September 7, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #28 Parties' Joint Motion to Vacate Scheduled Mediation. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 9/7/2018. (lcdar1)
|
September 6, 2018 |
Filing 29
PROVISIONAL ORDER DISMISSING CASE DUE TO SETTLEMENT. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 09/06/2018. (lckbj1)
|
September 6, 2018 |
Filing 28
Joint MOTION to Vacate Mediation by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS OF THE UNITED STATES (Scully, Elizabeth)
|
July 13, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER. In light of the extension of the mediation period in this action, it is hereby ORDERED that the Status Conference currently set for 7/24/2018 is VACATED and RESET for 9/11/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 07/13/2018. (lckbj1)
|
July 13, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Extend Mediation Deadline #27 is granted, and that the settlement conference now scheduled for July 19 is continued to 2:00 p.m. on Friday, September 7, 2018. in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 7/13/2018. (lcdar1)
|
July 12, 2018 |
Filing 27
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS OF THE UNITED STATES (Scully, Elizabeth)
|
May 11, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the status conference currently set for 5/31/2018 is VACATED and RESET for 7/24/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 05/11/2018. (lckbj1)
|
May 11, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation; Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 7/16/2018. Settlement Conference set for 7/19/2018 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 5/11/2018. (lcdar1)
|
May 10, 2018 |
Filing 26
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation by INFORMA EXHIBITIONS U.S., CONSTRUCTION & REAL ESTATE, INC. (Hollman, Steven)
|
April 4, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER. In light of the extended mediation period and the settlement conference set for 5/14/2018, the status conference set for 4/5/2018 is VACATED, and a new status conference is set for 5/31/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 4/4/2018. (lckbj2)
|
March 12, 2018 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference RESET for 5/14/2018 at 02:00 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. (cal)
|
March 9, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation in part: It is hereby ORDERED that the Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation #25 is GRANTED with respect to the request to reschedule the settlement conference scheduled for March 12, 2018. It is also ORDERED that said settlement conference is rescheduled for May 14, 2018 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson on 3/9/2018. (lcdar1) Modified on 3/12/2018 (lcdar1).
|
March 8, 2018 |
Filing 25
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS OF THE UNITED STATES (Scully, Elizabeth)
|
January 31, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER: Set/Reset Hearings: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Motion to Extend Mediation Period #24 , it is hereby ORDERED that the settlement conference now scheduled for February 1, 2018 is continued to 2:00 p.m. on Monday, March 12, 2018, in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. (lcdar1)
|
January 29, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation. It is hereby ORDERED that the mediation deadline in this matter is extended to 3/19/2018, and that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before 3/22/2018, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the status conference currently set for 2/20/2018 is VACATED and RESET for 4/5/2018 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 1/29/2018. (lckbj1)
|
January 23, 2018 |
Filing 24
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS OF THE UNITED STATES (Scully, Elizabeth)
|
December 15, 2017 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/8/2018 (gdf)
|
December 15, 2017 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 2/20/2018 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (gdf)
|
December 14, 2017 |
Filing 23
Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS OF THE UNITED STATES. (Scully, Elizabeth)
|
December 14, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER. As suggested in the parties' just filed joint status report, the Court will expect a joint status report on or before February 8, 2018 in the event that the parties' settlement discussions prove unfruitful. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/14/17. (lckbj2)
|
December 14, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER. The Status Conference scheduled in this matter for 12/21/2017 is vacated, and the Court approves of the next Settlement Conference being held before Magistrate Judge Robinson on 2/1/2018. A new Status Conference shall be set for 2/20/2018 at 9:30am. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/14/17. (lckbj2)
|
December 12, 2017 |
Filing 22
ORDER granting #21 Motion for Protective Order. The parties' attention is directed to the edits that the Court has made to paragraphs 8 and 13 of the proposed order. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/12/2017. (lckbj1)
|
December 12, 2017 |
Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held on 12/12/2017 from 10 AM to 12:30 PM. Subject to approval of the assigned District Judge, next Settlement Conference scheduled for 2/1/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. (lcdar1)
|
November 22, 2017 |
Set/Reset Hearings: At the request of counsel for the parties, the Settlement Conference now set for 12/04/2017 is continued to 12/12/2017 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. (lcdar3)
|
November 21, 2017 |
Filing 21
Consent MOTION for Protective Order by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS OF THE UNITED STATES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement And Protective Order For the Treatment of Confidential Information)(Scully, Elizabeth)
|
November 21, 2017 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 12/4/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson. (lcdar1)
|
October 6, 2017 |
CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson for Mediation running from October 20, 2017 until December 21, 2017. (md)
|
October 6, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER REFERRING CASE to a Magistrate Judge, to be selected at random by the Clerk's Office, for a period of mediation running from October 20, 2017, until December 21, 2017. Before and during the mediation period, the parties must respond to any early discovery requests that were outstanding as of the Initial Scheduling Conference that this Court held on October 5, 2017, but the parties shall not exchange any additional discovery requests. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a post-mediation scheduling conference is set for December 21, 2017, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must submit a revised meet-and-confer statement that complies with the requirements of this Court's #16 Order on or before December 14, 2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on October 6, 2017. (lckbj2)
