May 18, 2018 |
Filing 35
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to BARRY FARM TENANTS AND ALLIES ASSOCIATION, INC., DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GRASSROOTS EMPOWERMENT PROJECT, INC., BRENDA LUCAS, JACQUELINE THRASH, ISMAEL VAZQUEZ, SR.. Attorney Matthew K. Handley terminated. (Handley, Matthew)
|
April 30, 2018 |
Filing 34
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/30/2018. (lcegs3)
|
April 30, 2018 |
Filing 33
ORDER granting #12 , #13 defendants' motions to dismiss the plaintiffs' complaint and denying as moot #21 plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction and #27 motion for a briefing schedule and hearing. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/30/2018. (lcegs3)
|
April 27, 2018 |
Filing 32
Joint STATUS REPORT by BARRY FARM TENANTS AND ALLIES ASSOCIATION, INC., DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GRASSROOTS EMPOWERMENT PROJECT, INC., BRENDA LUCAS, JACQUELINE THRASH, ISMAEL VAZQUEZ, SR.. (Edmondson, Joseph)
|
April 27, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER directing the parties to file a joint status report discussing what impact, if any, the District of Columbia Court of Appeals' April 26, 2018 opinion in Barry Farm Tenants and Allies Association v. District of Columbia Zoning Commission (case no. 15-AA-1000) has on the instant case and providing recommendations for further proceedings. The parties shall file this status report by no later than 3:00 pm today, April 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 4/27/2018. (lcegs3)
|
April 3, 2018 |
Filing 31
STATUS REPORT (TENANT RELOCATION) by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA HOUSING AUTHORITY. (Skojec, Michael)
|
April 2, 2018 |
NOTICE OF ERROR re #30 Status Report; emailed to skojecm@ballardspahr.com, cc'd 19 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Please refile document, 2. ENTERED IN ERROR; Incorrect format (letter); Refile in proper pleading/brief format in accordance with Local Rules. (znmw, )
|
March 30, 2018 |
Filing 30
ENTERED IN ERROR..... STATUS REPORT (Relocation) by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA HOUSING AUTHORITY. (Skojec, Michael) Modified on 4/2/2018 (znmw).
|
March 30, 2018 |
Filing 29
REPLY to opposition to motion re #27 MOTION for Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date MOTION for Hearing filed by BARRY FARM TENANTS AND ALLIES ASSOCIATION, INC., DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GRASSROOTS EMPOWERMENT PROJECT, INC., BRENDA LUCAS, JACQUELINE THRASH, ISMAEL VAZQUEZ, SR.. (Edmondson, Joseph)
|
March 23, 2018 |
Filing 28
RESPONSE re #27 MOTION for Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date MOTION for Hearing Defendants' Joint Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Set Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule on Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by A&R DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA HOUSING AUTHORITY, PRESERVATION OF AFFORDABLE HOUSING, INC.. (Kiernan, Paul)
|
March 15, 2018 |
Filing 27
MOTION for Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date by BARRY FARM TENANTS AND ALLIES ASSOCIATION, INC., DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GRASSROOTS EMPOWERMENT PROJECT, INC., BRENDA LUCAS, JACQUELINE THRASH, ISMAEL VAZQUEZ, SR. (Edmondson, Joseph). Added MOTION for Hearing on 3/16/2018 (znmw).
|
February 12, 2018 |
Filing 26
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan held on 12-12-17; Page Numbers: 1-42. Date of Issuance:2-12-18. Court Reporter/Transcriber Scott Wallace, Telephone number 202-354-3196, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the
|
February 12, 2018 |
Filing 25
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan held on 01-09-18; Page Numbers: 1-103. Date of Issuance:2-12-18. Court Reporter/Transcriber Scott Wallace, Telephone number 202-354-3196, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the
|
January 9, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER. Due to the Courts calendar, the hearing previously scheduled for January 9, 2018 at 11:00 am will now take place on January 9, 2018 at 11:30 am in Courtroom 24A. PLEASE NOTE THE TIME CHANGE. The Court regrets any inconvenience to the parties. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/9/2018. (lcegs3)
|
January 9, 2018 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 1/9/2018 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (mac)
|
January 9, 2018 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan: Motion Hearing held on 1/9/2018 re #12 MOTION to Dismiss and #13 MOTION to Dismiss . The Court Will Take Arguments Under Advisement. (Court Reporter SCOTT WALLACE.) (mac)
|
January 5, 2018 |
Filing 24
SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re Order,, Entered January 4, 2018 filed by A&R DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA HOUSING AUTHORITY, PRESERVATION OF AFFORDABLE HOUSING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Kiernan, Paul)
