RAMIREZ v. SESSIONS et al

Plaintiff: Claudia Arely Molina de Ramirez
Defendant: ALEX AZAR, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, SCOTT LLOYD, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN and JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III
Case Number: 1:2018cv01516
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Paul L Friedman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: Alien Detainee (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 9/17/2018, (tj)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #8 defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before September 17, 2018. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 24, 2018. (lcplf1)
August 24, 2018 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by ALEX AZAR, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Murley, Nicole)
August 21, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/27/2018 (tj)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties are directed to meet and confer and submit a joint status report as to how they intend to proceed in this matter on or before Monday, August 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 20, 2018. (lcplf1)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re counsel's obligations under the Court's Local Rule 40.5 re related cases. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 7, 2018. (MA)
July 18, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Newcomb Murley on behalf of All Defendants (Murley, Nicole)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Motion #2 for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mario B. Williams and Motion #3 for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Julie J. Oinonen on behalf of plaintiff. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 3, 2018.(MA)
July 3, 2018 Filing 5 Case reassigned to Judge Paul L. Friedman as there is an earlier related case. Judge Richard J. Leon is no longer assigned to the case. (rj)
June 28, 2018 SUMMONS Not Issued as to U.S. Attorney. (zmd)
June 28, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to ALEX AZAR, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
June 28, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Julie J. Oinonen, :Firm- Williams Oinonen, LLC, :Address- 44 Broad Street NW, Suite 200, Atlanta, GA 30303. Phone No. - 4046540288. Fax No. - 4045926225 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5562102. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CLAUDIA ARELY MOLINA DE RAMIREZ (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Julie Oinonen)(Shoreman, John)
June 28, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Mario B. Williams, :Firm- Nexus Derechos Humanos Attorneys, Inc., :Address- 44 Broad Street NW, Suite 200, Atlanta, GA 30303. Phone No. - 4042540442. Fax No. - 703-935-2453 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5562088. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CLAUDIA ARELY MOLINA DE RAMIREZ (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Mario Williams)(Shoreman, John)
June 26, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (zmd)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5555875) filed by CLAUDIA ARELY MOLINA DE RAMIREZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Proposed Summons - Azar, #3 Summons Proposed Summons - Sessions, #4 Summons Proposed Summons - McAleenan, #5 Summons Proposed Summons - Nielsen, #6 Summons Proposed Summons - Lloyd)(Shoreman, John) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/27/2018) (zmd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RAMIREZ v. SESSIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX AZAR
Represented By: Nicole Newcomb Murley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Represented By: Nicole Newcomb Murley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT LLOYD
Represented By: Nicole Newcomb Murley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Represented By: Nicole Newcomb Murley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III
Represented By: Nicole Newcomb Murley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Arely Molina de Ramirez
Represented By: John M. Shoreman
Represented By: Mario B. Williams
Represented By: Julie J. Oinonen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?