M.M.M et al v. SESSIONS et al
Plaintiff: L.C.O., I.A.T., G.C.H., P.A.P., N.B. and M.M.M
Defendant: ALEX AZAR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DANIEL A. BIBLE, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, RONALD VITIELLO, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, SCOTT LLOYD, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, L. FRANCIS CISSNA and UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Case Number: 1:2018cv01835
Filed: August 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Paul L Friedman
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0706
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #52 defendants' consent motion for extension of time up to and including October 31, 2018 within which to answer. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on October 1, 2018. (MA)
October 1, 2018 Filing 52 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #31 Amended Complaint by ALEX AZAR, DANIEL A. BIBLE, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, RONALD VITIELLO (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Robins, Jeffrey)
September 28, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to ALEX AZAR, DANIEL A. BIBLE, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, RONALD VITIELLO. Attorney Briana Faith Yuh terminated. (Yuh, Briana)
September 27, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/26/2018 (tj)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of the parties' joint status report #50 , the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before October 26, 2018. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 26, 2018. (MA)
September 24, 2018 Filing 50 Joint STATUS REPORT in Response to September 11, 2018 Minute Order by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B., P.A.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice Lodging Agreement for Court's Approval in Case No. 18cv1832 DMS JLB, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bernick, Justin)
September 12, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/24/2018 (tj)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' representations in their joint status report #49 , the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before September 24, 2018. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on September 11, 2018. (MA)
September 7, 2018 Filing 49 Joint STATUS REPORT in Response to August 27, 2018 Minute Order by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B., P.A.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Joint Status Report in Case No. 18cv428 DMS MDD, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Response to Joint Status Report in Case No. 3:18-cv-1832-DMS, #3 Certificate of Service)(Bernick, Justin)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of the parties' joint status report #48 , the parties shall submit a further joint status report after the status conference before Judge Sabraw on August 31, 2018 at their earliest convenience, but in any event no later than 5:00 p.m. on September 7, 2018. The parties shall file in this Court copies of any written submissions filed before Judge Sabraw in advance of the August 31, 2018 status conference. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 27, 2018. (lcplf1)
August 27, 2018 Filing 48 Joint STATUS REPORT in Response to August 17, 2018 Order (Dkt. 47). by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B., P.A.P.. (Bernick, Justin)
August 17, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/24/2018 (gdf)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER holding in abeyance #32 plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction until after the hearing before Judge Sabraw on August 24, 2018; parties shall file in this Court copies of any written submissions filed before Judge Sabraw in advance of the August 24, 2018 hearing; and the parties shall submit a status report after the hearing on August 24, 2018 no later than 5:00 p.m. on August 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 17, 2018. (MA)
August 17, 2018 Filing 46 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re Order,,, filed by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B., P.A.P.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bernick, Justin)
August 17, 2018 Filing 45 SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re Order,,, filed by ALEX AZAR, DANIEL A. BIBLE, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, RONALD VITIELLO. (Robins, Jeffrey)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. In view of the temporary restraining order issued yesterday by Judge Sabraw in M.M.M. v. Sessions, No. 18-1832 (S.D. Cal. August 16, 2018), ECF No. 55, the parties are directed to file short supplemental briefs addressing whether the Court should hold in abeyance plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction in this case [Dkt. No. 32] until after the status conference scheduled for August 24, 2018 before Judge Sabraw. In particular, the parties should address the impact of Judge Sabraw's Order on this Courts consideration of irreparable harm with respect to plaintiffs' preliminary injunction motion in this case. The parties shall file such briefs by 4:00 p.m. today. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 17, 2018. (MA)
August 17, 2018 Filing 44 REPLY re #41 Notice of Proposed Order, filed by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B., P.A.P.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bernick, Justin)
August 16, 2018 Filing 43 RESPONSE re #41 Notice of Proposed Order, filed by ALEX AZAR, DANIEL A. BIBLE, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, RONALD VITIELLO. (Yuh, Briana)
August 16, 2018 Filing 42 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Paul L. Friedman held on 8-14-18; Page Numbers: 1-59. Date of Issuance:8-16-18. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Griffith, Telephone number (202) 354-3247, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the <

