FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION et al v. DRAFTKINGS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF CALIFORNIA and FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
Defendant: DRAFTKINGS, INC. and FANDUEL LIMITED
Case Number: 1:2017cv01195
Filed: June 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Ketanji Brown Jackson
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2017 Filing 51 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson held on July 7, 2017; Page Numbers: 1-79. Date of Issuance:July 17, 2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter refe renced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2017.(Dickman, Janice)
July 13, 2017 Filing 50 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Dillickrath, Thomas)
July 12, 2017 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Elisa F. Kantor on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kantor, Elisa)
July 12, 2017 Filing 48 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by FANDUEL LIMITED.(Ferris, Jamillia)
July 12, 2017 Filing 47 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by DRAFTKINGS, INC..(Park, Chong)
July 12, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/12/2017. Fact discovery due by 8/16/2017. (zgdf)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. See attached document for details. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on July 10, 2017. (lckbj2)
July 10, 2017 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Guia Dixon on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Dixon, Guia)
July 10, 2017 Filing 44 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to #3 Complaint by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Public Version of Complaint for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Section 13(b) of the Federal Trade Commission Act)(Quillian, Ryan)
July 10, 2017 Filing 43 NOTICE of Filing Joint Proposed Schedule by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION re #38 MOTION for Scheduling Order (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Parties' Joint Proposed Schedule)(Dillickrath, Thomas)
July 10, 2017 Set/Reset Hearings: Pre-Hearing conference set for 9/15/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 9/18/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (tj)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER denying #27 Motion for Change of Venue. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on July 7, 2017. (lckbj2)
July 7, 2017 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Dickinson on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Dickinson, Charles)
July 7, 2017 Filing 40 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to #30 Sealed Reply, by DRAFTKINGS, INC., FANDUEL LIMITED (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Defendants Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendants Motion to File Documents Under Seal, #3 Defendants Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants Motion for Change of Venue [, #4 Exhibit Index to Defendants Reply Memorandum, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 14, #12 Exhibit 15, #13 Exhibit 16, #14 Exhibit 17)(Park, Chong)
July 7, 2017 Filing 39 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to #27 SEALED MOTION filed by DRAFTKINGS, INC., FANDUEL LIMITED. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) by DRAFTKINGS, INC., FANDUEL LIMITED (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Defendants Motion to Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal, #3 Defendants Motion for Change of Venue, #4 Defendants Memorandum in Support of their Motion for Change of Venue, #5 Declaration of Tim Dent, #6 Declaration of Christian Genetski, #7 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Change of Venue)(Park, Chong)
July 7, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson: Status Conference held on 7/7/2017. Defendant's motion to transfer venue of this action is DENIED for reasons stated on the record. Parties to confer and advise the court of their agreement on scheduling by 7/10/17. Plaintiff to serve production requests by 7/7/17. The parties are reminded to email the court today, (7/7/17), a Word copy of ECF No #28 . (Court Reporter: Janice Dickman.) (tj)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. On June 29, 2017, and July 3, 2017, this Court entered Minute Orders granting Defendants' motions to file their initial brief and reply brief in support of their motion for change of venue under seal. However, in both Orders, the Court directed that public, redacted versions of those documents shall be filed on or before 7/6/2017. (Min. Order of June 29, 2017; Min. Order of July 3, 2017.) That date has now passed, and Defendants have not filed redacted versions of their briefs on the public docket. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that today, July 7, 2017, Defendants must file redacted versions of their #27 Motion for Change of Venue and #30 Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion for Change of Venue on the public docket. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on July 7, 2017. (lckbj2)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Consistent with the discussion that the Court held with the parties during the status conference of July 7, 2017, it is hereby ORDERED that, at or before 10:00 AM on July 10, 2017, the parties shall submit a joint proposed schedule for further proceedings in this matter. The proposed schedule shall set the hearing on Plaintiffs' anticipated motion for a preliminary injunction to begin on Monday, September 18, 2017, and shall otherwise reflect the considerations discussed at the July 7, 2017, status conference. The parties are directed to agree on a single set of dates to the greatest extent possible, and should note and explain any areas of continued disagreement. The joint proposed schedule should be submitted both through the Court's electronic filing system and also by emailing the document to chambers in Microsoft Word format. The joint proposed schedule need not include the other subjects addressed in the parties' #38 Proposed Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on July 7, 2017. (lckbj2)
July 6, 2017 Filing 37 NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to #26 Sealed Opposition, by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Plaintiffs Motion to File Documents Under Seal, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion to File Documents Under Seal, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Public Version of Plaintiffs Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Change of Venue, #6 Exhibit List, #7 Exhibit 3 - Press Release, #8 Exhibit 4 - Declaration, #9 Exhibit 6 Mem. Op. in EnergySolutions, #10 Exhibit 8 - Declaration, #11 Exhibit 9 - Declaration, #12 Certificate of Service)(Quillian, Ryan)
July 5, 2017 Filing 38 Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, DRAFTKINGS, INC., FANDUEL LIMITED, FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Exhibit List, #2 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 1, #3 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 2, #4 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 3, #5 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 4, #6 Defendants' Exhibit List, #7 Defendants' Exhibit A, #8 Defendants' Exhibit B, #9 Defendants' Exhibit C, #10 Defendants' Exhibit D, #11 Defendants' Exhibit E)(znmw)
July 5, 2017 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by David E. Owyang on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Owyang, David)
July 5, 2017 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Sophia Vandergrift on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Vandergrift, Sophia)
July 5, 2017 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Zuver, Jr. on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Zuver, Jr., Robert E.)
