BEEBE MEDICAL CENTER et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: EL CENTRO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SAMARITAN MEDICAL CENTER, VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, MOSES TAYLOR HOSPITAL, HUDSON VALLEY HOSPITAL CENTER, TOURO INFIRMARY, TUCSON MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT JOSEPH'S MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT ROSE HOSPITAL, TEMPLE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, BEEBE MEDICAL CENTER, F.F. THOMPSON HOSPITAL, VALLEY PRESBYTERIAN HOSPITAL, RICHMOND UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, PACIFIC HOSPITAL OF LONG BEACH, KUAKINI MEDICAL CENTER, UNIONTOWN HOSPITAL, REYNOLDS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SAINT JOSEPH'S HOSPITAL HEALTH CENTER, MILFORD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ORANGE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SOUTHAMPTON HOSPITAL, PACIFIC ALLIANCE MEDICAL CENTER, NIAGRA FALLS MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, ERIE COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER CORP., BROOKDALE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, VASSAR BROTHERS MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT FRANCIS HOSPITAL, CROUSE HOSPITAL, OLEAN GENERAL HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT LUKE'S CORNWELL HOSPITAL, SAINT ELIZABETH HOSPITAL, BILLINGS CLINIC, GRIFFIN HOSPITAL, PECONIC BAY MEDICAL CENTER, LOYOLA UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, COMMUNITY GENERAL HOSPITAL, MAINE COAST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, NYACK HOSPITAL and BETHESDA HOSPITAL
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Case Number: 1:2018cv01613
Filed: July 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Christopher R Cooper
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' #11 joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the case remain stayed. The parties shall file a joint status report within thirty days of the Supreme Court's decision on the merits in Azar v. Allina Health Services (No. 17-1484). Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/19/2018. (lccrc1)
October 17, 2018 Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT by ALEX M. AZAR, II. (Bryce, Peter)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Stay. See full Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/1/2018. (lccrc3)
July 31, 2018 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings by ALEX M. AZAR, II (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bryce, Peter)
July 23, 2018 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 7/12/2018 (Marcus, Kenneth)
July 23, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/13/2018. (Marcus, Kenneth)
July 23, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/13/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/11/2018. (Marcus, Kenneth)
July 22, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Bryce on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR, II (Bryce, Peter)
July 9, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zjd)
July 9, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zjd)
July 9, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BROOKDALE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, BEEBE MEDICAL CENTER, BETHESDA HOSPITAL, BILLINGS CLINIC, BROOKDALE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, COMMUNITY GENERAL HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTER, CROUSE HOSPITAL, EL CENTRO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, ERIE COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER CORP., F.F. THOMPSON HOSPITAL, GRIFFIN HOSPITAL, HUDSON VALLEY HOSPITAL CENTER, KUAKINI MEDICAL CENTER, LOYOLA UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, MAINE COAST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, MILFORD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, MOSES TAYLOR HOSPITAL, NIAGRA FALLS MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, NYACK HOSPITAL, OLEAN GENERAL HOSPITAL, ORANGE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, PACIFIC ALLIANCE MEDICAL CENTER, PACIFIC HOSPITAL OF LONG BEACH, PECONIC BAY MEDICAL CENTER, REYNOLDS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, RICHMOND UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT ELIZABETH HOSPITAL, SAINT FRANCIS HOSPITAL, SAINT JOSEPH'S HOSPITAL HEALTH CENTER, SAINT JOSEPH'S MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT LUKE'S CORNWELL HOSPITAL, SAINT ROSE HOSPITAL, SAMARITAN MEDICAL CENTER, SOUTHHAMPTON HOSPITAL, TEMPLE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, TOURO INFIRMARY, TUCSON MEDICAL CENTER, UNIONTOWN HOSPITAL, VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, VALLEY PRESBYTERIAN HOSPITAL, VASSAR BROTHERS MEDICAL CENTER. (Marcus, Kenneth)
July 9, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 18-1248. (Marcus, Kenneth)
July 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW against ALEX M. AZAR, II SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5576430) filed by SAMARITAN MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT ROSE HOSPITAL, ORANGE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, CROUSE HOSPITAL, RICHMOND UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER, MOSES TAYLOR HOSPITAL, BETHESDA HOSPITAL, BEEBE MEDICAL CENTER, NIAGRA FALLS MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT JOSEPH'S MEDICAL CENTER, MILFORD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, SAINT ELIZABETH HOSPITAL, REYNOLDS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SAINT FRANCIS HOSPITAL, VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER, OLEAN GENERAL HOSPITAL, LOYOLA UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM, PECONIC BAY MEDICAL CENTER, F.F. THOMPSON HOSPITAL, SAINT LUKE'S CORNWELL HOSPITAL, TEMPLE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, GRIFFIN HOSPITAL, VASSAR BROTHERS MEDICAL CENTER, PACIFIC ALLIANCE MEDICAL CENTER, KUAKINI MEDICAL CENTER, PACIFIC HOSPITAL OF LONG BEACH, SAINT JOSEPH'S HOSPITAL HEALTH CENTER, COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTER, UNIONTOWN HOSPITAL, BILLINGS CLINIC, BROOKDALE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, ERIE COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER CORP., VALLEY PRESBYTERIAN HOSPITAL, HUDSON VALLEY HOSPITAL CENTER, MAINE COAST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, TUCSON MEDICAL CENTER, EL CENTRO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, BROOKDALE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER, SOUTHHAMPTON HOSPITAL, TOURO INFIRMARY, NYACK HOSPITAL, COMMUNITY GENERAL HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Summons Secretary of Health and Human Services, #5 Summons Attorney General, #6 Summons United States Attorney)(Marcus, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BEEBE MEDICAL CENTER et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EL CENTRO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMARITAN MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALLEY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOSES TAYLOR HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUDSON VALLEY HOSPITAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOURO INFIRMARY
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TUCSON MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT JOSEPH'S MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT ROSE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TEMPLE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEEBE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F.F. THOMPSON HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALLEY PRESBYTERIAN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHMOND UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PACIFIC HOSPITAL OF LONG BEACH
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KUAKINI MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIONTOWN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REYNOLDS MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT JOSEPH'S HOSPITAL HEALTH CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MILFORD REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ORANGE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOUTHAMPTON HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PACIFIC ALLIANCE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NIAGRA FALLS MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIE COUNTY MEDICAL CENTER CORP.
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROOKDALE HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VASSAR BROTHERS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT FRANCIS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CROUSE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OLEAN GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMUNITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT LUKE'S CORNWELL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT ELIZABETH HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILLINGS CLINIC
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRIFFIN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PECONIC BAY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOYOLA UNIVERSITY HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMMUNITY GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAINE COAST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NYACK HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BETHESDA HOSPITAL
Represented By: Kenneth R. Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Represented By: Peter M. Bryce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?