HOLLADAY et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN et al
Plaintiff: MARK J. PRATT, BRAD LEE SCHWARZ, SONJA RUHREN, JONATHAN F. KUNIHOLM, BRIAN R. SCHAR, JOSHUA B. WOLFE, TARA K. HUTCHINSON, GRANT BLANEY VON LETKEMANN, II, TRAVIS M. STRONG, TIMOTHY J. O'SULLIVAN, TINA L. HOUCHINS, GREGORY E. HOGANCAMP, JEFF M. WRIGHT, JOSHUA L. HOLLADAY, PEGGY J. PORTWINE, TERAY A. BUNDY, ANITA NOLTE, TAYLER HESTON, ANTHONY J. DURKACS, BRIMA TURAY, A. N., JESSICA NOLTE, MELINA ROSE NOLTE, S. K., SEAN LEE WILLIAMS, SUE ANN WILLIAMS, EVAN W. BYLER, JERALD J. JENSEN, KELLY LYNN VON LETKEMANN, MICHELE TERESE QUINN, ANDREW PEARCY, MICHAEL A. COLLINS, JACOB MILLS, DANIEL BIVENS, MICHAEL L. OWEN, PATRICK PEARCY, JAMES NICHOLS, R. O., ERNESTO I. HERNANDEZ, II, ALICIA MIXSON, JAMES R. NICHOLS, COLIN L. PEARCY, AYAD M. MAJEED, ANNE PEARCY, E. H., S. M., ROGER L. YOUNG, SHIRLEY ATKINSON, LISA LAMBERT, RANDALL L. KLINGENSMITH, AARON BASS, HEATHER N. COE, M. A. M., SHARON NICHOLS, ALLISON P. ROOSIEN, CRYSTAL HASTINGS, ALLEN R. VAUGHT, I. C. C., N. H., JAMES J. POOLE, III, KARYN MCDONALD, THOMAS M. COE, II, THOMAS NICHOLS, JODY STRIKER, SHAWN COLLINS, RUTH TURAY, BRUCE KUNIHOLM, JOSEPH JOHNSON MIXSON, SANA ALI, BRIAN CLARK ALLDRIDGE, JAY M. FONDREN, QUENTIN D. COLLINS, ANDREW CHARLES MAJOR, LARRY SEGERS, A. M. M., MELIDA COLLINS, MIRANDA A. HARELSTON, M. J. F., IOAN A. KELEMEN, DANIEL W. SEGERS, ARTHUR B. STOKENBURY, V. T. C., ELIZABETH KUNIHOLM, JOSEPH C. MIXSON, JOHN MAINE, DOMENICK J. ALAGNA, DIANNA ALLDRIDGE, GRANT R. BLACKWELL, ASHLEY MEIKEL MAJOR, LAIRD PEARCY, HAROLD BASS, VIRGINIA B. MIXSON, SEAN M. NIQUETTE, ADAM C. BASS, TRAVIS R. BASS, BALTAZAR MORIN, JR., SIERA N. COLLINS, ERIN KUNIHOLM, LAUREN NIQUETTE, HARDY P. MILLS, IV, MARY L. BASS, JOSHUA MILLS, DAVID L. SEGERS, KARON MIXSON, ANTONIO M. FREDERICK, ALL PLAINTIFFS, RONALD ALLDRIDGE, ANNE H. FONDREN, KOMA K. TEXEIRA, LAURA F. HERNANDEZ, DAVID A. SIMMONS, II, ALLEN MILTON, WYMAN H. JONES, LAURIE MILLER, CATHY JEAN MILLS, ERNESTO P. HERNANDEZ, III, SHARON W. PARKER, JOANN ALLDRIDGE and QUEEN NICHOLS
Defendant: THE ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN, ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN, IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INTELLIGENCE & SECURITY, MELLI BANK PLC, BANK MARKAZI JOMHOURI ISLAMI IRAN, BANK MELLI IRAN, NATIONAL IRANIAN OIL COMPANY and ISLAMIC REVOLUTIONARY GUARD CORP
Interested Party: DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Case Number: 1:2017cv00915
Filed: May 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Presiding Judge: Randolph D Moss
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1605A
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Carol Federighi on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE (Federighi, Carol)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of an ongoing dispute regarding third-party discovery, the Clerk's Office is directed to add the Department of Defense as an interested party in this case in order to ensure that counsel for the Department receives all relevant notices and filings. It is further ordered that counsel for the Department of Defense, Carol Federighi, shall file her appearance forthwith. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/9/2020. (kt)
January 6, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Telephone Conference held on 1/6/2020. DOJ counsel Carol Federighi and Plaintiffs shall file a Joint Status Report by 1/21/2020 proposing a schedule for processing and rolling productions, as well as setting forth their respective positions as to any areas of dispute. A Status Conference is set for 1/30/2020, at 3:00 PM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt)
December 23, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 1/6/2020, at 2:45 PM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt)
October 30, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 10/30/2019. Plaintiffs' Status Report due by 4/10/2020. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt)
October 29, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: The Scheduling Conference set for 10/30/2019 at 10:30 AM is RESCHEDULED for 2:00 PM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt) Modified on 10/29/2019 to correct hearing type(kt).
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the scheduling conference previously set for October 30, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. is hereby VACATED and RESCHEDULED for October 30, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 21. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/28/19. (lcrdm3, ) Modified on 10/29/2019 to correct hearing type (kt).
October 23, 2019 Filing 82 STATUS REPORT by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Paulos, Christopher)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' motion for an order finding that service of process has been effected as to all defendants, Dkt. #68 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part without prejudice. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/23/2019. (lcrdm2, )
September 19, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Telephone Conference held on 9/19/2019. Issues addressed; Opinion forthcoming. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook) (kt)
September 19, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 9/19/2019, at 3:30 PM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that counsel appear for a telephone conference at 3:30 PM on September 19, 2019, in Courtroom 21. The Courtroom Deputy shall provide counsel with the conference call number. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/19/2019. (lcrdm2, )
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 PROTECTIVE ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion for entry of protective order, Dkt. #79 , is hereby GRANTED. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 08/29/2019. (lcrdm2, )
August 29, 2019 Filing 79 MOTION for Protective Order by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Herman, Dustin)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 PROTECTIVE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Plaintiffs' motion for entry of protective order, Dkt. #77 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall abide by the protective order as amended by the Court. See the attached document for further details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 08/5/2019. (lcrdm2, ) Modified on 8/6/2019 to remove "MINUTE ORDER" (kt).
August 5, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION for Protective Order by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Herman, Dustin)
May 13, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Paulos, Christopher)
May 2, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 5/2/2019. Status Report due by 10/23/2019. A further Status Conference is set for 10/30/2019, at 10:30 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt)
April 24, 2019 Filing 75 STATUS REPORT by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Paulos, Christopher)
April 23, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: The Status Conference set for 5/3/2019 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for 5/2/2019, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for May 3, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. is hereby VACATED and RESCHEDULED for May 2, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 21. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/223/2019. (lcrdm2, )
April 17, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: The Status Conference set for 5/1/2019 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for 5/3/2019, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for May 1, 2019 is hereby VACATED and RESCHEDULED for May 3, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 21. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/17/2019. (lcrdm2, )
March 20, 2019 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #74 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Christopher G. Paulos, :Firm- Levin, Papantonio, Thomas, Mitchell, Rafferty & Proctor, P.A., :Address- 316 South Baylen St., Suite 600, Pensacola, FL 32502. Phone No. - (850) 435-7000. Fa was entered in error and at the request of counsel and will be refiled in 18cv1612 (jf)
March 20, 2019 Filing 74 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Christopher G. Paulos, :Firm- Levin, Papantonio, Thomas, Mitchell, Rafferty & Proctor, P.A., :Address- 316 South Baylen St., Suite 600, Pensacola, FL 32502. Phone No. - (850) 435-7000. Fax No. - (850) 436-6067 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-6010233. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DOMENICK J. ALAGNA, SANA ALI, ALL PLAINTIFFS, BRIAN CLARK ALLDRIDGE, DIANNA ALLDRIDGE, JOANN ALLDRIDGE, RONALD ALLDRIDGE, SHIRLEY ATKINSON, AARON BASS, ADAM C. BASS, HAROLD BASS, MARY L. BASS, TRAVIS R. BASS, DANIEL BIVENS, GRANT R. BLACKWELL, TERAY A. BUNDY, EVAN W. BYLER, I. C. C., V. T. C., HEATHER N. COE, THOMAS M. COE, II, MELIDA COLLINS, MICHAEL A. COLLINS, QUENTIN D. COLLINS, SHAWN COLLINS, SIERA N. COLLINS, ANTHONY J. DURKACS, M. J. F., ANNE H. FONDREN, JAY M. FONDREN, ANTONIO M. FREDERICK, E. H., N. H., MIRANDA A. HARELSTON, CRYSTAL HASTINGS, ERNESTO I. HERNANDEZ, II, ERNESTO P. HERNANDEZ, III, LAURA F. HERNANDEZ, TAYLER HESTON, GREGORY E. HOGANCAMP, JOSHUA L. HOLLADAY, TINA L. HOUCHINS, TARA K. HUTCHINSON, JERALD J. JENSEN, WYMAN H. JONES, S. K., IOAN A. KELEMEN, RANDALL L. KLINGENSMITH, BRUCE KUNIHOLM, ELIZABETH KUNIHOLM, ERIN KUNIHOLM, JONATHAN F. KUNIHOLM, LISA LAMBERT, A. M. M., M. A. M.(A MINOR), HARDY P. MILLS, IV, JACOB MILLS, JOSHUA MILLS, ALLEN MILTON, ALICIA MIXSON, JOSEPH C. MIXSON, JOSEPH JOHNSON MIXSON, KARON MIXSON, VIRGINIA B. MIXSON, BALTAZAR MORIN, JR, S. M., JOHN MAINE, AYAD M. MAJEED, ANDREW CHARLES MAJOR, ASHLEY MEIKEL MAJOR, KARYN MCDONALD, LAURIE MILLER, CATHY JEAN MILLS, JESSICA NOLTE, MELINA ROSE NOLTE, TIMOTHY J. O'SULLIVAN, R. O., MICHAEL L. OWEN, SHARON W. PARKER, ANDREW PEARCY, ANNE PEARCY, COLIN L. PEARCY, LAIRD PEARCY, A. N., JAMES R. NICHOLS, JAMES NICHOLS, QUEEN NICHOLS, SHARON NICHOLS, THOMAS NICHOLS, LAUREN NIQUETTE, SEAN M. NIQUETTE, ANITA NOLTE, PATRICK PEARCY, JAMES J. POOLE, III, PEGGY J. PORTWINE, MARK J. PRATT, MICHELE TERESE QUINN, ALLISON P. ROOSIEN, SONJA RUHREN, BRIAN R. SCHAR, BRAD LEE SCHWARZ, DANIEL W. SEGERS, DAVID L. SEGERS, LARRY SEGERS, DAVID A. SIMMONS, II, ARTHUR B. STOKENBURY, JODY STRIKER, TRAVIS M. STRONG, KOMA K. TEXEIRA, BRIMA TURAY, RUTH TURAY, ALLEN R. VAUGHT, GRANT BLANEY VON LETKEMANN, II, KELLY LYNN VON LETKEMANN, SEAN LEE WILLIAMS, SUE ANN WILLIAMS, JOSHUA B. WOLFE, JEFF M. WRIGHT, ROGER L. YOUNG (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher G. Paulos, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nations, Howard) Modified on 3/20/2019 (jf).
