M.M.M et al v. SESSIONS et al
Plaintiff: L.C.O., I.A.T., G.C.H., P.A.P., N.B. and M.M.M
Defendant: ALEX AZAR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DANIEL A. BIBLE, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, RONALD VITIELLO, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, SCOTT LLOYD, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, L. FRANCIS CISSNA and UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Case Number: 1:2018cv01759
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Paul L Friedman
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2018 Receipt on 08/03/2018 of Electronic Transfer. Other Court Number 3:18-cv-01832 sent by USDC for the Southern District of California. (zrdj)
August 6, 2018 Filing 28 Memorandum in opposition to re #27 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Renewed) filed by ALEX AZAR, DANIEL A. BIBLE, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, RONALD VITIELLO. (Yuh, Briana)
August 4, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Renewed) by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B., P.A.P. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bernick, Justin)
August 3, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Extraction of case transferred to USDC for the Southern District of California (zrdj)
August 3, 2018 Filing 25 OPINION granting defendants' motion to transfer venue #19 . Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 3, 2018. (lcplf1)
August 3, 2018 Case transferred as to Counts I, II, and III of the complaint to the USDC for the Southern District of California, pursuant to Court Order entered 08/03/2018. Sent to Court Electronically. (zrdj)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting defendants' motion to transfer venue #19 . Count IV of the complaint is severed from Counts I, II, and III, and this case with those three claims will be transferred immediately, without any waiting period, to the United States District Court for the Southern District of California to be assigned, with his consent, to the Honorable Dana M. Sabraw. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 3, 2018. (lcplf1)
August 3, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary W. H. Best on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Best, Zachary)
August 2, 2018 Filing 23 SUPPLEMENTAL Response to Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue re Minute Order on Motion for Leave to File, Minute Order filed by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B., P.A.P.. (ztd)
August 2, 2018 Filing 21 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Paul L. Friedman held on July 31, 2018; Page Numbers: 1-46. Date of Issuance:August 2, 2018. Court Reporter/Transcriber Patricia A Kaneshiro-Miller, Telephone number 202-354-3243, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 8/23/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/2/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2018.(pk)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #20 plaintiffs' motion for leave to file response to defendants' supplemental brief in support of defendants' motion to transfer venue. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 2, 2018. (MA)
August 2, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B., P.A.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Supplemental Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bernick, Justin)
August 1, 2018 Filing 19 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by ALEX AZAR, DANIEL A. BIBLE, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, RONALD VITIELLO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Yuh, Briana) Modified event title on 8/8/2018 (znmw).
August 1, 2018 Filing 18 REPLY to opposition to motion re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B., P.A.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bernick, Justin)
August 1, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Briana Faith Yuh on behalf of All Defendants (Yuh, Briana)
August 1, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Supplement brief due 8/1/2018, by 5:00 pm. (gdf)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties are directed to file supplemental briefs addressing the transfer and venue issues raised at the hearing of July 31, 2018, by 5:00 p.m. today. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 1, 2018. (MA)
July 31, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Motion Hearing held on 7/31/2018, re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Oral argument heard and order forthcoming via chambers. (Court Reporter: Patricia Kaneshiro-Miller) (gdf)
July 31, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Grant Stewart on behalf of All Defendants (Stewart, Scott)
July 30, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: TRO Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2018 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (gdf)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice Motion #12 for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Zachary W. Best and Motion #13 for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Theodore Clark Weymouth. Counsel are advised to review Local Civil Rule 83.2, in particular 83.2(c)(2). Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 30, 2018.(MA)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Motion #9 for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Katherine A. Nelson, Motion #10 for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ira M. Feinberg, and Motion #11 for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Oliver J. Armas, on behalf of plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 30, 2018. (MA)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall appear for a hearing on plaintiff' motion #6 for a temporary restraining order on Tuesday, July 31, 2018 at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 29A. The parties shall be prepared to argue the TRO motion. The parties shall also be prepared to discuss whether the relief sought is already covered by orders issued by Judge Sabraw in the class action pending in San Diego and, relatedly, whether this case should be transferred to Judge Sabraw. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 30, 2018. (MA)
