STATE OF NEW YORK et al v. E. SCOTT PRUITT et al Featured Case

Seventeen states and the District of Columbia have filed a lawsuit against the Trump administration over the rollback of car emissions rules. The plaintiff states allege that the Environmental Protection Agency's weakening of auto emissions rules is unlawful and violates the agency's own rules.

Plaintiff: STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF IOWA, STATE OF MAINE, STATE OF MARYLAND, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF OREGON, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF WASHINGTON, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA and CITY OF CHICAGO
Defendant: E. SCOTT PRUITT and UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Case Number: 1:2018cv00773
Filed: April 5, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Reggie B. Walton
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:7604
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 18, 2018 36 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Regarding Discovery Procedure)(Costello, Morgan)
September 12, 2018 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Turner H. Smith on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Smith, Turner)
September 7, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/18/2018 (hs)
September 7, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant's 34 Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline for Submitting Joint Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that this motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file their joint report on or before September 18, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on September 7, 2018. (lcrbw1)
September 7, 2018 34 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Report by E. SCOTT PRUITT, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gange, Heather)
August 20, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 9/11/2018 Initial Conference set for 9/27/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 16 before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (hs)
August 20, 2018 33 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 32 Joint Motion to Modify Minute Order of July 31, 2018, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that this motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that this case is not exempt under Local Rule 16.3(b). It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint report on or before September 11, 2018. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall appear for an Initial Scheduling Conference on September 27, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. See attached Order for additional details and requirements. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 20, 2018. (lcrbw1)
August 20, 2018 32 Joint MOTION to Modify Minute Order of July 31, 2018 by CITY OF CHICAGO, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, ENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE FUND, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF IOWA, STATE OF MAINE, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF WASHINGTON (Costello, Morgan)
August 8, 2018 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Leah J. Tulin on behalf of STATE OF MARYLAND (Tulin, Leah) (Main Document 31 replaced on 8/15/2018) (znmw).
August 1, 2018 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald Donohue Reid on behalf of STATE OF MAINE (Reid, Gerald)
July 31, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 8/21/2018 (hs)
July 31, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. To ensure the expeditious resolution of this action, and because this qualifies as an exempted case under Local Civil Rule 16.3(b), it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed briefing schedule governing the filing of dispositive motions on or before August 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 31, 2018. (lcrbw1)
July 31, 2018 29 ANSWER to Complaint re 1 Complaint and 20 Intervenor Complaint by E. SCOTT PRUITT, ENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE FUND, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Gange, Heather) Modified to add links on 8/8/2018 (znmw).
July 31, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered the District of Columbia's 28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Court's rules, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Jared Policicchio, City of Chicago Department of Law, 30 North LaSalle Street, Suite 1400, Chicago, IL 60647, is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 31, 2018. (lcrbw1)
July 25, 2018 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jared Policicchio, :Firm- City of Chicago Corporatnio Counsel, :Address- 30 N. LaSalle Street, Suite 1400, Chicago, IL 60602. Phone No. - 312-744-1438. Fax No. - 312-744-3588 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5604912. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Rock, Jimmy)
July 3, 2018 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Myers on behalf of STATE OF NEW YORK (Myers, Michael)
June 20, 2018 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Kavita Paul Lesser on behalf of STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Lesser, Kavita) (Main Document 26 replaced on 6/21/2018) (ztd).
June 19, 2018 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas F. Persampieri on behalf of STATE OF VERMONT (Persampieri, Nicholas) (Main Document 25 replaced on 6/20/2018) (ztd).
June 13, 2018 24 NOTICE of Appearance by William Gregory Grantham on behalf of STATE OF NEW MEXICO (Grantham, William)
June 8, 2018 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Katharine Goold Shirey on behalf of STATE OF WASHINGTON (Shirey, Katharine)
June 6, 2018 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Charles Mulcahy on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS (Mulcahy, Peter)
June 6, 2018 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa A. Hoffer on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS (Hoffer, Melissa)
May 30, 2018 20 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT against E. SCOTT PRUITT, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by ENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE FUND.(Weaver, Susannah) Modified event title on 6/7/2018 (znmw).
May 29, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Complaint due by 6/1/2018. Omnibus Response due by 7/31/2018 (hs)
May 29, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of 18 Environmental Defense Fund's Unopposed Motion to Intervene as Plaintiff, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that this motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Environmental Defense Fund is permitted to intervene as a plaintiff. It is further ORDERED that the Environmental Defense Fund shall file its complaint on or before June 1, 2018. It is further ORDERED that the defendants shall file their omnibus response to the states' and local governments' complaint and the Environmental Defense Fund's complaint on or before July 31, 2018. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 29, 2018. (lcrbw1)
May 25, 2018 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE FUND. (Weaver, Susannah)
May 25, 2018 18 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene as Plaintiff by ENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE FUND (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Supplement Proposed Complaint)(Weaver, Susannah)
May 25, 2018 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Hoe Donahue on behalf of ENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE FUND (Donahue, Sean)
May 25, 2018 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Susannah Landes Foster Weaver on behalf of ENVIRONMENTAL DEFENSE FUND (Weaver, Susannah)
May 24, 2018 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather E. Gange on behalf of All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Gange, Heather)
May 21, 2018 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Larson on behalf of STATE OF IOWA (Larson, Jacob)
May 9, 2018 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael John Fischer on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Familiarity)(Fischer, Michael)
May 4, 2018 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill N. Lacedonia on behalf of STATE OF CONNECTICUT (Lacedonia, Jill) (Main Document 12 replaced on 5/7/2018) (ztd).
May 4, 2018 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Martin Lucas on behalf of STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Lucas, Daniel)
May 2, 2018 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Eugene Sullivan on behalf of STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Sullivan, Timothy) (Main Document 10 replaced on 5/2/2018) (ztd).
May 2, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald Thomas Karr on behalf of STATE OF ILLINOIS (Karr, Gerald) (Main Document 9 replaced on 5/2/2018) (ztd).
April 27, 2018 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Andrew Garrahan on behalf of STATE OF OREGON (Garrahan, Paul) (Main Document 8 replaced on 4/30/2018) (znmw).
April 25, 2018 7 Featured Case GENERAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on April 25, 2018. (lcrbw1)
April 25, 2018 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/18/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/17/2018. (Costello, Morgan)
April 25, 2018 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/18/2018. (Costello, Morgan)
April 25, 2018 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. E. SCOTT PRUITT served on 4/17/2018; UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 4/17/2018 (Costello, Morgan)
April 18, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan Anna Costello on behalf of STATE OF NEW YORK (Costello, Morgan)
April 10, 2018 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to E. SCOTT PRUITT, UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(jd)
April 9, 2018 Filing fee received: $ 400, Receipt Number: 4616090409. (jd)
April 5, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (jd)
April 5, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by STATE OF NEW YORK. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(Gore, Christopher) (Attachment 1 replaced on 4/6/2018) (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STATE OF NEW YORK et al v. E. SCOTT PRUITT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Morgan Anna Costello
Represented By: Christopher Charles Gore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF CALIFORNIA
Represented By: Daniel Martin Lucas
Represented By: Timothy Eugene Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF CONNECTICUT
Represented By: Jill N. Lacedonia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF ILLINOIS
Represented By: Gerald Thomas Karr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF IOWA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF MAINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF MARYLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF NEW MEXICO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF OREGON
Represented By: Paul Andrew Garrahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF RHODE ISLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF VERMONT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE OF WASHINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITY OF CHICAGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. SCOTT PRUITT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?