ALFA INTERNATIONAL SEAFOOD, INC. et al v. PRITZKER et al
Plaintiff: ALFA INTERNATIONAL SEAFOOD, INC., FORTUNE FISH & GOURMET, HANDY SEAFOOD INCORPORATED, DULCICH, INC., PACIFIC SEAFOOD PROCESSORS ASSOCIATION, TRIDENT SEAFOODS CORPORATION, WEST COAST SEAFOOD PROCESSORS ASSOCIATION, LIBBY HILL SEAFOOD RESTAURANTS, INC. and NATIONAL FISHERIES INSTITUTE
Defendant: KATHRYN D. SULLIVAN, PENNY PRITZKER, EILEEN SOBEK and SAMUAL D. RAUCH, III
Case Number: 1:2017cv00031
Filed: January 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Amit P. Mehta
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 92 Motion to Vacate 44 Order on Motion to Intervene. See the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/10/2018. (lcapm3)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM OPINION re: 56 Federal Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, 57 Intervenor-Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, 48 Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, and 64 Federal Defendants' Motion to Amend Answer. See the attached Memorandum Opinion for further details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/28/2017. (lcapm2)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 43 Motion to Intervene. See the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 05/08/2017. (lcapm2)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER denying 24 Motion to Intervene. See the attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 04/17/2017. (lcapm2) Modified on 4/17/2017 to add Memorandum Opinion language.(ztnr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALFA INTERNATIONAL SEAFOOD, INC. et al v. PRITZKER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHRYN D. SULLIVAN
Represented By: Frederick Harter Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENNY PRITZKER
Represented By: Frederick Harter Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EILEEN SOBEK
Represented By: Frederick Harter Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMUAL D. RAUCH, III
Represented By: Frederick Harter Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALFA INTERNATIONAL SEAFOOD, INC.
Represented By: Robert Phillip Charrow
Represented By: Laura Metcoff Klaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FORTUNE FISH & GOURMET
Represented By: Robert Phillip Charrow
Represented By: Laura Metcoff Klaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HANDY SEAFOOD INCORPORATED
Represented By: Robert Phillip Charrow
Represented By: Laura Metcoff Klaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DULCICH, INC.
Represented By: Robert Phillip Charrow
Represented By: Laura Metcoff Klaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PACIFIC SEAFOOD PROCESSORS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Robert Phillip Charrow
Represented By: Laura Metcoff Klaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRIDENT SEAFOODS CORPORATION
Represented By: Robert Phillip Charrow
Represented By: Laura Metcoff Klaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WEST COAST SEAFOOD PROCESSORS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Robert Phillip Charrow
Represented By: Laura Metcoff Klaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIBBY HILL SEAFOOD RESTAURANTS, INC.
Represented By: Robert Phillip Charrow
Represented By: Laura Metcoff Klaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATIONAL FISHERIES INSTITUTE
Represented By: Robert Phillip Charrow
Represented By: Laura Metcoff Klaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?