FOR IN CAMERA TREATMENT OF CONFIDENTIAL MATERIAL, #7 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Monts, William)
March 19, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #272 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Anne M. Lockner is hereby admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 19, 2015. (lcegs4)
March 19, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER withdrawing #271 Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 19, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 19, 2016 Filing 275 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by JOHN DOE II CORPORATION re #271 SEALED MOTION filed by JOHN DOE II CORPORATION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Mullen, Kathleen)
March 19, 2016 Filing 274 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to Order,, by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PX07136, #2 Exhibit PX07365, #3 Exhibit PX07366, #4 Exhibit PX07367, #5 Certificate of Service)(Quillian, Ryan)
March 18, 2016 Filing 358 SEALED ERRATA to REPLY MEMORANDUM IN FURTHER SUPPORT OFPLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf)
March 18, 2016 Filing 345 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (see entry #258 to view document)(zjf)
March 18, 2016 Filing 273 NOTICE of Witnesses (Amended) by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION re Order,, (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Loughlin, Charles A.)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #267 Motion to Clarify. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 18, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting the Parties #267 Motion for Reconsideration. Confidential Material of Third Parties cited as exhibits to the pre-trial briefing shall be the subject of meet and confers in conjunction with the process outlined in paragraph 2 of the Courts Order at Docket Entry 254. However, the third sentence of section III. A. 2 of the #256 Final Pre-Hearing Order is hereby modified as follows: Any exhibits granted Complete Non-Disclosure status must be filed under seal and the Notice of Filing must indicate that the documents should be maintained under seal. Any exhibits granted Partial Non-Disclosure status shall be filed on the public docket with appropriate redactions. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 18, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court received one binder of exhibits for one witness from Plaintiffs. The Court seeks clarification from the Plaintiffs as to whether Plaintiffs seek to call more than one witness on Monday. If so, Plaintiffs shall provide the binders for additional witnesses to be called on Monday no later than 8:00 a.m. Monday, March 21, 2016. Going forward, both parties shall indicate by yellow highlight the information redacted in each exhibit for which Partial Non-Disclosure treatment is sought. Plaintiffs shall file redacted versions of the documents for which they seek Partial Non-Disclosure treatment no later than 3:00 p.m. Saturday, March 19, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 18, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 18, 2016 Filing 272 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Anne M. Lockner, :Firm- Robins Kaplan LLp, :Address- 2800 LaSalle Plaza, 800 LaSalle Avenue, Minneapolis, MN 55402. Phone No. - 612-349-8470. Fax No. - 612-339-4181 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4451966. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by BEST BUY CO., INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Anne M. Lockner, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Finzen, Bruce)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #263 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #270 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Edward D. Hassi and Judy L. Woods are hereby admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 18, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 18, 2016 Filing 271 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED ON 03/19/2016.....SEALED MOTION filed by JOHN DOE II CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Mullen, Kathleen) Modified on 3/21/2016 (jf).
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #258 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting #264 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting #269 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 18, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 18, 2016 Filing 270 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Judy L. Woods, :Firm- Benesch, Friedlander, Coplan & Aronoff LLP, :Address- One American Square, Suite 2300, Indianapolis, Indiana, 46282. Phone No. - (317) 632-3232. Fax No. - (317) 632-2962 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4451743. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Corporate United, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Sullivan, Erin)
March 18, 2016 Filing 269 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order Grantin Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Errata, #3 Exhibit, #4 Certificate of Service)(Reinhart, Tara)
March 18, 2016 Filing 268 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Kathleen Sullivan on behalf of Corporate United, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sullivan, Erin)
March 18, 2016 Filing 267 Joint MOTION to Clarify by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sullivan, Diane)
March 18, 2016 Filing 266 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by WINDFALL. INC. for In Camera Treatment of Confidential Material Under Protective Order (Haake, Jack)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER clarifying that consistent with paragraph two of the Order at Docket No. 234, the Parties and nonparties shall endeavor to reach an agreement on redactions that are justified under United States v. Hubbard, 650 F.2d 293, 317-22 (D.C. Cir. 1980) for all exhibits that were attached to the Parties' pre-trial briefs and will be docketed in redacted form no later than 8:00 p.m. Sunday, March 20, 2016. See March 15, 2016 Minute Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 18, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 18, 2016 Filing 265 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to #264 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Public Version of Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, #2 Motion to File Under Seal, #3 [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to File Under Seal, #4 Certificate of Service)(Loughlin, Charles A.)
March 17, 2016 Filing 264 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order re: Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, #2 Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, #3 Exhibit List re: Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, #4 Exhibit PX0001, #5 Exhibit PX02001-PX02162, #6 Exhibit PX03002-PX03059, #7 Exhibit PX04042-PX04414, #8 Exhibit PX04499-PX04572, #9 Exhibit PX04763- 1 of 3, #10 Exhibit PX04763- 2 of 3, #11 Exhibit PX04763- 3 of 3, #12 Exhibit PX05390-PX05498, #13 Exhibit PX06001-PX06400, #14 Exhibit PX07017-PX07576, #15 Exhibit PX08051-PX08064, #16 Exhibit DX0037-DX04451, #17 Certificate of Service)(Loughlin, Charles A.)
March 17, 2016 Filing 263 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Edward D. Hassi, :Firm- O'Melveny & Myers LLP, :Address- 1625 Eye Street NW, Washington, DC 20006. Phone No. - 202-383-5300. Fax No. - 202-383-5414 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4450487. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by FIFTH THIRD BANK (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Service)(Robson, Katrina)
March 17, 2016 Filing 262 NOTICE of Submission of Consultant Certifications by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Anderson, Carrie)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Any objection to Defendants' oral motion to designate Staples and Office Depot CEOs as corporate representatives to be present for the entirety of the hearing shall be filed no later than 7:00 p.m. Thursday, March 17, 2016. Defendants' reply shall be filed no later than 8:00 a.m. Friday, March 18, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 17, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. For substantially the same reasons articulated by the Plaintiffs, Defendants' #239 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery is DENIED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 17, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #243 , #246 , and #247 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Jonathan S. Klarfeld, James A. King, and Cody D. Rockey are hereby admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 17, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 17, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER clarifying that the #254 Order setting forth the procedure for consideration of non-party requests for in-camera treatment of confidential material, filed at 6:18 p.m., Wednesday, March 16, 2016, supersedes Section III, paragraph 3 of the #256 Final Pre-hearing Order, filed at 7:01 p.m. March 16, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 17, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 17, 2016 Filing 261 NOTICE of Order of Witnesses by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Loughlin, Charles A.)
March 17, 2016 Filing 260 REPLY to opposition to motion re #239 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Spahn, Brian)
March 17, 2016 Filing 259 MOTION for Order for In Camera Treatment of Confidential Information by OFFICE DEPOT, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration of Heather Stern, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lacy, Andrew)
March 16, 2016 Filing 344 SEALED Description of Video-Taped Deposition Testimony filed by STAPLES, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf)
March 16, 2016 Filing 258 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Colwell, Peter)
March 16, 2016 Filing 257 MOTION for Order for In Camera Treatment of Confidential Information by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael T. Williams, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(Sullivan, Diane)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 256 FINAL PRE-HEARING ORDER. The parties' Final Pre-Hearing Order is hereby APPROVED, with the following modifications as discussed at the March 16, 2016 Status Conference: (1) the parties shall be permitted 75 minutes each for opening and closing arguments; (2) the length of the parties' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law shall be discussed during the course of the hearing. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 16, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 16, 2016 Filing 255 RESPONSE re #239 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Loughlin, Charles A.)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. For the duration of the hearing, the first row in the well of the Court and the first row in the gallery shall be reserved for the parties attorneys. The remaining three rows in the gallery shall be reserved for the public and press. Additional seating will be provided in overflow rooms. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 16, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 254 MINUTE ORDER. Consistent with the edits made in the attached Order, the Court adopts the parties' proposed Order regarding the procedure for the use of non-party material and consideration of non-party requests for in-camera treatment of confidential material with the following modifications: (1) the first sentence shall read No later than 72 hours prior to the proposed use of non-party materials, the Parties shall affirmatively identify for each non-party any materials produced by the non-party, including precise portions of deposition transcripts, that the Parties intend to use in open court in the preliminary injunction hearing.; (2) line nine of paragraph one shall read "for In Camera Treatment no later than 48 hours...." To the extent the use of deposition transcripts for the purposes of impeachment raises confidentiality concerns, counsel for non-parties shall object during the hearing. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 16, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 16, 2016 Filing 253 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by SAVANNAH RIVER NUCLEAR SOLUTIONS, LLC re Motion For In Camera Treatment of Proposed Evidence (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Pachter, John)
March 16, 2016 Filing 252 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca E. Bazan on behalf of RENT-A-CENTER, INC. (Bazan, Rebecca)
March 16, 2016 Filing 251 NOTICE of Non-Party Essendant Inc.s Objections To Plaintiffs Proposed Order Of March 16, 2016 by ESSENDANT, INC. re Order (Park, Chong)
March 16, 2016 Filing 250 REPLY to FTC's Proposed Order by Defendants filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lacy, Andrew)
March 16, 2016 Filing 249 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by MCDONALD'S USA, LLC to Intervene and for In Camera Treatment (Armour, Courtney)
March 16, 2016 Filing 248 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT by STAPLES, INC. (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sullivan, Diane)
March 16, 2016 Filing 247 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- James A. King, :Firm- Porter, Wright, Morris & Arthur LLP, :Address- 41 S. High Street, 29th Floor, Columbus, OH 43215. Phone No. - 6142272051. Fax No. - 6142272100 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4449282. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of James A. King, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Monica, John)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER directing Defendants and non-parties to file any objections to the #241 Proposed Order filed by Plaintiffs no later than 5:15 p.m. Wednesday, March 16, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 16, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 16, 2016 Filing 246 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jonathan S. Klarfeld, :Firm- Ropes & Gray LLP, :Address- 2099 Pennsylvania Avenue NW Washington, DC 20006. Phone No. - 202-508-4600. Fax No. - 202-383-8364 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4449277. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Essendant Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Jonathan S. Klarfeld, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Park, Chong)
March 16, 2016 Filing 245 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. Monica, Jr on behalf of AMERICAN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY, INC. (Monica, John)
March 16, 2016 Filing 244 NOTICE of Appearance by Chong S. Park on behalf of Essendant Inc. (Park, Chong)
March 16, 2016 Filing 243 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Cody D. Rockey, :Firm- Dykema Gossett PLLC, :Address- 2723 South State Street, Suite 400. Phone No. - 734-214-7655. Fax No. - crockey@dykema.com Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4449184. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Detroit Regional Chamber (Joseph, Joshua)
March 16, 2016 Filing 242 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hunt Joseph on behalf of Detroit Regional Chamber (Joseph, Joshua)
March 16, 2016 Filing 241 NOTICE of Proposed Order by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Reinhart, Tara)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER directing Plaintiffs to respond to Defendants' Emergency Motion for Out of Time Discovery no later than 9:30 a.m. Thursday, March 17, 2016. Defendants shall reply no later than 3:00 p.m. Thursday, March 17, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 16, 2016. (lcegs4) Modified on 3/16/2016 (zmac).
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the discussion at the March 16, 2016 Status Conference, and pending the Government's proposed order, Motions for leave and Motions For in camera Treatment of confidential third-party exhibits #215 , #221 , #223 , #226 , #233 , #234 and #235 are DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 16, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 16, 2016 Filing 240 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by AMAZON.COM, INC. re #221 MOTION for Order for In Camera Treatment of Confidential Material (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Monts, William)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #222 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 16, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 16, 2016 Filing 239 DENIED PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED ON 03/17/216.....Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by OFFICE DEPOT, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(Spahn, Brian) Modified on 4/4/2016 (zjf).
March 16, 2016 Filing 238 NOTICE of Appearance by Morris A. Bloom on behalf of HITOUCH BUSINESS SERVICES LLC (Bloom, Morris)
March 16, 2016 Filing 237 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Samuel Popofsky on behalf of Essendant Inc. (Popofsky, Mark)
March 16, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan: Pretrial Conference held on 3/16/2016. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 3/21/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. Minute Order To Be Issued. (Court Reporter SCOTT WALLACE.) (mac)
March 16, 2016 Filing 236 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by JOHN DOE II CORPORATION re #218 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by JOHN DOE II CORPORATION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mullen, Kathleen)
March 16, 2016 Filing 235 DENIED PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED ON 03/16/216.....SEALED MOTION filed by Rent-A-Center, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Answer in Intervention, #3 Exhibit Motion for In Camera Treatment, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Bazan, Rebecca) Modified on 4/4/2016 (zjf).
