MANAFORT v. U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR.
Defendant: U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, ROD ROSENSTEIN and ROBERT S. MUELLER, III
Case Number: 1:2018cv00011
Filed: January 3, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2018 USCA Case Number 18-5193 for 38 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (zvt)
June 25, 2018 39 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re 38 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (jf)
June 25, 2018 38 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to 36 Order on Motion to Dismiss, 37 Memorandum & Opinion by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-5552917. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Downing, Kevin)
April 27, 2018 37 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/27/2018. (lcabj2)
April 27, 2018 36 Featured Case ORDER. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12 and 58, and for the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, it is hereby ORDERED that defendants' 16 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. This is a final appealable order. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/27/2018. (lcabj2)
April 11, 2018 35 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted Regarding Subject-Matter Jurisdiction filed by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Downing, Kevin)
April 11, 2018 34 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted, Order,,, Set Deadlines,, Regarding Plaintiff's Lack of Standing filed by ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, ROD ROSENSTEIN, U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Schwei, Daniel)
April 5, 2018 33 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Amy Berman Jackson held on April 4, 2018; Page Numbers: 1-55. Date of Issuance: April 4, 2018. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <a href="http://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/node/110">Transcript Order Form</a><P></P><P></P>For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.<P>NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov.<P></P> Redaction Request due 4/26/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/6/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/4/2018.(Dickman, Janice)
April 5, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. The parties may submit supplemental memoranda, which may not exceed five pages, by April 11, 2018, addressing the question of whether the Court has subject matter jurisdiction over Count I now that plaintiff has withdrawn any claim for declaratory or injunctive relief relating to the pending indictments, and he seeks prospective relief, including an order "enjoining the Special Counsel's future ultra vires exercise of authority under" the Appointment Order. See Pl.'s Mem. of Law in Opp. to Defs.' Mot. to Dismiss [Dkt. # 24] at 11. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/5/2018. (lcabj2)
April 4, 2018 Minute Entry for Proceedings held before Judge Amy Berman Jackson: Motion Hearing held on 4/4/2018 re: Defendants 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted. The 16 Motion was Heard and Taken Under Advisement. (Court Reporter: Janice Dickman) (jth)
March 29, 2018 32 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Writ of Mandamus and Prohibition submitted by David Andrew Christenson. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file DENIED" Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 03/29/2018. (jf)
March 22, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 30 Motion to Unseal Document. The Clerk of Court is directed to unseal, and make available on the public docket, David Andrew Christenson's 20 motion for a gag order. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/22/2018. (lcabj2)
March 20, 2018 31 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Emergency Motion to Intervene filed on behalf of all americans filed by David Andrew Christenson This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file DENIED. Movant has already been denied permission to intervene in this case and no further pleading may be docketed" Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 03/20/2018. (jf)
March 8, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: A Motion's Hearing in this case is scheduled for Wednesday, April 4, 2018, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (jth)
March 2, 2018 28 REPLY to opposition to motion re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted filed by ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, ROD ROSENSTEIN, U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Schwei, Daniel)
February 27, 2018 30 MOTION to Unseal Document 20 Sealed Document filed by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON. "Leave to file GRANTED As A Motion To Unseal Dkt. 20" signed by Amy B. Jackson on 02/27/2018 (jf)
February 27, 2018 29 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Ninth Supplemental Motion to Intervene and Join filed by David A. Christenson. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file DENIED. Received after motion to intervene was denied" Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 02/27/2018. (jf)
February 22, 2018 27 LEAVE TO FILE DENIED- Eighth Supplemental Motion to Intervene and Join filed by David Andrew Christenson. This document is unavailable as the Court denied its filing. "Leave to file DENIED. Intervention motion has been denied" Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 02/22/2018. (jf)
February 21, 2018 26 Featured Case ORDER. David Andrew Christenson's 15 motion to intervene is hereby DENIED. See Order for details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/21/2018. (lcabj2)
February 20, 2018 MINUTE ORDER granting 25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants must file their reply by March 2, 2018. SO ORDERED. (lcabj2)
February 20, 2018 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted by ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, ROD ROSENSTEIN, U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwei, Daniel)
February 16, 2018 24 Memorandum in opposition to re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted filed by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Downing, Kevin)
February 14, 2018 22 Featured Case ORDER. Freedom Watch, Inc.'s 9 Motion to Intervene is hereby DENIED. See Order for details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 2/14/2018. (lcabj2)
February 13, 2018 23 ERRATA re 17 Supplemental Memorandum, filed by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON. "Leave to file GRANTED. Leave to file under seal denied since original pleading was not sealed" signed by Judge Amy B. Jackson on 02/13/2018 (jf)
February 13, 2018 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 19 Memorandum in opposition to re 15 MOTION to Intervene by ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, ROD ROSENSTEIN, U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE . (Motgi, Anjali) Modified on 2/14/2018 to add docket link (jf).
