PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

Plaintiff: PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. and RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Case Number: 1:2018cv01655
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 23, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/13/2018. (dot)
August 23, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by no later than SEPTEMBER 13, 2018. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/23/2018. (lcckk3)
August 23, 2018 7 ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Field, Brian)
August 20, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian)
July 26, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 07/26/18. (DM)
July 25, 2018 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/24/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/23/2018. (Strugar, Matthew)
July 18, 2018 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb)
July 13, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zmd)
July 13, 2018 2 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. (Strugar, Matthew) (Main Document 2 replaced on 7/16/2018) (zmd).
July 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5586784) filed by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Strugar, Matthew) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/16/2018) (zmd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC.
Represented By: Matthew Strugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO
Represented By: Matthew Strugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Brian J. Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?