KELLEHER v. DREAM CATCHER, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: STEPHEN KELLEHER
Defendant: DREAM CATCHER, L.L.C., CESAR DE ARMAS and HEIDI SCHULTZ
Case Number: 1:2016cv02092
Filed: October 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Amit P. Mehta
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying Defendants' 57 Motion for Summary Judgment, and granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 58 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See attached Memorandum Opinion and Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/31/2019. (lcapm2)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 41 Individual Defendants' Application for Stay Pending Arbitration. See the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order for further details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/04/2017. (lcapm2)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 15 16 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. See the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order for further details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/15/2017. (lcapm2)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM OPINION concerning the court's continuing jurisdiction over this matter. See the attached Memorandum Opinion for further details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/24/2017. (lcapm2)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 29 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration. See the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order for further details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/10/2017. (lcapm2)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting the Individual Defendants' 3 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. See the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/23/2016. (lcapm1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KELLEHER v. DREAM CATCHER, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN KELLEHER
Represented By: Mark David Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DREAM CATCHER, L.L.C.
Represented By: Joseph Larry Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CESAR DE ARMAS
Represented By: Joseph Larry Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEIDI SCHULTZ
Represented By: Joseph Larry Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?