November 2, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff's Status Report due by 4/24/2019. Status Conference set for 5/1/2019, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' proposed case management plan, Dkt. #72 , it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs may commence third party discovery and may take more than 10 depositions by oral examination and more than 10 depositions by written questions. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file a status report on or before April 24, 2019 and shall appear for a status conference on May 1, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 21. The Court will address further scheduling at that time. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/1/2018. (lcrdm2, )
October 18, 2018 Filing 73 ERRATA corrected Proposed Case Management Plan by ALL PLAINTIFFS #72 Notice (Other) filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Paulos, Christopher)
October 12, 2018 Filing 72 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Proposed Case Management Plan by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Paulos, Christopher)
October 9, 2018 Filing 71 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to BANK MELLI IRAN (ztd)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of Plaintiffs' notice of voluntary dismissal, Dkt. #70 , it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant Melli Bank PLC is DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/9/2018. (lcrdm2, )
October 8, 2018 Filing 70 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Melli Bank Plc (Paulos, Christopher)
October 8, 2018 Filing 69 AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT regarding Bank Melli Iran by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Paulos, Christopher)
September 14, 2018 Filing 68 MOTION for Order Regarding Service of Process by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Declaration of Gary N. Kleiman, #20 Declaration of Sylvia Jarrett)(Paulos, Christopher)
September 12, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs shall file their proposed case management plan on or before 10/12/2018. (kt)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' motion for extension of time to file, Dkt. #66 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file their proposed case management plan on or before October 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/12/2018. (lcrdm2, )
September 11, 2018 Filing 67 ERRATA corrected Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Case Management Plan by ALL PLAINTIFFS #66 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Case Management Plan filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Nations, Howard)
September 11, 2018 Filing 66 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Case Management Plan by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nations, Howard)
August 31, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Status Conference held on 8/31/2018. Plaintiffs shall file their brief and a further case management plan within two (2) weeks. The Court ORDERS that the Clerk's Entry of Default, at Dkt #43 , is PARTIALLY VACATED only as to Bank Melli Iran, and the Clerk's Entry of Default, at Dkt. #44 , is also VACATED as to Bank Melli Iran, for the reasons stated on the record. Plaintiffs will re-file the default. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt)
August 17, 2018 Filing 65 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Proposed Case Management Plan by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Paulos, Christopher)
August 3, 2018 Filing 64 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,,,, PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM ADDRESSING 10-YEAR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS SET FORTH AT 28 U.S.C. 1605A(b) filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Paulos, Christopher)
July 12, 2018 Filing 63 MEMORANDUM by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Errata to First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Corrected Pages of First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Yosef Mansharoff)(Nations, Howard)
July 12, 2018 Filing 62 ERRATA to First Amended Complaint by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Nations, Howard)
July 10, 2018 Filing 61 STATUS REPORT by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Paulos, Christopher)
July 2, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/11/2018. (kt)
July 1, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Seth Katz's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #60 is hereby GRANTED. Seth Katz may appear pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/1/2018. (lcrdm2, )
June 29, 2018 Filing 60 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Seth A. Katz, :Firm- BURG SIMPSON ELDREDGE HERSH & JARDINE, P.C., :Address- 40 Inverness Drive East, Englewood, CO 80112. Phone No. - (303) 792-5595. Fax No. - (303) 708-0527 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5563250. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Seth A. Katz, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nations, Howard)
June 28, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiffs' brief regarding the Plaintiffs whose names were omitted from the case caption due on or before 7/12/2018; Plaintiffs' brief addressing the application of the 10-year statute of limitations set forth at 28 U.S.C. 1605A(b) due on or before 8/3/2018; Plaintiffs' proposed case management plan due on or before August 17, 2018. A Status Conference is set for 8/31/2018, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' representations at the telephone conference held on June 28, 2018, it is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further proceedings in this matter: (1) Plaintiffs shall file a brief regarding the Plaintiffs whose names were omitted from the case caption on or before July 12, 2018 and may file an errata; (2) Plaintiffs shall file a brief addressing the application of the 10-year statute of limitations set forth at 28 U.S.C. 1605A(b) on or before August 3, 2018; and (3) Plaintiffs shall file a proposed case management plan on or before August 17, 2018. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall appear for a status conference on August 31, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 21. Counsel wishing to appear by telephone are directed to contact the courtroom deputy to arrange for a telephonic appearance. Finally, Plaintiffs may file, at the appropriate time, a motion for an order regarding whether they have properly effected service. See Foley v. Syrian Arab Republic, No. 11-699, Dkt. 48 (motion for order), Dkt. 51 (order). Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/28/2018. (lcrdm2, )
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Christopher Dyer's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #59 is hereby GRANTED. Christopher Dyer may appear pro hac vice in this matter. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/28/2018. (lcrdm2, )
June 28, 2018 Filing 59 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Christopher C. Dyer, :Firm- The Law Offices of Lucas Magazine, :Address- 8606 Government Drive, New Port Richey, FL 34654. Phone No. - (727) 849-5353. Fax No. - (727) 845-7949 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5561045. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher C. Dyer, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nations, Howard)
June 28, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Telephone Conference held on 6/28/2018. Order forthcoming. (Court Reporter: Jeff Hook.) (kt)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The motions for leave to appear pro hac vice by Adora Sauer #55 , Dustin Herman #56 , Jeremy Tor #57 , and Alison Spiers #58 are hereby GRANTED. Adora Sauer, Dustin Herman, Jeremy Tor, and Alison Spiers may appear pro hac vice in this action. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/26/2018. (lcrdm2, )
