SHVARTSER v. LEKSER
Plaintiff: KONSTANTIN SHVARTSER
Defendant: EVELINA LEKSER
Case Number: 1:2016cv01199
Filed: June 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: John D. Bates
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER denying 169 plaintiff's motion for summary judgment, 170 defendant's motion for summary judgment, and 174 defendant's cross-motion for partial summary judgment. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 9/18/18. (lcjdb1)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 2/26/2018. (lcjdb1)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 2/12/2018. (lcjdb1)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER denying 103 Motion for Protective Order. See text for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 09/07/17. (lcjdb1)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 07/05/17. (lcjdb1)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 66 plaintiff's motion to compel third parties. See text of Memorandum Opinion and accompanying Orders for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 06/16/17. (lcjdb1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHVARTSER v. LEKSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KONSTANTIN SHVARTSER
Represented By: Ely Goldin(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kenneth E. Raleigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVELINA LEKSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?