COCKRUM et al v. DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: ROY COCKRUM, SCOTT COMER and ERIC SCHOENBERG
Defendant: DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC. and ROGER STONE
Case Number: 1:2017cv01370
Filed: July 12, 2017
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Ellen S. Huvelle
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 48:1985
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2018 58 SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by ROY COCKRUM, SCOTT COMER, ERIC SCHOENBERG (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Emails, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Berwick, Benjamin)
May 18, 2018 57 NOTICE of Filing by ROY COCKRUM, SCOTT COMER, ERIC SCHOENBERG (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Arizona Democratic Party v Arizona Republican Party, # 2 Exhibit North Carolina Democratic Party v North Carolina Republican Party, # 3 Exhibit Daschle v Thune)(Berwick, Benjamin)
May 17, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on 5/17/18 : Motion Hearing held on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss 20 , 21 , 22 and 23 . Motions taken under advisement. Plaintiffs' supporting e-mails and supplemental submissions to be filed with the Court by 5/18/18. (Court Reporter: Lisa Griffith) (kk)
May 15, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 56 Motion: It is hereby ORDERED that defendant's motion for permission to bring in computer equipment is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on May 15, 2018. (lcesh1)
May 15, 2018 56 MOTION to Permit permission to bring in computer equipment for hearing by ROGER STONE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Buschel, Robert) Modified event title on 5/17/2018 (znmw).
May 10, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2018 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (gdf)
May 9, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Court will hold a hearing on defendants' motions to dismiss on May 17, 2018 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 23A, as opposed to the previously set time of 2:30 PM. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on May 9, 2018. (lcesh1)
April 10, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2018 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (gdf)
April 9, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER finding as moot 55 Motion: It is hereby ORDERED that the Court will hold a hearing on defendants' motions to dismiss on May 17, 2018 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 23A. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on April 9, 2018. (lcesh1)
April 5, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (gdf)
April 5, 2018 55 Unopposed MOTION to Reschedule Hearing by ROY COCKRUM, SCOTT COMER, ERIC SCHOENBERG (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berwick, Benjamin)
April 4, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Court will hold a hearing on defendants' motions to dismiss on April 23, 2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 23A. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on April 4, 2018. (lcesh1)
March 28, 2018 54 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 51 Motion to Intervene: See OPINION AND ORDER for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on March 28, 2018. (lcesh1)
March 22, 2018 53 REPLY to opposition to re 51 MOTION to Intervene filed by DAVID A. GOLDEN. (jf)
March 8, 2018 52 RESPONSE re 51 MOTION to Intervene (on behalf of all parties) filed by DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC.. (Carvin, Michael)
February 26, 2018 51 MOTION to Intervene by DAVID A. GOLDEN (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(jf)
February 7, 2018 50 SURREPLY re 20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by ROY COCKRUM, SCOTT COMER, ERIC SCHOENBERG. (jf)
February 7, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 46 Motion for Leave to File: it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs' Surreply in Opposition to defendants' Motion to Dismiss, which plaintiffs filed with this Court on January 19, 2018 as an attachment to their Motion for Leave to File Surreply, is deemed filed. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on February 7, 2018. (lcesh1)
January 22, 2018 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 48 Response to motion was entered in error at the request of counsel and refiled. (See Docket Entry 49 to view document) (jf)
January 22, 2018 49 RESPONSE re 46 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by ROGER STONE. (Buschel, Robert)
January 22, 2018 48 ENTERED IN ERROR.....RESPONSE re 46 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by ROGER STONE. (Buschel, Robert) Modified on 1/22/2018 (jf).
