FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: REEDLEY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, PORTLAND ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - PLYMOUTH, INC., SAN JOAQUIN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ARMC, L.P., HH KILLEEN HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC (HARKER HEIGHTS), SIMI VALLEY HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES, BAYSTATE WING HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BAYSTATE NOBLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BAYSTATE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., FEATHER RIVER HOSPITAL, AFFINITY HOSPITAL, LLC, GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, WOMEN & INFANTS HOSPITAL OF RHODE ISLAND, BAYSTATE FRANKLIN MEDICAL CENTER, TOPEKA HOSPITAL, LLC, LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., AHS SOUTHCREST HOSPITAL, LLC, BERWICK HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, PASACK VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC, BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS MEDICAL CENTER, INC., MONTCLAIR HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS PRYOR HOSPITAL, LLC, TULSA SPINE AND SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, LLC, ST. HELENA HOSPITAL, BILOXI HMA, LLC, POCATELLO HOSPITAL, LLC, UKIAH ADVENTIST HOSPITAL, KENT COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - MILTON, INC., HANFORD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, CASTLE MEDICAL CENTER, AHS HENRYETTA HOSPITAL, LLC, BAY COUNTY HEALTH, LLC, WHITE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, PHYSICIANS SURGICAL HOSPITALS, LLC, AHS HILLCREST MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, SONORA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, AHS CUSHING HOSPITAL, LLC, BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, BSA HOSPITAL, LLC, FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - NEEDHAM, INC., LODI MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, INC., BAILEY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, BILOXI HMA, LLC doing business as MERIT HEALTH BILOXI, AHS SOUTHCREST HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as HILLCREST HOSPITAL SOUTH, HH KILLEEN HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC (HARKER HEIGHTS) doing business as SETON MEDICAL CENTER HARKER HEIGHTS, FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER doing business as COMMUNITY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAYSTATE NOBLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION doing business as BAYSTATE NOBLE HOSPITAL, HANFORD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL doing business as ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER - HANFORD doing business as ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER - SELMA, LODI MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, INC. doing business as LODI MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. doing business as LOVELACE WOMEN'S HOSPITAL, AHS PRYOR HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as HILLCREST HOSPITAL PRYOR, REEDLEY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL doing business as ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER - REEDLEY, SONORA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL doing business as SONORA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, AHS HILLCREST MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as HILLCREST MEDICAL CENTER, ST. HELENA HOSPITAL doing business as ST. HELENA HOSPITAL NAPA VALLEY, TULSA SPINE AND SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as TULSA SPINE AND SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as HILLCREST HOSPITAL CLAREMORE, LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. doing business as LOVELACE REGIONAL HOSPITAL - ROSWELL, BAYSTATE WING HOSPITAL CORPORATION doing business as BAYSTATE WING HOSPITAL, BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as BAYFRONT HEALTH PUNTA GORDA, ARMC, L.P. doing business as ABILENE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BERWICK HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC doing business as BERWICK HOSPITAL CENTER, LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. doing business as LOVELACE WESTSIDE HOSPITAL, AFFINITY HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as GRANDVIEW MEDICAL CENTER, PORTLAND ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER doing business as ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER - PORTLAND, BAILEY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as BAILEY MEDICAL CENTER, BAY COUNTY HEALTH, LLC doing business as BAY MEDICAL CENTER, AHS HENRYETTA HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as HILLCREST HOSPITAL HENRYETTA, TOPEKA HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as THE UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HEALTH SYSTEM, ST. FRANCIS CAMPUS, LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. doing business as LOVELACE MEDICAL CENTER - DOWNTOWN, AHS CUSHING HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as HILLCREST HOSPITAL CUSHING, BSA HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as BAPTIST ST. ANTHONY'S HOSPITAL, POCATELLO HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as PORTNEUF MEDICAL CENTER, PASACK VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as HACKENSACK UMC AT PASACK VALLEY, UKIAH ADVENTIST HOSPITAL doing business as UKIAH VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, PHYSICIANS SURGICAL HOSPITALS, LLC doing business as PHYSICIANS SURGICAL HOSPITAL, MONTCLAIR HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as MOUNTAINSIDE HOSPITAL, FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER doing business as CLOVIS COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTER, SIMI VALLEY HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES doing business as SIMI VALLEY HOSPITAL, O'CONNOR HOSPITAL, WEST VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as WEST VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, ST. LOUISE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, WATERTOWN MEDICAL CENTER LLC doing business as WATERTOWN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC doing business as CENTENNIAL HILLS HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER and WEST BOCA MEDICAL CENTER, INC doing business as WEST BOCA MEDICAL CENTER
