NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Featured Case
Plaintiff: NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER and ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Petitioner: JOSEPH I. LIEBERMAN, DON KOZICH, REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF LAW LIBRARIES and MICHAEL T. PINES
Interested Party: ROB RAWSON, ROSEMARIE HOWELL and TROY LAW, PLLC
Amicus Curiae: ASSOCIATION OF ALTERNATIVE NEWS MEDIA, TULLY CENTER FOR FREE SPEECH, THOMAS BRUCE, ONLINE NEWS ASSOCIATION, ASSOCIATED PRESS MEDIA EDITORS, INTERNATIONAL DOCUMENTARY ASSOCIATION, DEBORAH BEIM, FIRST LOOK MEDIA WORKS, INC., CENTER FOR INVESTIGATIVE REPORTING, MPA, MEDIA CONSORTIUM, REPORTERS WITHOUT BORDERS, INVESTIGATIVE REPORTING WORKSHOP, JONATHAN ZITTRAIN, SEATTLE TIMES COMPANY, FIRST AMENDMENT COALITION, NATIONAL PRESS PHOTOGRAPHERS ASSOCIATION, RADIO TELEVISION DIGITAL NEWS ASSOCIATION, SOCIETY OF PROFESSIONAL JOURNALISTS, DARRELL ISSA, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF NEWSPAPER EDITORS and PHILLIP MALONE
Case Number: 1:2016cv00745
Filed: April 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Paul L Friedman
Referring Judge: Ellen S Huvelle
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of the #153 Order granting plaintiffs' #148 Revised Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement, plaintiffs' original #140 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement is hereby DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 21, 2023. (lceh)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 159 RESPONSE re #158 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, and Expenses filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval, MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, and Expenses by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of NVLSP, #2 Declaration of NCLC, #3 Declaration of AFJ, #4 Declaration of Brian Fitzpatrick, #5 Declaration of Deepak Gupta, #6 Declaration of Meghan Oliver, #7 Declaration of Gio Santiago, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Gupta, Deepak)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 157 NOTICE of Appearance by John Troy on behalf of TROY LAW, PLLC (Troy, John)
July 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 156 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Brenda A. Gonzalez Horowitz on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Substituting for attorney Derek S. Hammond (Gonzalez Horowitz, Brenda)
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Opt-Out deadline 8/20/2023. (tj)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting #154 Motion to Amend the Opt-Out Deadline. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 7, 2023. (lceh)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 154 MOTION to Amend/Correct the Opt-Out Deadline by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Narwold, William)
May 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 10/12/2023 at 10:00 AM in Ceremonial Courtroom before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (tj)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting plaintiffs' #148 Revised Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement. The Court shall convene a Settlement Hearing on October 12, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. in the Ceremonial Courtroom (Courtroom 20) at the United States District Court for the District of Columbia, 333 Constitution Avenue, NW, Washington, D.C. 20001. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 8, 2023. (ATM)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 152 NOTICE of Submission of Revised Proposed Order and Revised Notice Documents by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM re #148 Motion for Settlement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Revised Proposed Order)(Narwold, William)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 151 REPLY to opposition to motion re #148 Amended MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval Reply in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Revised Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement [ECF No. 148] filed by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Narwold, William)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 150 RESPONSE re #148 Amended MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hammond, Derek)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 149 DECLARATION of Deepak Gupta by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM re #148 Amended MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval filed by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit First Amendment to Settlement Agreement, #3 Exhibit Second Amendment to Settlement Agreement, #4 Exhibit Revised Notice Plan & Exhibits 1-6, #5 Exhibit KCC Supplemental Declaration)(Gupta, Deepak)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 148 Amended MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gupta, Deepak)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for Zoom Status Conference proceeding held on 4/5/23 before Judge Paul L. Friedman. The parties updated the Court on the status of the case. A revised Motion for Settlement Preliminary Approval due within a week. Court Reporter: Stacy Heavenridge (zgf)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 147 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Derek S. Hammond on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Jeremy S. Simon and Robert A. Caplen (Hammond, Derek)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Status Conference held on 2/22/2023. Parties inform the court of the status of this action with regard to settlement. Next Status Conference is set for 4/5/2023 at 10:00 AM in before Judge Paul L. Friedman via zoom video. (Court Reporter: Sara Wick) (tj)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER approving #144 Stipulated Supplement to #41 Protective Order. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on February 2, 2023. (lceh)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall appear for a status conference on February 22, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. via Zoom videoconference, the details of which will be provided the morning of or in advance of the hearing. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 17, 2023. (lceh)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 145 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Paul L. Friedman held on 12/6/22; Page Numbers: 1-10. Court Reporter/Transcriber Tammy Nestor, Telephone number 2023543127, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript m ay be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/3/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/13/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/13/2023.(Nestor, Tammy)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 144 STIPULATION (Stipulated Supplement to Protective Order) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Simon, Jeremy)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The status conference scheduled for January 12, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. is hereby VACATED. The Court will reschedule the status conference for a later date. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 11, 2023. (lceh)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/12/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Paul L. Friedman via zoom video. (tj)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall appear for a status conference on January 12, 2023 at 10:00 a.m. via Zoom videoconference, the details of which will be provided the morning of or in advance of the hearing. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on December 7, 2022. (lceh)
December 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held Via Videoconference (ZOOM) before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Status Conference held on 12/6/2022.Parties Updated The Court In Regards To The Current Posture Of This Matter. Parties Will Confer And Contact The Court's Chambers In Regards To the Next Status Conference Date. (Court Reporter TAMMY NESTOR.) (mac)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 12/6/2022 at 9:00 AM before Judge Paul L. Friedman via zoom video. (tj)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall appear for a status conference on December 6, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. via Zoom videoconference, the details of which will be provided the morning of or in advance of the hearing. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 28, 2022. (lceh)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MANDATE of USCA as to #132 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by MICHAEL T. PINES ; USCA Case Number 21-5291. (Attachment: #1 USCA Order September 28, 2022)(zjm)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 142 RESPONSE re #140 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval (Defendant's Response to Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Simon, Jeremy)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 141 DECLARATION of Deepak Gupta by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM re #140 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval filed by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit Supplemental Settlement Agreement, #3 Exhibit Proposed Notice Plan, #4 Exhibit KCC (Administrator) Declaration)(Gupta, Deepak)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gupta, Deepak)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Joint STATUS REPORT by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Gupta, Deepak)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In consideration of the parties' #139 joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiffs shall file a motion for an order approving settlement notice to the class, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(e)(1), on or before October 15, 2022, and that the stay of proceedings is extended from September 22, 2022 to October 15, 2022. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 22, 2022. (ATM)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 138 Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Simon, Jeremy)
