UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. AT&T INC. et al Featured Case

The United States of America has sued to prevent AT&T from acquiring Time Warner in a transaction whose effect the Plaintiff claims "may be substantially to lessen competition" in violation of Section 7 of the Clayton Act, 15 U.S.C. § 18.

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: AT&T INC., DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC and TIME WARNER INC.
Movant: CARTER PAGE
Third_party_defendant: 21ST CENTURY FOX
Case Number: 1:2017cv02511
Filed: November 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Richard J. Leon
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 25
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER. Upon consideration of the applicable law, the evidence presented at trial, the parties' arguments, and the entire record before the Court, and for all the reasons given in the accompanying Memorandum opinion, the Court concludes that the Government has failed to carry its burden to show that the merger of defendants AT&T and Time Warner, as reflected in the October 22, 2016 merger agreement, is likely to "substantially... lessen competition" in violation of Section 7 of the Clayton Act, 15 U.S.C. § 18. It is therefore ORDERED that the Government's request to enjoin the proposed merger between defendants AT&T and Time Warner is DENIED; it is further ORDERED that the pending post-trial motions for leave to file amici curiae briefs, see Dkt. ## 129, 135, 144; motion to intervene, see Dkt. #142; and motions for admission pro hac vice, see Dkt. ## 133; 134, are DENIED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/12/2018. (zjth)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 6/12/2018. (jth)
June 12, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Status Conference held on 6/12/2018. (Court Reporter: William P. Zaremba) (jth)
June 11, 2018 Filing 145 RESPONSE re 144 MOTION for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae Brief filed by AT&T INC., DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC, TIME WARNER INC.. (Petrocelli, Daniel)
June 9, 2018 Filing 144 MOTION for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae Brief by Joseph Alioto (Attachments: # 1 Amicus Brief, # 2 Annex A to Amicus Brief, # 3 Declaration of Joseph Alioto, # 4 Proposed Order)(Alioto, Joseph)
May 31, 2018 Filing 143 RESPONSE re 142 MOTION to Intervene filed by AT&T INC., DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC, TIME WARNER INC.. (Fetterman, Kenneth)
May 31, 2018 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. [140 ] has been reinstated on the Court's docket. Disregard previous re Notice of Corrected Docket Entry, was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. (jf)
May 30, 2018 ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 140 Notice of Appearance was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading. No Motion for Leave to File A Third Party Complaint has been filed in this case. Counsel needs to either file A Motion for Leave to File A Third Party Complaint, Amicus Brief or Intervene. (jf) Modified on 5/31/2018 (jf).
May 30, 2018 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 139 Corporate Disclosure Statement was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading with a Motion to Intervene or Motion to Appear Amicus. (jf)
May 29, 2018 Filing 142 MOTION to Intervene by CBS CORPORATION, WALT DISNEY COMPANY, 21ST CENTURY FOX, UNIVISION COMMUNICATIONS INC., VIACOM INTERNATIONAL INC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Brief of RCN Telecom Services, LLC, et al., # 2 Certificate of Corporate Disclosure - Univision Communications Inc., # 3 Certificate of Corporate Disclosure - Viacom International Inc., # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Reinker, Kenneth) Modified on 5/31/2018 to add additional parties (jf).
May 29, 2018 Filing 141 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth S. Reinker on behalf of UNIVISION COMMUNICATIONS INC., VIACOM INTERNATIONAL INC. (Reinker, Kenneth)
May 29, 2018 Filing 140 NOTICE of Appearance by Cody Shawn Harris on behalf of The Walt Disney Company (Harris, Cody) Modified on 5/30/2018 (jf).
May 29, 2018 Filing 139 ENTERED IN ERROR.....Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS CORPORATION. (Fenton, Kathryn) Modified on 5/30/2018 (jf).
May 29, 2018 Filing 138 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Marie Fenton on behalf of CBS CORPORATION (Fenton, Kathryn)
May 21, 2018 Filing 137 RESPONSE re 135 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amicus curiae In Support of United States of America filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Conrath, Craig)
May 21, 2018 Filing 136 RESPONSE re 135 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amicus curiae In Support of United States of America filed by AT&T INC., DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC, TIME WARNER INC.. (Petrocelli, Daniel)
May 18, 2018 Filing 135 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amicus curiae In Support of United States of America by CINEMOI NORTH AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Amicus Brief, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Sandell, Laurence)
May 18, 2018 Filing 134 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- DAVID W. KESSELMAN, :Firm- KESSELMAN BRANTLY STOCKINGER LLP, :Address- 1230 Rosecrans Avenue, Suite 690, Manhattan Beach, CA 90266. Phone No. - 310-307-4555. Fax No. - 310-307-4570 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5489781. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CINEMOI NORTH AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sandell, Laurence)
May 18, 2018 Filing 133 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- AMY T. BRANTLY, :Firm- KESSELMAN BRANTLY STOCKINGER LLP, :Address- 1230 Rosecrans Avenue, Suite 690, Manhattan Beach, CA 90266. Phone No. - 310-307-4555. Fax No. - 310-307-4570 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5489754. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CINEMOI NORTH AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sandell, Laurence)
May 18, 2018 Filing 132 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Laurence Michael Sandell on behalf of CINEMOI NORTH AMERICA (Sandell, Laurence) Modified on 5/22/2018 to correct docket text (jf).