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2018cv00867
Filed: April 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 USCA Case Number 19-5254 for #30 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by TOPEKA HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS HILLCREST MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, KENT COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SONORA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, AHS PRYOR HOSPITAL, LLC, SIMI VALLEY HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES, FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, PORTLAND ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - MILTON, INC., BILOXI HMA, LLC, BAYSTATE FRANKLIN MEDICAL CENTER, WHITE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS MEDICAL CENTER, INC., PASACK VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC, LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., WEST VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BERWICK HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, AHS HENRYETTA HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, UKIAH ADVENTIST HOSPITAL, HH KILLEEN HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC (HARKER HEIGHTS), ST. LOUISE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, ST. HELENA HOSPITAL, BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - NEEDHAM, INC., TULSA SPINE AND SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, LLC, HANFORD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ARMC, L.P., FEATHER RIVER HOSPITAL, VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, O'CONNOR HOSPITAL, BAYSTATE NOBLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, AHS SOUTHCREST HOSPITAL, LLC, SAN JOAQUIN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, REEDLEY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, BSA HOSPITAL, LLC, BAYSTATE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, AFFINITY HOSPITAL, LLC, WOMEN & INFANTS HOSPITAL OF RHODE ISLAND, BAY COUNTY HEALTH, LLC, MONTCLAIR HOSPITAL, LLC, BAYSTATE WING HOSPITAL CORPORATION, POCATELLO HOSPITAL, LLC, BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - PLYMOUTH, INC., GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, AHS CUSHING HOSPITAL, LLC, CASTLE MEDICAL CENTER, WEST BOCA MEDICAL CENTER, INC, PHYSICIANS SURGICAL HOSPITALS, LLC, BAILEY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, WATERTOWN MEDICAL CENTER LLC, LODI MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, INC. (zrdj)
September 20, 2019 Filing 31 Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date 9/19/19 re #30 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court,,,,,,,. (ztd)
September 19, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to #29 Order by AFFINITY HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS CUSHING HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS HENRYETTA HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS HILLCREST MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, AHS PRYOR HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS SOUTHCREST HOSPITAL, LLC, ARMC, L.P., BAILEY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, BAY COUNTY HEALTH, LLC, BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, BAYSTATE FRANKLIN MEDICAL CENTER, BAYSTATE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BAYSTATE NOBLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BAYSTATE WING HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BERWICK HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - MILTON, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - NEEDHAM, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - PLYMOUTH, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BILOXI HMA, LLC, BSA HOSPITAL, LLC, CASTLE MEDICAL CENTER, FEATHER RIVER HOSPITAL, FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, HANFORD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, HH KILLEEN HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC (HARKER HEIGHTS), KENT COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LODI MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, INC., LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., MONTCLAIR HOSPITAL, LLC, O'CONNOR HOSPITAL, PASACK VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC, PHYSICIANS SURGICAL HOSPITALS, LLC, POCATELLO HOSPITAL, LLC, PORTLAND ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, REEDLEY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SAN JOAQUIN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SIMI VALLEY HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES, SONORA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ST. HELENA HOSPITAL, ST. LOUISE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, TOPEKA HOSPITAL, LLC, TULSA SPINE AND SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, LLC, UKIAH ADVENTIST HOSPITAL, VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, WATERTOWN MEDICAL CENTER LLC, WEST BOCA MEDICAL CENTER, INC, WEST VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, INC., WHITE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, WOMEN & INFANTS HOSPITAL OF RHODE ISLAND. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-6388435. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Roth, Robert)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8-19-2019. (lcckk3)
August 16, 2019 Filing 28 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF REMAINING CLAIMS by AFFINITY HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS CUSHING HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS HENRYETTA HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS HILLCREST MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, AHS PRYOR HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS SOUTHCREST HOSPITAL, LLC, ARMC, L.P., BAILEY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, BAY COUNTY HEALTH, LLC, BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, BAYSTATE FRANKLIN MEDICAL CENTER, BAYSTATE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BAYSTATE NOBLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BAYSTATE WING HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BERWICK HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - MILTON, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - NEEDHAM, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - PLYMOUTH, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BILOXI HMA, LLC, BSA HOSPITAL, LLC, CASTLE MEDICAL