February 13, 2018 19 Memorandum in opposition to re 15 MOTION to Intervene filed by ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, ROD ROSENSTEIN, U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Motgi, Anjali)
February 12, 2018 20 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) "Leave to file GRANTED. File as a Motion for Protective Order" signed by Judge Amy B. Jackson on 02/12/2018(zjf)
February 6, 2018 18 Memorandum in opposition to re 9 MOTION to Intervene filed by ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, ROD ROSENSTEIN, U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwei, Daniel)
February 2, 2018 17 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM in support re 15 MOTION to Intervene filed by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON. "Leave to file granted. Docket as Supplemental Memo in support of Motion to Intervene," signed by Amy B. Jackson on 02/02/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(jf) Modified on 2/6/2018 (znmw).
February 2, 2018 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted by ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, ROD ROSENSTEIN, U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit - Rosenstein Testimony, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwei, Daniel)
January 26, 2018 15 MOTION to Intervene and Join by DAVID ANDREW CHRISTENSON (td)
January 24, 2018 14 ERRATA by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR 3 Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Proof of Service for Attorney General Sessions)(Downing, Kevin)
January 24, 2018 13 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ROD ROSENSTEIN served on 1/23/2018 (Downing, Kevin)
January 24, 2018 12 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ROBERT S. MUELLER, III served on 1/22/2018 (Downing, Kevin) Modified date of service on 1/25/2018 (znmw).
January 24, 2018 11 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 1/23/2018 (Downing, Kevin)
January 24, 2018 10 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/23/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/24/2018. (Downing, Kevin)
January 23, 2018 9 MOTION to Intervene by FREEDOM WATCH, INC. (Klayman, Larry)
January 19, 2018 8 Case directly reassigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson by consent. Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr)
January 19, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Anjali Motgi on behalf of All Defendants (Motgi, Anjali)
January 19, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John Russell Tyler on behalf of All Defendants (Tyler, John)
January 19, 2018 5 NOTICE of Development in Pending Case by ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, ROD ROSENSTEIN, U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Schwei, Daniel)
January 19, 2018 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Stephen Garrett Schwei on behalf of All Defendants (Schwei, Daniel)
January 17, 2018 3 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 01/17/18. (Downing, Kevin)
January 3, 2018 2 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to ROBERT S. MUELLER, III, ROD ROSENSTEIN, U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(sth)
January 3, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (sth)
January 3, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5271681) filed by PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Appointment Order, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Indictment, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons (DOJ), # 5 Summons (Liu), # 6 Summons (Mueller), # 7 Summons (Rosenstein), # 8 Summons (Sessions))(Downing, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MANAFORT v. U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Anjali Motgi(Designation Assistant U.S. Attorney)
Represented By: Daniel Stephen Garrett Schwei(Designation Assistant U.S. Attorney)
Represented By: John Russell Tyler(Designation Assistant U.S. Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROD ROSENSTEIN
Represented By: Anjali Motgi(Designation Assistant U.S. Attorney)
Represented By: Daniel Stephen Garrett Schwei(Designation Assistant U.S. Attorney)
Represented By: John Russell Tyler(Designation Assistant U.S. Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT S. MUELLER, III
Represented By: Anjali Motgi(Designation Assistant U.S. Attorney)
Represented By: Daniel Stephen Garrett Schwei(Designation Assistant U.S. Attorney)
Represented By: John Russell Tyler(Designation Assistant U.S. Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL J. MANAFORT, JR.
Represented By: Kevin M. Downing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?