BEAN LLC v. JOHN DOE BANK Featured Case

Plaintiff: BEAN LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE BANK
Intervenor: PERMANENT SELECT COMMITTEE ON INTELLIGENCE OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Case Number: 1:2017cv02187
Filed: October 20, 2017
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Tanya S. Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 12:3410 Right to Financial Privacy Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Alexander D. Bono is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Defendant. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/23/17. (DJS)
October 23, 2017 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Alexander D. Bono, :Firm- Duane Morris LLP, :Address- 30 South 17th Street, Philadelphia, PA 19103-4196. Phone No. - 215.979.1181. Fax No. - 215.689.4472 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5171065. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DEFENDANT BANK (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alexander D. Bono, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Aronica, Joseph)
October 23, 2017 Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number: 4616087771. (md)
October 23, 2017 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph J. Aronica on behalf of DEFENDANT BANK (Aronica, Joseph)
October 21, 2017 9 Amended NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas G. Hungar on behalf of Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence of the U.S. House of Representatives (Hungar, Thomas) Modified event title on 10/23/2017 (znmw).
October 21, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: GRANTING 7 Motion to Intervene by Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence of the U.S. House of Representatives. The court hereby allows intervention by the Committee. Further, the Committee may file its response to Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order by 6:00 p.m. on Monday, October 23, 2017. The Plaintiff shall file any reply by 11:59 p.m. on Monday, October 23, 2017. The court will notify the parties by 10:00 a.m. on Tuesday, October 24, 2017 if the court determines that a telephone conference at 2:00 p.m. on Tuesday, October 24, 2017 is necessary. Consistent with the representations of counsel for the Committee, the Defendant Bank's deadline to respond to the Committee's subpoena has been extended until Wednesday, October 25, 2017. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/21/17. (DJS)
October 21, 2017 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas G. Hungar on behalf of Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence of the U.S. House of Representatives (Hungar, Thomas)
October 21, 2017 7 MOTION to Intervene by Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence of the U.S. House of Representatives (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hungar, Thomas)
October 20, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Tanya S. Chutkan: Evidentiary Hearing held on 10/20/2017 re Unopposed Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion heard and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: Brian Wayne) (zcdw)
October 20, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: The General Counsel to the U. S. House of Representatives shall file a motion to intervene by noon on 10/21/2017, and may attach as an exhibit a response to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order in 17-cv-2187-TSC. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/20/17. (DJS)
October 20, 2017 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Granting 3 Motion for Order for Defendant to Proceed Under a Pseudonym. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 10/20/17. (DJS)
October 20, 2017 6 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by BEAN LLC. Case related to Case No. 17-mc-2171. (td)
October 20, 2017 5 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BEAN LLC (td)
October 20, 2017 4 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 65.1(a) by BEAN LLC (td)
October 20, 2017 3 MOTION for Defendant to Proceed Under a Pseudonym by BEAN LLC (td)
October 20, 2017 2 Unopposed MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by BEAN LLC (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Text of Proposed Order, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(td)
October 20, 2017 1 COMPLAINT against DEFENDANT BANK with Jury Demand filed by BEAN LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(td)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BEAN LLC v. JOHN DOE BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEAN LLC
Represented By: Rachel M. Clattenburg
Represented By: Rachel F. Cotton
Represented By: Joshua Aaron Levy
Represented By: William W. Taylor, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE BANK
Represented By: Joseph J. Aronica
Represented By: Alexander D. Bono(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: PERMANENT SELECT COMMITTEE ON INTELLIGENCE OF THE U.S. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
Represented By: Thomas G. Hungar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?