CENTER, FEATHER RIVER HOSPITAL, FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, HANFORD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, HH KILLEEN HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC (HARKER HEIGHTS), KENT COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LODI MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, INC., LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., MONTCLAIR HOSPITAL, LLC, O'CONNOR HOSPITAL, PASACK VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC, PHYSICIANS SURGICAL HOSPITALS, LLC, POCATELLO HOSPITAL, LLC, PORTLAND ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, REEDLEY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SAN JOAQUIN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SIMI VALLEY HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES, SONORA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ST. HELENA HOSPITAL, ST. LOUISE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, TOPEKA HOSPITAL, LLC, TULSA SPINE AND SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, LLC, UKIAH ADVENTIST HOSPITAL, VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, WATERTOWN MEDICAL CENTER LLC, WEST BOCA MEDICAL CENTER, INC, WEST VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, INC., WHITE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, WOMEN & INFANTS HOSPITAL OF RHODE ISLAND. (Roth, Robert)
August 5, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' Response and Reply due by 8/16/2019. Defendant's Reply due by 8/30/2019. (dot)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' #27 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Response and Reply and Defendant's Reply to Cross- Motions for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs' Response and Reply is currently due August 6, 2019 and Defendant's Reply is currently due August 20, 2019. Plaintiffs are requesting an extension as the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services recently released the 2020 IPPS Final Rule and Plaintiffs require additional time to determine whether or not that Rule has any impact on this litigation. Plaintiffs' Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' Response and Reply is due AUGUST 16, 2019. Defendant's Reply is due AUGUST 30, 2019. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8-5-2019. (lcckk3)
August 2, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by AFFINITY HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS CUSHING HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS HENRYETTA HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS HILLCREST MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, AHS PRYOR HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS SOUTHCREST HOSPITAL, LLC, ARMC, L.P., BAILEY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, BAY COUNTY HEALTH, LLC, BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, BAYSTATE FRANKLIN MEDICAL CENTER, BAYSTATE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BAYSTATE NOBLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BAYSTATE WING HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BERWICK HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - MILTON, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - NEEDHAM, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - PLYMOUTH, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BILOXI HMA, LLC, BSA HOSPITAL, LLC, CASTLE MEDICAL CENTER, FEATHER RIVER HOSPITAL, FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, HANFORD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, HH KILLEEN HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC (HARKER HEIGHTS), KENT COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LODI MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, INC., LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., MONTCLAIR HOSPITAL, LLC, O'CONNOR HOSPITAL, PASACK VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC, PHYSICIANS SURGICAL HOSPITALS, LLC, POCATELLO HOSPITAL, LLC, PORTLAND ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, REEDLEY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SAN JOAQUIN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SIMI VALLEY HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES, SONORA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ST. HELENA HOSPITAL, ST. LOUISE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, TOPEKA HOSPITAL, LLC, TULSA SPINE AND SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, LLC, UKIAH ADVENTIST HOSPITAL, VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, WATERTOWN MEDICAL CENTER LLC, WEST BOCA MEDICAL CENTER, INC, WEST VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, INC., WHITE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, WOMEN & INFANTS HOSPITAL OF RHODE ISLAND (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roth, Robert)
July 19, 2019 Filing 26 Memorandum in opposition to re #24 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALEX M. AZAR, II. (Bennett, Michelle)
July 19, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, Michelle)
June 26, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment by AFFINITY HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS CUSHING HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS HENRYETTA HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS HILLCREST MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, AHS PRYOR HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS SOUTHCREST HOSPITAL, LLC, ARMC, L.P., BAILEY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, BAY COUNTY HEALTH, LLC, BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, BAYSTATE FRANKLIN MEDICAL CENTER, BAYSTATE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BAYSTATE NOBLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BAYSTATE WING HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BERWICK HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - MILTON, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - NEEDHAM, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - PLYMOUTH, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BILOXI HMA, LLC, BSA HOSPITAL, LLC, CASTLE MEDICAL CENTER, FEATHER RIVER HOSPITAL, FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, HANFORD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, HH KILLEEN HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC (HARKER HEIGHTS), KENT COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LODI MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, INC., LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., MONTCLAIR HOSPITAL, LLC, PASACK VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC, PHYSICIANS SURGICAL HOSPITALS, LLC, POCATELLO HOSPITAL, LLC, PORTLAND ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, REEDLEY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SAN JOAQUIN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SIMI VALLEY HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES, SONORA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ST. HELENA HOSPITAL, TOPEKA HOSPITAL, LLC, TULSA SPINE AND SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, LLC, UKIAH ADVENTIST HOSPITAL, VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, WATERTOWN MEDICAL CENTER LLC, WEST BOCA MEDICAL CENTER, INC, WEST VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, INC., WHITE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, WOMEN & INFANTS HOSPITAL OF RHODE ISLAND (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pagonis, Katrina)
May 29, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Appendix due by 9/3/2019. Defendant's Cross Motion due by 7/19/2019. Response to Cross Motion due by 8/6/2019. Reply to Cross Motion due by 8/20/2019. Plaintiffs' Summary Judgment Motion due by 6/26/2019. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/19/2019. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/6/2019. (dot)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the parties' #23 Joint Statement. The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to file their Motion for Summary Judgment by JUNE 26, 2019 and Defendant to file its Opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by JULY 19, 2019. The Court further ORDERS Plaintiffs to file their Opposition and Reply by AUGUST 6, 2019 and Defendant to file its Reply by AUGUST 20, 2019. Finally, the parties are ORDERED to submit the Joint Appendix by SEPTEMBER 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/29/2019. (lcckk3)
May 23, 2019 Filing 23 MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Bennett, Michelle)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER dismissing Plaintiff Hospitals St. Louise Regional Hospital and OConnor Hospital. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/16/2019. (lcckk3)
May 16, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION of Dismissal of O'Connor Hospital and St. Louise Regional Hospital by AFFINITY HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS CUSHING HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS HENRYETTA HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS HILLCREST MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, AHS PRYOR HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS SOUTHCREST HOSPITAL, LLC, ARMC, L.P., BAILEY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, BAY COUNTY HEALTH, LLC, BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, BAYSTATE FRANKLIN MEDICAL CENTER, BAYSTATE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BAYSTATE NOBLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BAYSTATE WING HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BERWICK HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - MILTON, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - NEEDHAM, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - PLYMOUTH, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BILOXI HMA, LLC, BSA HOSPITAL, LLC, CASTLE MEDICAL CENTER, FEATHER RIVER HOSPITAL, FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, HANFORD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, HH KILLEEN HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC (HARKER HEIGHTS), KENT COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LODI MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, INC., LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., MONTCLAIR HOSPITAL, LLC, PASACK VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC, PHYSICIANS SURGICAL HOSPITALS, LLC, POCATELLO HOSPITAL, LLC, PORTLAND ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, REEDLEY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SAN JOAQUIN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SIMI VALLEY HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES, SONORA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ST. HELENA HOSPITAL, TOPEKA HOSPITAL, LLC, TULSA SPINE AND SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, LLC, UKIAH ADVENTIST HOSPITAL, VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, WATERTOWN MEDICAL CENTER LLC, WEST BOCA MEDICAL CENTER, INC, WEST VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, INC., WHITE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, WOMEN & INFANTS HOSPITAL OF RHODE ISLAND. (Roth, Robert)
April 9, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/30/2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 28A before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER FOR INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/9/2019. (lcckk3)
April 5, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by ALEX M. AZAR, II.(Bennett, Michelle)
February 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 4/5/2019. (dot)
February 28, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/28/2019. (lcckk3)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #7 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/28/2019. (lcckk3)
November 5, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ALEX M. AZAR, II. Case related to Case No. 1:18-cv-02262-TSC. (Bennett, Michelle)
October 5, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ALEX M. AZAR, II. Case related to Case No. 1:18-cv-01940-RDM. (Bennett, Michelle)
September 24, 2018 Filing 14 REPLY to opposition to motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by ALEX M. AZAR, II. (Bennett, Michelle)
September 10, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Reply to #7 due by 9/24/2018. (dot)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Defendant's #13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Reply in Support of his Motion to Dismiss. Defendant requests an extension up to and including September 24, 2018, to reply to his motion to dismiss because defense counsel is busy with other matters that did not exist when the parties previously filed their joint motion for an extension of time. The extension will allow defense counsel to prepare a reply brief in light of these other deadlines. This is the second request for an extension in this case, and Plaintiffs do not oppose it. Defendant's Motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall file a reply by no later than SEPTEMBER 24, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9-10-2018. (lcckk3)
