LEVINSON et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Plaintiff: |
ROBERT LEVINSON, CHRISTINE LEVINSON, SUSAN LEVINSON BOOTHE, STEPHANIE LEVINSON CURRY, SARAH LEVINSON MORIARTY, SAMANTHA LEVINSON, DANIEL LEVINSON, DAVID LEVINSON and DOUGLAS LEVINSON |
Defendant: |
ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN |
Case Number: |
1:2017cv00511 |
Filed: |
March 21, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Columbia |
Office: |
Washington, DC Office |
County: |
88888 |
Presiding Judge: |
Reggie B. Walton |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1602 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 1, 2020 |
Filing
72
MEMORANDUM OPINION in support of 71 Order adopting 69 Report and Recommendation and awarding damages. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/1/2020. (lctjk3)
|
March 9, 2020 |
Filing
67
MEMORANDUM OPINION in support of 66 Order granting Plaintiffs' 37 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 3/9/2020. (lctjk3)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: LEVINSON et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: ROBERT LEVINSON |
Represented By: |
James A. Byram, Jr., |
Represented By: |
J. Nixon Daniel, III |
Represented By: |
David L. McGee |
Represented By: |
Gregory R. Miller |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: CHRISTINE LEVINSON |
Represented By: |
James A. Byram, Jr., |
Represented By: |
J. Nixon Daniel, III |
Represented By: |
David L. McGee |
Represented By: |
Gregory R. Miller |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: SUSAN LEVINSON BOOTHE |
Represented By: |
James A. Byram, Jr., |
Represented By: |
J. Nixon Daniel, III |
Represented By: |
David L. McGee |
Represented By: |
Gregory R. Miller |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE LEVINSON CURRY |
Represented By: |
James A. Byram, Jr., |
Represented By: |
J. Nixon Daniel, III |
Represented By: |
David L. McGee |
Represented By: |
Gregory R. Miller |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: SARAH LEVINSON MORIARTY |
Represented By: |
James A. Byram, Jr., |
Represented By: |
J. Nixon Daniel, III |
Represented By: |
David L. McGee |
Represented By: |
Gregory R. Miller |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: SAMANTHA LEVINSON |
Represented By: |
James A. Byram, Jr., |
Represented By: |
J. Nixon Daniel, III |
Represented By: |
David L. McGee |
Represented By: |
Gregory R. Miller |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: DANIEL LEVINSON |
Represented By: |
James A. Byram, Jr., |
Represented By: |
J. Nixon Daniel, III |
Represented By: |
David L. McGee |
Represented By: |
Gregory R. Miller |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: DAVID LEVINSON |
Represented By: |
James A. Byram, Jr., |
Represented By: |
J. Nixon Daniel, III |
Represented By: |
David L. McGee |
Represented By: |
Gregory R. Miller |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: DOUGLAS LEVINSON |
Represented By: |
James A. Byram, Jr., |
Represented By: |
J. Nixon Daniel, III |
Represented By: |
David L. McGee |
Represented By: |
Gregory R. Miller |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?