MOLOCK et al v. WHOLE FOODS MARKET, INC. et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL MOLOCK and RANDAL KUCZOR
Defendant: WHOLE FOODS MARKET, INC. and WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP, INC.
Case Number: 1:2016cv02483
Filed: December 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Amit P. Mehta
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OPINION re: Defendant's 37 Motion for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal. See the attached Memorandum Opinion for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/11/2018. (lcapm3)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 30 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' 28 Second Amended Class Action Complaint. See the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/15/2018. (lcapm3)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 24 Motion to Amend the Complaint and denying as moot Defendants' 15 Motion to Dismiss. The Second Amended Complaint is now the operative complaint in this matter. The parties shall mee t and confer and, no later than June 28, 2017, notify the court if Defendants intend to file another motion to dismiss and, if so, propose a briefing schedule. See the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/22/2017. (lcapm1)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOLOCK et al v. WHOLE FOODS MARKET, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL MOLOCK
Represented By: Salvatore J. Zambri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDAL KUCZOR
Represented By: Salvatore J. Zambri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHOLE FOODS MARKET, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHOLE FOODS MARKET GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?