September 10, 2018 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, Michelle)
August 31, 2018 Filing 12 Memorandum in opposition to re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by AFFINITY HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS CUSHING HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS HENRYETTA HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS HILLCREST MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, AHS PRYOR HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS SOUTHCREST HOSPITAL, LLC, ARMC, L.P., BAILEY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, BAY COUNTY HEALTH, LLC, BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, BAYSTATE FRANKLIN MEDICAL CENTER, BAYSTATE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BAYSTATE NOBLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BAYSTATE WING HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BERWICK HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - MILTON, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - NEEDHAM, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - PLYMOUTH, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BILOXI HMA, LLC, BSA HOSPITAL, LLC, CASTLE MEDICAL CENTER, FEATHER RIVER HOSPITAL, FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, HANFORD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, HH KILLEEN HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC (HARKER HEIGHTS), KENT COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LODI MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, INC., LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., MONTCLAIR HOSPITAL, LLC, PASACK VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC, PHYSICIANS SURGICAL HOSPITALS, LLC, POCATELLO HOSPITAL, LLC, PORTLAND ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, REEDLEY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SAN JOAQUIN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SIMI VALLEY HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES, SONORA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ST. HELENA HOSPITAL, TOPEKA HOSPITAL, LLC, TULSA SPINE AND SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, LLC, UKIAH ADVENTIST HOSPITAL, VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, WATERTOWN MEDICAL CENTER LLC, WEST BOCA MEDICAL CENTER, INC, WEST VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, INC., WHITE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, WOMEN & INFANTS HOSPITAL OF RHODE ISLAND. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pagonis, Katrina)
August 22, 2018 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Supplemental Declaration of Katrina A. Pagonis filed by AFFINITY HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS CUSHING HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS HENRYETTA HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS HILLCREST MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, AHS PRYOR HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS SOUTHCREST HOSPITAL, LLC, ARMC, L.P., BAILEY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, BAY COUNTY HEALTH, LLC, BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, BAYSTATE FRANKLIN MEDICAL CENTER, BAYSTATE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BAYSTATE NOBLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BAYSTATE WING HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BERWICK HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - MILTON, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - NEEDHAM, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - PLYMOUTH, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BILOXI HMA, LLC, BSA HOSPITAL, LLC, CASTLE MEDICAL CENTER, FEATHER RIVER HOSPITAL, FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, HANFORD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, HH KILLEEN HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC (HARKER HEIGHTS), KENT COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LODI MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, INC., LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., MONTCLAIR HOSPITAL, LLC, PASACK VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC, PHYSICIANS SURGICAL HOSPITALS, LLC, POCATELLO HOSPITAL, LLC, PORTLAND ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, REEDLEY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SAN JOAQUIN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SIMI VALLEY HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES, SONORA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ST. HELENA HOSPITAL, TOPEKA HOSPITAL, LLC, TULSA SPINE AND SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, LLC, UKIAH ADVENTIST HOSPITAL, VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, WATERTOWN MEDICAL CENTER LLC, WEST BOCA MEDICAL CENTER, INC, WEST VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, INC., WHITE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, WOMEN & INFANTS HOSPITAL OF RHODE ISLAND. (Roth, Robert)
August 15, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' Response to #7 due by 8/31/2018. Reply due by 9/14/2018. (dot)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the parties' #9 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Response and Defendant's Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Plaintiffs request an eleven-day extension of time to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction because Plaintiffs' counsel is busy with other matters. Defendant requests a seven-day extension to file its reply because defense counsel has a vacation scheduled in September. These are the first requests for extensions of these particular deadlines. The parties' Joint Motion is accordingly GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by AUGUST 31, 2018. Defendant shall file its Reply by no later than SEPTEMBER 14, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/15/2018. (lcckk3)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Katrina A. Pagonis, in order for her to appear as co-counsel for Plaintiffs, contingent on said attorney filing a declaration certifying familiarity with this Court's Local Rules by no later than AUGUST 22, 2018. Counsel shall promptly register for this Court's CM/ECF system. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/15/2018. (lcckk3)