May 16, 2018 Filing 131 RESPONSE re 129 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici curiae In Support of Neither Party filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Conrath, Craig)
May 15, 2018 Filing 130 RESPONSE re 129 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici curiae In Support of Neither Party filed by AT&T INC., DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC, TIME WARNER INC.. (Petrocelli, Daniel)
May 14, 2018 Filing 129 MOTION for Leave to File Brief as Amici curiae In Support of Neither Party by RCN Telecom Service, LLC, Grande Communications Networks, LLC, Wavedivision Holdings, LLC, American Cable Association (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Amici Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilson, Joseph)
May 8, 2018 Filing 128 Proposed Findings of Fact by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Conrath, Craig)
May 8, 2018 Filing 127 REDACTED DOCUMENT- Proposed Conclusions of Law to 122 Sealed Document, 125 Sealed Document, by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Conrath, Craig)
May 8, 2018 Filing 126 TRIAL BRIEF (PUBLIC VERSION) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Conrath, Craig)
May 8, 2018 Filing 125 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re 122 Sealed Document, 123 Sealed Document, 124 Sealed Document (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Conrath, Craig)
May 3, 2018 Filing 124 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Conrath, Craig)
May 3, 2018 Filing 123 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Conrath, Craig)
May 3, 2018 Filing 122 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Conrath, Craig)
May 3, 2018 Filing 121 TRIAL BRIEF by AT&T INC., DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC, TIME WARNER INC.. (Petrocelli, Daniel)
May 3, 2018 Filing 120 Proposed Findings of Fact by AT&T INC., DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC, TIME WARNER INC.. (Petrocelli, Daniel)
May 3, 2018 Filing 119 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by AT&T INC., DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC, TIME WARNER INC.(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Petrocelli, Daniel)
April 30, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Bench Trial resumed, and concluded on 4/30/2018. A Status Conference is set for 6/12/2018 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter: William P. Zaremba) (jth)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of 117 DIRECTV'S Motion to Dismiss or for Entry of Judgment in Its Favor, and the United States' opposition thereto, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 4/27/2018. (lcrjl1)
April 26, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Bench Trial resumed and held on 4/26/2018. Plaintiff's Witness: Carl Shapiro. Bench Trial continued to 4/30/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter: William P. Zaremba) (jth)
April 24, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Bench Trial resumed and held on 4/24/2018. Plaintiff's Witness: Carl Shapiro. Bench Trial continued to 4/26/2018 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter: William P. Zaremba) (jth)
April 23, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Bench Trial resumed and held on 4/23/2018. Plaintiff Witnesses: Ronald Gary Quintero and Susan Athey. Bench Trial continued to 4/24/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporters: William P. Zaremba AM; Crystal Pilgrim PM) (jth)
April 19, 2018 Filing 118 Memorandum in opposition to re 117 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative MOTION for Judgment filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Anderson, Caroline)
April 19, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Bench Trial resumed and held on 4/19/2018. Defense Witnesses: John Thomas Stankey and Randall Stephenson; Plaintiff's Witness: Ronald Gary Quintero. Bench Trial continued to 4/23/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporters: Crystal Pilgrim AM; William P. Zaremba PM) (jth)
April 18, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Bench Trial resumed and held on 4/18/2018. Defense Witnesses: Jeffrey Lawrence Bewkes and John Thomas Stankey. Bench Trial continued to 4/19/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter: William P. Zaremba) (jth)
April 17, 2018 Filing 117 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, MOTION for Judgment by DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Petrocelli, Daniel)
April 17, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Bench Trial resumed and held on 4/17/2018. Plaintiff Witness: Jim Holanda. Defense Witnesses: Peter Rossi and David Christopher. Motion presented DIRECTV to dismiss or for entry of judgment in it favor. Plaintiff's response due 4/19/18, by 10:00 AM. Bench Trial continued to 4/18/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporters Crystal Pilgrim AM; William P. Zaremba PM). (zgdf)
April 16, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Bench Trial resumed and held on 4/16/2018. Defense Witnesses: Michael Katz and Peter Rossi; Bench Trial continued to 4/17/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporters: William P. Zaremba AM; Crystal Pilgrim PM). (jth)
April 12, 2018 Filing 116 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Cameron Gower on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Gower, Richard)
April 12, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Bench Trial resumed and held on 4/12/2018. Defense Witness: Dennis Carlton. Bench Trial continued to 4/16/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporters: Crystal Pilgrim AM; William P. Zaremba PM) (jth)
April 11, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Bench Trial resumed and held on 4/11/2018. Plaintiff's Witness: Carl Shapiro. Bench Trial continued to 4/12/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporters: William P. Zaremba AM; Crystal Pilgrim PM) (jth)
April 10, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Bench Trial resumed and held on 4/10/2018. Plaintiff's Witnesses: Madison Bond and Daniel York. Bench Trial continued to 4/11/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporters: Crystal Pilgrim AM; William P. Zaremba PM) (jth)
April 9, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Bench Trial resumed and held on 4/9/2018. Plaintiff's Witnesses: Devin Merrill and John Harran. The Sealed Motion 113 filed by the United States is STRICKEN. The Sealed Motion 110 filed by the United States is Granted in Part and Denied in Part. Bench Trial continued to 4/10/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporters: William P. Zaremba AM; Crystal Pilgrim PM) (jth) Modified on 4/11/2018 to reflect that the Sealed Motion of the United States 110 was granted in part and denied in part. (jth).
