FRIENDS OF ANIMALS v. UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE et al

Plaintiff: FRIENDS OF ANIMALS
Defendant: UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE and RYAN ZINKE
Case Number: 1:2018cv01761
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Tanya S Chutkan
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 16:1540
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 20, 2018 8 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE served on 8/3/2018 (McKay, Jeremy)
August 20, 2018 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. RYAN ZINKE served on 8/3/2018 (McKay, Jeremy)
August 20, 2018 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/6/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/5/2018. (McKay, Jeremy)
August 20, 2018 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General August 6, 2018. (McKay, Jeremy)
July 30, 2018 4 SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, RYAN ZINKE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsth)
July 27, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zsth)
July 27, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexa Marie Carreno on behalf of FRIENDS OF ANIMALS (Carreno, Alexa)
July 27, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FRIENDS OF ANIMALS. (McKay, Jeremy)
July 27, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5608885) filed by FRIENDS OF ANIMALS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(McKay, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FRIENDS OF ANIMALS v. UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN ZINKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRIENDS OF ANIMALS
Represented By: Jeremy Devin McKay
Represented By: Alexa Marie Carreno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?