JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC. v. MEHTA
Plaintiff: JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC.
Defendant: POOJA MEHTA and DOUGHBOY ENTERPRISES LLC d/b/a MELLOW MUSHROOM
Case Number: 1:2018cv00950
Filed: April 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC. (Chuzi, George)
April 24, 2018 Filing 5 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright.. (Chuzi, George) (Main Document 5 replaced on 4/26/2018) (ztd).
April 24, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC.. (Chuzi, George)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 4/24/2018. (lckbj1)
April 24, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to DOUGHBOY ENTERPRISES LLC, POOJA MEHTA. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
April 24, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsb)
April 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Pooja Mehta and Doughboy Enterprises LLC d/b/a Mellow Mushroom ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5437953) filed by JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Chuzi, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC. v. MEHTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC.
Represented By: George Michael Chuzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POOJA MEHTA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUGHBOY ENTERPRISES LLC d/b/a MELLOW MUSHROOM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?