April 9, 2018 Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick Sherwood Young on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Young, Frederick) (Main Document 115 replaced on 4/10/2018) (jf).
April 7, 2018 Filing 114 SEALED OPPOSITION filed by AT&T INC., DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC, TIME WARNER INC.. re 110 SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Petrocelli, Daniel)
April 7, 2018 Filing 113 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO MINUTE ENTRY FILED 04/09/18.....SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H)(Conrath, Craig) Modified on 4/10/2018 to reflect that the motion has been Stricken. (jth).
April 6, 2018 Filing 112 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie Marie Kiser on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Kiser, Melanie)
April 6, 2018 Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by Ruediger Ralf Schuett on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Schuett, Ruediger)
April 6, 2018 NOTICE OF ERROR re 110 Sealed Motion; emailed to nathan.brenner@usdoj.gov, cc'd 113 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Invalid attorney signature, 2. In future, ECF login must match attorney signature on document; Do not refile. (znmw, )
April 5, 2018 Filing 110 SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Brenner, Nathan)
April 5, 2018 Filing 109 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Robert Jones on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Jones, Matthew) (Main Document 109 replaced on 4/6/2018) (znmw).
April 5, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Bench Trial resumed and held on 4/5/2018. Plaintiff's Witnesses: Daniel York, Timothy David Gibson and Gregory Stephen Manty. The United States' 108 Motion for Access to the Transcripts of the Bench Conferences Following Hanny Patel's and Daniel York's Testimony is DENIED. Bench Trial continued to 4/9/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporters: William P. Zaremba AM; Crystal Pilgrim PM) (jth) Modified on 4/10/2018 to reflect that the United States' Motion for Access to the Transcripts of the Bench Conferences (Dkt. #108) was DENIED by the Court (jth).
April 4, 2018 Filing 108 MOTION for Access to Bench Conference Transcripts by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Conrath, Craig)
April 4, 2018 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Scharfenberg Elmer on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Elmer, Julie)
April 4, 2018 Filing 106 NOTICE of Appearance by Claude F. Scott, Jr on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Scott, Claude)
April 4, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Bench Trial resumed and held on 4/4/2018. Plaintiff's Witnesses: Tom Montemagno, Vincent Torres, Simon Sutton, Hanny Patel and Daniel York. Bench Trial continued to 4/5/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporters: Crystal Pilgrim AM; William P. Zaremba PM) (jth)
April 3, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Bench Trial resumed and held on 4/3/2018. Plaintiff Witnesses: Richard Warren, Stefan Kyle Bewley and Tom Montemagno. Bench Trial continued to 4/4/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporters: William P. Zaremba AM; Crystal Pilgrim PM) (jth)
April 2, 2018 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Georgia Schussl Riker on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Riker, Lauren) (Main Document 105 replaced on 4/3/2018) (znmw).
April 2, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Bench Trial resumed and held on 4/2/2018. Plaintiffs' Witnesses: Breece Coleman Breland and Richard Warren. Bench Trial continued to 4/3/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporters: William P. Zaremba AM; Crystal Pilgrim PM) (jth)
March 30, 2018 Filing 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Samer Makram Musallam on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Musallam, Samer) (Main Document 104 replaced on 4/2/2018) (znmw).
March 29, 2018 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis Wayne Strong on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Strong, Curtis) (Main Document 103 replaced on 3/30/2018) (znmw).
March 29, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Bench Trial resumed and held on 3/29/2018. Plaintiff's Witnesses: Professor John Hauser and Gregory Rigdon. Bench Trial continued to 4/2/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporters William P. Zaremba AM; Crystal Pilgrim PM) (jth)
March 28, 2018 Filing 102 NOTICE of Appearance by Shobitha Bhat on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Bhat, Shobitha) (Main Document 102 replaced on 3/29/2018) (znmw).
