HILLMAN et al v. AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES et al
Plaintiff: DEVLIN HILLMAN and TARA BLUNT
Defendant: AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES and LOCAL 2741 AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES
Case Number: 1:2018cv00999
Filed: April 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Royce C. Lamberth
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 29:0401
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 09/28/2020. (lcrcl3)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 06/29/2020. (lcrcl3)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 01/28/2019. (lcrcl3)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HILLMAN et al v. AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEVLIN HILLMAN
Represented By: Marlene Denise Morten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TARA BLUNT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES
Represented By: Hampton H. Stennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOCAL 2741 AMERICAN FEDERATION OF GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES
Represented By: Hampton H. Stennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?