KOHL v. PEOPLE OF THE STATE

Petitioner: EMONTE D. KOHL
Respondent: PEOPLE OF THE STATE
Case Number: 1:2018cv01650
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Unassigned
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petition: General (Habeas Corpus)
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 13, 2018 Receipt on 08/09/2018 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 1:18-cv-01296 sent by USDC for the Central District of Illinois. (zrdj)
August 8, 2018 5 NOTICE of Extraction of case transferred to USDC for the Central District of Illinois (zsb)
August 8, 2018 Case transferred to the USDC for the Central District of Illinois, pursuant to Court Order entered 07/19/2018. Sent to Court Electronically. (zsb)
July 19, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER TRANSFERRING PRO SE CASE to the USDC for the Central District of Illinois. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Transfer due by 8/8/2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 07/19/2018. (zsb)
July 13, 2018 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by EMONTE D. KOHL (zsb) (temp2, ). Modified on 8/13/2018 (zrdj).
July 13, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by EMONTE D. KOHL (zsb) (temp2, ). Modified on 8/13/2018 (zrdj).
July 13, 2018 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by EMONTE D. KOHL(Attachment: #1 Supplement) (zsb)
July 13, 2018 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 07/13/2018. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KOHL v. PEOPLE OF THE STATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: EMONTE D. KOHL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PEOPLE OF THE STATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?