March 28, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Bench Trial resumed and held on 3/28/2018. Plaintiff's Witnesses: John Kevin Martin, Jr., and Marty Hinson. Bench Trial continued to 3/29/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporters: William P. Zaremba AM; Crystal Pilgram PM) (jth)
March 27, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Bench Trial resumed and held on 3/27/2018. Plaintiff's Witnesses: Warren Schlichting, John Kevin Martin, Jr. Bench Trial continued to 3/28/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporters: William P. Zaremba AM; Crystal Pilgrim PM). (jth)
March 26, 2018 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Hane on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Hane, Jennifer) (Main Document 101 replaced on 3/27/2018) (znmw).
March 26, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Bench Trial resumed and held on 3/26/2018. Plaintiff's Witness: Warren Schlichting. Bench Trial continued to 3/27/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporters: William P. Zaremba AM; Crystal Pilgrim PM;) (jth)
March 25, 2018 Filing 100 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy B. Walthall on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Walthall, Timothy) (Main Document 100 replaced on 3/26/2018) (znmw).
March 23, 2018 Filing 99 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry James Joyce on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Joyce, Barry) (Main Document 99 replaced on 3/26/2018) (znmw).
March 22, 2018 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by Cerin Milliejane Lindgrensavage on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Lindgrensavage, Cerin) (Main Document 98 replaced on 3/23/2018) (znmw).
March 22, 2018 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by David Joseph Shaw on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Shaw, David) (Main Document 97 replaced on 3/23/2018) (znmw).
March 22, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Bench Trial begun and held on 3/22/2018. Plaintiff's Witness: Suzanne Fenwick. Bench Trial continued to 3/26/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporters: William P. Zaremba AM; Crystal Pilgrim PM). (jth)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of tomorrow's delayed opening of the U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia due to inclement weather, it is hereby ORDERED that Opening Arguments are rescheduled from 10:30 AM to 11:30 AM, Thursday, March 22, 2018, in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/21/2018. (lcrjl1)
March 20, 2018 Filing 96 TRANSCRIPT OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard J. Leon held on March 15, 2018; Page Numbers: 1-32. Date of Issuance: March 20, 2018. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/10/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/20/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2018.(wz)
March 20, 2018 Filing 95 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa A. Scanlon on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Scanlon, Lisa)
March 20, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Evidentiary Hearing resumed and concluded on 3/20/2018. Opening Arguments are set for Thursday, March 22, 2018, at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporters: William P. Zaremba (AM) and Crystal Pilgrim (PM)) (jth)
March 19, 2018 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Elizabeth Sallstrom on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Sallstrom, Anna)
March 19, 2018 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Ihan Kim on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Kim, Ihan)
March 19, 2018 Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Sanford Marshall Adler on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Adler, Sanford)
March 19, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Evidentiary Hearing held on 3/19/2018. Evidentiary Hearing continued to 3/20/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporters: William P. Zaremba (AM) and Crystal Pilgrim (PM)) (jth)
March 17, 2018 Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexis Brown-Reilly on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Brown-Reilly, Alexis)
March 15, 2018 Filing 90 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew David Siegel on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Siegel, Matthew)
March 15, 2018 Filing 89 NOTICE of Appearance by Dylan Matthew Carson on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Carson, Dylan)
March 15, 2018 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Daniel Brenner on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Brenner, Nathan)
March 15, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Status and Pretrial Conference held on 3/15/2018. (Court Reporter: William P. Zaremba) (jth)
March 13, 2018 Filing 87 PRETRIAL STATEMENT by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Conrath, Craig)
March 13, 2018 Filing 86 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Conrath, Craig)
March 13, 2018 Filing 85 MOTION in Limine [REDACTED] by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Caroline)
March 13, 2018 Filing 84 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by AT&T INC., DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC, TIME WARNER INC. re 83 Memorandum in Opposition, (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Petrocelli, Daniel)
March 13, 2018 Filing 83 Memorandum in opposition to re 78 SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA filed by AT&T INC., DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC, TIME WARNER INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Petrocelli, Daniel)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of 78 Sealed Motion filed by United States of America, filed publicly as 85 The United States' Motion in Limine to Exclude or Limit Evidence of Defendants' Arbitration Offer, and defendants' opposition thereto, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that 73 Motion for Leave by Former Department of Justice Officials to File Brief Amici Curiae in Support of Neither Party is DENIED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/13/2018. (lcrjl1)
March 12, 2018 Filing 82 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re 75 Sealed Document (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Conrath, Craig)
March 12, 2018 Filing 81 ERRATA by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA 76 Trial Brief filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Conrath, Craig)