July 5, 2017 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew McDonald on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(McDonald, Matthew)
July 5, 2017 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Stelios S. Xenakis on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Xenakis, Stelios S.)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #31 Motion to File Corrected Document. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 07/05/2017. (lckbj1)
July 3, 2017 Filing 31 MOTION to Amend/Correct #28 Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Parties' Respective Proposals for a Case Management and Scheduling Order, #3 Plaintiffs' Exhibit List, #4 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 1, #5 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 2, #6 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 3, #7 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 4, #8 Defendants' Exhibit List, #9 Defendants' Exhibit A, #10 Defendants' Exhibit B, #11 Defendants' Exhibit C, #12 Defendants' Exhibit D, #13 Defendants' Exhibit E, #14 Certificate of Service)(Dillickrath, Thomas)
July 3, 2017 Filing 30 SEALED REPLY TO OPPOSITION filed by DRAFTKINGS, INC., FANDUEL LIMITED re #27 SEALED MOTION filed by DRAFTKINGS, INC., FANDUEL LIMITED. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(ztd) Modified date filed on 7/5/2017 (ztd).
July 3, 2017 NOTICE OF ERROR re #28 Motion for Scheduling Order; emailed to rquillian@ftc.gov, cc'd 14 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. Your signature must be on the document if you are electronically filing. (ztd, )
July 3, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #29 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. The public version of this document shall be filed on or before 7/6/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 07/03/2017. (lckbj1)
June 30, 2017 Filing 29 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by DRAFTKINGS, INC., FANDUEL LIMITED (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion for Change of Venue, #3 Exhibit Index to Defendants Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendants Motion for Change of Venue, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19)(Park, Chong)
June 30, 2017 Filing 28 ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .Joint MOTION for Scheduling Order by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Exhibit List, #2 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 1, #3 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 2, #4 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 3, #5 Plaintiffs' Exhibit 4, #6 Defendants' Exhibit List, #7 Defendants' Exhibit A, #8 Defendants' Exhibit B, #9 Defendants' Exhibit C, #10 Defendants' Exhibit D, #11 Defendants' Exhibit E, #12 Certificate of Service)(Quillian, Ryan) Modified on 7/3/2017 (td).
June 30, 2017 Filing 25 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson Page Numbers: 1-17. Date of Issuance:6-30-17. Court Reporter/Transcriber Barbara DeVico, Telephone number 202-354-3118, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 7/21/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/31/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/28/2017.(DeVico, Barbara)
June 29, 2017 Filing 27 SEALED MOTION or Change of Venue filed by DRAFTKINGS, INC., FANDUEL LIMITED. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf) (Main Document 27 replaced on 6/30/2017) (ztd).
June 29, 2017 Filing 26 SEALED OPPOSITION filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, STATE OF CALIFORNIA re #27 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by DRAFTKINGS, INC., FANDUEL LIMITED (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(zjf)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #22 , #23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby ORDERED that Jamillia P. Ferris and Jonathan S. Klarfeld are admitted pro hac vice in this matter as counsel for DraftKings, Inc. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 06/29/2017. (lckbj1)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #24 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. The public version of this document shall be filed on or before 7/6/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 06/29/2017. (lckbj1)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #16 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. The public version of this document shall be filed on or before 7/6/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on June 29, 2017. (lckbj2)
June 28, 2017 Filing 24 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, STATE OF CALIFORNIA (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Change of Venue, #4 Exhibit List, #5 Exhibit 1 - Excerpt from DraftKings Second Request Response, #6 Exhibit 2 - Excerpt from FanDuels Second Request Response, #7 Exhibit 3 - Press Release, #8 Exhibit 4 - Declaration, #9 Exhibit 5 - Excerpt from Investigational Hearing, #10 Exhibit 6 - Mem. Op. in EnergySolutions, #11 Exhibit 7 - Excerpts from Transaction Agreement, #12 Exhibit 8 - Declaration, #13 Exhibit 9 - Declaration, #14 Exhibit 10 - Excerpt from Investigational Hearing, #15 Certificate of Service)(Quillian, Ryan)
June 28, 2017 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jonathan S. Klarfeld, :Firm- Ropes & Gray LLP, :Address- 2099 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, Washington, DC 20006. Phone No. - (202) 508-4764. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5011010. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DRAFTKINGS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan S. Klarfeld)(Park, Chong)
June 28, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jamillia P. Ferris, :Firm- Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C., :Address- 1700 K Street, N.W., Fifth Floor, Washington, D.C. 20006. Phone No. - 202-973-8843. Fax No. - 202-973-8899 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5010211. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by FANDUEL LIMITED (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Sher, Scott)