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In consideration of the parties' #138 joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiffs shall file a motion for an order approving settlement notice to the class, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(e)(1), on or before September 26, 2022, and that the stay of proceedings is extended from August 12, 2022 to September 26, 2022. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 12, 2022. (lcjr)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In consideration of the parties' #137 joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before August 12, 2022, and that the stay of proceedings is extended from July 12, 2022, to August 26, 2022. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 30, 2022. (ATM)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Simon, Jeremy)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In consideration of the parties' #135 joint status report and #136 joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before June 30, 2022, and that the stay of proceedings is extended from April 8, 2022 through July 12, 2022. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on May 18, 2022. (lcjr)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Simon, Jeremy)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Joint STATUS REPORT by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Gupta, Deepak)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In consideration of the joint status report #134 filed on January 20, 22, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before April 1, 2022, and that the stay of proceedings is extended through April 8, 2022. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on January 21, 2022. (MA)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 134 Joint STATUS REPORT by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Narwold, William)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order USCA Case Number 21-5291 for #132 Notice of Appeal filed by MICHAEL T. PINES. (zjf)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The fee was not paid because it was filed in forma pauperis re #132 Notice of Appeal. (znmw)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 132 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #130 Memorandum & Opinion by MICHAEL T. PINES. Fee Status: IFP. Parties have been notified. (znmw) Modified fee status on 12/17/2021 (znmw).
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying #116 Mr. Pines pro se Motion for Intervention and for Leave to File Complaint in Intervention, Motion to Modify Class Certification Order, and for Sanctions; denying as moot Mr. Pines Motion for Pretrial Conference and to Appoint a Special Master; denying as moot #125 Mr. Pines Emergency Motion for Order to Reactivate PACER Account; and granting Mr. Pines Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file that application on the docket in this case. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 16, 2021. (MA)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' representations concerning settlement discussions in #129 the Joint Status Report, the stay in this case is extended through January 27, 2022. The parties shall file a further joint status report on or before January 20, 2022 notifying the Court of the progress of their settlement efforts. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on November 16, 2021. (lcaa)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/20/2022 (hs)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 131 PER CURIAM ORDER of USCA (certified copy) filed re: petitioner Michael T. Pines, granting motion for in forma pauperis; dismissing petition for writ of mandamus; dismissing as moot motion to reactivate Pacer account; USCA Case Number 21-5204. (znmw)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Joint STATUS REPORT by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Narwold, William)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 RESPONSE re #125 MOTION for Order (Defendant's Response to Michael Pines' Motion to Reactivate Pines' PACER Account) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Simon, Jeremy)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,, REGARDING MICHAEL PINESS MOTION FOR INTERVENTION, TO MODIFY THE CLASS DEFINITION, AND FOR SANCTIONS filed by NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Gupta, Deepak)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 126 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re Order,, (Supplemental Brief In Response To Court Order Dated October 12, 2021) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Simon, Jeremy)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Emergency MOTION for Order to Reactivate PACER Account by MICHAEL T. PINES. "Let this be filed," signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 10/21/2021. (znmw)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' briefs #122 #124 in opposition to #116 Mr. Pines's Motion for Intervention, Motion to Modify Class Certification Order, and for Sanctions. On or before October 26, 2021, the parties are directed to file supplemental briefs addressing (1) whether, to the parties' knowledge, Mr. Pines is in fact a member of the class in this case; (2) if so, whether Mr. Pines has opted out of the class, and noting any applicable deadlines for opting out; and (3) setting forth the legal standard for a motion for intervention by a class member. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 12, 2021. (lcaa)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 RESPONSE re #116 MOTION to Intervene MOTION for Leave to File filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Simon, Jeremy)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' representations concerning settlement discussions in #123 the joint status report, the stay in this case is extended through November 22, 2021. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before November 15, 2021, notifying the Court of the progress of their discussions. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 17, 2021. (lcaf)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Joint STATUS REPORT by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Narwold, William)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court has reviewed #121 Mr. Pines' notice requesting reconsideration of #119 the Court's order granting the government an extension of time up to October 1, 2021 in which to respond to the motion to intervene. The Court concludes that Mr. Pines has not demonstrated that he will suffer prejudice as a result of the extension of time, and the government has established good cause for the extension of time. The Court therefore will not alter the deadline for the government's response to the motion to intervene. The government, in its response to the motion to intervene, is directed to also address the concerns about delay raised in #120 #121 Mr. Pines' notices. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 14, 2021. (lcaf)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 RESPONSE re #116 MOTION to Intervene MOTION for Leave to File filed by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Gupta, Deepak)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 NOTICE by MICHAEL T. PINES (ztd)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Memorandum in opposition to re #118 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by MICHAEL T. PINES. (ztd)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting #118 defendant's motion for extension of time up to and including October 1, 2021 within which to respond to motion for intervention, to modify class certification order and for sanctions. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 9, 2021. (MA)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion for Intervention, to Modify Class Certification Order, and for Sanctions by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) Modified event on 9/9/2021 (ztd).