August 14, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Katrina A. Pagonis, :Firm- Hooper, Lundy & Bookman, P.C., :Address- 575 Market Street, Suite 2300, San Francisco, CA 94105. Phone No. - 415-875-8515. Fax No. - 415-875-8519 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5639049. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AFFINITY HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS CUSHING HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS HENRYETTA HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS HILLCREST MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, AHS PRYOR HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS SOUTHCREST HOSPITAL, LLC, ARMC, L.P., BAILEY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, BAY COUNTY HEALTH, LLC, BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, BAYSTATE FRANKLIN MEDICAL CENTER, BAYSTATE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BAYSTATE NOBLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BAYSTATE WING HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BERWICK HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - MILTON, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - NEEDHAM, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - PLYMOUTH, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BILOXI HMA, LLC, BSA HOSPITAL, LLC, CASTLE MEDICAL CENTER, FEATHER RIVER HOSPITAL, FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, HANFORD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, HH KILLEEN HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC (HARKER HEIGHTS), KENT COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LODI MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, INC., LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., MONTCLAIR HOSPITAL, LLC, PASACK VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC, PHYSICIANS SURGICAL HOSPITALS, LLC, POCATELLO HOSPITAL, LLC, PORTLAND ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, REEDLEY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SAN JOAQUIN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SIMI VALLEY HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES, SONORA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ST. HELENA HOSPITAL, TOPEKA HOSPITAL, LLC, TULSA SPINE AND SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, LLC, UKIAH ADVENTIST HOSPITAL, VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, WATERTOWN MEDICAL CENTER LLC, WEST BOCA MEDICAL CENTER, INC, WEST VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, INC., WHITE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, WOMEN & INFANTS HOSPITAL OF RHODE ISLAND (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Katrina A. Pagonis, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Roth, Robert)
August 14, 2018 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by AFFINITY HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS CUSHING HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS HENRYETTA HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS HILLCREST MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, AHS PRYOR HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS SOUTHCREST HOSPITAL, LLC, ARMC, L.P., BAILEY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, BAY COUNTY HEALTH, LLC, BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, BAYSTATE FRANKLIN MEDICAL CENTER, BAYSTATE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BAYSTATE NOBLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BAYSTATE WING HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BERWICK HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - MILTON, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - NEEDHAM, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - PLYMOUTH, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BILOXI HMA, LLC, BSA HOSPITAL, LLC, CASTLE MEDICAL CENTER, FEATHER RIVER HOSPITAL, FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, HANFORD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, HH KILLEEN HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC (HARKER HEIGHTS), KENT COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LODI MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, INC., LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., MONTCLAIR HOSPITAL, LLC, PASACK VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC, PHYSICIANS SURGICAL HOSPITALS, LLC, POCATELLO HOSPITAL, LLC, PORTLAND ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, REEDLEY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SAN JOAQUIN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SIMI VALLEY HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES, SONORA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ST. HELENA HOSPITAL, TOPEKA HOSPITAL, LLC, TULSA SPINE AND SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, LLC, UKIAH ADVENTIST HOSPITAL, VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC, WATERTOWN MEDICAL CENTER LLC, WEST BOCA MEDICAL CENTER, INC, WEST VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, INC., WHITE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, WOMEN & INFANTS HOSPITAL OF RHODE ISLAND (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roth, Robert)
August 7, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiffs' Responses due by 8/20/2018. Defendant's Reply due by 8/27/2018. (dot)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Defendant's #7 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Plaintiffs shall file a response to this motion by no later than AUGUST 20, 2018. Defendant shall file a reply by no later than AUGUST 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/7/2018. (lcckk3)
August 6, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Certified Index to Administative Record by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Certified Index to Part 1, #2 Certified Index to Part 2)(Bennett, Michelle)
August 6, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, Michelle)
