JONES v. CAMPBELL UNIVERSITY et al

Plaintiff: AMOS N. JONES
Defendant: ROBERT COGSWELL, JOHN BRADLEY CREED, J. RICH LEONARD, CATHOLIC UNIVERSITY OF AMERICA, CAMPBELL UNIVERSITY, SUSAN THROWER and TIMOTHY ZINNECKER
Case Number: 1:2018cv00321
Filed: February 12, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 46 Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re #45 Order on Motion to Alter Judgment, ;USCA Case Number 18-7125. (ztd)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order 45 OPINION and ORDER amending #35 Court's Order granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and granting Defendants' Motion for Sanctions in Case No. 18-mc-100. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 09/04/2018. (lccrc1) Modified on 9/4/2018 (zlsj).
August 23, 2018 44 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to CAMPBELL UNIVERSITY, ROBERT COGSWELL, JOHN BRADLEY CREED, J. RICH LEONARD, SUSAN THROWER, TIMOTHY ZINNECKER. Attorney Zachary Stevens Stinson terminated. (Stinson, Zachary)
August 23, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Christopher R. Cooper: Motion Hearing held on 8/23/2018 re #28 MOTION for Sanctions Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11 and #38 MOTION to Alter Judgment as to #36 Memorandum & Opinion. Oral arguments heard from both sides and motions taken under advisement. Order forthcoming from chambers. (Court Reporter: Elizabeth Saint-Loth.) (jl)
August 13, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 8/23/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (lsj)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: It is ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a hearing on #28 Defendants' motion for sanctions and #38 Plaintiff's motion to alter or amend the judgment on August 23, 2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27A. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/13/2018. (lccrc1)
August 10, 2018 43 REPLY to opposition to motion re #38 MOTION to Alter Judgment as to #36 Memorandum & Opinion, #35 Order on Motion to Strike,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,,,,,, Order on Motion to Transfer Case,,, filed by AMOS N. JONES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Communications with EEOC, #2 Exhibit B. Right to Sue from EEOC)(Dhali, Arinderjit)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order 42 ORDER of USCA ORDERED, on the court's own motion, that this case be held in abeyance pending the district court's resolution of appellants motion to alter judgment filed on July 26, 2018 as to #39 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by AMOS N. JONES. USCA Case Number 18-7125. (zrdj)
August 3, 2018 41 RESPONSE re #38 MOTION to Alter Judgment as to #36 Memorandum & Opinion, #35 Order on Motion to Strike,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,,,,,, Order on Motion to Transfer Case,,, filed by CAMPBELL UNIVERSITY, ROBERT COGSWELL, JOHN BRADLEY CREED, TIMOTHY ZINNECKER. (Calabro, Regina)
August 1, 2018 USCA Case Number 18-7125 for #39 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by AMOS N. JONES. (zrdj)
July 28, 2018 40 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re #39 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (jf)
July 27, 2018 39 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT by AMOS N. JONES. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-5608877. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Dhali, Arinderjit)
July 26, 2018 38 MOTION to Alter Judgment as to #36 Memorandum & Opinion, #35 Order on Motion to Strike,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,,,,,, Order on Motion to Transfer Case,,, by AMOS N. JONES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dhali, Arinderjit) Modified on 8/1/2018 (znmw).
July 26, 2018 Case Remanded to Superior Court re #36 Memorandum & Opinion, #35 Order on Motion to Strike,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,,,,,, Order on Motion to Transfer Case,,, #37 Order. (ztd)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order 37 ORDER directing opening of miscellaneous case. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 7/25/2018. (lccrc1)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order 36 MEMORANDUM OPINION re #35 Order. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/29/2018. (lccrc1)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order 35 ORDER granting #18 and #22 the Campbell defendants' motions to dismiss Plaintiff's amended complaint; denying #27 Defendants' motion to strike Plaintiff's opposition; denying as moot #8 , #11 , and #17 ; and remanding Count Eleven of Plaintiff's amended complaint to D.C. Superior Court. See full Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/29/2018. (lccrc1)
June 21, 2018 34 REPLY to opposition to motion re #28 MOTION for Sanctions Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11 filed by CAMPBELL UNIVERSITY, ROBERT COGSWELL, JOHN BRADLEY CREED, TIMOTHY ZINNECKER. (Stinson, Zachary)
June 20, 2018 33 REPLY in further support of re #27 MOTION to Strike #23 Response to motion, filed by CAMPBELL UNIVERSITY, ROBERT COGSWELL, JOHN BRADLEY CREED, TIMOTHY ZINNECKER. (Stinson, Zachary) Modified text on 6/21/2018 (ztd).