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Counsel for the parties are directed to file responses to #116 Mr. Pines' motion to intervene on or before September 10, 2021. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 27, 2021. (lcaf)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 SEALED DOCUMENT (MOTION FOR INTERVENTION AND LEAVE TO FILE) filed by MICHAEL T. PINES. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(ztd);("Leave to File Granted - Document Under Seal" signed 8/26/2021 by Judge Paul L. Friedman)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MOTION to Intervene, MOTION for Leave to File by MICHAEL T. PINES. (Attachments: #1 Declaration redacted)(ztd); ("Leave to file Granted" signed 8/26/2021 by Judge Paul L. Friedman)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Narwold, William)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of #115 the parties' joint status report, this matter is STAYED until September 23, 2021. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before September 16, 2021, updating the Court on the progress of their discussions. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on June 16, 2021. (lcaf)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Jeremy S. Simon on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Substituting for attorney Brian J. Field (Simon, Jeremy)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Robert Aaron Caplen on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Substituting for attorney W. Mark Nebeker (Caplen, Robert)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties joint status report #112 , this matter is STAYED until June 25, 2021. The parties shall file a joint status report on or before June 18, 2021 updating the Court on the status of any mediation. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 12/29/2020. (lceg)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/18/2021. (tj)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Joint STATUS REPORT by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Gupta, Deepak)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In view of the recent decision by the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit remanding this case for further proceedings, it is ORDERED that the parties file a joint status report on or before December 23, 2020 addressing how they wish to proceed. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on 12/11/2020. (lceg)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MANDATE of USCA as to #107 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER ; USCA Case Number 19-1081, 19-1083. (Attachments: #1 USCA Judgment)(zrdj)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Case directly reassigned to Judge Paul L. Friedman by consent. Judge Christopher R. Cooper is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Case randomly reassigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. Judge Ellen S. Huvelle is no longer assigned to the case. (rj) Modified on 9/11/2020 (rj).
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Transmission of the Notice of Grant of Permission to Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. 1292(B)and Docket Sheet to Federal Circuit. The appeal fee was paid this date re #107 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit. (jf)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 NOTICE OF GRANT OF PERMISSION TO APPEAL UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1292(B)by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-5811958. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Attachments: #1 USCA Order)(Narwold, William) Modified on 11/29/2018 to correct docket event/text (jf).
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order USCA for the Federal Circuit Case Number 19-1081-SJ (zrdj)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order USCA for the Federal Circuit Case Number 19-1083-SJ (zrdj)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order USCA for the Federal Circuit Case Number 18-155-CP (zrdj)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order USCA for the Federal Circuit Case Number 18-154-CP (zrdj)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle held on 7-18-18; Page Numbers: 1-21. Date of Issuance:7-18-18. Court Reporter/Transcriber Scott Wallace, Telephone number 202-354-3196, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 9/10/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/20/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/18/2018.(Wallace, Scott)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEMORANDUM OPINION accompanying August 13, 2018 Order, ECF No. #104 , re certification of March 31, 2018 Order, ECF No. #88 for interlocutory appeal. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on August 13, 2018. (AG)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #99 defendant's Motion for to Certify Orders for Interlocutory Appeal; amending Order filed on March 31, 2018, ECF No. #88 , to certify for interlocutory appeal for the reasons stated in an accompanying Memorandum Opinion, ECF No. #105 ; and granting #99 unopposed Motion to Stay. See order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on August 13, 2018. (AG)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 REPLY to opposition to motion re #99 MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal MOTION to Stay filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Field, Brian)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 RESPONSE re #99 MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal MOTION to Stay filed by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Gupta, Deepak)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Joint STATUS REPORT by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Gupta, Deepak)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE Regarding Annual Courtroom Technology Expenditures by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Field, Brian)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle: Status Conference held on 7/18/2018. Parties should submit a report by the C.O.B. on Friday, 7/20/18. (Court Reporter: Scott Wallace) (gdf)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MOTION for Certification for interlocatory appeal, MOTION to Stay by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Field, Brian). Added MOTION to Stay on 7/17/2018 (jf).