January 22, 2018 47 Memorandum in opposition to re 46 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply filed by DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC.. (Carvin, Michael)
January 19, 2018 46 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by ROY COCKRUM, SCOTT COMER, ERIC SCHOENBERG (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Surreply, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Berwick, Benjamin)
December 29, 2017 45 REPLY to opposition to motion re 23 MOTION to Dismiss under the D.C. Anti-SLAPP Act filed by ROGER STONE. (Buschel, Robert)
December 29, 2017 44 REPLY to opposition to motion re 22 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by ROGER STONE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Graphic timeline)(Buschel, Robert)
December 29, 2017 43 REPLY to opposition to motion re 21 MOTION to Dismiss under the D.C. Anti-SLAPP Act filed by DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC.. (Carvin, Michael)
December 29, 2017 42 REPLY to opposition to motion re 20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1 - WikiLeaks accuracy policy, # 2 Exhibit Ex 2 - Washington Post article)(Carvin, Michael)
December 20, 2017 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Harden Tindall on behalf of ROY COCKRUM, SCOTT COMER, ERIC SCHOENBERG (Tindall, Anne)
December 9, 2017 40 AMICUS BRIEF by MINDY FINN, BEN LABOLT, HOWARD OPINKSKY, MARK SALTER, HARI SEVUGAN. (znmw)
December 9, 2017 39 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER. (znmw)
December 9, 2017 38 AMICUS BRIEF by CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER, THEODORE M. SHAW. (znmw)
December 9, 2017 37 AMICUS BRIEF by FORMER NATIONAL SECURITY OFFICIALS. (znmw)
December 9, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 36 Motion for Leave to File: It is hereby ORDERED that the Motion of Former National Security Officials for leave to file amicus curiae brief in support of Plaintiffs is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on December 9, 2017. (lcesh1)
December 9, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 34 Motion for Leave to File: It is hereby ORDERED that the motion of Campaign Legal Center and Professor Theodore M. Shaw for leave to file as amici curiae in opposition to defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Amended Complaint, which they filed with this Court on October 25, 2017, is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the Brief of Amici Curiae Campaign Legal Center and Professor Theodore M. Shaw is deemed filed. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on December 9, 2017. (lcesh1)
December 9, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 35 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: It is hereby ORDERED that Ruth Merewyn Greenwood is admitted pro hac vice, on behalf of Amici Curiae, Campaign Legal Center and Professor Theodore M. Shaw. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on December 9, 2017. (lcesh1)
December 8, 2017 36 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by FORMER NATIONAL SECURITY OFFICIALS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amicus Curiae Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Spector, Phillip)
December 8, 2017 35 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Ruth Merewyn Greenwood, :Firm- Campaign Legal Center, :Address- 73 W Monroe St., Ste. 322, Chicago, IL 60603. Phone No. - 312-561-5508. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5240813. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER, Theodore M. Shaw (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Ruth M. Greenwood, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Paul)
December 8, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 32 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: It is hereby ORDERED that M. Patrick Moore Jr. be granted leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of amici Mark Salter, Ben LaBolt, Howard Opinsky, Mindy Finn, and Hari Sevugan. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on December 8, 2017. (AG)
December 8, 2017 34 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae by CAMPAIGN LEGAL CENTER, Theodore M. Shaw (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Brief of Amici Curiae, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit LCvR 7.1 Certificate)(Smith, Paul)
December 8, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; granting 27 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages: The Court GRANTS defendants' joint motion for extension of time to file reply briefs and for leave to file excess pages. Defendants may file their reply briefs in support of the motions to dismiss and anti-SLAPP motions on or before December 29, 2017. In addition, the Court extends the page limit for each reply brief in support of the motion to dismiss to 30 pages. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on December 8, 2017. (lcesh1)
December 8, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: granting 33 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on December 8, 2017. (lcesh1)
December 8, 2017 33 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae by MARK SALTER, BEN LABOLT,HOWARD OPINKSKY, MINDY FINN,HARI SEVUGAN (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Brief of Amici Curiae)(Atkinson, Katherine) Modified on 12/11/2017 to correct filer(s)(jf).
December 8, 2017 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- M. Patrick Moore, :Firm- Hemenway & Barnes, :Address- 75 State Street Boston, MA 02109. Phone No. - 617-227-7940. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5240695. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by MARK SALTER, BEN LABOLT,HOWARD OPINKSKY, MINDY FINN, HARI SEVUGAN (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Atkinson, Katherine) Modified filers on 12/12/2017 (znmw).