June 14, 2018 32 RESPONSE re #28 MOTION for Sanctions Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11 filed by AMOS N. JONES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Dhali, Arinderjit)
June 13, 2018 31 RESPONSE re #27 MOTION to Strike #23 Response to motion, filed by AMOS N. JONES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Dhali, Arinderjit)
June 8, 2018 30 REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Effect Service of Process and for Lack of Personal Jurisidction and Incorporated Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by J. RICH LEONARD, SUSAN THROWER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Stinson, Zachary) Modified text event on 6/13/2018 (ztd).
June 1, 2018 29 RESPONSE re #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Effect Service of Process and for Lack of Personal Jurisidction and Incorporated Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by AMOS N. JONES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. USPS Receipt 1/19/18, #2 Exhibit B. Email from Stinson, #3 Exhibit C. USPS Tracking Judge Leonard, #4 Exhibit D. USPS Tracking Thrower, #5 Exhibit E. DDC Docket Sheet)(Dhali, Arinderjit)
May 31, 2018 28 MOTION for Sanctions Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11 by CAMPBELL UNIVERSITY, ROBERT COGSWELL, JOHN BRADLEY CREED, TIMOTHY ZINNECKER (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Stinson, Zachary)
May 30, 2018 27 MOTION to Strike #23 Response to motion, by CAMPBELL UNIVERSITY, ROBERT COGSWELL, JOHN BRADLEY CREED, TIMOTHY ZINNECKER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Stinson, Zachary)
May 30, 2018 NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re #26 MOTION to Strike #23 Response to motion, was entered in error at the request of counsel and will be refiled. (jf)
May 29, 2018 26 ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION to Strike #23 Response to motion, by CAMPBELL UNIVERSITY, ROBERT COGSWELL, JOHN BRADLEY CREED, TIMOTHY ZINNECKER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Stinson, Zachary) Modified on 5/30/2018 (zjf).
May 25, 2018 25 ERRATA by J. RICH LEONARD, SUSAN THROWER #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Effect Service of Process and for Lack of Personal Jurisidction and Incorporated Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by J. RICH LEONARD, SUSAN THROWER. (Stinson, Zachary)
May 25, 2018 24 REPLY to opposition to motion re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Effect Service of Process and for Lack of Personal Jurisidction and Incorporated Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by CAMPBELL UNIVERSITY, ROBERT COGSWELL, JOHN BRADLEY CREED, J. RICH LEONARD, SUSAN THROWER, TIMOTHY ZINNECKER. (Stinson, Zachary) Modified to correct linkage on 5/29/2018 (ztd).
May 18, 2018 23 RESPONSE re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue MOTION to Transfer Case filed by AMOS N. JONES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Judge Leonard Campbell University Bio, #2 Exhibit B. Judge Leonard Wikipedia Bio)(Dhali, Arinderjit)
May 18, 2018 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Effect Service of Process and for Lack of Personal Jurisidction and Incorporated Memorandum of Points and Authorities by J. RICH LEONARD, SUSAN THROWER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Stinson, Zachary)
May 4, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's opposition due by 5/18/2018 (lsj)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #21 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition. Plaintiff's opposition is due by May 18, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 5/4/2018. (lccrc1)
May 3, 2018 21 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue MOTION to Transfer Case by AMOS N. JONES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dhali, Arinderjit)
April 30, 2018 20 REPLY to opposition to motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by CATHOLIC UNIVERSITY OF AMERICA. (McCally, Thomas)
April 23, 2018 19 RESPONSE re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by AMOS N. JONES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. AAUP Termination & Discipline Presentation Paper, #2 Exhibit B. Letter to CUA)(Dhali, Arinderjit)
April 20, 2018 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue by CAMPBELL UNIVERSITY, ROBERT COGSWELL, JOHN BRADLEY CREED, TIMOTHY ZINNECKER (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Stinson, Zachary). Added MOTION to Transfer Case on 4/23/2018 (td).