March 15, 2016 Filing 343 SEALED REPLY TO OPPOSITION re #341 SEALED MOTION to Strike Defendants' Exhibit List and to Modify the Case Management and Scheduling Order filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (zjf)
March 15, 2016 Filing 234 DENIED PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED ON 03/16/216.....SEALED MOTION filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Motion for In Camera Treatment, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2)(Nigro, Bernard) Modified on 4/4/2016 (zjf).
March 15, 2016 Filing 233 DENIED PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED ON 03/16/216.....SEALED MOTION filed by MCDONALD'S USA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Original Complaint in FTC v. Staples, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Intervene, #3 Exhibit Motion for In Camera Treatment and Memo in Support, #4 Exhibit Declaration in Support of Motion for In Camera Treatment, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion for In Camera Treatment, #6 Exhibit 3-10 Email Notice of Proposed Trial Exhibits, #7 Exhibit 3-11 Email Notice of Proposed Trial Exhibits, #8 Exhibit 3-13 Email Notice of Proposed Trial Exhibits, #9 Exhibit 3-14 Email Notice of Proposed Trial Exhibits, #10 Exhibit Proposed Trial Exhibit for In Camera Treatment, #11 Exhibit Proposed Trial Exhibit for In Camera Treatment, #12 Exhibit Proposed Trial Exhibit for In Camera Treatment, #13 Exhibit Proposed Trial Exhibit for In Camera Treatment, #14 Exhibit Proposed Trial Exhibit for In Camera Treatment, #15 Exhibit Proposed Trial Exhibit for In Camera Treatment, #16 Exhibit Proposed Trial Exhibit for In Camera Treatment, #17 Exhibit Proposed Trial Exhibit for In Camera Treatment, #18 Exhibit Proposed Trial Exhibit for In Camera Treatment, #19 Exhibit Proposed Trial Exhibit for In Camera Treatment, #20 Exhibit Proposed Trial Exhibit for In Camera Treatment, #21 Exhibit Proposed Trial Exhibit for In Camera Treatment, #22 Exhibit Proposed Trial Exhibit for In Camera Treatment, #23 Exhibit Proposed Trial Exhibit for In Camera Treatment, #24 Exhibit Proposed Trial Exhibit for In Camera Treatment, #25 Exhibit Proposed Trial Exhibit for In Camera Treatment)(Armour, Courtney) Modified on 4/4/2016 (zjf).
March 15, 2016 Filing 232 NOTICE of Proposed Order by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION re #228 Order, (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Pre-Hearing Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Loughlin, Charles A.)
March 15, 2016 Filing 231 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan A. Shores on behalf of Georgia-Pacific LLC (Shores, Ryan)
March 15, 2016 Filing 230 NOTICE of Appearance by Wendell Landray Taylor on behalf of Georgia-Pacific LLC (Taylor, Wendell)
March 15, 2016 Filing 229 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Bruce Hoffman on behalf of Georgia-Pacific LLC (Hoffman, D.)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties are hereby ordered to ensure that any non-party that may be affected by the Minute Order specifying the procedure for non-party intervention receive notice of the full text of that Minute Order no later than 9:00 p.m. today, March 15, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 15, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 228 MINUTE ORDER. Consistent with the attached preliminary rulings indicated by red-line edits, the parties are ordered to file an updated Proposed Final Pre-Hearing Order no later than 7:00 a.m. Wednesday, March 16, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 15, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 15, 2016 Filing 227 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by AMERICAN AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION (INC.) re #217 Unopposed MOTION In Camera Treatment of its Confidential Materials Included on the Parties' Exhibit List (Evans, Philip)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court is aware that Metro has announced a 24-hour shut down starting at midnight. Unless the District Court closes, the Court plans to proceed with the pre-hearing status conference as scheduled and encourages the parties, non-parties, and the public to plan accordingly. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 15, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 15, 2016 Filing 226 DENIED PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED ON 03/16/216.....MOTION for In Camera Treatment by GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ricciardi, Matthew) Modified on 4/4/2016 (zjf).
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part #206 Defendants' Motion to Introduce Limited Deposition Video Testimony. Defendants shall select three of the eight individuals listed in Docket 222. The video deposition testimony for all three individuals shall not exceed two hours total. Plaintiffs likewise may introduce video deposition testimony of no more than three individuals that lasts no longer than 2 hours total. The video deposition testimony shall not be introduced back-to-back. Video deposition not introduced at trial may be cited in the parties' final findings of fact and conclusions of law. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 15, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In order to ensure the public has access to as much information relevant to this proceeding as possible, Defendants shall file a redacted version of their brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction no later than 5:00 p.m. Wednesday, March 16, 2016. The parties shall file redacted versions of all exhibits in support of their briefs in support of and in opposition to the Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction no later than Sunday, March 20, 2016 at 8 p.m. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 15, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Consistent with the long-standing policy of the United States District Court for the District of Columbia, the Court will be in recess on Friday, March 25, 2016 and Monday, March 28. 2016. The Court is amenable to extending Court hours each day as requested or is necessary. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 15, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 15, 2016 Filing 225 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ECOLAB INC. Attorney Toyja Eran Libia Kelley terminated. (Kelley, Toyja)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #224 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ordered that Nicole Susanne Frank be admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 15, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 15, 2016 Filing 224 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Nicole S. Frank, :Firm- Robins Kaplan LLP, :Address- 800 LaSalle Avenue, Suite 2800, Minneapolis, MN 55402. Phone No. - 612-349-0194. Fax No. - 612-339-4181 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4447727. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Best Buy Co., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicole Susanne Frank, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Finzen, Bruce)
March 15, 2016 Filing 223 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO #253 NOTICE FILED 3/16/2016.....MOTION In Camera Treatment of Proposed Evidence filed by by Savannah River Nuclear Solutions, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pachter, John) Modified on 3/23/2016 (zrdj).
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of the volume of calls received by chambers seeking clarification in regard to the desired procedure for third-party motions requesting in camera / sealed consideration of documents produced for the upcoming preliminary injunction hearing, it is HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) non-parties who wish to file a motion for sealed consideration of documents produced to the parties that are currently listed on one or both parties' exhibit lists shall file a Motion to Intervene with their Motion for In Camera / Sealed Consideration as an attachment; (2) non-party Motions to Intervene shall otherwise be consistent with federal and local rules; (3) non-parties may file Motions to Intervene under seal without seeking leave to file the motion under seal; (4) non-parties shall meet and confer with the parties about whether any party opposes the non-parties' Motion for In Camera / Sealed Consideration of relevant exhibits; (5) non-parties shall redact from relevant exhibits only that information that is justified pursuant to the factors discussed in United States v. Hubbard, 650 F.2d 293, 317-22 (D.C. Cir. 1980) and other relevant points and authorities of law; (6) non-parties shall attach the exhibits at issue, with proper redactions, to their Motion for In Camera / Sealed Consideration; (7) non-parties shall submit one hard copy of the redacted documents to chambers in three-ring binders that are clearly tabbed and labeled no later than Friday, March 18 at 3:00 p.m. To the extent the parties' exhibit lists will include fewer potential exhibits from any non-party in light of the parties' Joint Motion Regarding Admissibility of Trial Exhibits, Docket No. 220, the parties are HEREBY ORDERED to inform relevant non-parties of third-party documents removed from their exhibit lists by no later than 11:59 p.m., Tuesday, March 15, 2016. Non-parties who have filed a Motion for In Camera / Sealed Treatment that does not comply with this Order shall withdraw their Motion and refile it consistent with this Order. Finally, due to the likelihood that this issue will be discussed at tomorrow's pre-hearing status conference, all interested third-parties are HEREBY ORDERED to ensure a representative who may speak on their behalf is present in Courtroom 24A at 9:30 a.m. Any non-party that is represented by a firm that does not have an office in the Washington, D.C. area may request permission to participate telephonically by emailing mark_coates@dcd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 15, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 15, 2016 Filing 222 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Defendants' Description of Video-Taped Deposition Testimony, #3 Certificate of Service)(Sullivan, Diane)
March 15, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 3/16/2016 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (mac)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The pre-hearing status conference scheduled for 10:00 a.m. on Wednesday March 16, 2016 shall now take place at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 24A. The Court regrets any inconvenience to the parties. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 15, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #204 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting #207 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting #213 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting #220 Motion for Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 15, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 15, 2016 Filing 221 DENIED PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED ON 03/16/216.....MOTION for Order for In Camera Treatment of Confidential Material by AMAZON.COM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Non-Party Amazon.Com, Inc.'s Motion for In Camera Treatment of Confidential Material, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for In Camera Treatment of Confidential Material, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Monts, William) Modified on 4/4/2016 (zjf).
March 15, 2016 Filing 220 Joint MOTION for Order Regarding Admissibility of Trial Exhibits by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Sullivan, Diane)
March 15, 2016 Filing 219 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen A. Mullen on behalf of JOHN DOE II CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Mullen, Kathleen)
March 15, 2016 Filing 218 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by JOHN DOE II CORPORATION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit A)(Mullen, Kathleen)
March 15, 2016 Filing 217 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO #227 .....Unopposed MOTION In Camera Treatment of its Confidential Materials Included on the Parties' Exhibit List by AMERICAN AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION (INC.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Evans, Philip) Modified on 3/16/2016 (jf).
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants request for an extension of time until 12:00 p.m. today to meet and confer with Plaintiffs regarding the Court's order pertaining to evidentiary objections to Exhibits. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 15, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 15, 2016 Filing 216 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,,,,, Directing Parties to Confer on Potential Evidentiary Disputes filed by STAPLES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sullivan, Diane)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties differing views on how to most efficiently resolve any potential evidentiary disputes to exhibits, including disputes regarding portions of exhibits that should be designated as confidential, the Court concludes that the following procedure is consistent with the fair administration of justice and serves the interests of judicial economy: (1) no later than Tuesday, March 15, 2016 at 7:00 p.m., the parties shall simultaneously disclose the witnesses they plan to call during the course of trial, the exhibits they plan to offer through each witness, and a brief statement of the evidentiary basis for each exhibit; (2) no later than Thursday, March 17, 2016 at 9:00 a.m., the parties shall file detailed objections, including relevant points and authorities of law, and proposed redactions to the exhibits identified; (3) no later than Friday, March 18, 2016 at 3:00 p.m., replies to any objections and proposed redactions shall be filed. This process will allow the Court to rule on all significant evidentiary issues before the start of trial. Any objections to this proposal shall be filed no later than 9:00 a.m. Tuesday, March 15, 2016. The Court will consider any alternative proposal to which the parties stipulate. See e.g. Case No. 15-1039, Docket No. 276. Any proposed stipulation must also be filed by Friday, March 18, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 14, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 14, 2016 Filing 215 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO #266 .....MOTION for Order Granting In Camera Treatment of Confidential Material by Windfall, Inc. (Haake, Jack) Modified on 3/21/2016 (jf).