March 12, 2018 Filing 80 NOTICE of Error in Government's Response to Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief by PROTECT DEMOCRACY PROJECT, INC. re 74 Response to motion (Berwick, Benjamin)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Consistent with the Judge's standing practice, tomorrow's 3:00 PM initial pretrial conference will be held in the Court's Conference Room. Attendance at the pretrial conference will be limited to no more than 3 lawyers per side. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/12/2018. (lcrjl1)
March 9, 2018 Filing 79 NOTICE of Proposed Order Joint Confidentiality by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re 72 Scheduling Order, (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Welsh, Eric)
March 9, 2018 Filing 78 SEALED MOTION filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Anderson, Caroline)
March 9, 2018 Filing 77 TRIAL BRIEF by AT&T INC., DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC, TIME WARNER INC.. (Petrocelli, Daniel)
March 9, 2018 Filing 76 TRIAL BRIEF (REDACTED) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Conrath, Craig)
March 9, 2018 Filing 75 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Conrath, Craig)
March 9, 2018 Filing 74 RESPONSE re 73 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae by The Protect Democracy Project, Inc. filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Welsh, Eric)
March 8, 2018 Filing 73 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae by FORMER DOJ OFFICIALS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Berwick, Benjamin)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 SUPPLEMENTAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/13/2018 at 3:00 PM; Final Pretrial Conference (if necessary) set for 3/15/2018 at 3:00 PM; Trial begins (anticipated 15 days) 3/19/2018. (See Order for complete details) SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 3/6/2018. (jth)
March 2, 2018 Filing 71 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard J. Leon held on March 2, 2018; Page Numbers: 1-15. Date of Issuance: March 2, 2018. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/23/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/2/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/31/2018.(wz)
March 2, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Status Conference held on 3/2/2018. (Court Reporter: William P. Zaremba) (jth)
February 28, 2018 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Martin Panner on behalf of AT&T INC., DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC (Panner, Aaron)
February 23, 2018 Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline J. Anderson on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Anderson, Caroline)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that defendants' oral motion to compel production of the requested privilege logs relating to their selective enforcement defense is DENIED; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiff's oral motion to strike defendants' outstanding discovery and interrogatory requests for: 1) all written communications about the merger between the White House and the Attorney General's office; 2) all written communications about the White House's view of the merger between Attorney General's office and the Antitrust Division; and 3) all oral communications between the White House and the Antitrust Division with regard to the AT&T merger is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/20/2018. (jth)
February 20, 2018 Filing 67 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard J. Leon held on February 16, 2018; Page Numbers: 1-62. Date of Issuance: February 20, 2018. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased f rom the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/13/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/21/2018.(wz)
February 20, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: A Status Conference in this matter is set for Friday, March 2, 2018, at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (jth)
February 16, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Status Conference held on 2/16/2018. (Court Reporter: William P. Zaremba) (jth)
February 15, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference reset for 2/16/2018 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (zcdw)
February 9, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: The Status Conference is reset for 2/12/2018 at 12:00 PM in Court's Conference Room before Judge Richard J. Leon. (jth)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The informal Status Conference, with no more than three lawyers per side, currently set for 2/12/2018 at 3:00 PM is hereby RESCHEDULED for 2/12/2018 at 12:00 PM in the Court's Conference Room. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/9/2018. (lcrjl1)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Status Conference set for 2/16/2018 at 3:00 PM is hereby RESCHEDULED for 2/16/2018 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 2/6/2018. (lcrjl1)
February 2, 2018 Filing 66 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard J. Leon held on February 2, 2018; Page Numbers: 1-19. Date of Issuance: February 2, 2018. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased fro m the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/23/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/5/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/3/2018.(wz)
February 2, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Status Conference held on 2/2/2018. An informal Status Conference, with no more than 3 lawyers per side, to be held in the Court's Conference Room is set for 2/12/2018 at 3:00 PM; A draft Trial Procedures Order from the parties is to be submitted to the Court by 12:00 PM (noon) on 2/15/2018; A full Status Conference is set for 2/16/2018 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter: William P. Zaremba) (jth)
January 30, 2018 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene M. Paige on behalf of WALT DISNEY COMPANY (Paige, Eugene)
January 29, 2018 Filing 64 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Steven P. Hollman on behalf of The Walt Disney Company, Substituting for attorney Eugene Paige (Hollman, Steven)
