HALL v. NIELSEN

Plaintiff: STEVEN H. HALL
Defendant: KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN
Case Number: 1:2018cv00461
Filed: February 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: James E. Boasberg
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 29:791
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 57 Order. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/11/2019. (lcjeb2)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 50 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/17/2019. (lcjeb3)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 35 Order. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/8/2018. (lcjeb2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HALL v. NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN H. HALL
Represented By: Glenn H. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?