March 14, 2016 Filing 214 NOTICE of Letter Submission Regarding Correspondence with Amazon.com, Inc. by STAPLES, INC. re #197 Order (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Perry, Jeffrey)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. On Monday, March, 14, 2016, Defendants and third-party Amazon sought clarification about whether the out-of-time deposition granted to Defendants was intended to be a 30(b)(6) witness or an individual percipient witness. See Order, Docket No. 182. After review of the parties' letters, the Court GRANTS Defendants' request that the individual deposed be prepared as a 30(b)(6) witness. The Court's Order specifies that the deposition shall be limited to new information learned by Defendants as a consequence of its Motion to Compel. To the extent that the new information disclosed as a result of Defendants' Motion requires knowledge of a corporate designee, it is only fair and in the interests of justice that the out-of-time deposition be a 30(b)(6) designee. The deposition shall take place no later than March 17, 2016 at 9:00 Pacific Time. The parties are hereby ordered to file the letters submitted to the Court for its review on the docket forthwith. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 14, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 14, 2016 Filing 213 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Letter to Judge Sullivan, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Loughlin, Charles A.)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER directing Defendants to file additional information about the 10 out-of-state witnesses for whom they propose introducing limited video-taped deposition testimony. Defendants shall file, no later than 3:00 p.m. Tuesday, March 15, 2016, the following: (1) the witness name; (2) position (3) affiliated company, and (4) a detailed proffer as to the substance of the testimony they wish to introduce by video during the upcoming hearing. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 14, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 14, 2016 Filing 212 ERRATA to Opposition to Motion to Introduce Videotaped Deposition Testimony by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service)(Reinhart, Tara)
March 14, 2016 Filing 211 Joint STATUS REPORT FOR MARCH 16, 2016 PRETRIAL HEARING by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Pre-Hearing Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Reinhart, Tara)
March 12, 2016 Filing 210 REPLY to opposition to motion re #206 MOTION to Introduce Limited Videotaped Deposition Testimony at Trial filed by STAPLES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sullivan, Diane)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER directing the parties to file a joint status report summarizing all issues that require discussion during the March 16, 2016 pre-trial status hearing. The status report shall be filed no later than 12:00 p.m. Monday, March 14, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 11, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #209 Motion for Briefing Schedule. Defendants must file their response, if any, to Plaintiffs OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO INTRODUCE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSTION TESTIMONY by 5:00 p.m. on Saturday, March 12, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 11, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 11, 2016 Filing 209 Emergency MOTION for Briefing Schedule (Expedited) for Defendants Motion to Introduce Limited Videotaped Deposition Testimony by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order Setting an Expedited Briefing Schedule, #2 Certificate of Service)(Reinhart, Tara)
March 11, 2016 Filing 208 Memorandum in opposition to re #206 MOTION to Introduce Limited Videotaped Deposition Testimony at Trial filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Emergency Motion for Expedited Briefing, #2 [Proposed] Order Setting Expedited Briefing Schedule, #3 Certificate of Service)(Reinhart, Tara)
March 11, 2016 Filing 207 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants' Exhibit List and to Modify the Case Management and Scheduling Order, #3 [Amended Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants' Exhibit List and to Modify the Case Management and Scheduling Order, #4 Reply Declaration of Stelios S. Xenakis, #5 Exhibits to Reply Declaration of Stelios S. Xenakis, #6 Certificate of Service)(Reinhart, Tara)
March 10, 2016 Filing 342 SEALED OPPOSITION filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC. re #341 SEALED MOTION to Strike Defendants' Exhibit List and to Modify the Case Management and Scheduling Order filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (zjf)
March 10, 2016 Filing 341 SEALED MOTION to Strike Defendants' Exhibit List and to Modify the Case Management and Scheduling Order filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf)
March 10, 2016 Filing 340 SEALED OPPOSITION filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. re #177 SEALED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (see docket entries #201 #202 to view exhibits (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (zjf) .
March 10, 2016 Filing 206 MOTION to Introduce Limited Videotaped Deposition Testimony at Trial by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Allison Brown, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Introduce Limited Videotaped Deposition Testimony at Trial, #6 Certificate of Service)(Sullivan, Diane)
March 10, 2016 Filing 205 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT by STAPLES, INC. (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Staples, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Non-Party Amazon.com, Inc., #2 Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery from Non-Party Amazon.com, Inc., #3 Declaration of Eric S. Hochstadt, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3 [Confidential], #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6-8 [Confidential], #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11-25 [Confidential], #13 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel Discovery, #14 Staples, Inc.'s Reply Brief in Support of the Motion to Compel Discovery from Non-Party Amazon.com, Inc., #15 Declaration of Eric S. Hochstadt, #16 Exhibit 1 [Confidential], #17 Certificate of Service)(Perry, Jeffrey)
March 10, 2016 Filing 204 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike and Modify, #2 Declaration of Andrew M. Lacy, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9)(Lacy, Andrew)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #203 Motion for Briefing Schedule. Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike no later than 5:00 p.m. Thursday, March 10, 2016. Plaintiffs' reply shall be filed no later than 12:00 p.m. Friday, March 11, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 10, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 10, 2016 Filing 203 Emergency MOTION for Briefing Schedule (Expedited) for Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendants Exhibit List and to Modify the Case Management and Scheduling Order by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order Setting an Expedited Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendants Exhibit List and to Modify the Case Management and Scheduling Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Reinhart, Tara)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #195 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting #199 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting #200 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting #201 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting #202 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 10, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part #190 Sealed Motion, consistent with the order entered at Docket No. 197. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 10, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 9, 2016 Filing 202 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DX0037, #2 Exhibit DX0039, #3 Exhibit DX0040, #4 Exhibit DX0041, #5 Exhibit DX0076, #6 Exhibit DX0077 Part 1, #7 Exhibit DX0077 Part 2, #8 Exhibit DX0077 Part 3, #9 Exhibit DX0077 Part 4, #10 Exhibit DX0079, #11 Exhibit DX0090, #12 Exhibit DX0092, #13 Exhibit DX0097, #14 Exhibit DX0098, #15 Exhibit DX0117, #16 Exhibit DX0122, #17 Exhibit DX0139, #18 Exhibit DX0150, #19 Exhibit DX0152, #20 Exhibit DX0156 Part 1, #21 Exhibit DX0156 Part 2, #22 Exhibit DX0156 Part 3, #23 Exhibit DX0198, #24 Exhibit DX0216, #25 Exhibit DX0217, #26 Exhibit DX0218, #27 Exhibit DX0301, #28 Exhibit DX0302, #29 Exhibit DX0304, #30 Exhibit DX0335, #31 Exhibit DX0336, #32 Exhibit DX0349, #33 Exhibit DX0351, #34 Exhibit DX0366, #35 Exhibit DX0367, #36 Exhibit DX0369, #37 Exhibit DX0370, #38 Exhibit DX0381, #39 Exhibit DX0389, #40 Exhibit DX0396, #41 Exhibit DX0397, #42 Exhibit DX0418, #43 Exhibit DX0475, #44 Exhibit DX0511, #45 Exhibit DX0541, #46 Exhibit DX0542, #47 Exhibit DX0550, #48 Exhibit DX0737, #49 Exhibit DX0984, #50 Exhibit DX0993)(Sullivan, Diane)
March 9, 2016 Filing 201 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DX0002, #2 Exhibit DX0004, #3 Exhibit DX0006, #4 Exhibit DX0007, #5 Exhibit DX0025, #6 Exhibit DX0029, #7 Exhibit DX0030, #8 Exhibit DX0032, #9 Exhibit DX0033, #10 Exhibit DX0034)(Sullivan, Diane)
March 9, 2016 Filing 200 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Motion to Strike Defendants' Exhibit List and to Modify the Case Management and Scheduling Order, #3 [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Strike Defendants' Exhibit List and to Modify the Case Management and Scheduling Order, #4 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike Defendants' Exhibit List and to Modify the Case Management and Scheduling Order, #5 Declaration of Stelios S. Xenakis, #6 Exhibits to the Declaration of Stelios S. Xenakis, #7 Certificate of Service)(Reinhart, Tara)
March 8, 2016 Filing 199 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, #2 Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Appendix A, #4 Appendix B, #5 Appendix C, #6 Appendix D, #7 Exhibit List to the Brief in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #8 Certificate of Service)(Sullivan, Diane)
March 8, 2016 Filing 198 Memorandum in opposition to re #141 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Amazon.com, Inc.'s Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel of Defendant Staples, Inc. filed by AMAZON.COM, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of William L. Monts in Support of Non-Party Amazon.com, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendant Staples, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery, #2 Declaration Declaration of Joel Dion in Support of Non-Party Amazon.com, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendant Staples, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery, #3 Declaration Declaration of Jeffrey Goldberg in Support of Non-Party Amazon.com, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendant Staples, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery, #4 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Monts, William)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER Supplementing March 4, 2016 Minute Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/7/16. (mac)
March 6, 2016 Filing 366 SEALED MOTION FOR SERVICE OF SUBPONEAS OUTSIDE THE DISTRICT AND BEYONDONE HUNDRED MILES, AS AUTHORIZED BY STATUTE filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf)
March 6, 2016 Filing 365 SEALED MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIESIN COMPLAINCE WITH THE COURTS SEALED ORDEROF MARCH 1, 2016 [DKT. NO. 185] filed by STAPLES, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf)
March 6, 2016 Filing 364 SEALED REPLY TO OPPOSITION re #362 SEALED Emergency Motion to Enforce the Case Management and Scheduling Order filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (zjf)
March 6, 2016 Filing 363 SEALED OPPOSITION filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION re #362 SEALED Emergency Motion to Enforce the Case Management and Scheduling Order filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (zjf)
March 6, 2016 Filing 362 SEALED Emergency Motion to Enforce the Case Management and Scheduling Order filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf)
March 6, 2016 Filing 196 NOTICE of Proposed Order Supplementing March 4, 2016 Minute Order by AMAZON.COM, INC., STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Perry, Jeffrey)
March 6, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' Motion for Service of Subpoenas outside the District and beyond one hundred miles, as authorized by statute. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 6, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 6, 2016 Filing 195 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Letter to Judge Sullivan, #3 Certificate of Service)(Loughlin, Charles A.)