June 25, 2018 Filing 58 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Alison R.Spiers, :Firm- The Nations Law Firm, :Address- 3131 Briarpark Dr., Suite 208, Houston, TX 77042. Phone No. - (713) 807-8400. Fax No. - (713) 807-8423 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5554234. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alison Spiers, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nations, Howard)
June 25, 2018 Filing 57 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jeremy A. Tor, :Firm- Spangenbert Shibley & Liber LLP, :Address- 1001 Lakeside Ave., East, Suite 1700, Cleveland, OH 44114 44. Phone No. - (216) 696-3232. Fax No. - (216) 696-3924 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5554009. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DOMENICK J. ALAGNA, SANA ALI, ALL PLAINTIFFS, BRIAN CLARK ALLDRIDGE, DIANNA ALLDRIDGE, JOANN ALLDRIDGE, RONALD ALLDRIDGE, SHIRLEY ATKINSON, AARON BASS, ADAM C. BASS, HAROLD BASS, MARY L. BASS, TRAVIS R. BASS, DANIEL BIVENS, GRANT R. BLACKWELL, TERAY A. BUNDY, EVAN W. BYLER, I. C. C., V. T. C., HEATHER N. COE, THOMAS M. COE, II, MELIDA COLLINS, MICHAEL A. COLLINS, QUENTIN D. COLLINS, SHAWN COLLINS, SIERA N. COLLINS, ANTHONY J. DURKACS, M. J. F., ANNE H. FONDREN, JAY M. FONDREN, ANTONIO M. FREDERICK, E. H., N. H., MIRANDA A. HARELSTON, CRYSTAL HASTINGS, ERNESTO I. HERNANDEZ, II, ERNESTO P. HERNANDEZ, III, LAURA F. HERNANDEZ, TAYLER HESTON, GREGORY E. HOGANCAMP, JOSHUA L. HOLLADAY, TINA L. HOUCHINS, TARA K. HUTCHINSON, JERALD J. JENSEN, WYMAN H. JONES, S. K., IOAN A. KELEMEN, RANDALL L. KLINGENSMITH, BRUCE KUNIHOLM, ELIZABETH KUNIHOLM, ERIN KUNIHOLM, JONATHAN F. KUNIHOLM, LISA LAMBERT, A. M. M., M. A. M.(A MINOR), HARDY P. MILLS, IV, JACOB MILLS, JOSHUA MILLS, ALLEN MILTON, ALICIA MIXSON, JOSEPH C. MIXSON, JOSEPH JOHNSON MIXSON, KARON MIXSON, VIRGINIA B. MIXSON, BALTAZAR MORIN, JR, S. M., JOHN MAINE, AYAD M. MAJEED, ANDREW CHARLES MAJOR, ASHLEY MEIKEL MAJOR, KARYN MCDONALD, LAURIE MILLER, CATHY JEAN MILLS, JESSICA NOLTE, MELINA ROSE NOLTE, TIMOTHY J. O'SULLIVAN, R. O., MICHAEL L. OWEN, SHARON W. PARKER, ANDREW PEARCY, ANNE PEARCY, COLIN L. PEARCY, LAIRD PEARCY, A. N., JAMES R. NICHOLS, JAMES NICHOLS, QUEEN NICHOLS, SHARON NICHOLS, THOMAS NICHOLS, LAUREN NIQUETTE, SEAN M. NIQUETTE, ANITA NOLTE, PATRICK PEARCY, JAMES J. POOLE, III, PEGGY J. PORTWINE, MARK J. PRATT, MICHELE TERESE QUINN, ALLISON P. ROOSIEN, SONJA RUHREN, BRIAN R. SCHAR, BRAD LEE SCHWARZ, DANIEL W. SEGERS, DAVID L. SEGERS, LARRY SEGERS, DAVID A. SIMMONS, II, ARTHUR B. STOKENBURY, JODY STRIKER, TRAVIS M. STRONG, KOMA K. TEXEIRA, BRIMA TURAY, RUTH TURAY, ALLEN R. VAUGHT, GRANT BLANEY VON LETKEMANN, II, KELLY LYNN VON LETKEMANN, SEAN LEE WILLIAMS, SUE ANN WILLIAMS, JOSHUA B. WOLFE, JEFF M. WRIGHT, ROGER L. YOUNG (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeremy A. Tor, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nations, Howard)
June 25, 2018 Filing 56 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Dustin B. Herman, :Firm- Spangenberg Shibley & Liber LLP, :Address- 1001 Lakeside Ave., East, Suite 1700, Cleveland, OH 44114. Phone No. - (216) 696-3232. Fax No. - (216) 696-3924 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5553885. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DOMENICK J. ALAGNA, SANA ALI, ALL PLAINTIFFS, BRIAN CLARK ALLDRIDGE, DIANNA ALLDRIDGE, JOANN ALLDRIDGE, RONALD ALLDRIDGE, SHIRLEY ATKINSON, AARON BASS, ADAM C. BASS, HAROLD BASS, MARY L. BASS, TRAVIS R. BASS, DANIEL BIVENS, GRANT R. BLACKWELL, TERAY A. BUNDY, EVAN W. BYLER, I. C. C., V. T. C., HEATHER N. COE, THOMAS M. COE, II, MELIDA COLLINS, MICHAEL A. COLLINS, QUENTIN D. COLLINS, SHAWN COLLINS, SIERA N. COLLINS, ANTHONY J. DURKACS, M. J. F., ANNE H. FONDREN, JAY M. FONDREN, ANTONIO M. FREDERICK, E. H., N. H., MIRANDA A. HARELSTON, CRYSTAL HASTINGS, ERNESTO I. HERNANDEZ, II, ERNESTO P. HERNANDEZ, III, LAURA F. HERNANDEZ, TAYLER HESTON, GREGORY E. HOGANCAMP, JOSHUA L. HOLLADAY, TINA L. HOUCHINS, TARA K. HUTCHINSON, JERALD J. JENSEN, WYMAN H. JONES, S. K., IOAN A. KELEMEN, RANDALL L. KLINGENSMITH, BRUCE KUNIHOLM, ELIZABETH KUNIHOLM, ERIN KUNIHOLM, JONATHAN F. KUNIHOLM, LISA LAMBERT, A. M. M., M. A. M.(A MINOR), HARDY P. MILLS, IV, JACOB MILLS, JOSHUA MILLS, ALLEN MILTON, ALICIA MIXSON, JOSEPH C. MIXSON, JOSEPH JOHNSON MIXSON, KARON MIXSON, VIRGINIA B. MIXSON, BALTAZAR MORIN, JR, S. M., JOHN MAINE, AYAD M. MAJEED, ANDREW CHARLES MAJOR, ASHLEY MEIKEL MAJOR, KARYN MCDONALD, LAURIE MILLER, CATHY JEAN MILLS, JESSICA NOLTE, MELINA ROSE NOLTE, TIMOTHY J. O'SULLIVAN, R. O., MICHAEL L. OWEN, SHARON W. PARKER, ANDREW PEARCY, ANNE PEARCY, COLIN L. PEARCY, LAIRD PEARCY, A. N., JAMES R. NICHOLS, JAMES NICHOLS, QUEEN NICHOLS, SHARON NICHOLS, THOMAS NICHOLS, LAUREN NIQUETTE, SEAN M. NIQUETTE, ANITA NOLTE, PATRICK PEARCY, JAMES J. POOLE, III, PEGGY J. PORTWINE, MARK J. PRATT, MICHELE TERESE QUINN, ALLISON P. ROOSIEN, SONJA RUHREN, BRIAN R. SCHAR, BRAD LEE SCHWARZ, DANIEL W. SEGERS, DAVID L. SEGERS, LARRY SEGERS, DAVID A. SIMMONS, II, ARTHUR B. STOKENBURY, JODY STRIKER, TRAVIS M. STRONG, KOMA K. TEXEIRA, BRIMA TURAY, RUTH TURAY, ALLEN R. VAUGHT, GRANT BLANEY VON LETKEMANN, II, KELLY LYNN VON LETKEMANN, SEAN LEE WILLIAMS, SUE ANN WILLIAMS, JOSHUA B. WOLFE, JEFF M. WRIGHT, ROGER L. YOUNG (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dustin B. Herman, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nations, Howard)
June 25, 2018 Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Adora Sauer , :Firm- MM Law LLC, :Address- 980 N. Michigan Avenue, Suite 1400, Chicago, IL 60611. Phone No. - (312) 6253-7444. Fax No. - (312) 275-8590 by DOMENICK J. ALAGNA, SANA ALI, ALL PLAINTIFFS, BRIAN CLARK ALLDRIDGE, DIANNA ALLDRIDGE, JOANN ALLDRIDGE, RONALD ALLDRIDGE, SHIRLEY ATKINSON, AARON BASS, ADAM C. BASS, HAROLD BASS, MARY L. BASS, TRAVIS R. BASS, DANIEL BIVENS, GRANT R. BLACKWELL, TERAY A. BUNDY, EVAN W. BYLER, I. C. C., V. T. C., HEATHER N. COE, THOMAS M. COE, II, MELIDA COLLINS, MICHAEL A. COLLINS, QUENTIN D. COLLINS, SHAWN COLLINS, SIERA N. COLLINS, ANTHONY J. DURKACS, M. J. F., ANNE H. FONDREN, JAY M. FONDREN, ANTONIO M. FREDERICK, E. H., N. H., MIRANDA A. HARELSTON, CRYSTAL HASTINGS, ERNESTO I. HERNANDEZ, II, ERNESTO P. HERNANDEZ, III, LAURA F. HERNANDEZ, TAYLER HESTON, GREGORY E. HOGANCAMP, JOSHUA L. HOLLADAY, TINA L. HOUCHINS, TARA K. HUTCHINSON, JERALD J. JENSEN, WYMAN H. JONES, S. K., IOAN A. KELEMEN, RANDALL L. KLINGENSMITH, BRUCE KUNIHOLM, ELIZABETH KUNIHOLM, ERIN KUNIHOLM, JONATHAN F. KUNIHOLM, LISA LAMBERT, A. M. M., M. A. M.(A MINOR), HARDY P. MILLS, IV, JACOB MILLS, JOSHUA MILLS, ALLEN MILTON, ALICIA MIXSON, JOSEPH C. MIXSON, JOSEPH JOHNSON MIXSON, KARON MIXSON, VIRGINIA B. MIXSON, BALTAZAR MORIN, JR, S. M., JOHN MAINE, AYAD M. MAJEED, ANDREW CHARLES MAJOR, ASHLEY MEIKEL MAJOR, KARYN MCDONALD, LAURIE MILLER, CATHY JEAN MILLS, JESSICA NOLTE, MELINA ROSE NOLTE, TIMOTHY J. O'SULLIVAN, R. O., MICHAEL L. OWEN, SHARON W. PARKER, ANDREW PEARCY, ANNE PEARCY, COLIN L. PEARCY, LAIRD PEARCY, A. N., JAMES R. NICHOLS, JAMES NICHOLS, QUEEN NICHOLS, SHARON NICHOLS, THOMAS NICHOLS, LAUREN NIQUETTE, SEAN M. NIQUETTE, ANITA NOLTE, PATRICK PEARCY, JAMES J. POOLE, III, PEGGY J. PORTWINE, MARK J. PRATT, MICHELE TERESE QUINN, ALLISON P. ROOSIEN, SONJA RUHREN, BRIAN R. SCHAR, BRAD LEE SCHWARZ, DANIEL W. SEGERS, DAVID L. SEGERS, LARRY SEGERS, DAVID A. SIMMONS, II, ARTHUR B. STOKENBURY, JODY STRIKER, TRAVIS M. STRONG, KOMA K. TEXEIRA, BRIMA TURAY, RUTH TURAY, ALLEN R. VAUGHT, GRANT BLANEY VON LETKEMANN, II, KELLY LYNN VON LETKEMANN, SEAN LEE WILLIAMS, SUE ANN WILLIAMS, JOSHUA B. WOLFE, JEFF M. WRIGHT, ROGER L. YOUNG (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adora Sauer, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nations, Howard) Modified text on 6/26/2018 (ztd).
