ROSELL et al v. BERRYHILL et al

Plaintiff: STEVEN ROSELL and FRANCES MICHENER
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION and NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Case Number: 1:2018cv01657
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Rudolph Contreras
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 25, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants (Walker, Johnny)
July 25, 2018 6 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to NANCY A. BERRYHILL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf)
July 25, 2018 5 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to Berryhill, USAO, and USAG filed by STEVEN ROSELL, FRANCES MICHENER.(Bruce, Jonathan)
July 23, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that Joseph J. Dehner is admitted to represent Plaintiffs pro hac vice in this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on July 23, 2018. (lcrc2)
July 23, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that Aaron M. Bernay is admitted to represent Plaintiffs pro hac vice in this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on July 23, 2018. (lcrc2)
July 23, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(d), it is hereby ORDERED that Darren A. Craig is admitted to represent Plaintiffs pro hac vice in this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on July 23, 2018. (lcrc2)
July 23, 2018 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Joseph Dehner, :Firm- Frost Brown Todd LLC, :Address- 301 E. Fourth St. Cincinnati, OH 45202. Phone No. - (513) 651-6800. Fax No. - (513) 651-6981 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5599958. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by FRANCES MICHENER, STEVEN ROSELL (Attachments: #1 Declaration Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bruce, Jonathan)
July 23, 2018 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Aaron Bernay, :Firm- Frost Brown Todd LLC, :Address- 301 E. Fourth St. Cincinnati, OH 45202. Phone No. - (513) 651-6800. Fax No. - (513) 651-6981 Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by FRANCES MICHENER, STEVEN ROSELL (Attachments: #1 Declaration Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bruce, Jonathan)
July 23, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Darren Craig, :Firm- Frost Brown Todd LLC, :Address- 201 North Illinois Street, Suite 1900 P.O. Box 44961 Indianapolis, IN 46244-0961. Phone No. - (317) 237-3975. Fax No. - (317) 237-3900 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5599935. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by FRANCES MICHENER, STEVEN ROSELL (Attachments: #1 Declaration Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Bruce, Jonathan)
July 13, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zmd)
July 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5587139) filed by STEVEN ROSELL, FRANCES MICHENER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Bruce, Jonathan) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/16/2018) (zmd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROSELL et al v. BERRYHILL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN ROSELL
Represented By: Jonathan Mark Bruce
Represented By: Darren A. Craig
Represented By: Aaron M. Bernay
Represented By: Joseph J. Dehner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCES MICHENER
Represented By: Jonathan Mark Bruce
Represented By: Darren A. Craig
Represented By: Aaron M. Bernay
Represented By: Joseph J. Dehner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Johnny Hillary Walker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Represented By: Johnny Hillary Walker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?