July 30, 2018 Filing 15 Memorandum in opposition to re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by ALEX AZAR, DANIEL A. BIBLE, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, RONALD VITIELLO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Robins, Jeffrey)
July 30, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S Robins on behalf of All Defendants (Robins, Jeffrey)
July 30, 2018 Filing fee received for Pro Hac Vice Motions for Theodore Clark Weymouth, Zachary W. Best, Oliver J. Armas, Ira M. Feinberg and Katherine A. Nelson: $ 500.00, receipt number: 4616093832. (ztd)
July 30, 2018 Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number: 4616093831. (ztd)
July 27, 2018 SUMMONS (15) Issued as to ALEX AZAR, DANIEL A. BIBLE, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, RONALD VITIELLO and U.S. Attorney (zrdj)
July 27, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- T. Clark Weymouth, :Firm- Hogan Lovells US LLP, :Address- 555 Thirteenth Street, NW, Washington, D.C. 20004. Phone No. - (202) 637-8633. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B., P.A.P. (zrdj)
July 27, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- ZACHARY W. BEST, :Firm- Hogan Lovells US LLP, :Address- 555 Thirteenth Street, NW, Washington, D.C. 20004. Phone No. - (202) 637-6473. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B. (zrdj)
July 27, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- OLIVER J. ARMAS, :Firm- Hogan Lovells US LLP, :Address- 875 Third Avenue, New York, NY 10022. Phone No. - (212) 918-3020. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B. (zrdj)
July 27, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- IRA M. FEINBERG, :Firm- Hogan Lovells US LLP, :Address- 875 Third Avenue, New York, NY 10022. Phone No. - (212) 918-3509. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B. (zrdj)
July 27, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- KATHERINE A. NELSON, :Firm- Hogan Lovells US LLP, :Address- 1601 Wewatta Street, Suite 900, Denver, CO 80202. Phone No. - (303) 454-2539. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B., P.A.P. (zrdj)
July 27, 2018 Filing 8 Certificate of Compliance with Local Rule 65.1 by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B., P.A.P. (zrdj)
July 27, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Expedited Hearing re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B., P.A.P. (zrdj)
July 27, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B., P.A.P. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - L.A.A. Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 - I.A.T. Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 - G.M.A. Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 - D.B.G. Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 - A.M.C. Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 - J.M.A Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 - Manoj Govindaiah Affidavit-, #9 Exhibit 8 - Shalyn Fluharty Declaration, #10 Text of Proposed Order Preliminary Injunction, #11 Text of Proposed Order TRO)(zrdj)
July 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B., P.A.P.. Case related to Case No. 18-1458-PLF. (zrdj)
July 27, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against ALEX AZAR, DANIEL A. BIBLE, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, RONALD VITIELLO filed by I.A.T., M.M.M, L.C.O., N.B., P.A.P., G.C.H. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(zrdj)
July 27, 2018 Filing 3 SEALED DOCUMENT filed by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B., P.A.P.. re #1 MOTION for Leave to File Under Pseudonym filed by N.B., G.C.H., I.A.T., M.M.M, L.C.O., P.A.P. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zrdj)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to File Under Pseudonym. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 7/27/2018. (zrdj)
July 27, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to File Under Pseudonym by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B., P.A.P. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(zrdj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.M.M et al v. SESSIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX AZAR
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL A. BIBLE
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD VITIELLO
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT LLOYD
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. FRANCIS CISSNA
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.C.O.
Represented By: Justin Bernick
Represented By: Oliver J. Armas
Represented By: Katherine A. Nelson
Represented By: Zachary W. H. Best
Represented By: Ira M. Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.A.T.
Represented By: Justin Bernick
Represented By: Oliver J. Armas
Represented By: Katherine A. Nelson
Represented By: Zachary W. H. Best
Represented By: Ira M. Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.C.H.
Represented By: Justin Bernick
Represented By: Oliver J. Armas
Represented By: Katherine A. Nelson
Represented By: Zachary W. H. Best
Represented By: Ira M. Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.A.P.
Represented By: Justin Bernick
Represented By: Oliver J. Armas
Represented By: Katherine A. Nelson
Represented By: Zachary W. H. Best
Represented By: Ira M. Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.B.
Represented By: Justin Bernick
Represented By: Oliver J. Armas
Represented By: Katherine A. Nelson
Represented By: Zachary W. H. Best
Represented By: Ira M. Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.M.M
Represented By: Justin Bernick
Represented By: Oliver J. Armas
Represented By: Katherine A. Nelson
Represented By: Zachary W. H. Best
Represented By: Ira M. Feinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?