|
January 4, 2018 |
Filing 23
NOTICE of Appearance by Theodore R. Flo on behalf of DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA HOUSING AUTHORITY (Flo, Theodore)
|
January 4, 2018 |
MINUTE ORDER- Chambers received a December 20, 2017 letter sent from defendants to the D.C. Court of Appeals regarding Appeal No. 15-AA-1000. In the letter, defendants reference certain pages from the oral argument transcript. Defendants also state that the "project has secured permission from HUD to proceed with demolition of empty parts of the project." Defendants are ordered file on the docket the oral argument transcript referenced in the letter and the received permission from HUD to proceed with demolition. The documents shall be filed by no later than 6:00 pm on January 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/4/2018. (lcegs3)
|
December 14, 2017 |
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Hearing on the defendants' Motions to Dismiss set for 1/9/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zcdw)
|
December 14, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER in view of #12 , #13 defendants' motions to dismiss and in reconsideration of the arguments advanced in the status conference held on December 12, 2018, the Court hereby schedules a hearing on the defendants' motions to dismiss for January 9, 2017 at 11:00 am in Courtroom 24A. It is further ordered that the preliminary injunction briefing schedule in the December 12, 2017 Minute Order is vacated and stayed. The Court will consider a revised briefing schedule at the motions to dismiss hearing. Finally, it is further ordered that the plaintiffs shall email Chambers pdf copies of the briefs filed in Barry Farm Tenants and Allies Association v. D.C. Zoning Commission, 15 AA-1000 (D.C. Court of Appeals) by December 18, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/14/2017. (lcegs3)
|
December 12, 2017 |
Filing 22
NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Kapatkin on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kapatkin, Brian)
|
December 12, 2017 |
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan: Status Conference held on 12/12/2017. Defendants Response due by 1/16/2018. Plaintiffs Reply due by 1/22/2018. Motion Hearing set for 2/1/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan.). (Court Reporter SCOTT WALLACE.) (mac)
|
December 11, 2017 |
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 12/12/2017 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 24A before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (mac)
|
December 11, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs are directed to deliver two courtesy copies of #21 motion for preliminary injunction and exhibits by 5:00 pm on December 11, 2017. See Standing Order, ECF No. 3. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/11/2017. (lcegs3)
|
December 11, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER. In view of #21 plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction, the Court sua sponte schedules a status conference for December 12, 2017 at 9:30 am in Courtroom 24A. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 12/11/2017. (lcegs3)
|
December 9, 2017 |
Filing 21
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by BARRY FARM TENANTS AND ALLIES ASSOCIATION, INC., DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GRASSROOTS EMPOWERMENT PROJECT, INC., BRENDA LUCAS, JACQUELINE THRASH, ISMAEL VAZQUEZ, SR. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Joseph D. Edmondson, Jr. (Attorney), #3 Exhibit A (Milloy Article), #4 Exhibit B (Belt Decl.), #5 Exhibit C (Thrash Decl.), #6 Exhibit D (Jones Decl.), #7 Exhibit E (Lucas Decl.), #8 Exhibit F (Wheeler Decl.), #9 Exhibit G (Weaver Decl.), #10 Exhibit H (Vazquez Decl.), #11 Exhibit I (DCHA Webpage - Barry Farm), #12 Exhibit J (Webpage - New Communities), #13 Exhibit K (Z.C. Order 14-02), #14 Exhibit L (Z.C. Order 14-02A), #15 Exhibit M (July 14 Cover Letter), #16 Exhibit N (Relocation Letter), #17 Exhibit O (Raze Application), #18 Exhibit P (90-day Notices), #19 Exhibit Q (Young Decl.), #20 Exhibit R (FOIA Letters), #21 Exhibit S (DCHA Webpages - Comparator Properties), #22 Exhibit T (Stahl Decl.), #23 Exhibit U (MWCG Report on Homelessness), #24 Exhibit V (Barry Farm Q&A Responses), #25 Exhibit W (Tatian, et al. Article), #26 Exhibit X (Rivers Article), #27 Exhibit Y (DCHA Webpage - Mission and Vision), #28 Exhibit Index (A-Y), #29 Text of Proposed Order)(Edmondson, Joseph)
|
December 8, 2017 |
Filing 20
REPLY to opposition to motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA HOUSING AUTHORITY. (Skojec, Michael)
|
December 8, 2017 |
Filing 19
REPLY to opposition to motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Counts I and II filed by A&R DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, PRESERVATION OF AFFORDABLE HOUSING, INC.. (Kiernan, Paul) Modified event title on 12/11/2017 (znmw).