March 6, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #184 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting #186 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting #191 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting #192 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting #193 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting #194 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 6, 2016. (lcegs4, )
March 4, 2016 Filing 194 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Motion for Service of Subpoenas Outside the District and Beyond One Hundred Miles, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Service of Subpoenas Outside the District and Beyond One Hundred Miles, #5 Certificate of Service)(Sullivan, Diane)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. As discussed at the March 4, 2016 hearing, the parties shall, no later than 1:00 p.m. Sunday, March 6, 2016, submit a proposed order consistent with the parties' agreements expressed at the hearing and the following Court rulings: (1) Defendants' Emergency Motion is DENIED. Plaintiffs may take limited out-of-time fact discovery related to Xerox, Wal-mart and Windstream. Defendants shall inform no later than Sunday, March 6, 2016 at 1:00 p.m. of any outstanding pre-trial discovery needs; (2) Defendants' Motion to Compel production of all draft Wilson Declarations is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Amazon shall produce the Wilson Declaration drafts. Amazon may redact comments that are internal in nature and do not reference the FTC's preferred language or requests. The emails related to the Wilson Declaration need not be produced; (3) Defendants' Motion to Compel production of unredacted copies of the documents produced by Amazon for the Court's in camera review is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The parties shall meet and confer regarding their agreement that unredacted documents shall be viewed by outside counsel and experts only, consistent with the Protective Order. The parties shall also consider a process whereby if any information originally redacted by Amazon is deemed relevant to be included in a pleading or exhibit, such that in-house counsel may view the information, Defendants shall inform Amazon at least two days prior to any disclosure to in-house counsel. The parties shall also finalize their agreement in principle that non-privileged information included in emails relating to Amazon's business strategy for the specified time periods and relating to the specified custodians be produced. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 4, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 4, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan: Status Conference held on 3/4/2016. (Court Reporter SCOTT WALLACE.) (mac)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Counsel of record not located in Washington, D.C. who wish to listen to the 11:00 a.m. hearing by phone may email mark_coates@dcd.uscourts.gov for call-in information. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 4, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon further consideration, the Court anticipates that the majority of issues discussed at the March 4, 2016 hearing will not need to be considered under seal. To the extent possible, the hearing will therefore be open to the public. The hearing will proceed Friday, March 4, in Courtroom 26A (Judge Kessler's Courtroom), not Courtroom 24A, at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 4, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 3, 2016 Filing 193 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, #2 Staples' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Compliance with the Court's Sealed Order of March 1, 2016, #3 Declaration of Eric S. Hochstadt, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Certificate of Service)(Anderson, Carrie)
March 3, 2016 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/4/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (mac)
March 3, 2016 Filing 192 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendants' Emergency Motion to Enforce the Case Management and Scheduling Order, #3 Reply Declaration of Allison Brown, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Certificate of Service)(Sullivan, Diane)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER directing Staples to file its brief pursuant to the Court's Order Under Seal no later than 3:00 p.m. on Thursday, March 3, 2016. The hearing is hereby rescheduled for Friday, March 4, 2015 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 24A. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 2, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Counsel for Staples, Inc., Amazon, Inc., and the FTC contacted chambers staff this evening to inform the Court that Staples did not receive notice of the sealed order for sealed briefing and the hearing scheduled for March 3, 2016. Under the circumstances, the hearing scheduled for March 3, 2016 is cancelled and the Court will issue a new briefing schedule on March 3, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 2, 2016. (lcegs1)
March 2, 2016 Filing 191 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Enforce CMSO, #3 Declaration of Ryan K. Quillian, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #12 Certificate of Service)(Reinhart, Tara)
March 2, 2016 Filing 190 SEALED MOTION filed by AMAZON.COM, INC., SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by AMAZON.COM, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service for Motion to Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, #3 Memorandum in Support Non-Party Amazon.com, Inc.'s Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Compliance with the Court's Sealed Order of March 1, 2016)(Monts, William)
March 2, 2016 Filing 189 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION re #185 Sealed Order, #184 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by AMAZON.COM, INC., STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Reinhart, Tara)
March 2, 2016 Filing 188 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Colwell on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Colwell, Peter)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER directing the FTC to file a response to Defendants' Emergency Motion to Enforce the Case Management and Scheduling Order no later than 5:00 p.m. on Wednesday, March 2, 2016. Defendants' Reply shall be filed no later than 10 a.m. Thursday, March 3, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on March 2, 2016. (lcegs4)
March 2, 2016 Filing 187 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Anne Jackson on behalf of DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Jackson, Catherine)
March 1, 2016 Filing 186 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Defendants' Emergency Motion to Enforce the Case Management and Scheduling Order, #3 Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Emergency Motion to Enforce the Case Management and Scheduling Order, #4 Declaration of Allison Brown, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Text of Proposed Order Granting Emergency Motion to Enforce the Case Management and Scheduling Order, #14 Certificate of Service)(Sullivan, Diane)
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 185 SEALED ORDER for sealed briefing and hearing. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 3/1/16.(zmac)
February 29, 2016 Filing 184 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by AMAZON.COM, INC., STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Joint Notice of Agreed Upon Proposed Public Version of Motion to Compel Discovery from Non-Party Amazon.com Briefing, #3 Motion to Compel Discovery from Non-Party Amazon.com, #4 Brief In Support of Motion to Compel Discovery, #5 Declaration of Eric S. Hochstadt, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 8, #14 Exhibit 9, #15 Exhibit 10, #16 Exhibit 11, #17 Exhibit 12, #18 Exhibit 13, #19 Exhibit 14, #20 Exhibit 15, #21 Exhibit 16, #22 Exhibit 17, #23 Exhibit 18, #24 Exhibit 19, #25 Exhibit 20, #26 Exhibit 21, #27 Exhibit 22, #28 Exhibit 23, #29 Exhibit 24, #30 Exhibit 25, #31 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel, #32 Certificate of Service, #33 Amazon.com, Inc.'s Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Compel, #34 Declaration of William L. Monts, #35 Declaration of Joel Dion, #36 Declaration of Jeffrey Goldberg, #37 Text of Proposed Order Denying Motion to Compel, #38 Certificate of Service, #39 Reply Brief in Support of Defendant Staples, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery, #40 Reply Declaration of Eric S. Hochstadt, #41 Exhibit 1, #42 Certificate of Service, #43 Certificate of Service of Joint Motion to File Under Seal the Proposed Agreed Upon Redacted Motion to Compel Briefing)(Perry, Jeffrey)
February 29, 2016 Filing 183 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,,, Defendant Staples' Response to the Court's February 17, 2016 Minute Order filed by STAPLES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wick, Ronald)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #181 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Adam S. Tolin is hereby admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 26, 2016. (lcegs4)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER granting #179 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 26, 2016. (lcegs4)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying Defendants Motion to Compel against Plaintiff, the Federal Trade Commission (FTC). Defendants argue that the FTC has failed to properly respond to its second Request for Production (RFP). Docket No. 165. For substantially the same reasons articulated by the FTC in its response brief, the Court concludes that the FTC has sufficiently complied with Defendants discovery requests. See generally, Docket No. 162. First, Defendants seek more information about the small supplier referenced by the FTC at an administrative hearing, from whom the FTC purchases some office supplies. Id. at 6-7. As context, the FTC explains that government agencies are required to purchase certain items from small, disadvantaged businesses. Id. at 7. Moreover, the FTC claims that no documents exist regarding the statement about purchases from a small supplier. Id. The Court cannot order production of documents that do not exist. Even if additional documents did exist, the Court is confident that the burden of production outweighs the likely benefit of the information sought. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(b)(1). Defendants also seek additional information explaining the data already produced by the FTC about its purchase of office supplies. Id. at 7-8. The FTC has produced data regarding all purchases of office supplies by purchase order, which includes the amount, the vendor, and more. Id. at 5. The FTC also produced data for its purchases of consumable office supplies through purchase cards. Id. at 6. Not satisfied with this information, Defendants seek information about office supply purchases from the FTCs regional offices. Docket No. 165 at 11. The FTC insists that it does not maintain information about its regional office purchases in the manner requested by Defendants. Docket No. 162 at 7. Under Rule 34, the FTC is only required to produce documents that it maintains in the ordinary course of business. Fed. R. Civ. P. 34(b)(2)(E)(i). For all of these reasons, the FTCs response to Defendants' second RFP is sufficient, and Defendants' Motion to Compel is DENIED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 26, 2016. (lcegs4)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #144 Staples' Motion to Compel against Amazon. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 26, 2016. (lcegs4)
February 23, 2016 Filing 181 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Adam S. Tolin, :Firm- Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP, :Address- 17 Hulfish Street, Princeton, NJ 08542. Phone No. - 609-986-1105. Fax No. - 609-986-119 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4423731. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Adam S. Tolin, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Diane)
February 23, 2016 MINUTE ORDER denying Defendants' Motions to Compel against non-parties Boston Childrens Hospital and New York-Presbyterian Healthcare System. Docket Nos. 156 and 166. Rule 45 governs issuance and compliance with subpoenas issued to non-parties in civil litigation. Fed. R. Civ. P. 45. The rule defines the issuing court as the court where the action is pending. Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 (a)(2). Subpoenas under Rule 45 must be issued from the issuing Court. Id. Compliance under Rule 45 for subpoenaed depositions or document production is limited to 100 miles of where the person resides, is employed, or regularly transacts business in person. Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 (c)(1)-(2). Motions to compel compliance with such subpoenas must be filed in the district where compliance is required. Fed. R. Civ. P. 45 (d)(2)(B)(i); see e.g. HT S.R.L v. Velasco, 15-MC-00177 (D.MD), 2015 WL 5120980, at*3 (D.D.C. August 28, 2015) (noting that a motion to compel compliance with a subpoena must be filed in the court for the district where compliance is required.); Google, Inc. v. Digital Citizens All., MC 15-00707 JEB/DAR, 2015 WL 4930979, at *2 (D.D.C. July 31, 2015) (noting that Rule 45, as amended in 2013, provides for the transfer for subpoena related motions from the court where compliance is required to the court where the underlying action is pending where the person subject to the subpoena consents or if the court finds exceptional circumstances.). Here, Defendants moved to compel compliance of Boston Childrens Hospital and New York-Presbyterian Healthcare System with subpoenas issued under Rule 45 in this Court, the issuing Court, where the underlying action is pending. Docket Nos. 156 and 166. The Court is aware of no authority permitting it to rule on the merits of the motions to compel, nor have Defendants cited any. Defs. Reply, Docket No. 172 at 1-2. As such, Defendants Motions to Compel against non-parties Boston Childrens Hospital and New York-Presbyterian Healthcare System are DENIED without prejudice to refiling in the appropriate jurisdiction. The Court notes that although the motions were filed under seal, this order is posted on the public docket because no information contained herein is confidential or otherwise subject to being filed under seal.(lcegs4)
February 23, 2016 Filing 180 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian C. Spahn on behalf of OFFICE DEPOT, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Spahn, Brian)
February 22, 2016 Filing 179 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Letter to Judge Sullivan, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal Submission, #3 Certificate of Service)(Perry, Jeffrey)
February 19, 2016 Filing 178 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT Redacted Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order re: Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, #3 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Memorandum in Support REDACTED Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Text of Proposed Order re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #6 Exhibit PX0001, #7 Exhibit PX0009, #8 Exhibit PX02001 - PX07222, #9 Exhibit PX08051, #10 Exhibit PX08063, #11 Exhibit PX08064, #12 Exhibit PX08065, #13 Certificate of Service)(Loughlin, Charles A.)
February 18, 2016 Filing 177 SEALED MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit List, #4 Exhibit PX0001-PX03002, #5 Exhibit PX03003-PX03007, #6 Exhibit X03008-PX03013, #7 Exhibit PX03014-PX03017, #8 Exhibit PX03018-PX03019, #9 Exhibit PX03020-PX03029, #10 Exhibit PX03030-PX03038, #11 Exhibit PX03040-PX03047, #12 Exhibit PX03055-PX04042, #13 Exhibit PX04044-PX04266, #14 Exhibit PX04294-PX04412, #15 Exhibit PX04414-PX04425, #16 Exhibit PX04463-PX05039, #17 Exhibit PX05042 - 1of2, #18 Exhibit PX05042 - 2of2, #19 Exhibit PX05155-PX05215, #20 Exhibit PX05221-PX05222, #21 Exhibit PX05229 - 1of4, #22 Exhibit PX05229 - 2of4, #23 Exhibit PX05229 - 3of4, #24 Exhibit PX05229 - 4of4, #25 Exhibit PX05233-PX05294, #26 Exhibit PX05311-PX05380, #27 Exhibit PX05393-PX05424, #28 Exhibit PX05427-PX07010, #29 Exhibit PX07028-PX07222, #30 Exhibit PX08051-PX08065)(znmw) Modified on 2/19/2016 (znmw).
February 18, 2016 Filing 176 NOTICE of Submission of Expert Certification by STAPLES, INC. (Anderson, Carrie)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Staples #158 Motion to Compel against Cornell University is moot in light of #170 Staples' withdrawing the motion. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 18, 2016. (lcegs4)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #164 , #167 , and #168 Sealed Motions for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 18, 2016. (lcegs4)
February 17, 2016 Filing 172 SEALED REPLY TO OPPOSITION filed by STAPLES, INC. re #156 SEALED MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Boston Children's Hospital (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Declaration Wise Reply Declaration; see also ECF No. 168, #2 Certificate of Service ; see also ECF No. 168)(Wick, Ronald) Modified link on 2/18/2016 (znmw).
February 17, 2016 Filing 171 SEALED REPLY TO OPPOSITION filed by STAPLES, INC. re #166 SEALED MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by NEW YORK PRESBYTERIAN HEALTH CARE SYSTEM (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Declaration De Leeuw Reply Decl; see also ECF No. 167, #2 Certificate of Service see also ECF No. 167)(Wick, Ronald) Modified link on 2/18/2016 (znmw).
February 17, 2016 Filing 170 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by STAPLES, INC. re #151 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Wick, Ronald)
February 17, 2016 Filing 169 REPLY to opposition to motion re #165 SEALED MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Comply with Second Set of Requests for Production filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andy Lacy, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Certificate of Service)(Lacy, Andrew) Modified link on 2/18/2016 (znmw).
