MCCORMICK v. BERRYHILL
Plaintiff: FLORENCE MCCORMICK
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2018cv01704
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XV1
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/9/2018. RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/9/2018. (Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/8/2018.) (tth)
August 9, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NANCY A. BERRYHILL served on 8/6/2018. (tth)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 08/08/2018.(DM)
August 3, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued as to NANCY A. BERRYHILL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zsb)
July 30, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsb)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIAT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. "Leave to file without prepayment of costs GRANTED." Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 07/30/2018. (zsb).
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by FLORENCE MCCORMICK. (zmd)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NANCY A. BERRYHILL filed by FLORENCE MCCORMICK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (zmd)
July 20, 2018 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 7/20/2018. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCCORMICK v. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLORENCE MCCORMICK
Represented By: Michael McGonnigal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?