|
December 7, 2017 |
Filing 18
NOTICE of Substitute Filing by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA HOUSING AUTHORITY re #12 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Substitute Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint)(Skojec, Michael)
|
November 22, 2017 |
Filing 17
NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Kiernan on behalf of A&R DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, PRESERVATION OF AFFORDABLE HOUSING, INC. (Kiernan, Paul)
|
November 21, 2017 |
Filing 16
Memorandum in opposition to re #12 MOTION to Dismiss , #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by BARRY FARM TENANTS AND ALLIES ASSOCIATION, INC., DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GRASSROOTS EMPOWERMENT PROJECT, INC., BRENDA LUCAS, JACQUELINE THRASH, ISMAEL VAZQUEZ, SR.. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit X (90-Day Notice to Vacate for 1137 Sumner Road, SE, dated October 17, 2017), #3 Exhibit Y (Letter from D.C. Housing Authority, dated July 17, 2017), #4 Exhibit Z (Raze Application Report, dated November 6, 2017, and associated applications))(Edmondson, Joseph)
|
November 9, 2017 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Opposition To The Motions To Dismiss due by 11/21/2017. Defendant Brief In Reply due by 12/8/2017. (mac)
|
November 9, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #15 plaintiffs' consent motion for extension of time to respond to defendants' motions to dismiss and set a reply deadline. It is therefore ordered that plaintiffs shall file their opposition to the motions to dismiss by November 21, 2017. Defendants shall file their briefs in reply by December 8, 2017. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 11/9/2017. (lcegs3)
|
November 8, 2017 |
Filing 15
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss , #13 MOTION to Dismiss by BARRY FARM TENANTS AND ALLIES ASSOCIATION, INC., DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GRASSROOTS EMPOWERMENT PROJECT, INC., BRENDA LUCAS, JACQUELINE THRASH, ISMAEL VAZQUEZ, SR. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Edmondson, Joseph)
|
October 30, 2017 |
Filing 14
LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by A&R DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, PRESERVATION OF AFFORDABLE HOUSING, INC. (Calkins, Lynn)
|
October 30, 2017 |
Filing 13
MOTION to Dismiss by PRESERVATION OF AFFORDABLE HOUSING, INC., A&R DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Calkins, Lynn) Modified to add filer on 10/31/2017 (znmw).
|
October 30, 2017 |
Filing 12
MOTION to Dismiss by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA HOUSING AUTHORITY (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Skojec, Michael)
|
September 25, 2017 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/30/2017, (mac)
|
September 22, 2017 |
MINUTE ORDER granting #11 defendants' consent motion for extension of time to respond to plaintiffs' complaint. It is therefore ordered that defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint no later than October 30, 2017. In light of this Order, #5 defendants' earlier consent motion for extension of time is moot. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 9/22/2017. (lcegs3)
|
September 21, 2017 |
Filing 11
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by A&R DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA HOUSING AUTHORITY, PRESERVATION OF AFFORDABLE HOUSING, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Skojec, Michael)
|
September 20, 2017 |
Filing 10
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew K. Handley on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Handley, Matthew)
|
September 20, 2017 |
Filing 9
NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine Cone on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cone, Catherine)
|
September 18, 2017 |
Filing 8
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. A&R DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION served on 8/30/2017, answer due 9/20/2017; PRESERVATION OF AFFORDABLE HOUSING, INC. served on 9/1/2017, answer due 9/22/2017 (Edmondson, Joseph)
|
September 18, 2017 |
Filing 7
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA HOUSING AUTHORITY served on 8/31/2017 (Edmondson, Joseph)
|
September 18, 2017 |
Filing 6
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael William Skojec on behalf of DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA HOUSING AUTHORITY (Skojec, Michael)
|
September 15, 2017 |
Filing 5
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, OR OTHER RESPONSIVE PLEADING by A&R DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA HOUSING AUTHORITY, PRESERVATION OF AFFORDABLE HOUSING, INC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Calkins, Lynn)
|
September 15, 2017 |
Filing 4
NOTICE of Appearance by Lynn Estes Calkins on behalf of A&R DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, PRESERVATION OF AFFORDABLE HOUSING, INC. (Calkins, Lynn)
|
August 29, 2017 |
Filing 3
STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 08/29/17. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac)
|
August 29, 2017 |
Filing 2
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to A&R DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA HOUSING AUTHORITY, PRESERVATION OF AFFORDABLE HOUSING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(sth)
|
August 29, 2017 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT against A&R DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA HOUSING AUTHORITY, PRESERVATION OF AFFORDABLE HOUSING, INC. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5093827) filed by JACQUELINE THRASH, BARRY FARM TENANTS AND ALLIES ASSOCIATION, INC., ISMAEL VAZQUEZ, SR., DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA GRASSROOTS EMPOWERMENT PROJECT, INC., BRENDA LUCAS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons to D.C. Housing Authority, #4 Summons Summons to Preservation of Affordable Housing, #5 Summons Summons to A&R Development Corp.)(Edmondson, Joseph)
|
August 29, 2017 |
Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (sth)
|