February 17, 2016 Filing 168 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order granting motion to file under seal, #2 Memorandum in Support Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel, #3 Declaration Reply Declaration of Tamar Wise, #4 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Wick, Ronald)
February 17, 2016 Filing 167 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order granting motion to file under, #2 Memorandum in Support Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel, #3 Declaration Reply Declaration of Michael De Leeuq, #4 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Wick, Ronald)
February 17, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/29/2016 (mac)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER directing the FTC to meet and confer with opposing counsel no later than February 18, 2016 about any redactions necessary for the filing of a public version of its Memorandum in Support of the FTC's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. A public version of the Memorandum and supporting material shall be filed no later than 5:00 p.m. February 19, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 17, 2016. (lcegs4)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER vacating the Courts Order granting #141 Staples' Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Once fully briefed, Staples shall meet and confer with all parties against whom Motions to Compel have been filed with the goal of reaching consensus on which materials should be redacted from the public docket. Staples and all parties opposing the pending Motions to Compel shall file joint proposed redactions to all briefs and related material that pertain to the pending Motions to Compel. If full consensus on redactions cannot be reached, the parties shall file a joint status report no later than February 29, 2016, that includes: (1) any agreed upon redactions, and (2) an explanation from both parties, including points and authorities of law, specifying their disagreement about what material should be made public. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 17, 2016. (lcegs4)
February 16, 2016 Filing 175 SEALED OPPOSITION filed by NEW YORK PRESBYTERIAN HEALTH CARE SYSTEM re #166 SEALED MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by STAPLES, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(znmw)
February 16, 2016 Filing 174 SEALED OPPOSITION filed by BOSTON CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL re #156 SEALED MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by STAPLES, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(znmw)
February 16, 2016 Filing 173 SEALED REPLY TO OPPOSITION filed by STAPLES, INC. re #155 SEALED MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by STAPLES, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1)(znmw)
February 16, 2016 Filing 164 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order re: Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, #2 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Text of Proposed Order re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Exhibit Exhibit List re: Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #6 Exhibit PX0001-PX03002, #7 Exhibit PX03003-PX03007, #8 Exhibit PX03008-PX03013, #9 Exhibit PX03014-PX03017, #10 Exhibit PX03018-PX03019, #11 Exhibit PX03020-PX03029, #12 Exhibit PX03030-PX03038, #13 Exhibit PX03040-PX03047, #14 Exhibit PX03055-PX04042, #15 Exhibit PX04044-PX04266, #16 Exhibit PX04294-PX04412, #17 Exhibit PX04414-PX04425, #18 Exhibit PX04463-PX05039, #19 Exhibit PX05042 - 1of2, #20 Exhibit PX05042 - 2of2, #21 Exhibit PX05155-PX05215, #22 Exhibit PX05221-PX05222, #23 Exhibit PX05229 - 1of4, #24 Exhibit PX05229 - 2of4, #25 Exhibit PX05229 - 3of4, #26 Exhibit PX05229 - 4of4, #27 Exhibit PX05233-PX05294, #28 Exhibit PX05311-PX05380, #29 Exhibit PX05393-PX05424, #30 Exhibit PX05427-PX07010, #31 Exhibit PX07028-PX07222, #32 Exhibit PX08051-PX08065, #33 Certificate of Service)(Loughlin, Charles A.)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #154 , #161 , and #163 Motions for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 16, 2016. (lcegs4)
February 16, 2016 Filing 163 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by NEW YORK PRESBYTERIAN HEALTH CARE SYSTEM (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Memo in Opposition, #3 Text of Proposed Order Quashing Subpoena)(Gerson, Stuart)
February 16, 2016 Filing 162 Memorandum in opposition to re #152 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Haidee L. Schwartz, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certificate of Service)(Reinhart, Tara)
February 16, 2016 Filing 161 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by Boston Children's Hospital (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Boston Children's Hospital's Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Memorandum in Support of Boston Children's Hospital's Opposition to Defendant Staples, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery, #3 Declaration of Steven M. Veenema, #4 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Steven M. Veenema, #5 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Steven M. Veenema, #6 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Steven M. Veenema, #7 Text of Proposed Order Denying Defendant Staples, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery from Non-Party Boston Children's Hospital, #8 Certificate of Service)(Scruggs, Stephanie)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #159 #160 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Theodore J. Folkman and Steven M. Veenema are hereby admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 16, 2016. (lcegs4)
February 16, 2016 Filing 160 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Steven M. Veenema, :Firm- Murphy & King P.C., :Address- One Beacon Street, Boston, MA 02108. Phone No. - 617-423-0400. Fax No. - 617-423-0498 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4413789. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Boston Children's Hospital (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Steven M. Veenema, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice)(Scruggs, Stephanie)
February 16, 2016 Filing 159 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Theodore J. Folkman, :Firm- Murphy & King, P.C., :Address- One Beacon Street, Boston, MA 02108. Phone No. - 617-423-0400. Fax No. - 617-423-0498 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4413746. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by Boston Children's Hospital (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Theodore J. Folkman, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice)(Scruggs, Stephanie)
February 16, 2016 Filing 157 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie D. Scruggs on behalf of Boston Children's Hospital (Scruggs, Stephanie)
February 15, 2016 Filing 154 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery from Non-Party Amazon.com, #3 Declaration of Eric S. Hochstadt, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Certificate of Service)(Perry, Jeffrey)
February 14, 2016 Filing 166 SEALED MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by STAPLES, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(znmw)
February 14, 2016 Filing 165 SEALED MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Comply with Second Set of Requests for Production filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14)(znmw)
February 14, 2016 Filing 158 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED 2/17/2018..... SEALED MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by STAPLES, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(znmw) Modified on 2/18/2016 (znmw).
February 14, 2016 Filing 156 SEALED MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by STAPLES, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(znmw)
February 14, 2016 Filing 155 SEALED MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by STAPLES, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Text of Proposed Order)(znmw)
February 14, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #141 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting #150 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting #151 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting #152 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting #153 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 14, 2016. (lcegs4) Modified on 2/17/2016, VACATING MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #141 PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED ON 02/17/2016.....(jf).
February 14, 2016 Opinion or Order MNUTE ORDER directing Plaintiff Federal Trade Commission and non-parties New York Presbyterian Health Care System, Cornell University, and Boston Children's Hospital to respond to Defendants' Motions to Compel no later than 5:00 p.m. Tuesday, February 16, 2016. Defendants shall file their replies no later than 5:00 p.m. Wednesday, Febrauary 17, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 14, 2016. (lcegs4)
February 14, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #146 , #147 , and #148 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. John J. Sullivan, Michael B. de Leeuw, and Tamar S. Wise are hereby admitted pro had vice. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 14, 2016. (lcegs4)
February 13, 2016 Filing 153 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Motion to Compel, #3 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel, #4 Declaration of Michael de Leeuw, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel, #12 Certificate of Service)(Wick, Ronald)
February 12, 2016 Filing 152 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Motion to Compel, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Declaration of Andy Lacy, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 8, #14 Exhibit 9, #15 Exhibit 10, #16 Exhibit 11, #17 Exhibit 12, #18 Exhibit 13, #19 Exhibit 14)(Lacy, Andrew)
February 12, 2016 Filing 151 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 MTC Discovery, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Declaration, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(Wick, Ronald)
February 12, 2016 Filing 150 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 MTC Discovery, #3 Memorandum in Support ISO MTC Discovery, #4 Declaration ISO MTC Discovery, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Text of Proposed Order PO Granting MTC Discovery, #11 Certificate of Service)(Wick, Ronald)
February 12, 2016 Filing 149 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald F. Wick on behalf of STAPLES, INC. (Wick, Ronald)
February 12, 2016 Filing 148 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Tamar S. Wise, :Firm- Cozen O'Connor, :Address- 277 Park Avenue, New York, NY 10172. Phone No. - 212-883-4924. Fax No. - 646-461-2054 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4412331. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Tamar S. Wise, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice)(Sullivan, Diane)
February 12, 2016 Filing 147 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael B. de Leeuw, :Firm- Cozen O'Connor, :Address- 45 Broadway, New York, NY 10006. Phone No. - 212-908-1331. Fax No. - 212-509-9492 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4412330. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Michael B. de Leeuw, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice)(Sullivan, Diane)
February 12, 2016 Filing 146 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- John J. Sullivan, :Firm- Cozen O'Connor, :Address- 45 Broadway, New York, NY 10006. Phone No. - 212-453-3729. Fax No. - 212-509-9492 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4412309. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John J. Sullivan, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Pro Hac Vice)(Sullivan, Diane)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #143 Non-Party Amazon.com, Inc's motion to file those portions of its response to defendant Staple's motion to compel under seal as set forth in Non-Party Amazon.com, Inc's motion. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 12, 2016. (lcegs1)
February 12, 2016 Filing 143 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by AMAZON.COM, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Non-Party Amazon.Com Inc.'s Motion to File Response To Defendant Staples Motion to Compel Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Denying Defendant Staples, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery From Non-Party Amazon.Com, Inc., #3 Amazon.Com, Inc's Memorandum In Opposition to Motion to Compel of Defendant Staples, Inc., #4 Declaration Declaration of William L. Monts III, #5 Declaration Declaration of Joel Dion, #6 Declaration Declaration of Jeffrey Goldberg, #7 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Robertson, J.)
February 12, 2016 Filing 142 NOTICE of Appearance by William Leitzsey Monts, III on behalf of AMAZON.COM, INC. (Monts, William)
February 11, 2016 Filing 145 SEALED LARGE ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT (EXHIBIT 8 MAIN DOCUMENT) filed by STAPLES, INC.. re #144 SEALED MOTION filed by STAPLES, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by STAPLES, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9, #2 Exhibit 10, #3 Exhibit 11, #4 Exhibit 12, #5 Exhibit 13, #6 Exhibit 14, #7 Exhibit 15, #8 Exhibit 16, #9 Exhibit 17, #10 Exhibit 18, #11 Exhibit 19, #12 Exhibit 20, #13 Exhibit 21, #14 Exhibit 22, #15 Exhibit 23, #16 Exhibit 24, #17 Exhibit 25)(ztd)
February 11, 2016 Filing 144 SEALED MOTION filed by STAPLES, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Declaration Eric S. Hochstadt, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7)(ztd)
February 11, 2016 Filing 141 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Motion to Compel Discovery from Non-Party Amazon.com, Inc. [Proposed Redacted Public Version], #3 Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery from Non-Party Amazon.com, Inc. [Proposed Redacted Public Version], #4 Declaration of Eric S. Hochstadt [Proposed Redacted Public Version], #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14, #19 Exhibit 15, #20 Exhibit 16, #21 Exhibit 17, #22 Exhibit 18, #23 Exhibit 19, #24 Exhibit 20, #25 Exhibit 21, #26 Exhibit 22, #27 Exhibit 23, #28 Exhibit 24, #29 Exhibit 25, #30 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel Discovery from Non-Party Amazon.com, Inc. [Proposed Redacted Version], #31 Certificate of Service)(Perry, Jeffrey)
February 11, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amazon.com Inc. Response To Defendants' Motion To Compel due 2/12/2016 by 5:00pm. Defendants Reply due 2/15/2016 by 5:00pm. (mac)
February 11, 2016 Filing 140 NOTICE of Second Supplemental Submission of Expert Certifications by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. (Lacy, Andrew)
February 11, 2016 Filing 139 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by STAPLES, INC. to Compel Discovery from Non-Party Canon USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Withdrawal of Motion to Compel Discovery from Non-Party Canon USA, Inc.)(Perry, Jeffrey)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER directing Amazon.com, Inc. to respond to Defendants' Motion to Compel no later than 5:00 p.m. Friday, February 12, 2016. Defendants shall reply no later than 5:00 p.m. Monday, February 15, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 11, 2016. (lcegs4)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #138 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 11, 2016. (lcegs4)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #136 and #137 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Michael Lindsay and Jonathan Montcalm are hereby admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 11, 2016. (lcegs4)
February 11, 2016 Filing 138 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Motion to Compel Discovery from Non-Party Amazon.com, Inc., #3 Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery from Non-Party Amazon.com, Inc., #4 Declaration of Eric S. Hochstadt, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14, #19 Exhibit 15, #20 Exhibit 16, #21 Exhibit 17, #22 Exhibit 18, #23 Exhibit 19, #24 Exhibit 20, #25 Exhibit 21, #26 Exhibit 22, #27 Exhibit 23, #28 Exhibit 24, #29 Exhibit 25, #30 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel Discovery from Non-Party Amazon.com, Inc., #31 Certificate of Service)(Perry, Jeffrey)
February 10, 2016 Filing 137 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jonathan Montcalm, :Firm- Dorsey & Whitney LLP, :Address- 51 West 52nd Street, New York, New York, 10019. Phone No. - (212) 415-9347. Fax No. - (212) 953-7201 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4409377. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CANON U.S.A., INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Montcalm, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Magid, Creighton)
February 10, 2016 Filing 136 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael Lindsay, :Firm- Dorsey & Whitney LLP, :Address- 50 South Sixth Street, Suite 1500, Minneapolis, MN 55402-1498. Phone No. - (612) 340-7819. Fax No. - (612) 340-2868 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4409374. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CANON U.S.A., INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Lindsay, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Magid, Creighton)
February 10, 2016 Filing 135 NOTICE of Appearance by Creighton R. Magid on behalf of CANON U.S.A., INC. (Magid, Creighton)
February 10, 2016 Filing 134 SEALED MOTION to Compel filed by STAPLES, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(zjf)
February 10, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Canon USA Response To Staples #133 Motion to Compel due on 2/11/2016 by 12:00pm. Staples Reply due on 2/12/2016 by 12:00 PM. (mac)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #133 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 10, 2016. (lcegs4)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER directing Canon USA, Inc. to respond to Staples' #133 Motion to Compel no later than 12:00 p.m. Thursday, February 11, 2016. Staples' reply shall be filed no later than 12:00 p.m. Friday, February 12, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 10, 2016. (lcegs4)
February 9, 2016 Filing 133 WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO DOCKET ENTRY NO. #139 . . . .SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Motion to Compel Discovery from Non-Party Canon USA, Inc., #3 Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery, #4 Declaration of Christopher Barraza in Support of Motion to Compel Discovery, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel Discovery from Non-Party Canon USA, Inc., #11 Certificate of Service)(Sullivan, Diane) Modified on 2/12/2016 (ztd).