June 25, 2018 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard L. Nations on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Nations, Howard)
June 22, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: The Telephone Conference set for 6/27/2018 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for 6/28/2018, at 10:30 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: The telephone conference scheduled for June 27, 2018, is hereby CONTINUED to June 28, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 21. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/22/2018. (lcrdm2, )
June 14, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 6/27/2018, at 11:15 AM, in Courtroom 21, before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (kt)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of Plaintiffs' status report #53 , Plaintiffs are hereby ORDERED to appear for a telephone conference to discuss future proceedings in this matter on June 27, 2018, at 11:15 a.m. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/14/2018. (lcrdm2, )
June 13, 2018 Filing 53 STATUS REPORT by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Paulos, Christopher)
May 24, 2018 Filing 52 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INTELLIGENCE & SECURITY, ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN, ISLAMIC REVOLUTIONARY GUARD CORP (ztd)
May 23, 2018 Filing 51 AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT Regarding the Islamic Republic of Iran, Iranian Ministry of Intelligence & Security, and the Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corp by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Paulos, Christopher)
May 3, 2018 Filing 50 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INTELLIGENCE & SECURITY served on 3/18/2018, answer due 5/17/2018; ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN served on 3/18/2018, answer due 5/17/2018; ISLAMIC REVOLUTIONARY GUARD CORP served on 3/18/2018, answer due 5/17/2018. (td)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Christian Hurt's motion to withdraw #49 is hereby GRANTED. Christian Hurt may withdraw as counsel in this case. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/3/2018. (lcrdm2, )
April 3, 2018 Filing 49 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to Christian Hurt by ALL PLAINTIFFS (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Ihrig, Chad)
March 19, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Status Report due by 6/15/2018. (kt)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of the Plaintiffs' status report #48 , it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file a further status report updating the Court on their efforts to effect service on or before June 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/16/2018. (lcrdm2, )
March 15, 2018 Filing 48 STATUS REPORT March 15, 2018 by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Paulos, Christopher)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Rachel Veronica Rose's motion to withdraw as counsel of record #47 is hereby GRANTED. Ms. Rose may withdraw as counsel in this action. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/15/2018. (lcrdm2, )
March 7, 2018 Filing 47 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by DOMENICK J. ALAGNA (Attachments: #1 Supplement Draft Order Granting Mtn. to Withdraw as Counsel)(Rose, Rachel)
February 9, 2018 Filing 46 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to BANK MELLI IRAN (td)
February 9, 2018 Filing 45 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to BANK MARKAZI JOMHOURI ISLAMI IRAN (td)
February 9, 2018 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #43 Clerk's Entry of Default, was entered in error and refiled said pleading as docket entries #44 , #45 and #46 . (td)
February 9, 2018 Filing 44 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to MELLI BANK PLC, NATIONAL IRANIAN OIL COMPANY (td)
February 8, 2018 Filing 43 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT(s);(main document is BANK MELLI IRAN default) as to: MELLI BANK PLC, BANK MARKAZI JOMHOURI, NATIONAL IRANIAN OIL COMPANY and BANK MELLI IRAN (Attachments: #1 MELLI BANK PLC Default, #2 ISLAMI IRAN Default, #3 NATIONAL IRANIAN OIL COMPANY Default) (td) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/8/2018) (td).
February 6, 2018 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT AGAINST MELLI BANK PLC by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Paulos, Christopher)
February 6, 2018 Filing 38 AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT AGAINST BANK MARKAZI JOMHOURI ISLAMI IRAN by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Paulos, Christopher)
February 6, 2018 Filing 37 AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT AGAINST NATIONAL IRANIAN OIL COMPANY by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Paulos, Christopher)
February 6, 2018 Filing 36 AFFIDAVIT FOR DEFAULT AGAINST BANK MELLI IRAN by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Paulos, Christopher)
February 5, 2018 Filing 35 SUMMONS (1) Reissued Electronically as to IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INTELLIGENCE & SECURITY (znmw)
February 2, 2018 Filing 34 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to Defendant, The Iranian Ministry of Intelligence and Security ("MOIS") filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS.(Paulos, Christopher)
December 26, 2017 Filing 42 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to NATIONAL IRANIAN OIL COMPANY. (td)
December 20, 2017 Filing 33 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to BANK MELLI IRAN served on 12/17/2017, answer due 2/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Paulos, Christopher)
December 19, 2017 Filing 41 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INTELLIGENCE & SECURITY. (td)
December 19, 2017 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF CLERK of mailing two copies of the summons, complaint, and notice of suit, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state on 12/19/2017, by Federal Express, to the U. S. Department of State, Edward Betancourt, Office of Policy Review and Interagency Liaison Overseas Citizens Services, 2201 C Street NW, Washington, DC 20522, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(4). (Attachments: #1 Waybills) (zrdj)
December 18, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' Status Report due by 3/15/2018. (kt)
December 15, 2017 Filing 40 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to BANK MARKAZI JOMHOURI ISLAMI IRAN. (td) Modified on 2/8/2018 (td).
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of Plaintiffs' representations in the December 15, 2017 Status Report #31 , it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file a further status report updating the Court on their efforts to effect service in this case on or before March 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/15/2017. (lcrdm2, )
December 15, 2017 Filing 31 STATUS REPORT by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Paulos, Christopher)
December 14, 2017 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT REQUESTING FOREIGN MAILING by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Paulos, Christopher)
December 14, 2017 Filing 29 Summons Returned Unexecuted by ALL PLAINTIFFS as to IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INTELLIGENCE & SECURITY, ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN, ISLAMIC REVOLUTIONARY GUARD CORP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - The Islamic Republic of Iran, #2 Exhibit 2 - The Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corp, #3 Exhibit 3 - Iranian Ministry of Intelligence & Security)(Paulos, Christopher)
December 5, 2017 Filing 28 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to NATIONAL IRANIAN OIL COMPANY served on 12/2/2017, answer due 1/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Paulos, Christopher)
November 28, 2017 Filing 27 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to BANK MARKAZI JOMHOURI ISLAMI IRAN served on 11/20/2017, answer due 1/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Paulos, Christopher)
November 13, 2017 Filing 26 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to MELLI BANK PLC served on 11/9/2017, answer due 1/8/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Paulos, Christopher)
November 13, 2017 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF CLERK of mailing one copy of the summons and complaint, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state on 11/13/17, by DHL, to the agency or instrumentality of the foreign state, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3). (Attachments: #1 Attachments and DHL Waybills, #2 DHL Confirmation for Pick UP) (td)
November 9, 2017 Filing 24 REQUEST from Plaintiff's for the Clerk to effect service of one copy of the summons, complaint, and notice of suit, together with a translation of each into the official language of the foreign state, by DHL, to the head of the ministry of foreign affairs, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1608(a)(3).; (See docket entry no. #23 to view) (td) Modified text on 11/9/2017 (td).
November 3, 2017 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT REQUESTING FOREIGN MAILING by ALL PLAINTIFFS. (Paulos, Christopher)
October 13, 2017 Filing 22 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by ALL PLAINTIFFS re Order on Motion for Leave to File,, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Rose, Rachel)
September 20, 2017 Filing 21 SUMMONS (1) Reissued Electronically as to ISLAMIC REVOLUTIONARY GUARD CORP. (znmw)
September 20, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Status Report due by 12/15/2017. (kt)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of Plaintiffs' representations in the September 18, 2017 Status Report #19 , it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file a further status report updating the Court on their efforts to effect service in this case on or before December 15, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/20/2017. (lcrdm2, )
September 19, 2017 Filing 20 ERRATA - Corrected Summons to Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corp by ALL PLAINTIFFS #18 Summons Issued Electronically. (Rose, Rachel)
