SAFARINI v. ASHCROFT et al
Plaintiff: ZAID HASSAN ABD LATIF SAFARINI
Defendant: JOHN ASHCROFT, ROBERT MUELLER, BRAD, NADA ALI, ONE UNKNOWN, AHMED AL-HAJAYH, GOVERNMENT OF THE KINGDOM OF THAILAND, UNKNOWN IMMIGRATION OFFICIALS, HASHEMITE KINGDOM OF JORDAN and THAI AIRLINE INTERNATIONAL
Case Number: 1:2017cv00430
Filed: March 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: James E. Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Civil Rights (Other)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OPINION: Plaintiff's amended complaint will be DISMISSED on the Court's own motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). A separate order, Dkt. 24 , will issue. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/29/2019. (lcrdm1, ) Modified on 1/29/2019 to change document type to "opinion" (kt).
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION: The remaining claims in Plaintiff's complaint are hereby DISMISSED on the Court's own motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/3/2018. (lcrdm1, )
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiff's claims against "Thai Airline International," Ahmed Al-Hajayh, and "Unknown Immigration Officials" for the Kingdom of Thailand are hereby DISMISSED. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/10/2017. (lcrdm1, ) Document re-uploaded with a corrected title on 10/12/2017 (tg).
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: (1) Plaintiff's motion for the appointment of counsel, Dkt. 10 , is hereby DENIED without prejudice; (2) Plaintiffs claims against the Kingdom of Thailand, the Hashemite Kingdom of Jordan, and the Thailand National Police Agency are hereby DISMISSED; (3) The Marshals Service is hereby DIRECTED to effect service on the federal defendants and Thai Airline International in compliance with Rule 4(i)(3) and this Order on or before October 10, 2017; (4) Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to, on or before September 9, 2017, (a) provide the Clerk of the Court with addresses or other information that would permit the Marshals Service to effect service on the individual foreign defendants; and (b) show cause why the claims against those individuals should not be dismissed for lack of personal jurisdiction. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/9/2017. (lcrdm1, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAFARINI v. ASHCROFT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZAID HASSAN ABD LATIF SAFARINI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN ASHCROFT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT MUELLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRAD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NADA ALI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONE UNKNOWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AHMED AL-HAJAYH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOVERNMENT OF THE KINGDOM OF THAILAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN IMMIGRATION OFFICIALS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HASHEMITE KINGDOM OF JORDAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THAI AIRLINE INTERNATIONAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?