June 19, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Administrative Record due by 8/6/2018. Answer due by 8/6/2018. (dot)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Defendant's #6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant requests an extension up to and including August 6, 2018, to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint because defense counsel is busy with other matters and has upcoming jury duty. The extension will allow Defendant time to compile the administrative record and prepare its response. This is the first request for an extension in this case, and Plaintiffs do not oppose it, on the condition that Defendant agrees to file a certified list of the contents of the administrative record and to produce the administrative record to Plaintiffs on August 6, 2018. Defendant has agreed to do so. Defendant's Motion is GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by no later than AUGUST 6, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/19/2018. (lcckk3)
June 18, 2018 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bennett, Michelle)
May 9, 2018 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 4/20/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/23/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/23/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/22/2018.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Roth, Robert)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 04/17/18. (DM)
April 16, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, Robert P. Charrow, non-party, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
April 13, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zmd)
April 13, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AFFINITY HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS CUSHING HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS HENRYETTA HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS HILLCREST MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, AHS PRYOR HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS SOUTHCREST HOSPITAL, LLC, ARMC, L.P., BAILEY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, BAY COUNTY HEALTH, LLC, BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, BAYSTATE FRANKLIN MEDICAL CENTER, BAYSTATE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BAYSTATE NOBLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BAYSTATE WING HOSPITAL CORPORATION, BERWICK HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - MILTON, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - NEEDHAM, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - PLYMOUTH, INC., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BILOXI HMA, LLC, BSA HOSPITAL, LLC, CASTLE MEDICAL CENTER, FEATHER RIVER HOSPITAL, FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, HANFORD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, HH KILLEEN HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC (HARKER HEIGHTS), KENT COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LODI MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, INC., LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., MONTCLAIR HOSPITAL, LLC, PASACK VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC, PHYSICIANS SURGICAL HOSPITALS, LLC, POCATELLO HOSPITAL, LLC, PORTLAND ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, REEDLEY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SAN JOAQUIN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, SIMI VALLEY HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES, SONORA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ST. HELENA HOSPITAL, TOPEKA HOSPITAL, LLC, TULSA SPINE AND SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, LLC, UKIAH ADVENTIST HOSPITAL, WHITE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, WOMEN & INFANTS HOSPITAL OF RHODE ISLAND. (Roth, Robert)
April 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5421116) filed by BAYSTATE FRANKLIN MEDICAL CENTER, AHS HILLCREST MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, TOPEKA HOSPITAL, LLC, BAYSTATE WING HOSPITAL CORPORATION, GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, WHITE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, BAYSTATE MEDICAL CENTER, INC., SAN JOAQUIN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER, SIMI VALLEY HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES, BERWICK HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC, MONTCLAIR HOSPITAL, LLC, ARMC, L.P., BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - NEEDHAM, INC., AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC, PASACK VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC, BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - PLYMOUTH, INC., POCATELLO HOSPITAL, LLC, SONORA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, PHYSICIANS SURGICAL HOSPITALS, LLC, BAYSTATE NOBLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., UKIAH ADVENTIST HOSPITAL, AHS HENRYETTA HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS PRYOR HOSPITAL, LLC, LODI MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, INC., BILOXI HMA, LLC, WOMEN & INFANTS HOSPITAL OF RHODE ISLAND, AFFINITY HOSPITAL, LLC, ST. HELENA HOSPITAL, KENT COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, PORTLAND ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER, TULSA SPINE AND SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, LLC, AHS CUSHING HOSPITAL, LLC, FEATHER RIVER HOSPITAL, BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, BAILEY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, BAY COUNTY HEALTH, LLC, REEDLEY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, HANFORD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - MILTON, INC., AHS SOUTHCREST HOSPITAL, LLC, HH KILLEEN HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC (HARKER HEIGHTS), BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS MEDICAL CENTER, INC., BSA HOSPITAL, LLC, CASTLE MEDICAL CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons Alex M. Azar II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, #9 Summons Jessie K. Liu, U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, #10 Summons Jefferson B. Sessions, United States Attorney General, #11 Summons General Counsel, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services)(Roth, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REEDLEY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PORTLAND ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - PLYMOUTH, INC.
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAN JOAQUIN COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARMC, L.P.