|
October 5, 2017 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson: Status conference held on 10/5/17. Case called for Initial Scheduling Conference, but not held. Case to be referred to magistrate judge for mediation. Order forthcoming from chambers. Initial Conference continued to 12/21/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (Court Reporter: Barbara DeVico) (jl)
|
September 28, 2017 |
Filing 20
MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Scully, Elizabeth)
|
September 6, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the Initial Scheduling Conference that was previously scheduled for October 5, 2017, at 10:00 AM is VACATED and RESET for October 5, 2017, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on September 6, 2017. (lckbj2)
|
August 17, 2017 |
Filing 19
ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by INFORMA EXHIBITIONS U.S., CONSTRUCTION & REAL ESTATE, INC.. Related document: #4 Amended Complaint filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS OF THE UNITED STATES.(Hollman, Steven)
|
August 2, 2017 |
Filing 18
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson held on 7-27-17; Page Numbers: 1-45. Date of Issuance:8-2-18. Court Reporter/Transcriber Barbara DeVico, Telephone number 202-354-3118, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the < < <<
< < Redaction Request due 8/23/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/2/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2017.(DeVico, Barbara)
|
August 2, 2017 |
Filing 17
Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Amber C. Thomson, :Firm- Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP, :Address- 2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 100, Washington, DC 20006. Phone No. - (202) 747-2658. Fax No. - (202) 747-1901 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5058021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by INFORMA EXHIBITIONS U.S., CONSTRUCTION & REAL ESTATE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hollman, Steven)
|
August 2, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Amber C. Thomson is admitted pro hac vice in this matter as counsel for Defendant. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 08/02/2017. (lckbj1)
|
July 28, 2017 |
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Answer to the Amended Complaint due by 8/17/2017. Initial Conference set for 10/5/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (gdf)
|
July 27, 2017 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson: Status Conference held on 7/27/2017. Oral ruling on Motion #9 to dismiss. Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter Barbara DeVico) (gdf)
|
July 27, 2017 |
Filing 16
ORDER. See attached document for details. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on July 27, 2017. (lckbj2)
|
July 11, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER setting Status Conference for 7/27/2017 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on July 11, 2017. (lckbj2)
|
July 6, 2017 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson: Motion Hearing held on 7/6/2017 re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by INFORMA EXHIBITIONS U.S., CONSTRUCTION & REAL ESTATE, INC. Oral argument heard and motion taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (ztj)
|
April 14, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER setting hearing on Defendant's #9 Motion to Dismiss for July 6, 2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on April 14, 2017. (lckbj2)
|
March 6, 2017 |
Filing 15
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Edward Hogan on behalf of NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS OF THE UNITED STATES (Hogan, Thomas)
|
February 28, 2017 |
Filing 14
REPLY to opposition to motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by INFORMA EXHIBITIONS U.S., CONSTRUCTION & REAL ESTATE, INC.. (Hollman, Steven)
|
February 24, 2017 |
Filing 13
ANSWER to #10 COUNTERCLAIM by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS OF THE UNITED STATES. Related document: #10 COUNTERCLAIM filed by INFORMA EXHIBITIONS U.S., CONSTRUCTION & REAL ESTATE, INC..(Scully, Elizabeth)
|
February 21, 2017 |
Filing 12
Memorandum in opposition to re #9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS OF THE UNITED STATES. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Scully, Elizabeth)
|
February 6, 2017 |
Filing 11
Corporate Disclosure Statement by INFORMA EXHIBITIONS U.S., CONSTRUCTION & REAL ESTATE, INC.. (Hollman, Steven)
|
February 6, 2017 |
Filing 10
COUNTERCLAIM against NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS OF THE UNITED STATES filed by INFORMA EXHIBITIONS U.S., CONSTRUCTION & REAL ESTATE, INC..(Hollman, Steven)
|
February 6, 2017 |
Filing 9
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by INFORMA EXHIBITIONS U.S., CONSTRUCTION & REAL ESTATE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hollman, Steven)
|
January 30, 2017 |
Filing 8
GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 1/30/2017. (lckbj1)
|
January 23, 2017 |
Filing 7
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD by INFORMA EXHIBITIONS U.S., CONSTRUCTION & REAL ESTATE, INC.. (Hollman, Steven)
|
January 23, 2017 |
Filing 6
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven P. Hollman on behalf of INFORMA EXHIBITIONS U.S., CONSTRUCTION & REAL ESTATE, INC. (Hollman, Steven)
|
January 10, 2017 |
Filing 5
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. INFORMA EXHIBITIONS U.S., CONSTRUCTION & REAL ESTATE, INC. served on 11/8/2016, answer due 11/29/2016 (Scully, Elizabeth)
|
December 30, 2016 |
Filing 4
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS OF THE UNITED STATES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Scully, Elizabeth)
|
November 2, 2016 |
Filing 3
SUMMONS (1) Electronically as to INFORMA EXHIBITIONS U.S., CONSTRUCTION & REAL ESTATE, INC.. (Attachment: #1 Consent Form)(sb)
|
November 2, 2016 |
Filing 2
LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS OF THE UNITED STATES (Scully, Elizabeth)
|
November 2, 2016 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT For Declaratory Relief against Informa Exhibitions U.S., Construction & Real Estate, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4729928) filed by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF HOME BUILDERS OF THE UNITED STATES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Summons Summons In A Civil Action, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Scully, Elizabeth)
|
November 2, 2016 |
Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (sb)
|