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Field, Brian)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER re discovery and future proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 7/13/2018. Status Conference set for 7/18/2018 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. See order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on May 17, 2018. (AG)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle held on 4-18-18; Page Numbers: 1-38. Date of Issuance:5-17-18. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Griffith, Telephone number (202) 354-3247, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 6/7/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/15/2018.(Griffith, Lisa)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle held on 3-23-18; Page Numbers: 1-121. Date of Issuance:5-17-18. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Griffith, Telephone number (202) 354-3247, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 6/7/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/15/2018.(Griffith, Lisa)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 5/17/18 : Status Conference held. Order to be issued. Joint Status Report due by 7/13/18. Further Status Conference set for 7/18/18 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (Court Reporter: Lisa Griffith) (kk)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Field, Brian)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying #93 Motion for Extension of Time to file Status Report; granting in part and denying in part #93 Motion to Continue Status Conference: Upon consideration of defendant's motion, plaintiffs' opposition thereto, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that defendant's motion for an extension of time to file a status report is DENIED; and it is further ORDERED that defendant's motion to continue the Status Conference presently set for May 18, 2018, is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; and it is further ORDERED that the Status Conference presently scheduled for May 18, 2018, is RESCHEDULED to May 17, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 23A. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on April 27, 2018. (AG)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying 93 Motion for Extension of Time to file Status Report; granting in part and denying in part 93 Motion to Continue Status Conference: Upon consideration of defendant's motion, plaintiffs' opposition thereto, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that defendant's motion for an extension of time to file a status report is DENIED; and it is further ORDERED that defendant's motion to continue the Status Conference presently set for May 18, 2018, is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; and it is further ORDERED that the Status Conference presently scheduled for May 18, 2018, is RESCHEDULED to May 17, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 23A. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on April 27, 2018. (AG)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report, MOTION to Continue Status Conference by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Field, Brian)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER setting Status Conference for May 18, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 23A. Joint Status Report due by May 11, 2018. See order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on April 18, 2018. (AG)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle: Status Conference held on 4/18/2018. Status Report due by 5/11/2018. Status Conference set for 5/18/2018 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (Court Reporter Lisa Griffith) (gdf)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Joint STATUS REPORT Proposing a Schedule to Govern Further Proceedings by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Narwold, William)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/16/2018. (gdf)
March 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ATTACHMENT to #89 Memorandum & Opinion Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on March 31, 2018. (ztnr)
March 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEMORANDUM OPINION accompanying Order, ECF No. #88 , denying #52 plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment and granting in part and denying in part defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on March 31, 2018. (AG) Modified on 4/2/2018 to remove attachment. Attachment docketed separately for opinion posting purposes.(ztnr)
March 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER denying #52 plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part #73 defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; and setting Status Conference for 4/18/2018 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 23A. Joint status report due by April 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on March 31, 2018. (AG)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 REPLY re #86 Response to Document filed by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Gupta, Deepak)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 RESPONSE re #85 Notice (Other) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Field, Brian)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 RESPONSE to Defendant's supplemental authority by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM re #84 Notice (Other) (Gupta, Deepak) Modified event title on 3/29/2018 (znmw).
March 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Ex. B, #3 Exhibit Ex. C, #4 Exhibit Ex. D, #5 Exhibit Ex. E, #6 Exhibit Ex. F, #7 Exhibit Ex. G)(Field, Brian)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry; for proceedings held before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle: Oral Arguments held on 3/23/2018. Plaintiffs' #52 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability and Defendant's #73 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment; heard and Taken Under Advisement. (Court Reporter Lisa Griffith) (hs)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Minute Entry; for proceedings held before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle: Oral Arguments held on 3/23/2018. Plaintiffs' 52 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability and Defendant's 73 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment; heard and Taken Under Advisement. (Court Reporter Lisa Griffith) (hs)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2018 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (gdf)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jonathan Taylor, :Firm- Gupta Wessler PLLC, :Address- jon@guptawessler.com. Phone No. - 2028881741. Fax No. - 2028887792 Address: 1900 L Street NW, Suite 312, Washington DC 20036 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5383035. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Taylor, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gupta, Deepak)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Meghan Oliver, :Firm- Motley Rice LLC, :Address- 28 Bridgeside Blvd, Mt. Pleasant, SC 29464. Phone No. - 843-216-9492. Fax No. - 843-216-9430 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5382765. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Meghan Oliver, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Smith, Elizabeth)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the hearing on plaintiffs' MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability and defendant's Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment is CONTINUED from Wednesday, March 21, 2018, to Friday, March 23, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on March 21, 2018. (AG)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 83 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Upon consideration of the Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Jonathan Taylor is admitted pro hac vice for the purpose of appearing in proceedings in the above-captioned case. Counsel is reminded that pursuant to LCvR 83.2(c)(2) "An attorney who engages in the practice of law from an office located in the District of Columbia must be a member of the District of Columbia Bar and the Bar of this Court to file papers in this Court." Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on March 21, 2018. (AG)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #82 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Upon consideration of the above-referenced motion, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Meghan Oliver is admitted pro hac vice for the purpose of appearing in the above-captioned case. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on March 21, 2018. (AG)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #83 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Upon consideration of the Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Jonathan Taylor is admitted pro hac vice for the purpose of appearing in proceedings in the above-captioned case. Counsel is reminded that pursuant to LCvR 83.2(c)(2) "An attorney who engages in the practice of law from an office located in the District of Columbia must be a member of the District of Columbia Bar and the Bar of this Court to file papers in this Court." Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on March 21, 2018. (AG)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the hearing on plaintiffs' MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability and defendant's Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment is CONTINUED from Wednesday, March 21, 2018, to Friday, March 23, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on March 21, 2018. (AG)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 82 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Upon consideration of the above-referenced motion, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Meghan Oliver is admitted pro hac vice for the purpose of appearing in the above-captioned case. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on March 21, 2018. (AG)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE Of Filing by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #52 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability, Order Setting Hearing on Motion, #73 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tabs 1 through 40)(Nebeker, William)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 80 Consent Motion to Continue: Upon consideration of the Consent Motion to Continue, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is granted in part and denied in part; and it is further ORDERED that the Summary Judgment Motions Hearing presently set for 3/19/2018 is CONTINUED TO 3/21/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 23A. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on March 2, 2018. (AG)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part #80 Consent Motion to Continue: Upon consideration of the Consent Motion to Continue, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is granted in part and denied in part; and it is further ORDERED that the Summary Judgment Motions Hearing presently set for 3/19/2018 is CONTINUED TO 3/21/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 23A. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on March 2, 2018. (AG)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Consent MOTION to Continue Motions Hearing by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Field, Brian)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER Setting Hearing on Motions: It is hereby ORDERED that a hearing on 52 plaintiffs' MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability and 73 defendant's Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment is set for Monday, March 19, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on February 27, 2018. (AG)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER Setting Hearing on Motions: It is hereby ORDERED that a hearing on #52 plaintiffs' MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability and #73 defendant's Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment is set for Monday, March 19, 2017, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on February 27, 2018. (AG)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 REPLY to opposition to motion re #73 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Field, Brian)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Declaration of Amended Service. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave To File Denied" Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 12/12/2017. (jf)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #73 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Field, Brian)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part #77 defendant's opposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #73 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment: Upon consideration of the above-referenced motion, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; and it is further ORDERED that defendant shall have until January 5, 2018, to file its reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on December 8, 2017. (lcesh2)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 77 defendant's opposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re 73 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment: Upon consideration of the above-referenced motion, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; and it is further ORDERED that defendant shall have until January 5, 2018, to file its reply in support of its cross-motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on December 8, 2017. (lcesh2)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Memorandum in opposition to re #73 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (See Docket Entry #75 to view document). (znmw)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 REPLY to opposition to motion re #52 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability, filed by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts Response to Defendant's Statement of Facts)(Gupta, Deepak) Modified to remove link on 12/6/2017 (znmw).