January 23, 2018 Filing 63 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard J. Leon held on January 19, 2018; Page Numbers: 1-28. Date of Issuance: January 23, 2018. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased fro m the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 2/13/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/23/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/23/2018.(wz)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER. The Court, upon good cause shown, ORDERS as follows: 1). Plaintiff shall seek consent from each of the 9 third parties identified in paragraph 2 below to produce pricing data to Defendants that those third parties had provided to Plaintiff during prior merger investigations, which data Plaintiff agreed to produce upon receiving consent. Plaintiff shall send the data to the third parties that produced such data by January 23, 2018, and shall request a response regarding the third parties' consent by noon on January 25, 2018. Plaintiff shall immediately notify defendants of each response. 2). The 9 third parties consist of four distributors (Comcast/NBC, Charter, Cox, and Altice) and five programmers (Disney, Fox, Viacom, Discovery, and Scripps). Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 01/22/2018. (jth)
January 19, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Status Conference held on 1/19/2018. Another Status Conference is set for 2/2/2018 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter: William P. Zaremba) (jth)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Consistent with the discussion at today's status hearing, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall confer further regarding their dispute over the Government's production of the third-party pricing information sought by defendants. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall notify the Court regarding the status of the discovery dispute on or before Monday, January 22, 2018 at 12:00 PM. It is further ORDERED that, in the event the parties are unable to resolve the discovery dispute, defendants shall file a proposed order granting their requested relief and setting forth deadlines for compliance with the order no later than 12:00 PM on January 22, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/19/2018. (lcrjl1)
January 5, 2018 Filing 61 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard J. Leon held on January 5, 2018; Page Numbers: 1-13. Date of Issuance: January 5, 2018. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 1/26/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/5/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/5/2018.(wz)
January 5, 2018 Filing 60 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Andrew J. Frackman, :Firm- O'Melveny & Myers LLP, :Address- 7 Times Square Tower, 7 Times Square, New York, New York 10036. Phone No. - 212-326-2000. Fax No. - 212-326-2061 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5274985. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AT&T INC., DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC, TIME WARNER INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Andrew J. Frackman In Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Robson, Katrina)
January 5, 2018 Filing 59 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kenneth R. O'Rourke, :Firm- O'Melveny & Myers LLP, :Address- 1625 Eye Street, NW. Phone No. - 202-383-5300. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5274490. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AT&T INC., DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC, TIME WARNER INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kenneth R. O'Rourke in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Robson, Katrina)
January 5, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Status Conference held on 1/5/2018. Another Status Conference is set for 1/19/2018 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter: William P. Zaremba) (jth)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 59 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kenneth R. O'Rourke and 60 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew J. Frackman. It is hereby ORDERED that the motions are GRANTED and that Kenneth R. O'Rourke and Andrew J. Frackman be, and hereby are, admitted pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 1/5/2018. (lcrjl1)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/29/17. (jl)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 57 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Enter Amended Protective Order. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/29/2017. (jl)
December 27, 2017 Filing 57 Unopposed MOTION to Modify the Protective Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Conrath, Craig)
December 22, 2017 Filing 56 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard J. Leon held on December 21, 2017; Page Numbers: 1-27. Date of Issuance: December 22, 2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased f rom the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 1/12/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/22/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/22/2018.(wz)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/21/2017. (tg)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/21/2017. (tg)
December 21, 2017 Filing 53 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Cody Shawn Harris, :Firm- Keker Van Nest & Peters LLP, :Address- 633 Battery Street, San Francisco, California 94111. Phone No. - 415-391-5400. Fax No. - 415-397-7188 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5259220. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by The Walt Disney Company, (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Cody Shawn Harris, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hollman, Steven)
December 21, 2017 Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robert Addy Van Nest, :Firm- Keker Nest & Peters LLP, :Address- 633 Battery Street, San Francisco, California 94111. Phone No. - 415-391-5400. Fax No. - 415-397-7188 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5259202. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by The Walt Disney Company, (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Robert Addy Van Nest, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hollman, Steven)