February 8, 2016 Filing 132 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL SUBMISSION OF EXPERT CERTIFICATIONS by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lacy, Andrew)
February 8, 2016 Filing 131 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Gris on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gris, Benjamin)
February 5, 2016 Filing 130 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah L Feinstein on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Feinstein, Deborah)
February 5, 2016 Filing 129 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF EXPERT CERTIFICATIONS by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lacy, Andrew)
February 4, 2016 Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy Katharine Arends on behalf of OFFICE DEPOT, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Arends, Wendy)
February 4, 2016 Filing 127 NOTICE of Submission of Expert Certifications by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Loughlin, Charles A.)
February 2, 2016 Filing 126 NOTICE of Appearance by Markus H. Meier on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Meier, Markus)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER informing the parties that chambers received a call from an individual representing himself as an investor in Office Depot. The individual sought guidance on how to inform the Court of a settlement proposal crafted by the investor. The individual was advised to consult with an attorney. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on February 2, 2016. (lcegs4)
February 1, 2016 Filing 125 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Goodman on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Goodman, Joshua)
February 1, 2016 Filing 124 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristian Sjoberg Rogers on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rogers, Kristian)
January 29, 2016 Filing 123 NOTICE of Appearance by Dominic Vote on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Vote, Dominic)
January 29, 2016 Filing 122 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by STAPLES, INC. re #119 MOTION to Compel Sprint Corporation (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Carrie)
January 29, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: Sprint Response To Defendants' Motion To Compel due by 4:00 PM on 2/1/2016. Defendants Reply due by 1:00 PM on 2/2/2016. (mac)
January 29, 2016 Filing 121 ERRATA Amended Certificate of Service by STAPLES, INC. #119 MOTION to Compel Sprint Corporation filed by STAPLES, INC.. (Anderson, Carrie)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #120 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Jason M. Bussey is hereby admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on January 29, 2015. (lcegs4)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER directing Sprint to file its response to Defendants' Motion to Compel no later than 4:00 p.m. Monday, February 1, 2016. Defendants shall file their reply no later than 1:00 p.m. Tuesday, February 2, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on January 29, 2016. (lcegs4)
January 28, 2016 Filing 120 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jason M. Bussey, :Firm- Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP, :Address- 2475 Hanover St., Palo Alto, CA 94304. Phone No. - (650) 251-5272. Fax No. - (650) 251-5002 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4392924. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by OFFICE DEPOT, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Declaration, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lacy, Andrew)
January 28, 2016 Filing 119 MOTION to Compel Sprint Corporation by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(Anderson, Carrie)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER clarifying that any consultants for Defendants or Plaintiffs shall submit to the Court a signed agreement acknowledging that they are bound by the terms of the Protective Order. To protect confidentiality, the parties are permitted to submit the signed agreements directly to chambers. Any such submissions shall be accompanied by a notice on the docket indicating the date and time the submissions were delivered or postmarked. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on January 27, 2016. (lcegs4)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part Lowe's #94 #97 Motion to Modify the Protective Order. First, Lowe's seeks to extend the ban on in-house counsel from giving competitive decision making advice from July 2017 to December 2017. In light of the current provisions of the protective order that prohibit and penalize misuse of information by in-house counsel, and because Lowe's has not articulated a persuasive rationale for this extension of time, this modification is DENIED. Second, Lowe's seeks to explicitly forbid in-house counsel from printing, saving or otherwise storing information accessible to them. Docket No. 94 at 6. The Modified Protective Order states that "in house counsel... may review documents". Docket No. 59 at 5. Review of documents, by definition, does not include printing or saving. As such, any use of material by designated in-house counsel that extends beyond "review" is forbidden and would constitute a "knowing" violation subject to a fine of up to $250,000.00. See Docket No. 59 at 5. For these reasons, to the extent Lowe's motion seeks to explicitly prohibit in-house counsel from printing or saving material, the motion is DENIED as moot. Finally, Lowe's seeks to require that all consultants sign an agreement acknowledging they are bound by the terms of the Protective Order. Requiring consultants to sign such an agreement acknowledging their obligations under the Protective Order is of little burden to Defendants and helps ensure such consultants are fully apprised of their duties in this case. Lowe's motion to require consultants to sign such an agreement is therefore GRANTED. Defendants shall post signed agreements from their consultants within 10 days of this order being posted. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on January 26, 2016. (lcegs4)
January 25, 2016 Filing 118 SEALED REPLY TO OPPOSITION filed by JOHN DOE re #99 SEALED MOTION filed by JOHN DOE. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (znmw)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #99 John Doe's Motion to Modify the Protective Order. John Doe's concerns about commercial retaliation are speculative. Univ. of Mass. v. Roslin Inst., 437 F. Supp. 2d 57, 60 (D.D.C. 2006)("[G]ood cause [for a protective order] is only established when the movant demonstrates that disclosure would cause a clearly defined and serious injury.") Moreover, current provisions of the Protective Order include significant penalties for misuse of confidential information. See Docket No. 59. Defendants' need to prepare for trial under severe time constraints outweighs the proffered harm cited by John Doe. See e.g. Fed. Trade Comm'n v. Sysco Corp., 83 F. Supp. 3d 271, 274 (D.D.C. 2015). Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on January 25, 2016. (lcegs4)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #117 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on January 25, 2016. (lcegs4) Modified event title on 1/26/2016 (znmw).
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. For substantially the same reasons advanced by Defendants in their response brief, the American Automobile Association's #91 objection to the Protective Order is DENIED. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on January 25, 2016. (lcegs4)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The #110 Memorandum and Opinion and related order were designated as under seal, but inadvertently filed on the public docket. However, the Court is not aware of any confidential information that was published in the opinion. The parties may inform the Court of any information they believe should be redacted no later than 4:00 p.m. Tuesday January 26, 2016. By the same time, the parties shall file any objection to the relevant motion, response an reply being published on the public docket. Going forward, filings shall not be made under seal absent compelling reasons consistent with D.C. Circuit precedent Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on January 25, 2016. (lcegs4)
January 22, 2016 Filing 117 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by JOHN DOE (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Under Seal, #2 Sealed Reply in Further Support of Motion for Entry of Protective Order)(Iverson, Brian)
January 22, 2016 Filing 116 SEALED RESPONSE filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC.. re #91 Objection to modified protective order filed by AMERICAN AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION (INC.). (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(znmw)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #113 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on January 22, 2016. (lcegs4)
January 21, 2016 Filing 115 SEALED OPPOSITION filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. re #99 SEALED MOTION for Protective Order filed by JOHN DOE. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (znmw)
January 21, 2016 Filing 114 SEALED OPPOSITION filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. re #97 MOTION to Modify the Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(znmw)
January 21, 2016 Filing 113 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Response to Objection of AAA to Modified Protective Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Certificate of Service)(Anderson, Carrie)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #111 and #112 Sealed Motions for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on January 21, 2016. (lcegs4)
January 21, 2016 Filing 112 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Opposition to John Doe's Motion)(Lacy, Andrew)
January 21, 2016 Filing 111 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Opposition to Lowe's Motion to Modify Protective Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Lacy, Andrew)
January 21, 2016 Filing 110 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION denying #64 Defendants' Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on January 21, 2016. (lcegs4)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER denying #64 Defendants' Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on January 21, 2016. (lcegs4)
January 21, 2016 Filing 108 RESPONSE re #94 MOTION to Modify the Protective Order, #99 SEALED MOTION filed by JOHN DOE. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Reinhart, Tara)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER directing the parties to respond to the pending third-party motions to modify the protective order [Docket Nos. 94 and 99]. All responses shall be filed no later than 4:00 p.m. Thursday, January 21, 2016. All replies shall be filed no later than 4:00 p.m. Friday, January 22, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on January 20, 2016. (lcegs4)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #104 and #105 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Gabriel Rottman and Mark Hancock are hereby admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on January 20, 2016. (lcegs4)
January 20, 2016 Filing 107 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan held on 12-17-15; Page Numbers: (1-46). Date of Issuance:12-18-15. Court Reporter/Transcriber Scott Wallace, Telephone number 202-354-3196, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 2/10/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/20/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/19/2016.(Wallace, Scott)
January 20, 2016 Filing 106 NOTICE of Appearance by Noah Pinegar on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Pinegar, Noah)
January 19, 2016 Filing 105 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Mark W. Hancock, :Firm- Godfrey & Kahn S.C., :Address- One E. Main St., P.O. Box 2719, Madison, WI 53701. Phone No. - (608) 284-2251. Fax No. - (608) 257-0609 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4383432. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by OFFICE DEPOT, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Lacy, Andrew)
January 19, 2016 Filing 104 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Gabriel Rottman, :Firm- Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP, :Address- 900 G Street, NW Washington DC 20001. Phone No. - (202) 636-5571. Fax No. - (202) 636-5502 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4383430. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by OFFICE DEPOT, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Lacy, Andrew)
January 19, 2016 Filing 103 SEALED DOCUMENT (Exhibits 1-4 to Stelios S. Xenakis Declaration) filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. re #102 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(znmw)
January 19, 2016 Filing 102 Memorandum in opposition to re #64 SEALED MOTION filed by STAPLES, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stelios S. Xenakis, #2 Declaration Ginger Z. Jin, #3 Declaration of Deborah L. Feinstein)(znmw)
January 19, 2016 Filing 101 SEALED DOCUMENT (Exhibit A) filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC.. re #100 Reply to opposition to Motion filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(znmw)
January 19, 2016 Filing 100 REPLY to opposition to motion re #64 SEALED MOTION to Compel filed by STAPLES, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC.. (znmw)
January 19, 2016 Filing 99 SEALED MOTION for Protective Order filed by JOHN DOE. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(znmw)
January 19, 2016 Filing 98 SEALED DOCUMENT (Letter) filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(znmw)
January 19, 2016 Filing 97 MOTION to Modify the Protective Order by LOWE'S COMPANIES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Proposed Modifications, #2 Exhibit B: Proposed Order)(Taylor, Wendell)
January 19, 2016 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Wendell Landray Taylor on behalf of LOWE'S COMPANIES, INC. (Taylor, Wendell)
January 19, 2016 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #93 Notice of Appearance was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading with the correct attorney's password. (td)
January 18, 2016 Filing 95 RESPONSE to Discovery Request from Staples, Inc. by ECOLAB INC.(Kelley, Toyja)
January 15, 2016 Filing 94 MOTION to Modify the Protective Order by LOWE'S COMPANIES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Proposed Modifications, #2 Exhibit B: Proposed Order)(Hauser, Brian)
January 15, 2016 Filing 93 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . NOTICE of Appearance by Brian C. Hauser on behalf of LOWE'S COMPANIES, INC. (Hauser, Brian) Modified on 1/19/2016 (td).