April 9, 2018 17 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by CATHOLIC UNIVERSITY OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McCally, Thomas)
April 5, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to Amended Complaint due by 4/23/2018 (lsj)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting nunc pro tunc #13 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint. An #14 amended complaint was filed March 26, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/5/2018. (lccrc1)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #16 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Defendants' response is due by April 23, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/5/2018. (lccrc1)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #12 motion to admit Regina W. Calabro pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/5/2018. (lccrc1)
April 3, 2018 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by CAMPBELL UNIVERSITY, ROBERT COGSWELL, JOHN BRADLEY CREED, TIMOTHY ZINNECKER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Stinson, Zachary)
March 26, 2018 15 NOTICE of Plaintiff's 1st Amended Complaint by AMOS N. JONES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's 1st Amended Complaint)(Dhali, Arinderjit)
March 26, 2018 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by AMOS N. JONES.(Dhali, Arinderjit)
March 5, 2018 13 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #8 MOTION to Dismiss by AMOS N. JONES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dhali, Arinderjit)
March 5, 2018 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Regina W. Calabro, :Firm- Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C., :Address- 4208 Six Forks Road, Suite 1100, Raleigh, NC 27609. Phone No. - (919) 789-3178. Fax No. - (919) 783-9412 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5358873. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CAMPBELL UNIVERSITY, ROBERT COGSWELL, JOHN BRADLEY CREED, TIMOTHY ZINNECKER (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Stinson, Zachary)
March 5, 2018 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by CAMPBELL UNIVERSITY, ROBERT COGSWELL, JOHN BRADLEY CREED, TIMOTHY ZINNECKER (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Meorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Declaration of James O. Roberts, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Declaration of J. Bradley Creed, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Declaration of Robert Cogswell, #5 Exhibit Ex. 4 - Declaration of Timothy R. Zinnecker, #6 Exhibit Ex. 5 - Letter to Creed from Levy, #7 Exhibit Ex. 6 - Letter to Levy from Calabro, #8 Exhibit Ex. 7 - EEOC Intake Questionnaire, #9 Exhibit Ex. 8 - A. Jones' Voter Registration, #10 Exhibit Ex. 9 - Judicial Caseload Profile, #11 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Stinson, Zachary)
February 27, 2018 10 Receipt on 02/27/2018 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 17ca8331. (jf)
February 23, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Joseph Murphy on behalf of CAMPBELL UNIVERSITY, ROBERT COGSWELL, JOHN BRADLEY CREED, TIMOTHY ZINNECKER (Murphy, Michael)
February 16, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 3/5/2018. (znbn)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' answer or other response is due by March 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/16/2018. (lccrc1)
February 16, 2018 8 MOTION to Dismiss by CATHOLIC UNIVERSITY OF AMERICA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McCally, Thomas)
February 15, 2018 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by CAMPBELL UNIVERSITY, ROBERT COGSWELL, JOHN BRADLEY CREED, TIMOTHY ZINNECKER (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Stinson, Zachary)
February 14, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L. McCally on behalf of CATHOLIC UNIVERSITY OF AMERICA (McCally, Thomas)
February 12, 2018 5 NOTICE to Counsel/Party. (zsth)
February 12, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsth)
February 12, 2018 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CAMPBELL UNIVERSITY. (Stinson, Zachary)
February 12, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Stevens Stinson on behalf of CAMPBELL UNIVERSITY, ROBERT COGSWELL, JOHN BRADLEY CREED, TIMOTHY ZINNECKER (Stinson, Zachary)
February 12, 2018 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Stevens Stinson on behalf of CAMPBELL UNIVERSITY, ROBERT COGSWELL, JOHN BRADLEY CREED, TIMOTHY ZINNECKER (Stinson, Zachary)
February 12, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 17ca8331 Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-5328516 filed by TIMOTHY ZINNECKER, JOHN BRADLEY CREED, CAMPBELL UNIVERSITY, ROBERT COGSWELL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Stinson, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JONES v. CAMPBELL UNIVERSITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT COGSWELL
Represented By: Zachary Stevens Stinson
Represented By: Regina W. Calabro
Represented By: Michael Joseph Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN BRADLEY CREED
Represented By: Zachary Stevens Stinson
Represented By: Regina W. Calabro
Represented By: Michael Joseph Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. RICH LEONARD
Represented By: Zachary Stevens Stinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATHOLIC UNIVERSITY OF AMERICA
Represented By: Thomas L. McCally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMPBELL UNIVERSITY
Represented By: Zachary Stevens Stinson
Represented By: Regina W. Calabro
Represented By: Michael Joseph Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN THROWER
Represented By: Zachary Stevens Stinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY ZINNECKER
Represented By: Zachary Stevens Stinson
Represented By: Regina W. Calabro
Represented By: Michael Joseph Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMOS N. JONES
Represented By: Arinderjit Dhali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?