December 21, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Status Conference held on 12/21/2017. A further Status Conference is scheduled for 1/5/2018, at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. The Court shall post orders by 4:30 p.m. today. (Court Reporter William P. Zaremba.) (tg)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of 52 and 53 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert Addy Van Nest and Cody Shawn Harris, it is hereby ORDERED that the motions are GRANTED and that Robert Addy Van Nest and Cody Shawn Harris be, and hereby are, admitted pro hac vice in this case. It is further ORDERED that 49 The Walt Disney Company's Motion to Join Third-Party Twenty-First Century Fox, Inc.'s Motion to Amend the Protective Order is GRANTED. Upon consideration of 42 Third-Party Twenty-First Century Fox, Inc.'s Motion to Amend the Protective Order and the corresponding pleadings, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/21/2017. (lcrjl1)
December 20, 2017 Filing 51 RESPONSE re 42 MOTION to Amend/Correct 37 Protective Order filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Conrath, Craig)
December 20, 2017 Filing 50 REPLY to opposition to motion re 42 MOTION to Amend/Correct 37 Protective Order filed by 21ST CENTURY FOX. (Reinker, Kenneth)
December 20, 2017 Filing 49 MOTION for Protective Order (joining Docket # 42) by The Walt Disney Company, (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hollman, Steven)
December 20, 2017 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L. Magielnicki, Sr on behalf of The Walt Disney Company, (Magielnicki, Robert)
December 20, 2017 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven P. Hollman on behalf of The Walt Disney Company, (Hollman, Steven)
December 20, 2017 Filing 46 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by The Walt Disney Company, (Hollman, Steven)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying 38 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/20/2017. (lcrjl1)
December 18, 2017 Filing 45 RESPONSE re 42 MOTION to Amend/Correct 37 Protective Order filed by AT&T INC., DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC, TIME WARNER INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A)(Fetterman, Kenneth)
December 18, 2017 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Matthew Fetterman on behalf of AT&T INC., DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC (Fetterman, Kenneth)
December 15, 2017 Filing 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 21ST CENTURY FOX. (Reinker, Kenneth)
December 15, 2017 Filing 42 MOTION to Amend/Correct 37 Protective Order by 21ST CENTURY FOX (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2, # 3 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Reinker, Kenneth)
December 15, 2017 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth S. Reinker on behalf of 21ST CENTURY FOX (Reinker, Kenneth)
December 15, 2017 Filing 40 NOTICE of Proposed Order (Joint Proposed Scheduling and Case Management Orders) by AT&T INC., DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC, TIME WARNER INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Joint Proposed Scheduling Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Joint Proposed Case Management Order)(Petrocelli, Daniel)
December 12, 2017 Filing 39 RESPONSE re 38 MOTION for Leave to File filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Conrath, Craig)
December 12, 2017 Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by CARTER PAGE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amicus Brief)(jf)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/8/2017. (jth)
December 8, 2017 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence Andrew Reicher on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Reicher, Lawrence)
December 7, 2017 Filing 35 TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard J. Leon held on December 7, 2017; Page Numbers: 1-21. Date of Issuance: December 7, 2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased fro m the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/28/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/7/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/7/2018.(wz)
December 7, 2017 Filing 34 NOTICE OF LODGING OF JOINTLY PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER by AT&T INC., DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC, TIME WARNER INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Joint Proposed Protective Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Proposed Scheduling and Case Management Order)(Petrocelli, Daniel)
December 7, 2017 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin T. Heipp on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Heipp, Justin) (Main Document 33 replaced on 12/8/2017) (znmw).
December 7, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Status Conference held on 12/7/2017. Bench Trial set for 3/19/2018 at 10:00 AM. Another Status Conference is scheduled for 12/21/2017 at 3:00 PM. Unless otherwise noted all proceedings will be held in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter: William P. Zaremba) (jth)
December 6, 2017 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Damian Welsh on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Welsh, Eric)
December 5, 2017 Filing 31 RESPONSE re 22 MOTION To Set Trial Date filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Conrath, Craig)
December 5, 2017 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Alan Scheele on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Scheele, Scott) (Main Document 30 replaced on 12/6/2017) (znmw).
December 4, 2017 Filing 29 RESPONSE re 25 MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by AT&T INC., DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC, TIME WARNER INC.. (Robson, Katrina)
November 30, 2017 Filing 28 ERRATA Regarding Docket 25 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA 25 MOTION for Scheduling Order filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Conrath, Craig)
November 30, 2017 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Joseph Schwingler on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Schwingler, Peter)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 7 , 8 , 10 , 11 , 12 and 13 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Robert C. Walters, Michael L. Raiff, Peter T. Barbur, Julie A. North, Kevin J. Orsini, and Margaret Segall D'Amico. It is hereby ORDERED that the motions are GRANTED and that Robert C. Walters, Michael L. Raiff, Peter T. Barbur, Julie A. North, Kevin J. Orsini, and Margaret Segall D'Amico be, and hereby are, admitted pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/30/2017. (lcrjl1)
November 29, 2017 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Jared A. Hughes on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Hughes, Jared) (Main Document 26 replaced on 11/30/2017) (znmw).