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HH KILLEEN HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC (HARKER HEIGHTS)
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIMI VALLEY HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYSTATE WING HOSPITAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYSTATE NOBLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYSTATE MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FEATHER RIVER HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AFFINITY HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLENDALE ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WOMEN & INFANTS HOSPITAL OF RHODE ISLAND
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYSTATE FRANKLIN MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOPEKA HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHS SOUTHCREST HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BERWICK HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PASACK VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONTCLAIR HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHS PRYOR HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TULSA SPINE AND SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. HELENA HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILOXI HMA, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: POCATELLO HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UKIAH ADVENTIST HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENT COUNTY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - MILTON, INC.
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HANFORD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CASTLE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHS HENRYETTA HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAY COUNTY HEALTH, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WHITE MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHYSICIANS SURGICAL HOSPITALS, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHS HILLCREST MEDICAL CENTER, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONORA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHS CUSHING HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BSA HOSPITAL, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETH ISRAEL DEACONESS HOSPITAL - NEEDHAM, INC.
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LODI MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, INC.
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAILEY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILOXI HMA, LLC doing business as MERIT HEALTH BILOXI
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHS SOUTHCREST HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as HILLCREST HOSPITAL SOUTH
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HH KILLEEN HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC (HARKER HEIGHTS) doing business as SETON MEDICAL CENTER HARKER HEIGHTS
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER doing business as COMMUNITY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYSTATE NOBLE HOSPITAL CORPORATION doing business as BAYSTATE NOBLE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HANFORD COMMUNITY HOSPITAL doing business as ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER - HANFORD doing business as ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER - SELMA
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LODI MEMORIAL HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, INC. doing business as LODI MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. doing business as LOVELACE WOMEN'S HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHS PRYOR HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as HILLCREST HOSPITAL PRYOR
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REEDLEY COMMUNITY HOSPITAL doing business as ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER - REEDLEY
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONORA COMMUNITY HOSPITAL doing business as SONORA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHS HILLCREST MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as HILLCREST MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. HELENA HOSPITAL doing business as ST. HELENA HOSPITAL NAPA VALLEY
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TULSA SPINE AND SPECIALTY HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as TULSA SPINE AND SPECIALTY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHS CLAREMORE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as HILLCREST HOSPITAL CLAREMORE
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. doing business as LOVELACE REGIONAL HOSPITAL - ROSWELL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYSTATE WING HOSPITAL CORPORATION doing business as BAYSTATE WING HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAYFRONT HMA MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as BAYFRONT HEALTH PUNTA GORDA
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARMC, L.P. doing business as ABILENE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BERWICK HOSPITAL COMPANY, LLC doing business as BERWICK HOSPITAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. doing business as LOVELACE WESTSIDE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AFFINITY HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as GRANDVIEW MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PORTLAND ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER doing business as ADVENTIST MEDICAL CENTER - PORTLAND
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAILEY MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as BAILEY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAY COUNTY HEALTH, LLC doing business as BAY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHS HENRYETTA HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as HILLCREST HOSPITAL HENRYETTA
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOPEKA HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as THE UNIVERSITY OF KANSAS HEALTH SYSTEM, ST. FRANCIS CAMPUS
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOVELACE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. doing business as LOVELACE MEDICAL CENTER - DOWNTOWN
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHS CUSHING HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as HILLCREST HOSPITAL CUSHING
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BSA HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as BAPTIST ST. ANTHONY'S HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: POCATELLO HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as PORTNEUF MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PASACK VALLEY HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as HACKENSACK UMC AT PASACK VALLEY
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UKIAH ADVENTIST HOSPITAL doing business as UKIAH VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHYSICIANS SURGICAL HOSPITALS, LLC doing business as PHYSICIANS SURGICAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONTCLAIR HOSPITAL, LLC doing business as MOUNTAINSIDE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRESNO COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER doing business as CLOVIS COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIMI VALLEY HOSPITAL & HEALTH CARE SERVICES doing business as SIMI VALLEY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O'CONNOR HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WEST VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as WEST VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ST. LOUISE REGIONAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WATERTOWN MEDICAL CENTER LLC doing business as WATERTOWN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, LLC doing business as CENTENNIAL HILLS HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WEST BOCA MEDICAL CENTER, INC doing business as WEST BOCA MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Robert L. Roth
Represented By: Katrina A. Pagonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Michelle Renee Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?