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Memorandum in opposition to re #52 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration Decl. of W. Skidgel, #3 Statement of Facts, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Field, Brian)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration Decl. of W. Skidgel, #3 Statement of Facts, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Field, Brian)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Rosemarie Howell's Verified Motion with Briefing #72 is STRICKEN from the docket as filed without leave of Court; it is further ORDERED that leave to file is denied because Rosemarie Howell has opted out of the class, see ECF 45; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall return the motion to Rosemarie Howell, along with a copy of this Minute Order. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on November 9, 2017. (lcesh2)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Rosemarie Howell's Verified Motion with Briefing 72 is STRICKEN from the docket as filed without leave of Court; it is further ORDERED that leave to file is denied because Rosemarie Howell has opted out of the class, see ECF 45; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall return the motion to Rosemarie Howell, along with a copy of this Minute Order. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on November 9, 2017. (lcesh2)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER denying #70 Motion for Reconsideration of October 17, 2017 Order Denying Petitioners Motion for Clarification of September 13, 2017 Order and Denying Petitioners Motion to File Amicus Curiae; and granting Movant access to documents filed in this case. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on November 6, 2017. (lcesh2)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MOTION for Reconsideration re #68 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Clarify by DON KOZICH (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jf)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #69 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #52 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability: Upon Consideration of the Unopposed Motion For An Enlargement Of Time, AndMemorandum In Support Thereof in response thereto, and for the reasons set forth in support thereof, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion should be and is hereby GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant file its opposition to Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment As To Liability (ECF No. #52 ) on or before November 17, 2017; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs may respond to Defendant's filing on or before December 5, 2017. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on October 31, 2017. (AG)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 69 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 52 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability: Upon Consideration of the Unopposed Motion For An Enlargement Of Time, AndMemorandum In Support Thereof in response thereto, and for the reasons set forth in support thereof, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion should be and is hereby GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant file its opposition to Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment As To Liability (ECF No. 52 ) on or before November 17, 2017; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs may respond to Defendant's filing on or before December 5, 2017. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on October 31, 2017. (AG)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STRIKEN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED ON 11/9/17.....Verified MOTION with Briefing by ROSEMARIE HOWELL (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Appendix 2, #3 Appendix 3)(jf) Modified on 11/12/2017 (zgdf).
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #52 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying #49 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief and to Appear Telephonically; denying as moot #67 Motion to Clarify: see Order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on October 17, 2017. (lcesh2)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION to Clarify Minute Order dated 09/13/2017 by DON KOZICH (jf)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DENYING as moot #64 Motion for Free Access to PACER Until Final Disposition of this Case. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on October 2, 2017. (lcesh2,)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 RESPONSE re #64 MOTION For Free Access To Pacer filed by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Gupta, Deepak)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Verified MOTION For Free Access To Pacer by DON KOZICH (jf)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part #57 defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #52 plaintiffs' MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability: Upon consideration of defendant's motion, plaintiff's partial consent and partial opposition thereto, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that defendant shall have until November 2, 2017, to file its response to plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiffs reply is due by November 13, 2017. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on September 14, 2017. (AG)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 57 defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 52 plaintiffs' MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability: Upon consideration of defendant's motion, plaintiff's partial consent and partial opposition thereto, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that defendant shall have until November 2, 2017, to file its response to plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiffs reply is due by November 13, 2017. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on September 14, 2017. (AG)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 AMICUS BRIEF by JOSEPH I. LIEBERMAN, DARRELL ISSA. (znmw)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF LAW LIBRARIES. (See Docket Entry #61 to view document). (znmw)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 AMICUS BRIEF by AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF LAW LIBRARIES, DEBORAH BEIM, THOMAS BRUCE, PHILLIP MALONE, JONATHAN ZITTRAIN. (znmw)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN SOCIETY OF NEWSPAPER EDITORS, ASSOCIATED PRESS MEDIA EDITORS, ASSOCIATION OF ALTERNATIVE NEWS MEDIA, CENTER FOR INVESTIGATIVE REPORTING, FIRST AMENDMENT COALITION, FIRST LOOK MEDIA WORKS, INC., INTERNATIONAL DOCUMENTARY ASSOCIATION, INVESTIGATIVE REPORTING WORKSHOP, MEDIA CONSORTIUM, MPA, NATIONAL PRESS PHOTOGRAPHERS ASSOCIATION, ONLINE NEWS ASSOCIATION, RADIO TELEVISION DIGITAL NEWS ASSOCIATION, REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS, REPORTERS WITHOUT BORDERS, SEATTLE TIMES COMPANY, SOCIETY OF PROFESSIONAL JOURNALISTS, TULLY CENTER FOR FREE SPEECH identifying Other Affiliate SYRACUSE UNIVERSITY for TULLY CENTER FOR FREE SPEECH; Other Affiliate AMERICAN UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF COMMUNICATION for INVESTIGATIVE REPORTING WORKSHOP; Corporate Parent MCCLATCHY COMPANY for SEATTLE TIMES COMPANY. (znmw)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 AMICUS BRIEF by REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF NEWSPAPER EDITORS, ASSOCIATED PRESS MEDIA EDITORS, ASSOCIATION OF ALTERNATIVE NEWS MEDIA, CENTER FOR INVESTIGATIVE REPORTING, FIRST AMENDMENT COALITION, FIRST LOOK MEDIA WORKS, INC., INTERNATIONAL DOCUMENTARY ASSOCIATION, INVESTIGATIVE REPORTING WORKSHOP, MEDIA CONSORTIUM, MPA, NATIONAL PRESS PHOTOGRAPHERS ASSOCIATION, ONLINE NEWS ASSOCIATION, RADIO TELEVISION DIGITAL NEWS ASSOCIATION, REPORTERS WITHOUT BORDERS, SEATTLE TIMES COMPANY, SOCIETY OF PROFESSIONAL JOURNALISTS, TULLY CENTER FOR FREE SPEECH. (znmw)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 RESPONSE re #57 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Gupta, Deepak)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Field, Brian)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #53 #55 #56 Movants' Motions for Leave to File Briefs as Amicus Curiae: Upon consideration of the above-referenced motions, plaintiffs' consent and defendant's representation that it will not oppose, it is hereby ORDERED that the motions are GRANTED and movants are granted leave to file briefs as amicus curiae. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on September 13, 2017. (AG)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 53 55 56 Movants' Motions for Leave to File Briefs as Amicus Curiae: Upon consideration of the above-referenced motions, plaintiffs' consent and defendant's representation that it will not oppose, it is hereby ORDERED that the motions are GRANTED and movants are granted leave to file briefs as amicus curiae. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on September 13, 2017. (AG)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by JOSEPH I. LIEBERMAN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bailen, Mark)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae by AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF LAW LIBRARIES (Attachments: #1 Proposed Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Samberg-Champion, Sasha)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Sasha Samberg-Champion on behalf of AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF LAW LIBRARIES (Samberg-Champion, Sasha)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Corporate Disclosure)(Brown, Bruce)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Liability by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jonathan Taylor, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit Exhibit M, #15 Declaration Declaration of Thomas Lee and Michael Lissner, #16 Statement of Facts Plaintiffs' Statement of Undisputed Material Facts)(Gupta, Deepak)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE of Change of Address by Elizabeth S. Smith (Smith, Elizabeth)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SUPPLEMENT re #45 NOTICE to Exclude by ROSEMARIE HOWELL re #44 ORDER granting 42 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Approval of Revised Plan of Class Notice and Class Notice Documents filed by ROSEMARIE HOWELL. (jf)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae, MOTION to Appear by Phone, by DON KOZICH (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis)(jf) Modified text on 7/19/2017 (znmw).
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Summary Judgment motion due by 8/28/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/18/2017. Plaintiff's Reply in support of Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/28/2017. (hs)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Summary Judgment motion due by 8/28/2017. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/18/2017. Plaintiff's Reply in support of Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/28/2017. (hs)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gupta, Deepak)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Change of Address by Deepak Gupta (Gupta, Deepak)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 48 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment: Upon consideration of the plaintiffs' unopposed motion to extend the briefing schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the time within which the plaintiffs may file their motion for summary judgment solely on the issue of liability, i.e., whether the fees charged to access records through PACER violate the E-Government Act of 2002, Pub. L. No. 107-347, § 205(e), 116 Stat. 2899, 2915 (Dec. 17, 2002) (28 U.S.C. § 1913 note), is extended through August 28, 2017; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the defendant shall file its opposition 20 days after this date, on September 18, 2017, and the plaintiffs' reply is due 10 days after that, on September 28, 2017, consistent with this Courts scheduling order entered on January 24, 2017. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on July 5, 2017. (AG)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #48 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment: Upon consideration of the plaintiffs' unopposed motion to extend the briefing schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the time within which the plaintiffs may file their motion for summary judgment solely on the issue of liability, i.e., whether the fees charged to access records through PACER violate the E-Government Act of 2002, Pub. L. No. 107-347, 205(e), 116 Stat. 2899, 2915 (Dec. 17, 2002) (28 U.S.C. 1913 note), is extended through August 28, 2017; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the defendant shall file its opposition 20 days after this date, on September 18, 2017, and the plaintiffs' reply is due 10 days after that, on September 28, 2017, consistent with this Courts scheduling order entered on January 24, 2017. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on July 5, 2017. (AG)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION for Order for Exclusion by ROB RAWSON. "Let this be filed" signed by Judge Ellen Segal Huvelle on 06/09/2017 (jf) Modified event title on 6/16/2017 (znmw).