September 18, 2017 Filing 19 STATUS REPORT by DOMENICK J. ALAGNA, SANA ALI, ALL PLAINTIFFS, BRIAN CLARK ALLDRIDGE, DIANNA ALLDRIDGE, JOANN ALLDRIDGE, RONALD ALLDRIDGE, SHIRLEY ATKINSON, AARON BASS, ADAM C. BASS, HAROLD BASS, MARY L. BASS, TRAVIS R. BASS, DANIEL BIVENS, GRANT R. BLACKWELL, TERAY A. BUNDY, EVAN W. BYLER, I. C. C., V. T. C., HEATHER N. COE, THOMAS M. COE, II, MELIDA COLLINS, MICHAEL A. COLLINS, QUENTIN D. COLLINS, SHAWN COLLINS, SIERA N. COLLINS, ANTHONY J. DURKACS, M. J. F., ANNE H. FONDREN, JAY M. FONDREN, ANTONIO M. FREDERICK, E. H., N. H., MIRANDA A. HARELSTON, CRYSTAL HASTINGS, ERNESTO I. HERNANDEZ, II, ERNESTO P. HERNANDEZ, III, LAURA F. HERNANDEZ, TAYLER HESTON, GREGORY E. HOGANCAMP, JOSHUA L. HOLLADAY, TINA L. HOUCHINS, TARA K. HUTCHINSON, JERALD J. JENSEN, WYMAN H. JONES, S. K., IOAN A. KELEMEN, RANDALL L. KLINGENSMITH, BRUCE KUNIHOLM, ELIZABETH KUNIHOLM, ERIN KUNIHOLM, JONATHAN F. KUNIHOLM, LISA LAMBERT, A. M. M., M. A. M.(A MINOR), ALLEN MILTON, ALICIA MIXSON, JOSEPH C. MIXSON, JOSEPH JOHNSON MIXSON, KARON MIXSON, VIRGINIA B. MIXSON, BALTAZAR MORIN, JR, A. N., JAMES R. NICHOLS, S. M., JOHN MAINE, AYAD M. MAJEED, ANDREW CHARLES MAJOR, ASHLEY MEIKEL MAJOR, KARYN MCDONALD, LAURIE MILLER, HARDY P. MILLS, IV, JAMES NICHOLS, QUEEN NICHOLS, SHARON NICHOLS, THOMAS NICHOLS, LAUREN NIQUETTE, SEAN M. NIQUETTE, ANITA NOLTE, JESSICA NOLTE, MELINA ROSE NOLTE, TIMOTHY J. O'SULLIVAN, R. O., MICHAEL L. OWEN, SHARON W. PARKER, ANDREW PEARCY, ANNE PEARCY, COLIN L. PEARCY, LAIRD PEARCY, PATRICK PEARCY, JAMES J. POOLE, III, PEGGY J. PORTWINE, MARK J. PRATT, MICHELE TERESE QUINN, ALLISON P. ROOSIEN, SONJA RUHREN, BRIAN R. SCHAR, BRAD LEE SCHWARZ, DANIEL W. SEGERS, DAVID L. SEGERS, LARRY SEGERS, DAVID A. SIMMONS, II, ARTHUR B. STOKENBURY, JODY STRIKER, TRAVIS M. STRONG, KOMA K. TEXEIRA, BRIMA TURAY, RUTH TURAY, ALLEN R. VAUGHT, GRANT BLANEY VON LETKEMANN, II, KELLY LYNN VON LETKEMANN, SEAN LEE WILLIAMS, SUE ANN WILLIAMS, JOSHUA B. WOLFE, JEFF M. WRIGHT, ROGER L. YOUNG. (Rose, Rachel)
September 18, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs shall file, under seal, a list containing the names and residential addresses of all plaintiffs on or before 10/14/2017. (kt)
September 15, 2017 Filing 18 SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to BANK MARKAZI JOMHOURI ISLAMI IRAN, BANK MELLI IRAN, IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INTELLIGENCE & SECURITY, ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN, ISLAMIC REVOLUTIONARY GUARD CORP, NATIONAL IRANIAN OIL COMPANY, MELLI BANK PLC. (znmw)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file their addresses under seal #17 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. It is hereby ORDERED that LCvR 5.1(c), which requires that the "full residence address of the party" be included in the caption of the first filing, is waived. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file, under seal, a list containing the names and residential addresses of all plaintiffs on or before October 14, 2017. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file, under seal, the names and residential addresses of any future plaintiffs within thirty days after filing. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/15/2017. (lcrdm2)
September 14, 2017 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Addresses Under Seal by DOMENICK J. ALAGNA, SANA ALI, BRIAN CLARK ALLDRIDGE, DIANNA ALLDRIDGE, JOANN ALLDRIDGE, RONALD ALLDRIDGE, SHIRLEY ATKINSON, AARON BASS, ADAM C. BASS, HAROLD BASS, MARY L. BASS, TRAVIS R. BASS, DANIEL BIVENS, GRANT R. BLACKWELL, TERAY A. BUNDY, EVAN W. BYLER, I. C. C., V. T. C., HEATHER N. COE, THOMAS M. COE, II, MELIDA COLLINS, MICHAEL A. COLLINS, QUENTIN D. COLLINS, SHAWN COLLINS, SIERA N. COLLINS, ANTHONY J. DURKACS, M. J. F., ANNE H. FONDREN, JAY M. FONDREN, ANTONIO M. FREDERICK, E. H., N. H., MIRANDA A. HARELSTON, CRYSTAL HASTINGS, ERNESTO I. HERNANDEZ, II, ERNESTO P. HERNANDEZ, III, LAURA F. HERNANDEZ, TAYLER HESTON, GREGORY E. HOGANCAMP, JOSHUA L. HOLLADAY, TINA L. HOUCHINS, TARA K. HUTCHINSON, JERALD J. JENSEN, WYMAN H. JONES, S. K., IOAN A. KELEMEN, RANDALL L. KLINGENSMITH, BRUCE KUNIHOLM, ELIZABETH KUNIHOLM, ERIN KUNIHOLM, JONATHAN F. KUNIHOLM, LISA LAMBERT, A. M. M., M. A. M.(A MINOR), ALICIA MIXSON, JOSEPH C. MIXSON, JOSEPH JOHNSON MIXSON, KARON MIXSON, VIRGINIA B. MIXSON, BALTAZAR MORIN, JR, A. N., JAMES R. NICHOLS, JAMES NICHOLS, S. M., JOHN MAINE, AYAD M. MAJEED, ANDREW CHARLES MAJOR, ASHLEY MEIKEL MAJOR, KARYN MCDONALD, LAURIE MILLER, HARDY P. MILLS, IV, ALLEN MILTON, QUEEN NICHOLS, SHARON NICHOLS, THOMAS NICHOLS, LAUREN NIQUETTE, SEAN M. NIQUETTE, ANITA NOLTE, JESSICA NOLTE, MELINA ROSE NOLTE, TIMOTHY J. O'SULLIVAN, R. O., MICHAEL L. OWEN, SHARON W. PARKER, ANDREW PEARCY, ANNE PEARCY, COLIN L. PEARCY, LAIRD PEARCY, PATRICK PEARCY, JAMES J. POOLE, III, PEGGY J. PORTWINE, MARK J. PRATT, MICHELE TERESE QUINN, ALLISON P. ROOSIEN, SONJA RUHREN, BRIAN R. SCHAR, BRAD LEE SCHWARZ, DANIEL W. SEGERS, DAVID L. SEGERS, LARRY SEGERS, DAVID A. SIMMONS, II, ARTHUR B. STOKENBURY, JODY STRIKER, TRAVIS M. STRONG, KOMA K. TEXEIRA, BRIMA TURAY, RUTH TURAY, ALLEN R. VAUGHT, GRANT BLANEY VON LETKEMANN, II, KELLY LYNN VON LETKEMANN, SEAN LEE WILLIAMS, SUE ANN WILLIAMS, JOSHUA B. WOLFE, JEFF M. WRIGHT, ROGER L. YOUNG (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rose, Rachel)
September 14, 2017 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN, ISLAMIC REVOLUTIONARY GUARD CORP, IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INTELLIGENCE & SECURITY, BANK MARKAZI JOMHOURI ISLAMI IRAN, BANK MELLI IRAN, MELLI BANK PLC, NATIONAL IRANIAN OIL COMPANY filed by TRAVIS M. STRONG, JERALD J. JENSEN, KELLY LYNN VON LETKEMANN, SONJA RUHREN, PEGGY J. PORTWINE, SEAN LEE WILLIAMS, BRAD LEE SCHWARZ, S. K., MELINA ROSE NOLTE, JOSHUA B. WOLFE, A. N., TIMOTHY J. O'SULLIVAN, BRIAN R. SCHAR, TERAY A. BUNDY, MARK J. PRATT, JOSHUA L. HOLLADAY, JEFF M. WRIGHT, GRANT BLANEY VON LETKEMANN, II, SUE ANN WILLIAMS, JESSICA NOLTE, BRIMA TURAY, TAYLER HESTON, ANITA NOLTE, ANTHONY J. DURKACS, TARA K. HUTCHINSON, EVAN W. BYLER, MICHELE TERESE QUINN, JONATHAN F. KUNIHOLM, TINA L. HOUCHINS, GREGORY E. HOGANCAMP, ANDREW PEARCY, JAMES NICHOLS, ARTHUR B. STOKENBURY, MICHAEL A. COLLINS, BRIAN CLARK ALLDRIDGE, ANNE H. FONDREN, RONALD ALLDRIDGE, RUTH TURAY, SANA ALI, ALLISON P. ROOSIEN, SHAWN COLLINS, JOANN ALLDRIDGE, ANNE PEARCY, KARYN MCDONALD, SIERA N. COLLINS, MICHAEL L. OWEN, DAVID L. SEGERS, JODY STRIKER, HARDY P. MILLS, IV, M. J. F., QUENTIN D. COLLINS, SHIRLEY ATKINSON, DANIEL W. SEGERS, PATRICK PEARCY, JOSEPH C. MIXSON, ELIZABETH KUNIHOLM, V. T. C., CRYSTAL HASTINGS, JAY M. FONDREN, RANDALL L. KLINGENSMITH, JOSEPH JOHNSON MIXSON, AYAD M. MAJEED, VIRGINIA B. MIXSON, JAMES R. NICHOLS, JAMES J. POOLE, III, BALTAZAR MORIN, JR, GRANT R. BLACKWELL, HAROLD BASS, TRAVIS R. BASS, LARRY SEGERS, N. H., DIANNA ALLDRIDGE, R. O., HEATHER N. COE, MARY L. BASS, LAURIE MILLER, M. A. M., MIRANDA A. HARELSTON, ASHLEY MEIKEL MAJOR, ALLEN R. VAUGHT, LISA LAMBERT, JOHN MAINE, QUEEN NICHOLS, ALLEN MILTON, ANTONIO M. FREDERICK, MELIDA COLLINS, DAVID A. SIMMONS, II, BRUCE KUNIHOLM, WYMAN H. JONES, DANIEL BIVENS, SHARON W. PARKER, ERIN KUNIHOLM, ERNESTO I. HERNANDEZ, II, SHARON NICHOLS, I. C. C., IOAN A. KELEMEN, SEAN M. NIQUETTE, THOMAS NICHOLS, ADAM C. BASS, E. H., THOMAS M. COE, II, KOMA K. TEXEIRA, AARON BASS, DOMENICK J. ALAGNA, ANDREW CHARLES MAJOR, ROGER L. YOUNG, COLIN L. PEARCY, KARON MIXSON, ALICIA MIXSON, LAIRD PEARCY, S. M., A. M. M., ERNESTO P. HERNANDEZ, III, LAUREN NIQUETTE, LAURA F. HERNANDEZ. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Islamic Republic of Iran, #2 Summons - Islamic Revolutionary Guard Corp, #3 Summons - Iranian Ministry of Intelligence & Security, #4 Summons - Bank Markazi Jomhouri Islami Iran, #5 Summons - Bank Melli Iran, #6 Summons - Melli Bank PLC, #7 Summons - National Iranian Oil Company)(Rose, Rachel)
September 5, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' Status Report due by 9/18/2017. (kt)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiffs are hereby ORDERED to file a status report on or before September 18, 2017, updating the Court on their efforts to effect service in this case in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1608. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/5/2017. (lcrdm2, )
June 13, 2017 Filing 15 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by TERAY A. BUNDY, EVAN W. BYLER, ANTHONY J. DURKACS, TAYLER HESTON, GREGORY E. HOGANCAMP, JOSHUA L. HOLLADAY, TINA L. HOUCHINS, TARA K. HUTCHINSON, JERALD J. JENSEN, S. K., JONATHAN F. KUNIHOLM, A. N., ANITA NOLTE, JESSICA NOLTE, MELINA ROSE NOLTE, TIMOTHY J. O'SULLIVAN, PEGGY J. PORTWINE, MARK J. PRATT, MICHELE TERESE QUINN, SONJA RUHREN, BRIAN R. SCHAR, BRAD LEE SCHWARZ, TRAVIS M. STRONG, BRIMA TURAY, GRANT BLANEY VON LETKEMANN, II, KELLY LYNN VON LETKEMANN, SEAN LEE WILLIAMS, SUE ANN WILLIAMS, JOSHUA B. WOLFE, JEFF M. WRIGHT re Order on Motion for Leave to File, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rose, Rachel)
May 22, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs are to file, under seal, a list containing the names and residential addresses of all plaintiffs on or before 6/15/2017. (kt)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the pending motions for leave to appear pro hac vice #3 , #4 , #5 . #6 , #7 , #8 , #9 , #10 , #11 , #12 , #13 , the motions are GRANTED, and Gavriel Mairone, Christopher Paulos, Jeffrey Gaddy, W. Troy Bouk, Troy Rafferty, Chad E. Ihrig, Christian Hurt, Michael B. Angelovich, James L. Magazine, David K. TeSelle, and William Hawal, are hereby granted leave to appear pro hac vice in this matter. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/22/2017. (lcrdm2, )
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of plaintiffs' motion for leave to file their addresses under seal #2 , the motion is GRANTED, and plaintiffs are hereby ORDERED to file, under seal, a list containing the names and residential addresses of all plaintiffs on or before June 15, 2017. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/22/2017. (lcrdm2, )
May 19, 2017 Filing 14 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN. (jf)
May 16, 2017 Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (md)
May 16, 2017 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- William Hawal, :Firm- Spangenberg Shibley & Liber, LLP, :Address- 1001 Lakeside Avenue East, Suite 1700, Cleveland, OH 44114. Phone No. - (216) 696-3232. Fax No. - (216) 696-3924 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4952789. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by TERAY A. BUNDY, EVAN W. BYLER, ANTHONY J. DURKACS, TAYLER HESTON, GREGORY E. HOGANCAMP, JOSHUA L. HOLLADAY, TINA L. HOUCHINS, TARA K. HUTCHINSON, JERALD J. JENSEN, S. K., JONATHAN F. KUNIHOLM, A. N., ANITA NOLTE, JESSICA NOLTE, MELINA ROSE NOLTE, TIMOTHY J. O'SULLIVAN, PEGGY J. PORTWINE, MARK J. PRATT, MICHELE TERESE QUINN, SONJA RUHREN, BRIAN R. SCHAR, BRAD LEE SCHWARZ, TRAVIS M. STRONG, BRIMA TURAY, GRANT BLANEY VON LETKEMANN, II, KELLY LYNN VON LETKEMANN, SEAN LEE WILLIAMS, SUE ANN WILLIAMS, JOSHUA B. WOLFE, JEFF M. WRIGHT (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William Hawal, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rose, Rachel)