December 8, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 31 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' motion for admission of attorney Ian M. Bassin pro hac vice, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that attorney Ian M. Bassin is admitted pro hac vice for the purpose of appearing in the above-captioned case. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on December 8, 2017. (AG)
December 8, 2017 31 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Ian M. Bassin, :Firm- United to Protect Democracy, :Address- 222 Broadway, New York, NY 10038. Phone No. - (202) 856-9191. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5240417. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ROY COCKRUM, SCOTT COMER, ERIC SCHOENBERG (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Berwick, Benjamin)
December 8, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' motion for admission of attorney Richard Primus pro hac vice, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that attorney Richard Primus is admitted pro hac vice for the purpose of appearing in the above-captioned case. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on December 8, 2017. (AG)
December 8, 2017 30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Richard Primus, :Address- 625 S. State Street, Ann Arbor, MI 48109. Phone No. - (734) 647-5543. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5239095. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ROY COCKRUM, SCOTT COMER, ERIC SCHOENBERG (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Berwick, Benjamin)
December 8, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 29 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Upon consideration of Plaintiffs' motion for admission of attorney Steven A. Hirsch pro hac vice, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that attorney Steven A. Hirsch is admitted pro hac vice for the purpose of appearing in the above-captioned case. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on December 8, 2017. (AG)
December 7, 2017 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Steven A. Hirsch, :Firm- Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP, :Address- 633 Battery Street, San Francisco, CA 94111-1809. Phone No. - (415) 391-5400. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5238732. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ROY COCKRUM, SCOTT COMER, ERIC SCHOENBERG (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Berwick, Benjamin)
December 7, 2017 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin G. Florence on behalf of ROY COCKRUM, SCOTT COMER, ERIC SCHOENBERG (Florence, Justin)
December 7, 2017 27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 20 MOTION to Dismiss , 23 MOTION to Dismiss under the D.C. Anti-SLAPP Act, 22 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, 21 MOTION to Dismiss under the D.C. Anti-SLAPP Act , Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC., ROGER STONE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carvin, Michael)
December 1, 2017 26 Memorandum in opposition to re 23 MOTION to Dismiss under the D.C. Anti-SLAPP Act, 21 MOTION to Dismiss under the D.C. Anti-SLAPP Act filed by ROY COCKRUM, SCOTT COMER, ERIC SCHOENBERG. (Berwick, Benjamin)
December 1, 2017 25 Memorandum in opposition to re 20 MOTION to Dismiss , 22 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by ROY COCKRUM, SCOTT COMER, ERIC SCHOENBERG. (Berwick, Benjamin)
November 21, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: granting 24 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on November 21, 2017. (lcesh1)
November 20, 2017 24 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by ROY COCKRUM, SCOTT COMER, ERIC SCHOENBERG (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berwick, Benjamin)
October 25, 2017 23 MOTION to Dismiss under the D.C. Anti-SLAPP Act by ROGER STONE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Buschel, Robert)
October 25, 2017 22 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by ROGER STONE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Buschel, Robert)
October 25, 2017 21 MOTION to Dismiss under the D.C. Anti-SLAPP Act by DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carvin, Michael)
October 25, 2017 20 MOTION to Dismiss by DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - May 5, 2016 email, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - May 21, 2016 email, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Washington Post article, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - April 24, 2016 email, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 5 - New York Times article, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 6 - Huffington Post article, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 7 - April 28, 2016 email, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 8 - May 22, 2016 email, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 9 - May 6, 2016 email, # 10 Exhibit Ex. 10 - April 25, 2016 email, # 11 Exhibit Ex. 11 - May 24, 2016 email, # 12 Exhibit Ex. 12 - May 10, 2016 email, # 13 Exhibit Ex. 13 - May 17, 2016 email, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Carvin, Michael) Modified event title on 10/26/2017 (znmw).
October 2, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 12/1/2017. Reply due by 12/18/2017. (gdf)
October 2, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: All Defendants; granting 19 Motion for Briefing Schedule; Set/Reset Deadlines: The Court hereby GRANTS the parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time for defendants' to Respond to the Amended Complaint and for Entry of Briefing Schedule. It is hereby ORDERED that: defendants shall respond to the Amended Complaint on or before October 25, 2017. If defendants move to dismiss the Amended Complaint (including by filing anti-SLAPP motions), plaintiffs shall file their response to such motion(s) on or before December 1, 2017, and defendants shall reply on or before December 18, 2017. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on October 2, 2017. (lcesh1) Modified event title on 10/3/2017 (znmw).