June 26, 2017 Filing 21 ERRATA by FANDUEL LIMITED #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michelle Yost Hale, :Firm- Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C., :Address- 1700 K Street, N.W., Fifth Floor, Washington, D.C. 20006. Phone No. - (202) 973-8836. Fax No. - (202) 973-8899 filed by FANDUEL LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - Corrected Declaration of Michelle Yost Hale, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit D - Certificate of Service)(Sher, Scott)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER construing #21 Errata as a renewed motion for leave to appear pro hac vice and, so construed, granting the motion. It is hereby ORDERED that Michelle Yost Hale is admitted pro hac vice in this matter as counsel for FanDuel Limited. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 06/26/2017. (lckbj1)
June 23, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson: Telephone Conference held in Chambers on 6/23/2017. (Court Reporter: Barbara DeVico) (gdf)
June 23, 2017 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FANDUEL LIMITED. (Sher, Scott)
June 23, 2017 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DRAFTKINGS, INC.. (Park, Chong)
June 23, 2017 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. DRAFTKINGS, INC. waiver sent on 6/19/2017, answer due 8/18/2017. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Quillian, Ryan)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/23/2017. (lckbj1)
June 23, 2017 Filing 16 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by DRAFTKINGS, INC., FANDUEL LIMITED (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: #1 Motion for Change of Venue, #2 Memorandum In Support, #3 Declaration of Tim Dent, #4 Declaration of Christian Genetski)(Park, Chong)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for failure to include in the declaration the information required by LCvR 83.2(d)(6). Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 06/23/2017. (lckbj1)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. On June 23, 2017, the Court convened a telephonic status conference. Based on the representations that the parties made during the status conference, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file any opposition to Defendants' [16-1] Sealed Motion on or before June 28, 2017, and that Defendants shall file a reply, if any, on or before June 30, 2017. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, on or before June 30, 2017, the parties must file a joint proposed schedule for further proceedings that notes areas of agreement and disagreement. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a status conference is set for July 7, 2017, at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on June 23, 2017. (lckbj2)
June 22, 2017 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michelle Yost Hale, :Firm- Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C., :Address- 1700 K Street, N.W., Fifth Floor, Washington, D.C. 20006. Phone No. - (202) 973-8836. Fax No. - (202) 973-8899 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5002258. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by FANDUEL LIMITED (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Sher, Scott)
June 22, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Andrew Sher on behalf of FANDUEL LIMITED (Sher, Scott)
June 22, 2017 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION. FANDUEL LIMITED waiver sent on 6/19/2017, answer due 8/18/2017. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Quillian, Ryan)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The telephonic status conference that is currently set for Friday, June 23, 2017, at 10:30 AM is VACATED and RESET for Friday, June 23, 2017, at 11:30 AM in Chambers before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on June 21, 2017. (lckbj2)
June 20, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Chong Seok Park on behalf of DRAFTKINGS, INC. (Park, Chong)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #4 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on June 20, 2017. (lckbj2)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Protective Order. The parties' attention is directed to the edits that this Court made to Paragraph 9 of the proposed order. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on June 20, 2017. (lckbj2)
June 20, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Seidman on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Seidman, Mark)
June 20, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexis Gilman on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gilman, Alexis)
June 20, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Quillian on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Quillian, Ryan)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER setting telephonic status conference for 6/23/2017 at 10:30 AM in Chambers before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on June 20, 2017. (lckbj2)
June 19, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE of Stipulation and Proposed Order by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, STATE OF CALIFORNIA (zjf)
June 19, 2017 Filing 5 MOTION for Protective Order by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(zjf)
June 19, 2017 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(zjf)
June 19, 2017 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against DRAFTKINGS, INC., FANDUEL LIMITED (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF CALIFORNIA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zjf)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion to File Complaint Under Seal. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 06/19/2017. Certified copies made available to counsel.(zjf)
June 19, 2017 Filing 1 MOTION to File Complaint Under Seal by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION, STATE OF CALIFORNIA (zjf) .

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION et al v. DRAFTKINGS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Catherine Anne Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
Represented By: Robert E. Zuver, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Dillickrath
Represented By: Stelios S. Xenakis
Represented By: Charles E Dickinson
Represented By: Elisa F. Kantor
Represented By: Guia Dixon
Represented By: Alexis Gilman
Represented By: Mark Seidman
Represented By: Sophia Vandergrift
Represented By: Matthew McDonald
Represented By: David E. Owyang
Represented By: Ryan Quillian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRAFTKINGS, INC.
Represented By: Chong Seok Park
Represented By: Jonathan S. Klarfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FANDUEL LIMITED
Represented By: Jamillia P. Ferris
Represented By: Michelle Yost Hale
Represented By: Scott Andrew Sher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?