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that an Initial Status Conference be set for December 7, 2017 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/29/2017. (lcrjl1)
November 28, 2017 Filing 25 MOTION for Scheduling Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Conrath, Craig)
November 28, 2017 Filing 24 MOTION for Protective Order by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Conrath, Craig)
November 28, 2017 Filing 23 MOTION for Protective Order by AT&T INC., DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC, TIME WARNER INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Robson, Katrina)
November 28, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION To Set Trial Date by AT&T INC., DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC, TIME WARNER INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Robson, Katrina)
November 28, 2017 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T INC., DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC, TIME WARNER INC. re 20 Answer to Complaint . (Robson, Katrina)
November 28, 2017 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint by AT&T INC., DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC, TIME WARNER INC..(Robson, Katrina)
November 28, 2017 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TIME WARNER INC.. (Varney, Christine)
November 28, 2017 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC. (Robson, Katrina)
November 28, 2017 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AT&T INC.. (Robson, Katrina)
November 28, 2017 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC waiver sent on 11/20/2017, answer due 1/19/2018. (Conrath, Craig)
November 28, 2017 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. AT&T INC. waiver sent on 11/20/2017, answer due 1/19/2018. (Conrath, Craig)
November 28, 2017 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine Anne Varney on behalf of TIME WARNER INC. (Varney, Christine)
November 27, 2017 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Margaret Segall D'Amico, :Firm- Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP, :Address- 825 Eighth Avenue, New York, NY 10019. Phone No. - (212) 474-1000. Fax No. - (212) 474-3700 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5221985. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by TIME WARNER INC. (Varney, Christine)
November 27, 2017 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kevin J. Orsini, :Firm- Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP, :Address- 825 Eighth Avenue, New York, NY 10019. Phone No. - (212) 474-1000. Fax No. - (212) 474-3700 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5221983. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by TIME WARNER INC. (Varney, Christine)
November 27, 2017 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Julie A. North, :Firm- Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP, :Address- 825 Eighth Avenue, New York, NY 10019. Phone No. - (212) 474-1000. Fax No. - (212) 474-3700 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5221981. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by TIME WARNER INC. (Varney, Christine)
November 27, 2017 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Peter T. Barbur, :Firm- Cravath, Swaine & Moore LLP, :Address- 825 Eighth Avenue, New York, NY 10019. Phone No. - (212) 474-1000. Fax No. - (212) 474-3700 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5221980. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by TIME WARNER INC. (Varney, Christine)
November 27, 2017 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. TIME WARNER INC. waiver sent on 11/20/2017, answer due 1/19/2018. (Conrath, Craig)
November 22, 2017 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Michael L. Raiff, :Firm- Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP, :Address- 2100 McKinney Ave., Suite 1100, Dallas, Texas 75201. Phone No. - (214) 698-3114. Fax No. - (214) 571-2900 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5219093. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AT&T INC., DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Robson, Katrina)
November 22, 2017 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Robert C. Walters, :Firm- Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP, :Address- 2100 McKinney Ave., Suite 1100, Dallas, Texas 75201. Phone No. - (214) 698-3114. Fax No. - (214) 571-2900 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5219079. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AT&T INC., DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Robson, Katrina)
November 22, 2017 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- M. Randall Oppenheimer, :Firm- O'Melveny & Myers LLP, :Address- 1999 Avenue of the Stars, 8th Floor, Los Angeles, California 90067. Phone No. - 310-553-6700. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5218913. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AT&T INC., DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC, TIME WARNER INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of M. Randall Oppenheimer, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Robson, Katrina)
November 22, 2017 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Daniel M. Petrocelli, :Firm- O'Melveny & Myers LLP, :Address- 1999 Avenue of the Stars, 8th Floor, Los Angeles, California 90067. Phone No. - 310-553-6700. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5218901. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AT&T INC., DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC, TIME WARNER INC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel M. Petrocelli In Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Robson, Katrina)
November 22, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Katrina M. Robson on behalf of AT&T INC., DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC, TIME WARNER INC. (Robson, Katrina)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel M. Petrocelli and 6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of M. Randall Oppenheimer. It is hereby ORDERED that the motions are GRANTED and that Daniel M. Petrocelli and M. Randall Oppenheimer be, and hereby are, admitted pro hac vice in this case. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/22/2017. (lcrjl1)
November 21, 2017 Filing 3 Case randomly reassigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. Judge Christopher R. Cooper is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
November 21, 2017 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to AT&T INC., DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC, TIME WARNER INC. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(jd)
November 20, 2017 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (jd)
November 20, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to AT&T INC., # 3 Summons to DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC, # 4 Summons to TIME WARNER INC.)(Conrath, Craig) Modified to replace fillable civil cover sheet on 11/21/2017 (jd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. AT&T INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Craig William Conrath(Designation Assistant U.S. Attorney)
Represented By: Justin T. Heipp
Represented By: Jared A. Hughes(Designation Assistant U.S. Attorney)
Represented By: Lawrence Andrew Reicher(Designation Assistant U.S. Attorney)
Represented By: Scott Alan Scheele(Designation Assistant U.S. Attorney)
Represented By: Peter Joseph Schwingler(Designation Assistant U.S. Attorney)
Represented By: Eric Damian Welsh(Designation Assistant U.S. Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T INC.
Represented By: Kenneth Matthew Fetterman
Represented By: M. Randall Oppenheimer(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Daniel M. Petrocelli(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Michael L. Raiff(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Katrina M. Robson
Represented By: Robert C. Walters(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRECTV GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth Matthew Fetterman
Represented By: M. Randall Oppenheimer(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Daniel M. Petrocelli(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Michael L. Raiff(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Katrina M. Robson
Represented By: Robert C. Walters(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIME WARNER INC.
Represented By: Peter T. Barbur(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Margaret Segall D'Amico(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Julie A. North(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: M. Randall Oppenheimer(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kevin J. Orsini(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Daniel M. Petrocelli(Designation Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Katrina M. Robson
Represented By: Christine Anne Varney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: CARTER PAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_defendant: 21ST CENTURY FOX
Represented By: Kenneth S. Reinker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?