May 15, 2017 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- David K. TeSelle, :Firm- Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh and Jardine, P.C., :Address- 40 Inverness Dr. East, Englewood, CO 80112. Phone No. - (303) 792-5595. Fax No. - (303) 708-0527 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4952783. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by TERAY A. BUNDY, EVAN W. BYLER, ANTHONY J. DURKACS, TAYLER HESTON, GREGORY E. HOGANCAMP, JOSHUA L. HOLLADAY, TINA L. HOUCHINS, TARA K. HUTCHINSON, JERALD J. JENSEN, S. K., JONATHAN F. KUNIHOLM, A. N., ANITA NOLTE, JESSICA NOLTE, MELINA ROSE NOLTE, TIMOTHY J. O'SULLIVAN, PEGGY J. PORTWINE, MARK J. PRATT, MICHELE TERESE QUINN, SONJA RUHREN, BRIAN R. SCHAR, BRAD LEE SCHWARZ, TRAVIS M. STRONG, BRIMA TURAY, GRANT BLANEY VON LETKEMANN, II, KELLY LYNN VON LETKEMANN, SEAN LEE WILLIAMS, SUE ANN WILLIAMS, JOSHUA B. WOLFE, JEFF M. WRIGHT (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David K. TeSelle, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rose, Rachel)
May 15, 2017 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- James L. Magazine, :Firm- The Law Offices of Lucas/Magazine, :Address- 8606 Government Dr., New Port Richey, FL 34654. Phone No. - (727) 849-5353. Fax No. - (727) 845-7949 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4952782. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by TERAY A. BUNDY, EVAN W. BYLER, ANTHONY J. DURKACS, TAYLER HESTON, GREGORY E. HOGANCAMP, JOSHUA L. HOLLADAY, TINA L. HOUCHINS, TARA K. HUTCHINSON, JERALD J. JENSEN, S. K., JONATHAN F. KUNIHOLM, A. N., ANITA NOLTE, JESSICA NOLTE, MELINA ROSE NOLTE, TIMOTHY J. O'SULLIVAN, PEGGY J. PORTWINE, MARK J. PRATT, MICHELE TERESE QUINN, SONJA RUHREN, BRIAN R. SCHAR, BRAD LEE SCHWARZ, TRAVIS M. STRONG, BRIMA TURAY, GRANT BLANEY VON LETKEMANN, II, KELLY LYNN VON LETKEMANN, SEAN LEE WILLIAMS, SUE ANN WILLIAMS, JOSHUA B. WOLFE, JEFF M. WRIGHT (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James L. Magazine, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rose, Rachel)
May 15, 2017 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael B. Angelovich, :Firm- Nix, Patterson & Roach, LLP, :Address- 3600 N. Capital of Texas Hwy., Bldg B, Ste 350, Austin, TX 78746. Phone No. - (512) 328-5333. Fax No. - (512) 328-5335 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4952781. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by TERAY A. BUNDY, EVAN W. BYLER, ANTHONY J. DURKACS, TAYLER HESTON, GREGORY E. HOGANCAMP, JOSHUA L. HOLLADAY, TINA L. HOUCHINS, TARA K. HUTCHINSON, JERALD J. JENSEN, S. K., JONATHAN F. KUNIHOLM, A. N., ANITA NOLTE, JESSICA NOLTE, MELINA ROSE NOLTE, TIMOTHY J. O'SULLIVAN, PEGGY J. PORTWINE, MARK J. PRATT, MICHELE TERESE QUINN, SONJA RUHREN, BRIAN R. SCHAR, BRAD LEE SCHWARZ, TRAVIS M. STRONG, BRIMA TURAY, GRANT BLANEY VON LETKEMANN, II, KELLY LYNN VON LETKEMANN, SEAN LEE WILLIAMS, SUE ANN WILLIAMS, JOSHUA B. WOLFE, JEFF M. WRIGHT (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael B. Angelovich, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rose, Rachel)
May 15, 2017 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Christian Hurt, :Firm- Nix, Patterson & Roach, LLP, :Address- 1845 Woodall Rodgers Fwy, Ste 1050, Dallas, TX 75201. Phone No. - (972) 831-1188. Fax No. - (972) 444-0716 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4952780. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by TERAY A. BUNDY, EVAN W. BYLER, ANTHONY J. DURKACS, TAYLER HESTON, GREGORY E. HOGANCAMP, JOSHUA L. HOLLADAY, TINA L. HOUCHINS, TARA K. HUTCHINSON, JERALD J. JENSEN, S. K., JONATHAN F. KUNIHOLM, A. N., ANITA NOLTE, JESSICA NOLTE, MELINA ROSE NOLTE, TIMOTHY J. O'SULLIVAN, PEGGY J. PORTWINE, MARK J. PRATT, MICHELE TERESE QUINN, SONJA RUHREN, BRIAN R. SCHAR, BRAD LEE SCHWARZ, TRAVIS M. STRONG, BRIMA TURAY, GRANT BLANEY VON LETKEMANN, II, KELLY LYNN VON LETKEMANN, SEAN LEE WILLIAMS, SUE ANN WILLIAMS, JOSHUA B. WOLFE, JEFF M. WRIGHT (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christian Hurt, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rose, Rachel)
May 15, 2017 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Chad E. Ihrig, :Firm- Nix, Patterson & Roach, LLP, :Address- 3600 N. Capital of Texas Hwy., Bldg B, Ste 350, Austin, TX 78746. Phone No. - (512) 328-5333. Fax No. - (512) 328-5335 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4952778. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by TERAY A. BUNDY, EVAN W. BYLER, ANTHONY J. DURKACS, TAYLER HESTON, GREGORY E. HOGANCAMP, JOSHUA L. HOLLADAY, TINA L. HOUCHINS, TARA K. HUTCHINSON, JERALD J. JENSEN, S. K., JONATHAN F. KUNIHOLM, A. N., ANITA NOLTE, JESSICA NOLTE, MELINA ROSE NOLTE, TIMOTHY J. O'SULLIVAN, PEGGY J. PORTWINE, MARK J. PRATT, MICHELE TERESE QUINN, SONJA RUHREN, BRIAN R. SCHAR, BRAD LEE SCHWARZ, TRAVIS M. STRONG, BRIMA TURAY, GRANT BLANEY VON LETKEMANN, II, KELLY LYNN VON LETKEMANN, SEAN LEE WILLIAMS, SUE ANN WILLIAMS, JOSHUA B. WOLFE, JEFF M. WRIGHT (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chad E. Ihrig, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rose, Rachel)
May 15, 2017 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Troy Rafferty, :Firm- Levin, Papantonio, Thomas, Mitchell, Rafferty & Proctor, P.A., :Address- 316 South Baylen St., Suite 600, Pensacola, FL 32502. Phone No. - (850) 435-7000. Fax No. - (850) 435-7020 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4952775. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by TERAY A. BUNDY, EVAN W. BYLER, ANTHONY J. DURKACS, TAYLER HESTON, GREGORY E. HOGANCAMP, JOSHUA L. HOLLADAY, TINA L. HOUCHINS, TARA K. HUTCHINSON, JERALD J. JENSEN, S. K., JONATHAN F. KUNIHOLM, A. N., ANITA NOLTE, JESSICA NOLTE, MELINA ROSE NOLTE, TIMOTHY J. O'SULLIVAN, PEGGY J. PORTWINE, MARK J. PRATT, MICHELE TERESE QUINN, SONJA RUHREN, BRIAN R. SCHAR, BRAD LEE SCHWARZ, TRAVIS M. STRONG, BRIMA TURAY, GRANT BLANEY VON LETKEMANN, II, KELLY LYNN VON LETKEMANN, SEAN LEE WILLIAMS, SUE ANN WILLIAMS, JOSHUA B. WOLFE, JEFF M. WRIGHT (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Troy Rafferty, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rose, Rachel)
May 15, 2017 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- W. Troy Bouk, :Firm- Levin, Papantonio, Thomas, Mitchell, Rafferty & Proctor, P.A., :Address- 316 South Baylen St., Suite 600, Pensacola, FL 32502. Phone No. - (850) 435-7000. Fax No. - (850) 435-7020 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4952774. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by TERAY A. BUNDY, EVAN W. BYLER, ANTHONY J. DURKACS, TAYLER HESTON, GREGORY E. HOGANCAMP, JOSHUA L. HOLLADAY, TINA L. HOUCHINS, TARA K. HUTCHINSON, JERALD J. JENSEN, S. K., JONATHAN F. KUNIHOLM, A. N., ANITA NOLTE, JESSICA NOLTE, MELINA ROSE NOLTE, TIMOTHY J. O'SULLIVAN, PEGGY J. PORTWINE, MARK J. PRATT, MICHELE TERESE QUINN, SONJA RUHREN, BRIAN R. SCHAR, BRAD LEE SCHWARZ, TRAVIS M. STRONG, BRIMA TURAY, GRANT BLANEY VON LETKEMANN, II, KELLY LYNN VON LETKEMANN, SEAN LEE WILLIAMS, SUE ANN WILLIAMS, JOSHUA B. WOLFE, JEFF M. WRIGHT (Attachments: #1 Declaration of W. Troy Bouk, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rose, Rachel)
May 15, 2017 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jeffrey Gaddy, :Firm- Levin, Papantonio, Thomas, Mitchell, Rafferty & Proctor, P.A., :Address- 316 South Baylen St., Suite 600, Pensacola, FL 32502. Phone No. - (850) 435-7000. Fax No. - (850) 435-7020 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4952772. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by TERAY A. BUNDY, EVAN W. BYLER, ANTHONY J. DURKACS, TAYLER HESTON, GREGORY E. HOGANCAMP, JOSHUA L. HOLLADAY, TINA L. HOUCHINS, TARA K. HUTCHINSON, JERALD J. JENSEN, S. K., JONATHAN F. KUNIHOLM, A. N., ANITA NOLTE, JESSICA NOLTE, MELINA ROSE NOLTE, TIMOTHY J. O'SULLIVAN, PEGGY J. PORTWINE, MARK J. PRATT, MICHELE TERESE QUINN, SONJA RUHREN, BRIAN R. SCHAR, BRAD LEE SCHWARZ, TRAVIS M. STRONG, BRIMA TURAY, GRANT BLANEY VON LETKEMANN, II, KELLY LYNN VON LETKEMANN, SEAN LEE WILLIAMS, SUE ANN WILLIAMS, JOSHUA B. WOLFE, JEFF M. WRIGHT (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey Gaddy, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rose, Rachel)
May 15, 2017 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Christopher Paulos, :Firm- Levin, Papantonio, Thomas, Mitchell, Rafferty & Proctor, P.A., :Address- 316 South Baylen St., Suite 600, Pensacola, FL 32502. Phone No. - (850) 435-7000. Fax No. - (850) 435-7020 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-4952768. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by TERAY A. BUNDY, EVAN W. BYLER, ANTHONY J. DURKACS, TAYLER HESTON, GREGORY E. HOGANCAMP, JOSHUA L. HOLLADAY, TINA L. HOUCHINS, TARA K. HUTCHINSON, JERALD J. JENSEN, S. K., JONATHAN F. KUNIHOLM, A. N., ANITA NOLTE, JESSICA NOLTE, MELINA ROSE NOLTE, TIMOTHY J. O'SULLIVAN, PEGGY J. PORTWINE, MARK J. PRATT, MICHELE TERESE QUINN, SONJA RUHREN, BRIAN R. SCHAR, BRAD LEE SCHWARZ, TRAVIS M. STRONG, BRIMA TURAY, GRANT BLANEY VON LETKEMANN, II, KELLY LYNN VON LETKEMANN, SEAN LEE WILLIAMS, SUE ANN WILLIAMS, JOSHUA B. WOLFE, JEFF M. WRIGHT (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher Paulos, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rose, Rachel)
May 15, 2017 Filing 3 by TERAY A. BUNDY, EVAN W. BYLER, ANTHONY J. DURKACS, TAYLER HESTON, GREGORY E. HOGANCAMP, JOSHUA L. HOLLADAY, TINA L. HOUCHINS, TARA K. HUTCHINSON, JERALD J. JENSEN, S. K., JONATHAN F. KUNIHOLM, A. N., ANITA NOLTE, JESSICA NOLTE, MELINA ROSE NOLTE, TIMOTHY J. O'SULLIVAN, PEGGY J. PORTWINE, MARK J. PRATT, MICHELE TERESE QUINN, SONJA RUHREN, BRIAN R. SCHAR, BRAD LEE SCHWARZ, TRAVIS M. STRONG, BRIMA TURAY, GRANT BLANEY VON LETKEMANN, II, KELLY LYNN VON LETKEMANN, SEAN LEE WILLIAMS, SUE ANN WILLIAMS, JOSHUA B. WOLFE, JEFF M. WRIGHT (Attachments: #1 Declaration of G. Mairone, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rose, Rachel)
May 15, 2017 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Addresses Under Seal by TERAY A. BUNDY, EVAN W. BYLER, ANTHONY J. DURKACS, TAYLER HESTON, GREGORY E. HOGANCAMP, JOSHUA L. HOLLADAY, TINA L. HOUCHINS, TARA K. HUTCHINSON, JERALD J. JENSEN, S. K., JONATHAN F. KUNIHOLM, A. N., ANITA NOLTE, JESSICA NOLTE, MELINA ROSE NOLTE, TIMOTHY J. O'SULLIVAN, PEGGY J. PORTWINE, MARK J. PRATT, MICHELE TERESE QUINN, SONJA RUHREN, BRIAN R. SCHAR, BRAD LEE SCHWARZ, TRAVIS M. STRONG, BRIMA TURAY, GRANT BLANEY VON LETKEMANN, II, KELLY LYNN VON LETKEMANN, SEAN LEE WILLIAMS, SUE ANN WILLIAMS, JOSHUA B. WOLFE, JEFF M. WRIGHT (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rose, Rachel)
