STATES v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Plaintiff: TIMOTHY STATES
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Case Number: 1:2018cv01652
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2018 8 Memorandum in opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by TIMOTHY STATES. (jf)
September 10, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Consent Motion for Leave to File. Notwithstanding the fact that plaintiff's opposition to the motion to dismiss was filed two days late, the Court grants plaintiff's motion to file it. The Clerk of Court is directed to file Dkt. # 7-1, Plaintiff's Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss, on the public docket. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 09/10/2018. (lcabj3)
September 7, 2018 7 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss Two Days Out of Time by TIMOTHY STATES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(Temple, Donald)
August 21, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff must file his opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss by September 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 08/21/2018. (lcabj3)
August 17, 2018 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss by TIMOTHY STATES (Temple, Donald)
August 6, 2018 5 MOTION to Dismiss by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Risher, Conrad)
August 1, 2018 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Conrad Z. Risher on behalf of DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Risher, Conrad)
August 1, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Joseph Rich on behalf of DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Rich, Robert)
July 13, 2018 2 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to District of Columbia Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsth)
July 13, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsth)
July 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5586385) filed by TIMOTHY STATES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Temple, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STATES v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY STATES
Represented By: Donald M. Temple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Robert Joseph Rich
Represented By: Conrad Z. Risher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?