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail a copy of 46 NOTICE of and MOTION For An Order For Exclusion filed by ROB RAWSON to the PACER Fees Class Action Administrator, P.O. Box 43434, Providence, RI 02940-3434. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on June 15, 2017. (lcesh2)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail a copy of #46 NOTICE of and MOTION For An Order For Exclusion filed by ROB RAWSON to the PACER Fees Class Action Administrator, P.O. Box 43434, Providence, RI 02940-3434. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on June 15, 2017. (lcesh2)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE to Exclude by ROSEMARIE HOWELL re #44 ORDER granting #42 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Approval of Revised Plan of Class Notice and Class Notice Documents (jf)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #42 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Approval of Revised Plan of Class Notice and Class Notice Documents: See Order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on April 17, 2017. (lcesh2)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER finding as moot #37 Motion for Approval of Class Notice in light of approval of #42 Motion for Approval of Revised Class Notice. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on April 17, 2017. (AG)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER finding as moot 37 Motion for Approval of Class Notice in light of approval of 42 Motion for Approval of Revised Class Notice. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on April 17, 2017. (AG)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE of Filing of Revised Notice Documents by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Revised Email Notice, #2 Exhibit 1A Revised and Blacklined Email Notice, #3 Exhibit 2 Revised Postcard Notice, #4 Exhibit 2A Revised and Blacklined Postcard Notice)(Narwold, William)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Unopposed MOTION for Approval of Revised Plan of Class Notice and Class Notice Documents by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email Notice, #2 Exhibit 1-A - BLACKLINE Email Notice, #3 Exhibit 2 - Postcard Notice, #4 Exhibit 2-A - BLACKLINE Postcard Notice, #5 Exhibit 3 - Website Notice, #6 Exhibit 3-A - BLACKLINE Website Notice, #7 Exhibit 4 - Online Exclusion, #8 Exhibit 5 - Printable Exclusion, #9 Exhibit 6 - Proposed Order, #10 Exhibit 6-A - BLACKLINE Proposed Order)(Narwold, William)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting #40 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on April 3, 2017. (lcesh2)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Consent MOTION for Protective Order by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Narwold, William)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Joint Filing of Proposed Order by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM re #37 Unopposed MOTION For Approval of Plan of Class Notice (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Narwold, William)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 RESPONSE re #37 Unopposed MOTION For Approval of Plan of Class Notice filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Nebeker, William)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Unopposed MOTION For Approval of Plan of Class Notice by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - Postcard Notice, #3 Exhibit 2 - Website Notice, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Narwold, William)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle held on 1-18-17; Page Numbers: (1-29). Date of Issuance:1-29-17. Court Reporter/Transcriber Scott Wallace, Telephone number 202-354-3196, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 3/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/15/2017.(Wallace, Scott)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SCHEDULING ORDER: See Order for deadlines and details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on January 24, 2017. (lcesh2)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OPINION in support of #32 Order Granting #8 Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on January 24, 2017. (lcesh2)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #8 Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class for the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on January 24, 2017. (lcesh2)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT re #8 MOTION to Certify Class of Deepak Gupta (Second) by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Gupta, Deepak)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT re #8 MOTION to Certify Class of Barton F. Stichman by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Gupta, Deepak)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT re #8 MOTION to Certify Class of Stuart Rossman by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Gupta, Deepak)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT re #8 MOTION to Certify Class of Daniel L. Goldberg by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Gupta, Deepak)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle: Motion Hearing held on 1/18/2017, re 8 MOTION to Certify Class, heard and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Scott Wallace) (gdf)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle: Motion Hearing held on 1/18/2017, re #8 MOTION to Certify Class, heard and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Scott Wallace) (gdf)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Nebeker, William)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion: It is hereby ORDERED that a motion hearing on #8 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Certify Class is set for 1/18/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on December 15, 2016. (lcesh2)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion: It is hereby ORDERED that a motion hearing on 8 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Certify Class is set for 1/18/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on December 15, 2016. (lcesh2)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM (Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact) to re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (znmw)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OPINION in support of #24 Order Denying #11 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on December 5, 2016. (lcesh2)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying #11 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment for the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on December 5, 2016. (lcesh2)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 21 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply: It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs may file [21-2] Plaintiffs' Concise Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact, but plaintiffs may not file [21-1] Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply. A sur-reply is unnecessary because plaintiffs seek to reply to a statement that defendant originally presented in its motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on December 5, 2016. (lcesh2)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part #21 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply: It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs may file [21-2] Plaintiffs' Concise Statement of Genuine Issues of Material Fact, but plaintiffs may not file [21-1] Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply. A sur-reply is unnecessary because plaintiffs seek to reply to a statement that defendant originally presented in its motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on December 5, 2016. (lcesh2)
October 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opinion in Fisher v. United States)(Gupta, Deepak)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE re #21 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sur-Reply, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Gupta, Deepak)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY to opposition to motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Second Garcia)(Nebeker, William)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties' #18 Joint Motion for Proposed Phased Schedule is hereby GRANTED. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on August 16, 2016. (lcesh2)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the 18 Joint Motion for Scheduling Order is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on August 16, 2016. (lcesh2)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that defendant's 14 Motion to Stay is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on August 16, 2016. (lcesh2)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the #18 Joint Motion for Scheduling Order is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on August 16, 2016. (lcesh2)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that defendant's #14 Motion to Stay is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on August 16, 2016. (lcesh2)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Narwold, William)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment : Upon consideration of the Unopposed Motion For An Enlargement Of Time, And Memorandum In Support Thereof, and for the reasons set forth in support thereof, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the time within which Defendant may file a reply to Plaintiffs' opposition to the pending Motion To Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, For Summary Judgment is enlarged up to and including August 16, 2016. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on August 5, 2016. (AG)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re 11 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment : Upon consideration of the Unopposed Motion For An Enlargement Of Time, And Memorandum In Support Thereof, and for the reasons set forth in support thereof, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the time within which Defendant may file a reply to Plaintiffs' opposition to the pending Motion To Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, For Summary Judgment is enlarged up to and including August 16, 2016. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on August 5, 2016. (AG)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPLY to opposition to motion re #8 MOTION to Certify Class filed by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Gupta, Deepak)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Govt's MTD in Fisher, #2 Exhibit Complaint in NVLSP v. USA, #3 Exhibit Complaint in Fisher)(Gupta, Deepak)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Stay Discovery by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Memorandum in opposition to re #8 MOTION to Certify Class filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration Garcia, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Certify Class , #11 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gupta, Deepak)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 8 MOTION to Certify Class and 11 MOTION to Dismiss: Upon consideration of the parties' joint motion to extend the briefing schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is FURTHER ORDERED that the time within which the defendant may file a memorandum of points and authorities in response to plaintiffs' motion for class certification is further extended though July 25, 2016, and no additional extensions shall be granted; and it isFURTHER ORDERED that the time within which the plaintiffs may file a memorandum of points and authorities in response to defendant's motion to dismiss is initially extended though July 29, 2016. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on July 7, 2016. (AG)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #8 MOTION to Certify Class and #11 MOTION to Dismiss: Upon consideration of the parties' joint motion to extend the briefing schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is FURTHER ORDERED that the time within which the defendant may file a memorandum of points and authorities in response to plaintiffs' motion for class certification is further extended though July 25, 2016, and no additional extensions shall be granted; and it isFURTHER ORDERED that the time within which the plaintiffs may file a memorandum of points and authorities in response to defendant's motion to dismiss is initially extended though July 29, 2016. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on July 7, 2016. (AG)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Or, In The Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (1 through 5), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that defendant's unopposed #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply is GRANTED, and defendant's Response is due by July 11, 2016. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on May 17, 2016. (lcesh2 )
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that defendant's unopposed 10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply is GRANTED, and defendant's Response is due by July 11, 2016. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on May 17, 2016. (lcesh2 )
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Certify Class by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nebeker, William)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by William Mark Nebeker on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Nebeker, William)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Certify Class by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deepak Gupta, #2 Declaration of William Narwold, #3 Declaration of Jonathan Taylor, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Gupta, Deepak)
May 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/02/2016. (Gupta, Deepak)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- William H. Narwold, :Firm- Motley Rice LLC, :Address- 20 Church Street, 17th Floor, Hartford, CT 06103. Phone No. - 860-882-1676. Fax No. - 860-882-1682 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4500590. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Elizabeth)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth S. Smith on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Smith, Elizabeth)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/26/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/25/2016. (Gupta, Deepak)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: It is hereby ORDERED that the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that William H. Narwold is admitted pro hac vice for the purpose of appearing in the above-captioned case. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on April 26, 2016. (AG)
April 26, 2016 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: It is hereby ORDERED that the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that William H. Narwold is admitted pro hac vice for the purpose of appearing in the above-captioned case. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on April 26, 2016. (AG)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Consent Forms)(jd)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (jd)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER, NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM (Gupta, Deepak)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4495374) filed by NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM, ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to United States Attorney General, #3 Summons to U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia)(Gupta, Deepak)
April 21, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4495374) filed by NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM, ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to United States Attorney General, # 3 Summons to U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia)(Gupta, Deepak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL VETERANS LEGAL SERVICES PROGRAM
Represented By: William H. Narwold
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Smith
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Represented By: Jonathan E. Taylor
Represented By: Meghan S.B. Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL CONSUMER LAW CENTER
Represented By: William H. Narwold
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Smith
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Represented By: Jonathan E. Taylor
Represented By: Meghan S.B. Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLIANCE FOR JUSTICE
Represented By: William H. Narwold
Represented By: Elizabeth S. Smith
Represented By: Deepak Gupta
Represented By: Jonathan E. Taylor
Represented By: Meghan S.B. Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Brian J. Field
Represented By: William Mark Nebeker
Represented By: Jeremy S. Simon
Represented By: Robert Aaron Caplen
Represented By: Derek S. Hammond
Represented By: Brenda A. Gonzalez Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ROB RAWSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ROSEMARIE HOWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: TROY LAW, PLLC
Represented By: John Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOSEPH I. LIEBERMAN
Represented By: Mark I. Bailen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DON KOZICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS
Represented By: Bruce D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF LAW LIBRARIES
Represented By: Sasha Samberg-Champion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MICHAEL T. PINES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ASSOCIATION OF ALTERNATIVE NEWS MEDIA
Represented By: Bruce D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TULLY CENTER FOR FREE SPEECH
Represented By: Bruce D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THOMAS BRUCE
Represented By: Sasha Samberg-Champion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ONLINE NEWS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Bruce D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ASSOCIATED PRESS MEDIA EDITORS
Represented By: Bruce D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: INTERNATIONAL DOCUMENTARY ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Bruce D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DEBORAH BEIM
Represented By: Sasha Samberg-Champion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FIRST LOOK MEDIA WORKS, INC.
Represented By: Bruce D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CENTER FOR INVESTIGATIVE REPORTING
Represented By: Bruce D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MPA
Represented By: Bruce D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MEDIA CONSORTIUM
Represented By: Bruce D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: REPORTERS WITHOUT BORDERS
Represented By: Bruce D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: INVESTIGATIVE REPORTING WORKSHOP
Represented By: Bruce D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JONATHAN ZITTRAIN
Represented By: Sasha Samberg-Champion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SEATTLE TIMES COMPANY
Represented By: Bruce D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FIRST AMENDMENT COALITION
Represented By: Bruce D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL PRESS PHOTOGRAPHERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Bruce D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RADIO TELEVISION DIGITAL NEWS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Bruce D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SOCIETY OF PROFESSIONAL JOURNALISTS
Represented By: Bruce D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DARRELL ISSA
Represented By: Mark I. Bailen
Represented By: Mark Bailen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN SOCIETY OF NEWSPAPER EDITORS
Represented By: Bruce D. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PHILLIP MALONE
Represented By: Sasha Samberg-Champion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?