May 15, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4952746) filed by MELINA ROSE NOLTE, TRAVIS M. STRONG, JERALD J. JENSEN, KELLY LYNN VON LETKEMANN, MARK J. PRATT, TERAY A. BUNDY, TAYLER HESTON, JOSHUA L. HOLLADAY, SONJA RUHREN, JEFF M. WRIGHT, PEGGY J. PORTWINE, ANITA NOLTE, ANTHONY J. DURKACS, JOSHUA B. WOLFE, SEAN LEE WILLIAMS, GRANT BLANEY VON LETKEMANN, II, TARA K. HUTCHINSON, SUE ANN WILLIAMS, EVAN W. BYLER, MICHELE TERESE QUINN, A. N., BRAD LEE SCHWARZ, JESSICA NOLTE, TIMOTHY J. O'SULLIVAN, JONATHAN F. KUNIHOLM, TINA L. HOUCHINS, BRIMA TURAY, BRIAN R. SCHAR, S. K., GREGORY E. HOGANCAMP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Rose, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOLLADAY et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK J. PRATT
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Jeffrey Gaddy
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: W. Troy Bouk
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: David K. TeSelle
Represented By: Christian Hurt
Represented By: Troy Rafferty
Represented By: Chad E. Ihrig
Represented By: Michael B. Angelovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRAD LEE SCHWARZ
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Jeffrey Gaddy
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: W. Troy Bouk
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: David K. TeSelle
Represented By: Christian Hurt
Represented By: Troy Rafferty
Represented By: Chad E. Ihrig
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: Michael B. Angelovich
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONJA RUHREN
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Jeffrey Gaddy
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: W. Troy Bouk
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: David K. TeSelle
Represented By: Christian Hurt
Represented By: Troy Rafferty
Represented By: Chad E. Ihrig
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: Michael B. Angelovich
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN F. KUNIHOLM
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Jeffrey Gaddy
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: W. Troy Bouk
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: David K. TeSelle
Represented By: Christian Hurt
Represented By: Troy Rafferty
Represented By: Chad E. Ihrig
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: Michael B. Angelovich
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN R. SCHAR
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Jeffrey Gaddy
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: W. Troy Bouk
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: David K. TeSelle
Represented By: Christian Hurt
Represented By: Troy Rafferty
Represented By: Chad E. Ihrig
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: Michael B. Angelovich
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA B. WOLFE
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Jeffrey Gaddy
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: W. Troy Bouk
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: David K. TeSelle
Represented By: Christian Hurt
Represented By: Troy Rafferty
Represented By: Chad E. Ihrig
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: Michael B. Angelovich
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TARA K. HUTCHINSON
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Jeffrey Gaddy
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: W. Troy Bouk
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: David K. TeSelle
Represented By: Christian Hurt
Represented By: Troy Rafferty
Represented By: Chad E. Ihrig
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: Michael B. Angelovich
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRANT BLANEY VON LETKEMANN, II
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Jeffrey Gaddy
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: W. Troy Bouk
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: David K. TeSelle
Represented By: Christian Hurt
Represented By: Troy Rafferty
Represented By: Chad E. Ihrig
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: Michael B. Angelovich
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRAVIS M. STRONG
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Jeffrey Gaddy
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: W. Troy Bouk
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: David K. TeSelle
Represented By: Christian Hurt
Represented By: Troy Rafferty
Represented By: Chad E. Ihrig
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: Michael B. Angelovich
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY J. O'SULLIVAN
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Jeffrey Gaddy
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: W. Troy Bouk
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: David K. TeSelle
Represented By: Christian Hurt
Represented By: Troy Rafferty
Represented By: Chad E. Ihrig
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: Michael B. Angelovich
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TINA L. HOUCHINS
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Jeffrey Gaddy
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: W. Troy Bouk
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: David K. TeSelle
Represented By: Christian Hurt
Represented By: Troy Rafferty
Represented By: Chad E. Ihrig
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: Michael B. Angelovich
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY E. HOGANCAMP
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Jeffrey Gaddy
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: W. Troy Bouk
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: David K. TeSelle
Represented By: Christian Hurt
Represented By: Troy Rafferty
Represented By: Chad E. Ihrig
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: Michael B. Angelovich
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFF M. WRIGHT
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Jeffrey Gaddy
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: W. Troy Bouk
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: David K. TeSelle
Represented By: Christian Hurt
Represented By: Troy Rafferty
Represented By: Chad E. Ihrig
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: Michael B. Angelovich
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA L. HOLLADAY
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Jeffrey Gaddy
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: W. Troy Bouk
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: David K. TeSelle
Represented By: Christian Hurt
Represented By: Troy Rafferty
Represented By: Chad E. Ihrig
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: Michael B. Angelovich
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEGGY J. PORTWINE
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Jeffrey Gaddy
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: W. Troy Bouk
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: David K. TeSelle
Represented By: Christian Hurt
Represented By: Troy Rafferty
Represented By: Chad E. Ihrig
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: Michael B. Angelovich
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERAY A. BUNDY
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Jeffrey Gaddy
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: W. Troy Bouk
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: David K. TeSelle
Represented By: Christian Hurt
Represented By: Troy Rafferty
Represented By: Chad E. Ihrig
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: Michael B. Angelovich
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANITA NOLTE
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Jeffrey Gaddy
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: W. Troy Bouk
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: David K. TeSelle
Represented By: Christian Hurt
Represented By: Troy Rafferty
Represented By: Chad E. Ihrig
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: Michael B. Angelovich
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAYLER HESTON
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Jeffrey Gaddy
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: W. Troy Bouk
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: David K. TeSelle
Represented By: Christian Hurt
Represented By: Troy Rafferty
Represented By: Chad E. Ihrig
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: Michael B. Angelovich
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY J. DURKACS
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Jeffrey Gaddy
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: W. Troy Bouk
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: David K. TeSelle
Represented By: Christian Hurt
Represented By: Troy Rafferty
Represented By: Chad E. Ihrig
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: Michael B. Angelovich
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIMA TURAY
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Jeffrey Gaddy
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: W. Troy Bouk
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: David K. TeSelle
Represented By: Christian Hurt
Represented By: Troy Rafferty
Represented By: Chad E. Ihrig
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: Michael B. Angelovich
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. N.
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Jeffrey Gaddy
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: W. Troy Bouk
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: David K. TeSelle
Represented By: Christian Hurt
Represented By: Troy Rafferty
Represented By: Chad E. Ihrig
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: Michael B. Angelovich
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSICA NOLTE
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Jeffrey Gaddy
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: W. Troy Bouk
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: David K. TeSelle
Represented By: Christian Hurt
Represented By: Troy Rafferty
Represented By: Chad E. Ihrig
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: Michael B. Angelovich