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs are hereby ordered to submit a random sampling of documents identified on its privilege log, Docket No. 66-3 at 6-12, for the Courts in camera review. The sample shall include every tenth document identified on the privilege log. Plaintiffs shall ensure that a representative sample of all types and styles of memoranda accounted for on the privilege log are produced. Put another way, if a unique type of memorandum is excluded in the random sampling produced, Plaintiffs shall submit a representative example of the excluded memorandum, in addition to the random sample. Plaintiff shall deliver the representative sample to Judge Sullivans chambers no later than 4:00 p.m. Tuesday, January 19, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on January 15, 2016. (lcegs4)
January 15, 2016 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan H. Wantland on behalf of STAPLES, INC. (Wantland, Megan)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #77 , #78 , #79 , #80 , #81 , #82 , #83 , #84 , #85 , #86 , #87 , #88 , #89 , #90 . Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on January 15, 2016. Attorneys Steven K. Bernstein, Theodore E. Tsekerides, Patrick J. O'Toole, Brianne L Kucerik, Robert T. Vlasis, John O'Connor, Jacob B. Ebin, Jonathan Cheng, Gary A. Coad, Christopher M. Pepe, James Salder, Caroline Toole, Sara Lonks and William A. Brewer are hereby admitted pro hac vice. (lcegs4)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #66 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting #67 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting #68 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal; granting #71 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on January 15, 2016. (lcegs4)
January 15, 2016 Filing 91 RESPONSE re #59 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order filed by AMERICAN AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION (INC.). (Evans, Philip)
January 15, 2016 Filing 90 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- William A. Brewer, :Firm- Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP, :Address- 767 Fifth Ave., New York, NY 10153. Phone No. - 212-310-8826. Fax No. - 212-310-8007 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4380190. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of William A. Brewer, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Diane)
January 15, 2016 Filing 89 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Sara Lonks, :Firm- Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP, :Address- 767 Fifth Ave., New York, NY 10153. Phone No. - 212-310-8531. Fax No. - 212-310-8007 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4380189. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sara Lonks, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Diane)
January 15, 2016 Filing 88 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Caroline Toole, :Firm- Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP, :Address- 767 Fifth Ave., New York, NY 10153. Phone No. - 212-310-8347. Fax No. - 212-310-8007 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4380181. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Caroline Toole, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Diane)
January 15, 2016 Filing 87 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- James Sadler, :Firm- Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP, :Address- 1300 Eye Street NW, Suite 900, Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - 202-682-7156. Fax No. - 202-857-0940 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4380134. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James Sadler, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Diane)
January 15, 2016 Filing 86 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Christopher M. Pepe, :Firm- Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP, :Address- 1300 Eye Street NW, Suite 900, Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - 202-682-7153. Fax No. - 202-857-0940 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4380125. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Christopher M. Pepe, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Diane)
January 15, 2016 Filing 85 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Gary A. Coad, :Firm- Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP, :Address- 1300 Eye Street NW, Suite 900, Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - 202-682-7146. Fax No. - 202-857-0940 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4380114. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Gary A. Coad, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Diane)
January 15, 2016 Filing 84 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jonathan Cheng, :Firm- Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP, :Address- 1300 Eye Street NW, Suite 900, Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - 202-682-7248. Fax No. - 202-857-0940 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4380102. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jonathan Cheng, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Diane)
January 15, 2016 Filing 83 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jacob B. Ebin, :Firm- Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP, :Address- 767 Fifth Ave., New York, NY 10153. Phone No. - 212-310-8516. Fax No. - 212-310-8007 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4380092. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Jacob B. Ebin, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Diane)
January 15, 2016 Filing 82 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- John O'Connor, :Firm- Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP, :Address- 200 Crescent Ct. #300, Dallas, TX 75201. Phone No. - 214-746-7715. Fax No. - 214-746-7777 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4380075. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John O'Connor, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Diane)
January 15, 2016 Filing 81 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robert T. Vlasis, :Firm- Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP, :Address- 1300 Eye Street NW, Suite 900, Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - 202-682-7024. Fax No. - 202-857-0940 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4380058. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Robert T. Vlasis, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Diane)
January 15, 2016 Filing 80 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Brianne L. Kucerik, :Firm- Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP, :Address- 1300 Eye Street NW, Suite 900, Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - 202-682-7034. Fax No. - 202-857-0940 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4380040. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Brianne L. Kucerik, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Diane)
January 15, 2016 Filing 79 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Patrick J. O'Toole, :Firm- Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP, :Address- 100 Federal Street, Floor 34, Boston, MA 02110. Phone No. - 617-772-8365. Fax No. - 617-772-8333 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4380032. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Patrick J. O'Toole, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Diane)
January 15, 2016 Filing 78 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Theodore E. Tsekerides, :Firm- Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP, :Address- 767 Fifth Ave., New York, NY 10153. Phone No. - 212-310-8218. Fax No. - 212-310-8007 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4379976. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Theodore E. Tsekerides, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Diane)
January 15, 2016 Filing 77 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Steven K. Bernstein, :Firm- Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP, :Address- 1300 Eye Street NW, Suite 900, Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - 202-682-7502. Fax No. - 202-857-0940 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4379950. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Steven Bernstein, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Diane)
January 15, 2016 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Anne Granger on behalf of STAPLES, INC. (Granger, Megan)
January 15, 2016 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D. Barraza on behalf of STAPLES, INC. (Barraza, Christopher)
January 15, 2016 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Holly Elizabeth Loiseau on behalf of STAPLES, INC. (Loiseau, Holly)
January 14, 2016 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Richard Iverson on behalf of JOHN DOE (Iverson, Brian)
January 14, 2016 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan Iorianni on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Iorianni, Meghan)
January 14, 2016 Filing 71 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order of Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Memorandum in Support of Reply to Defendants' Motion to Compel, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Certificate of Service)(Anderson, Carrie)
January 14, 2016 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Robert Robertson on behalf of AMAZON.COM, INC. (Robertson, J.)
January 14, 2016 Filing 69 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by John Doe re #68 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by John Doe (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Iverson, Brian)
January 13, 2016 Filing 68 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by John Doe (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Under Seal, #2 Sealed Motion for Protective Order, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order, #4 Sealed Memorandum In Support of Motion for Entry of Protective Order, #5 Exhibit A - Defendant's Letter to John Doe)(Iverson, Brian)
January 13, 2016 Filing 67 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter Submission For Under Seal, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Lacy, Andrew)
January 12, 2016 Filing 66 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order of Motion to Seal, #2 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel, #3 Declaration of Stelios S. Xenakis, #4 Declaration of Ginger Z. Jin, #5 Declaration of Deborah L. Feinstein, #6 Certificate of Service)(Reinhart, Tara)
January 11, 2016 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Neely on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Neely, Joseph)
January 11, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines: FTC Response To Defendants' Motion to Compel due by 12:00 PM on 1/12/2016. Defendants Reply due by 12:00 PM on 1/14/2016. (mac)
January 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MINUTE ORDER granting #59 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on January 10, 2016. (lcegs4)
January 10, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #60 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on January 10, 2016. (lcegs4)
January 10, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #61 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Evan I. Cohen is hereby admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on January 9, 2016. (lcegs4)
January 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTE ORDER directing the FTC to file a response to Defendants' Motion to Compel no later than 12:00 p.m. on January 12, 2016. Defendants shall file a reply no later than 12:00 p.m. on January 14, 2016. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on January 9, 2016. (lcegs4)
January 8, 2016 Filing 64 SEALED Motion to Compel filed by STAPLES, INC.. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(zjf)
January 8, 2016 Filing 61 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Evan I. Cohen, :Firm- Finn Dixon & Herling LLP, :Address- 177 Broad Street, Stamford, CT 06901. Phone No. - (203) 325-5069. Fax No. - (203) 325-5001 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4370917. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by OFFICE DEPOT, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit, #3 Certificate of Service)(Lacy, Andrew)
January 7, 2016 Filing 60 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by STAPLES, INC. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order of Motion to Seal, #2 Motion to Compel, #3 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel, #4 Text of Proposed Order of Motion to Compel, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Certificate of Service)(Anderson, Carrie)
January 7, 2016 Filing 59 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Anderson, Carrie)
January 5, 2016 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Masters on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Masters, Ashley)
January 5, 2016 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen W. Rodger on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rodger, Stephen)
December 30, 2015 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Zuver, Jr. on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Zuver, Jr., Robert E.)
December 28, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: Fact Discovery due by 2/12/2016. Plaintiffs' Brief In Support Of Preliminary Injunction due by 2/16/2016. Defendants Brief In Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion For Preliminary Injunction due by 3/8/2016. Motions In Limine due by 3/14/2016. Expert Discovery due by 3/15/2016. Joint Pretrial Statement due by 3/16/2016. Plaintiffs' Reply In Support of Motion For Preliminary Injunction due by 3/17/2016. (mac)
December 24, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #54 Motion for Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 24, 2015. (lcegs4)
December 23, 2015 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Helder Agostinho on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Agostinho, Helder)
December 23, 2015 Filing 54 Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Case Management and Scheduling Order by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Reinhart, Tara)
December 23, 2015 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Norman Wesley Marden on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA (Marden, Norman)
December 23, 2015 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly A. Horne on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Horne, Kelly)
December 23, 2015 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Lewis on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lewis, Amanda)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #39 Motion for Scheduling Order. The parties shall submit an amended Joint Motion for a Scheduling Order consistent with the following: (1) the language "Plaintiffs and Defendants will split the hearing time equally between sides" in paragraph 17 shall be replaced with "Plaintiffs and Defendants will be granted a full and fair opportunity to present their case in a non-cumulative fashion."; (2) the language "14 days" in paragraph 16 shall be replaced with "10 days"; (3) the parties shall include a provision noting that approximately one week after proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law are submitted, the parties shall appear for a final summation of the parties' argument. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 23, 2015. (lcegs4)
December 22, 2015 Filing 50 ANSWER to #3 Complaint, by OFFICE DEPOT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lacy, Andrew)
December 22, 2015 Filing 49 ANSWER to #3 Complaint, by STAPLES, INC..(Sullivan, Diane)
December 22, 2015 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Smith on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Smith, Joshua)
December 22, 2015 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Angel Prado on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Prado, Angel)
December 22, 2015 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas H. Brock on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Brock, Thomas)
December 22, 2015 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberley G. Biagioli on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Biagioli, Kimberley)
December 22, 2015 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Rohan Pai on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Pai, Rohan)
December 22, 2015 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by David E. Owyang on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Owyang, David)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #40 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Eric J. Wilson is hereby admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 22, 2015. (lcegs3)
December 22, 2015 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Greco on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Greco, Stephanie)
December 22, 2015 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Maria M. DiMoscato on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DiMoscato, Maria)
December 22, 2015 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Eric J. Wilson, :Firm- Godfrey Kahn, S.C., :Address- One E. Main St., P.O. Box 2719, Madison, WI 53701. Phone No. - (608) 284-2603. Fax No. - (608) 257-0609 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4357885. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by OFFICE DEPOT, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Certificate of Service)(Lacy, Andrew)
December 21, 2015 Filing 39 Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Case Management and Scheduling Order by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Reinhart, Tara)
December 18, 2015 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Haidee L. Schwartz on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Schwartz, Haidee)
December 18, 2015 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Krisha A. Cerilli on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cerilli, Krisha) (Main Document 37 replaced on 12/18/2015) (jf).