October 2, 2017 19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 17 Amended Complaint , Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by ROY COCKRUM, SCOTT COMER, ERIC SCHOENBERG (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berwick, Benjamin)
September 28, 2017 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Vivek Suri on behalf of DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC. (Suri, Vivek)
September 27, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' responses to the Amended Complaint are due by 10/11/2017. (jl)
September 27, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER finding as moot 12 13 14 15 defendants' motions to dismiss in light of plaintiffs' filing of an 17 Amended Complaint in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)1)(B). Defendants' responses to the Amended Complaint are due by October 11, 2017. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(3). Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on September 27, 2017. (AG)
September 26, 2017 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC., ROGER STONE with Jury Demand filed by ROY COCKRUM, ERIC SCHOENBERG, SCOTT COMER.(Berwick, Benjamin)
September 11, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: It is ordered that the above-referenced motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Jeffrey Baltruzak is granted leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant Donald J. Trump for President, Inc. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on September 11, 2017. (AG)
September 11, 2017 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jeffrey Baltruzak, :Firm- Jones Day, :Address- 500 Grant Street, Pittsburgh PA 15219. Phone No. - 412-394-7909. Fax No. - 412-394-7959 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5109872. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Carvin, Michael)
September 7, 2017 Filing fee Paid: $ 100.00, receipt number 4616086977 pursuant to 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice regarding Attorney Name Grant J. Smith. (md)
September 5, 2017 15 MOTION to Dismiss under the D.C. Anti-SLAPP by ROGER STONE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 recent unpublished opinion, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Buschel, Robert)
September 5, 2017 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by ROGER STONE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Buschel, Robert)
September 5, 2017 13 MOTION to Dismiss under the D.C. Anti-SLAPP Act by DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carvin, Michael)
September 5, 2017 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - May 5, 2016 email, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - May 21, 2016 email, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Washington Post article, # 4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - April 24, 2016 email, # 5 Exhibit Ex. 5 - New York Times article, # 6 Exhibit Ex. 6 - Huffington Post article, # 7 Exhibit Ex. 7 - April 28, 2016 email, # 8 Exhibit Ex. 8 - May 22, 2016 email, # 9 Exhibit Ex. 9 - May 6, 2016 email, # 10 Exhibit Ex. 10 - April 25, 2016 email, # 11 Exhibit Ex. 11 - May 24, 2016 email, # 12 Exhibit Ex. 12 - May 10, 2016 email, # 13 Exhibit Ex. 13 - May 17, 2016 email, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Carvin, Michael)
September 5, 2017 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC.. (Carvin, Michael)
September 1, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Upon consideration of the motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, filed on behalf of Grant J. Smith, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that Grant J. Smith be granted leave to appear pro hac vice in the above-captioned case on behalf of Defendant Roger Stone. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on September 1, 2017. (AG)
September 1, 2017 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Grant J. Smith, :Firm- StrategySmith PA, :Address- 401 Eat Olas Blvd, Fort Lauderdale, Florida 33301. Phone No. - 954.328.9064. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by ROGER STONE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Farkas, L.)
August 31, 2017 9 NOTICE of Appearance by L. Peter Farkas on behalf of ROGER STONE (Farkas, L.) (Main Document 9 replaced on 9/1/2017) (znmw).
August 31, 2017 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert C. Buschel on behalf of ROGER STONE (Buschel, Robert)
August 22, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Upon consideration of the above-referenced motion for leave to appear pro hac vice, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED insofar as Robert C. Buschel is granted leave to participate in court proceedings, as provided for by Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), on behalf of Defendant Roger Stone. Counsel is reminded that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(c)(1) "an attorney who is not a member of the Bar of this Court may file papers only if such attorney joins of record a member in good standing of the Bar of this Court. All papers submitted by non-members of the Bar of this Court must be signed by such counsel and by a member of the Bar of this Court is compliance with this Rule." Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on August 22, 2017. (AG)
August 22, 2017 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robert C. Buschel, :Firm- Buschel Gibbons, PA, :Address- One Financial Plaza, Suite 1300, 100 SE Third Ave, Ft Lauderdale, FL 33394. Phone No. - 9545305301. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5084911. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Carvin, Michael) Modified text on 8/22/2017 (td).
August 1, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 10/27/2017. Reply due by 11/10/2017. (gdf)
August 1, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and to set Briefing Schedule: Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to the Complaint and for Entry of Briefing Schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on or before September 18, 2017; it is further ORDERED that if Defendants move to dismiss the Complaint, Plaintiffs shall file their response to such motion(s) on or before October 27, 2017, and Defendants shall reply on or before November 10, 2017; and it is further ORDERED that if Plaintiffs amend the Complaint pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1)(B), the parties shall attempt to reach an agreement on a revised schedule and shall submit a joint status report to the Court on or before the date that is seven days after the filing of the amended complaint. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on August 1, 2017. (AG)
July 31, 2017 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, , Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by ROY COCKRUM, SCOTT COMER, ERIC SCHOENBERG (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berwick, Benjamin)
July 31, 2017 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE by ROY COCKRUM, ERIC SCHOENBERG, SCOTT COMER. ROGER STONE waiver sent on 7/20/2017, answer due 9/18/2017. (Berwick, Benjamin)
July 24, 2017 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC. served on 7/19/2017, answer due 8/9/2017 (Berwick, Benjamin)
July 18, 2017 3 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC., ROGER STONE. (Attachment: # 1 Consent Form)(zsb)
July 14, 2017 2 Case randomly reassigned to Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. Judge Amit P. Mehta is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
July 13, 2017 Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (sb)
July 12, 2017 1 COMPLAINT against DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC., ROGER STONE with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5029062) filed by ROY COCKRUM, ERIC SCHOENBERG, SCOTT COMER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Berwick, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COCKRUM et al v. DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROY COCKRUM
Represented By: Benjamin Leon Berwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT COMER
Represented By: Benjamin Leon Berwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC SCHOENBERG
Represented By: Benjamin Leon Berwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROGER STONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?