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELINA ROSE NOLTE
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Jeffrey Gaddy
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: W. Troy Bouk
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: David K. TeSelle
Represented By: Christian Hurt
Represented By: Troy Rafferty
Represented By: Chad E. Ihrig
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: Michael B. Angelovich
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. K.
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Jeffrey Gaddy
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: W. Troy Bouk
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: David K. TeSelle
Represented By: Christian Hurt
Represented By: Troy Rafferty
Represented By: Chad E. Ihrig
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: Michael B. Angelovich
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEAN LEE WILLIAMS
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Jeffrey Gaddy
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: W. Troy Bouk
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: David K. TeSelle
Represented By: Christian Hurt
Represented By: Troy Rafferty
Represented By: Chad E. Ihrig
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: Michael B. Angelovich
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUE ANN WILLIAMS
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Jeffrey Gaddy
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: W. Troy Bouk
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: David K. TeSelle
Represented By: Christian Hurt
Represented By: Troy Rafferty
Represented By: Chad E. Ihrig
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: Michael B. Angelovich
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVAN W. BYLER
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Jeffrey Gaddy
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: W. Troy Bouk
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: David K. TeSelle
Represented By: Christian Hurt
Represented By: Troy Rafferty
Represented By: Chad E. Ihrig
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: Michael B. Angelovich
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERALD J. JENSEN
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Jeffrey Gaddy
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: W. Troy Bouk
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: David K. TeSelle
Represented By: Christian Hurt
Represented By: Troy Rafferty
Represented By: Chad E. Ihrig
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: Michael B. Angelovich
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELLY LYNN VON LETKEMANN
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Jeffrey Gaddy
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: W. Troy Bouk
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: David K. TeSelle
Represented By: Christian Hurt
Represented By: Troy Rafferty
Represented By: Chad E. Ihrig
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: Michael B. Angelovich
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELE TERESE QUINN
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Jeffrey Gaddy
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: W. Troy Bouk
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: David K. TeSelle
Represented By: Christian Hurt
Represented By: Troy Rafferty
Represented By: Chad E. Ihrig
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: Michael B. Angelovich
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW PEARCY
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL A. COLLINS
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACOB MILLS
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL BIVENS
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL L. OWEN
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK PEARCY
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES NICHOLS
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. O.
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERNESTO I. HERNANDEZ, II
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALICIA MIXSON
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES R. NICHOLS
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLIN L. PEARCY
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AYAD M. MAJEED
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNE PEARCY
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E. H.
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. M.
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROGER L. YOUNG
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHIRLEY ATKINSON
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA LAMBERT
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RANDALL L. KLINGENSMITH
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AARON BASS
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEATHER N. COE
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. A. M.
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON NICHOLS
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLISON P. ROOSIEN
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRYSTAL HASTINGS
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLEN R. VAUGHT
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I. C. C.
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N. H.
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES J. POOLE, III
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARYN MCDONALD
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS M. COE, II
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS NICHOLS
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JODY STRIKER
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAWN COLLINS
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUTH TURAY
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUCE KUNIHOLM
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH JOHNSON MIXSON
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANA ALI
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN CLARK ALLDRIDGE
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAY M. FONDREN
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QUENTIN D. COLLINS
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW CHARLES MAJOR
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY SEGERS
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A. M. M.
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELIDA COLLINS
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIRANDA A. HARELSTON
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. J. F.
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IOAN A. KELEMEN
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL W. SEGERS
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARTHUR B. STOKENBURY
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V. T. C.
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH KUNIHOLM
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH C. MIXSON
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN MAINE
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOMENICK J. ALAGNA
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANNA ALLDRIDGE
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRANT R. BLACKWELL
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHLEY MEIKEL MAJOR
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAIRD PEARCY
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAROLD BASS
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIRGINIA B. MIXSON
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEAN M. NIQUETTE
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM C. BASS
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRAVIS R. BASS
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BALTAZAR MORIN, JR.
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIERA N. COLLINS
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIN KUNIHOLM
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAUREN NIQUETTE
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARDY P. MILLS, IV
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY L. BASS
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA MILLS
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID L. SEGERS
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARON MIXSON
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTONIO M. FREDERICK
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALL PLAINTIFFS
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Jeffrey Gaddy
Represented By: Dustin B. Herman
Represented By: Jeremy A. Tor
Represented By: Adora Sauer
Represented By: Alison R. Spiers
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Represented By: James L. Magazine
Represented By: Gavriel Mairone
Represented By: W. Troy Bouk
Represented By: Christopher Paulos
Represented By: William Hawal
Represented By: David K. TeSelle
Represented By: Christian Hurt
Represented By: Troy Rafferty
Represented By: Chad E. Ihrig
Represented By: Michael B. Angelovich
Represented By: Christopher C. Dyer
Represented By: Seth A. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD ALLDRIDGE
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNE H. FONDREN
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KOMA K. TEXEIRA
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURA F. HERNANDEZ
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID A. SIMMONS, II
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLEN MILTON
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WYMAN H. JONES
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURIE MILLER
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHY JEAN MILLS
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERNESTO P. HERNANDEZ, III
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON W. PARKER
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOANN ALLDRIDGE
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QUEEN NICHOLS
Represented By: Rachel Veronica Rose
Represented By: Howard L. Nations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRANIAN MINISTRY OF INTELLIGENCE & SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELLI BANK PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK MARKAZI JOMHOURI ISLAMI IRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK MELLI IRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL IRANIAN OIL COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISLAMIC REVOLUTIONARY GUARD CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Represented By: Carol Federighi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?