December 18, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #33 #34 and #35 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Andrea B. Levine, Jonathan Y. Mincer and Andrew L. Goldman are hereby admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 18, 2015. (lcegs4)
December 18, 2015 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Quillian on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Quillian, Ryan)
December 18, 2015 Filing 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Andrew L. Goldman, :Firm- Goldman Ismail Tomaselli Brennan & Baum LLP, :Address- 564 West Randolph Street, Suite 400, Chicago, IL 60661. Phone No. - 312-881-5960. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4354088. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew L. Goldman, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Diane)
December 18, 2015 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jonathan Y. Mincer, :Firm- Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP, :Address- 2475 Hanover St., Palo Alto, CA 94304. Phone No. - (650) 251-5267. Fax No. - (650) 251-5002 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4354040. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by OFFICE DEPOT, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Lacy, Andrew)
December 18, 2015 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Andrea B. Levine, :Firm- Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP, :Address- 425 Lexington Ave., New York, NY 10017. Phone No. - (212) 455-3578. Fax No. - (212) 455-5502 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4354036. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by OFFICE DEPOT, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Certificate of Service)(Lacy, Andrew)
December 17, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan: Status Conference held on 12/17/2015. Pretrial Conference set for 3/16/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan.Bench Trial set for 3/21/2016 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (Court Reporter SCOTT WALLACE.) (mac)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #32 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. N. Preston Miller is here by admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 17, 2015. (lcegs4)
December 17, 2015 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- N. Preston Miller, :Firm- Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP, :Address- 900 G Street, NW Washington DC 20001. Phone No. - (202) 636-5576. Fax No. - (202) 636-5502 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4352158. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by OFFICE DEPOT, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration, #3 Certificate of Service)(Lacy, Andrew)
December 17, 2015 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by John Lawrence Goheen, III on behalf of OFFICE DEPOT, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Goheen, John)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #30 motion for admission pro hac vice. Joseph Adamson is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 16, 2015. (lcegs1)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #29 motion for admission pro hac vice. Allison M. Brown is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 16, 2015. (lcegs1)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #28 motion for admission pro hac vice. Joy M. Dineo is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 16, 2015. (lcegs1)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #26 motion for admission pro hac vice. Eric S. Hochstadt is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 16, 2015. (lcegs1)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #25 motion for admission pro hac vice. Rishi Satia is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 16, 2015. (lcegs1)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #21 motion for admission pro hac vice of Peter C. Herrick, Esq. Peter C. Herrick is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 16, 2015. (lcegs1)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #20 motion for admission pro hac vice of Matthew J. Reilly, Esq. Matthew J. Reilly is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 16, 2015. (lcegs1)
December 16, 2015 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Joseph Adamson, :Firm- Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP, :Address- 767 Fifth Ave., New York, NY 10153. Phone No. - 212-310-8003. Fax No. - 212-310-8007 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4350689. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joseph Adamson, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Diane)
December 16, 2015 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Allison M. Brown, :Firm- Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP, :Address- 17 Hulfish Street, Princeton, NJ 08542. Phone No. - 609-986-1104. Fax No. - 609-986-1199 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4350654. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Allison M. Brown, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Diane)
December 16, 2015 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Joy M. Dineo, :Firm- Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP, :Address- 767 Fifth Ave., New York, NY 10153. Phone No. - 212-310-8613. Fax No. - 212-310-8007 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4350622. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joy M. Dineo, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Diane)
December 16, 2015 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Hahm on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hahm, Kevin)
December 16, 2015 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Eric S. Hochstadt, :Firm- Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP, :Address- 767 Fifth Ave., New York, NY 10153. Phone No. - 212-310-8003. Fax No. - 212-310-8007 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4350598. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Eric S. Hochstadt, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Diane)
December 16, 2015 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Rishi Satia, :Firm- Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP, :Address- 1300 Eye Street NW Suite 900, Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - 202-682-7119. Fax No. - 202-857-0940 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4350578. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Rishi Satia, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Diane)
December 16, 2015 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Stelios S. Xenakis on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Xenakis, Stelios S.)
December 16, 2015 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles A. Loughlin on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Loughlin, Charles A.)
December 16, 2015 Filing 22 Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Reinhart, Tara)
December 14, 2015 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Peter C. Herrick, :Firm- Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP, :Address- 900 G Street, NW Washington DC 20001. Phone No. - (202) 636-5881. Fax No. - (202) 636-5502 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4347973. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by OFFICE DEPOT, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Lacy, Andrew)
December 14, 2015 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Matthew J. Reilly, :Firm- Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP, :Address- 900 G Street, NW Washington DC 20001. Phone No. - (202) 636-5566. Fax No. - (202) 636-5502 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4347959. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by OFFICE DEPOT, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Lacy, Andrew)
December 14, 2015 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #9 Notice of Appearance was entered in error and counsel needs to move for Pro Hac Vice. (td)
December 14, 2015 Filing 19 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan held on December 8, 2015; Page Numbers: 1-34. Date of Issuance: 12-14-2015. Court Reporter/Transcriber Elizabeth SaintLoth, Telephone number 202-354-3242, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 1/4/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/14/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/13/2016.(Saint-Loth, Elizabeth)
December 14, 2015 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 12/17/2015 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (mac)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Due to the Court's calendar, the 10:00 a.m. status hearing scheduled for Thursday, December 17, 2015 is hereby rescheduled to 3:30 p.m. The Court regrets any inconvenience to the parties. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 14, 2015. (lcegs4)
December 10, 2015 Filing 18 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by OFFICE DEPOT, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lacy, Andrew)
December 10, 2015 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STAPLES, INC.. (Sullivan, Diane)
December 10, 2015 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey H. Perry on behalf of STAPLES, INC. (Perry, Jeffrey)
December 10, 2015 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Carrie Mahan Anderson on behalf of STAPLES, INC. (Anderson, Carrie)
December 9, 2015 Filing 14 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to #3 Complaint, by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Redacted Complaint)(Reinhart, Tara)
December 9, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due on 12/16/2015 by 9:00AM. (mac)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall meet and confer no later than December 15, 2015 and file a status report no later than December 16, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. The status report shall set forth a proposed schedule for briefing and a hearing on the Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The status report shall also include the amount of time sought for limited discovery, the length of time anticipated for a hearing, and the number of witnesses each party expects to call at the hearing. If the parties cannot agree on a schedule, they shall set forth their respective proposals in the Status Report, and are encouraged to submit for consideration scheduling orders used in comparable matters before this Court. A hearing on the parties' status report shall be held at 10:00 a.m. on December 17, 2015. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 8, 2015. (lcegs4)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #6 Motion for Protective Order, subject to further consideration by the Court. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 8, 2015. (lcegs4)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #4 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 8, 2015. (lcegs4)
December 8, 2015 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane P. Sullivan on behalf of STAPLES, INC. (Sullivan, Diane)
December 8, 2015 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexis Gilman on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gilman, Alexis)
December 8, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan: Status Conference held on 12/8/2015. The Court grants #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Redacted Complaint due by 12:00PM on 12/9/15. Attorney Are To Meet and Confer by 12/15/2015 and File A Status Report. Status Conference set for 12/17/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (Court Reporter ELIZABETH SAINT-LOTH.) (mac)
December 8, 2015 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Proposed Order by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Reinhart, Tara)
December 8, 2015 Filing 9 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .NOTICE of Appearance by Peter C. Herrick on behalf of OFFICE DEPOT, INC. (Herrick, Peter) Modified on 12/14/2015 (td).
December 8, 2015 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Lacy on behalf of OFFICE DEPOT, INC. (Lacy, Andrew)
December 8, 2015 Filing 7 NOTICE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Quillian, Ryan)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. A status hearing shall be held at 3:00 p.m. on December 8, 2015 in Courtroom 24A. Because counsel for all parties have not yet entered appearances on the Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system, the lead counsel for the Government shall ensure all counsel of record are informed of the date, time and place of the status hearing. The Government shall file a notice on ECF confirming all counsel of record have been informed of the status hearing. Any counsel of record not located in Washington, D.C. may seek leave to participate in the status hearing telephonically. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on December 8, 2015. (lcegs4)
December 7, 2015 Filing 6 MOTION for Protective Order by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(zrdj)
December 7, 2015 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(zrdj)
December 7, 2015 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(zrdj)
December 7, 2015 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against OFFICE DEPOT, INC., STAPLES, INC. filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zrdj)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to File complaint Under Seal. Any decision on further conditions on continued sealing are leftup to the assigned district judge. Signed by Chief Judge Richard W. Roberts on 12/7/2015. (zrdj)
December 7, 2015 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to File COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(zrdj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION et al v. STAPLES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DETROIT REGIONAL CHAMBER
Represented By: Joshua Hunt Joseph
Represented By: Cody D. Rockey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RENT-A-CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Rebecca E. Bazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Matthew J. Ricciardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MCDONALD'S USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WINDFALL. INC.
Represented By: Jack G. Haake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOHN DOE II CORPORATION
Represented By: Kathleen A. Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KINDRED HEALTHCARE
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Jacobovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AMERISOURCEBERGEN CORPORATION
Represented By: Andrew C. Bernasconi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BEST BUY CO., INC.
Represented By: Anne Michele Lockner
Represented By: Nicole Susanne Frank
Represented By: Bruce Arthur Finzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CORPORATE UNITED, INC.
Represented By: Erin Kathleen Sullivan
Represented By: Judy L. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ESSENDANT, INC.
Represented By: Mark Samuel Popofsky
Represented By: Chong Seok Park
Represented By: Jonathan S. Klarfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HITOUCH BUSINESS SERVICES LLC
Represented By: Morris A. Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: EXPRESS SCRIPTS HOLDING COMPANY
Represented By: Steven A. Neeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GEORGIA-PACIFIC, LLC
Represented By: D. Bruce Hoffman
Represented By: Wendell Landray Taylor
Represented By: Ryan A. Shores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SAVANNAH RIVER NUCLEAR SOLUTIONS, LLC
Represented By: John S. Pachter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE DEPOT, INC.
Represented By: Andrew McHie Lacy
Represented By: Jonathan Yakov Mincer
Represented By: Matthew James Reilly
Represented By: Eric J. Wilson
Represented By: Gabriel Rottman
Represented By: Evan I. Cohen
Represented By: Nathaniel Preston Miller
Represented By: Jason M. Bussey
Represented By: Brian C. Spahn
Represented By: John Lawrence Goheen, III
Represented By: Peter C. Herrick
Represented By: Mark W. Hancock
Represented By: Andrea B. Levine
Represented By: Wendy Katharine Arends
Represented By: Carrie C. Mahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STAPLES, INC.
Represented By: Megan Anne Granger
Represented By: Patrick O. O'Toole
Represented By: Eric S. Hochstadt
Represented By: Chad E. Kurtz
Represented By: John J. Sullivan
Represented By: Joseph Adamson
Represented By: Adam S. Tolin
Represented By: Andrew L. Goldman
Represented By: Theodore E. Tsekerides
Represented By: Jeffrey H. Perry
Represented By: Christopher D. Barraza
Represented By: Carrie C. Mahan
Represented By: Diane P. Sullivan
Represented By: Tamar S. Wise
Represented By: Holly Elizabeth Loiseau
Represented By: Allison M. Brown
Represented By: Robert T. Vlasis
Represented By: Ronald F. Wick
Represented By: Christopher M. Pepe
Represented By: John O'Connor
Represented By: Michael Birney de Leeuw
Represented By: Steven K. Bernstein
Represented By: Brianne L. Kucerik
Represented By: Rishi Satia
Represented By: Jonathan Cheng
Represented By: Megan H. Wantland
Represented By: Joy M. Dineo
Represented By: Gary A. Coad
Represented By: Jacob B. Ebin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JOHN DOE
Represented By: Brian Richard Iverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: LOWE'S COMPANIES, INC.
Represented By: Wendell Landray Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NEW YORK PRESBYTERIAN HEALTH CARE SYSTEM
Represented By: Stuart Michael Gerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ECOLAB INC
Represented By: Toyja Eran Libia Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CANON U.S.A., INC.
Represented By: Creighton R. Magid
Represented By: Michael Lindsay
Represented By: Jonathan Montcalm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AMERICAN AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION (INC.)
Represented By: Philip Tucker Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AMAZON.COM, INC.
Represented By: Benjamin F. Holt
Represented By: J. Robert Robertson
Represented By: William Leitzsey Monts, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AMERICAN ELECTRIC POWER COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: John C. Monica, Jr.
Represented By: James A. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: FIFTH THIRD BANK
Represented By: Katrina M. Robson
Represented By: Edward D. Hassi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: BOSTON CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL
Represented By: Stephanie D. Scruggs
Represented By: Theodore J. Folkman
Represented By: Steven M. Veenema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: GUY BROWN
Represented By: Ronald G. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Norman Wesley Marden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
Represented By: Thomas Hankins Brock
Represented By: Ashley Masters
Represented By: Joseph Neely
Represented By: David E. Owyang
Represented By: Haidee L. Schwartz
Represented By: Amanda Lewis
Represented By: Robert E. Zuver, Jr.
Represented By: Stelios S. Xenakis
Represented By: Rohan Pai
Represented By: Peter Colwell
Represented By: Kimberley G. Biagioli
Represented By: Dominic Vote
Represented By: Stephanie Greco
Represented By: Joshua M. Goodman
Represented By: Alexis Gilman
Represented By: Krisha A. Cerilli
Represented By: Angel Prado
Represented By: Stephen W. Rodger
Represented By: Kristian Sjoberg Rogers
Represented By: Kelly A. Horne
Represented By: Noah Pinegar
Represented By: Helder Agostinho
Represented By: Maria M. DiMoscato
Represented By: Tara L. Reinhart
Represented By: Ryan Quillian
Represented By: Joshua Smith
Represented By: Deborah L Feinstein
Represented By: Markus H. Meier
Represented By: Charles A. Loughlin
Represented By: Meghan Iorianni
Represented By: Benjamin Gris
Represented By: Kevin Hahm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Catherine Anne Jackson
Represented By: Bennett C. Rushkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: JOHN DOE CORPORATION III
Represented By: Edward B. Schwartz
Represented By: John J. Kavanagh, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?