<

<

<

<

< Redaction Request due 9/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2018.(Griffith, Lisa)
August 15, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE of Proposed Order REVISED by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B., P.A.P. re Motion Hearing, #32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Revised Proposed Order on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bernick, Justin)
August 14, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul L. Friedman: Motion Hearing held on 8/14/2018 re #32 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiff To File Notice To The Court. (Court Reporter LISA GRIFFIN.) (mac)
August 13, 2018 Filing 40 REPLY to opposition to motion re #32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B., P.A.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - DEF000001-17, #2 Exhibit 2 - Defs.' Resp. and Objs. to Pls.' RFPs No. 1, #3 Exhibit 3 - Decl. of Shalyn Fluharty, #4 Certificate of Service)(Bernick, Justin)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #36 motion for admission pro hac vice of Haley K. Costello Essig on behalf of plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 13, 2018. (MA)
August 12, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 8/13/2018, by 11:00 AM. (gdf)
August 11, 2018 Filing 38 RESPONSE re #32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ALEX AZAR, DANIEL A. BIBLE, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, RONALD VITIELLO. (Robins, Jeffrey)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' Motion #33 for Expedited Discovery. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 10, 2018. (lcplf1) Modified on 8/16/2018 to change document type(hs).
August 10, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Haley K. Costello Essig, :Firm- Hogan Lovells US LLP, :Address- Park Place II, Ninth Floor, 7930 Jones Branch Drive, McLean, Virginia 22102-3302. Phone No. - 703-610-6230. Fax No. - 703-610-6200 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5632495. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B., P.A.P. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Haley K. Costello Essig, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Bernick, Justin)
August 10, 2018 Filing 35 RESPONSE re #33 MOTION for Discovery Expedited Discovery filed by ALEX AZAR, DANIEL A. BIBLE, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, RONALD VITIELLO. (Robins, Jeffrey)
August 9, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 8/11/2018. Reply due by 8/13/2018. (gdf)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice the Motion #34 for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Haley K. Costello Essig. Counsel is advised to review Local Civil Rule 83.2, in particular 83.2(d). Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 9, 2018. (MA)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER directing defendants to respond to plaintiffs' motion #32 for a preliminary injunction on or before August 11, 2018 at 6:00 p.m. Plaintiffs shall submit their reply on or before August 13, 2018 at 5:00 p.m. The Court will hear oral argument on plaintiffs' motion #32 on August 14, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 29A. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 9, 2018.(MA)
August 9, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 8/10/2018 (gdf)
August 9, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Haley K. Costello Essig, :Firm- Hogan Lovells US LLP, :Address- 7930 Jones Branch Drive, McLean, Virginia 22102-3302. Phone No. - 703-610-6230. Fax No. - 703-610-6200 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5630863. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B., P.A.P. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Haley K. Costello Essig, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Bernick, Justin)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER directing defendants to respond to plaintiffs' motion #33 for expedited discovery on or before 8:00 a.m. on August 10, 2018. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 9, 2018. (MA)
August 8, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION for Discovery Expedited Discovery by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B., P.A.P. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Best Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1 to Best Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Best Declaration, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Bernick, Justin)
August 8, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B., P.A.P. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1- L.A.A.. Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 - I.A.T. Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 - G.M.A. Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 - D.B.G. Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 - A.M.C. Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 - J.M.A. Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 - Manoj Govindaiah Affidavit, #9 Exhibit 8 - Shalyn Fluharty Declaration, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Bernick, Justin)
August 8, 2018 Filing 31 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by I.A.T., M.M.M, L.C.O., N.B., P.A.P., G.C.H.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bernick, Justin)
August 8, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by T. Clark Weymouth on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Weymouth, T.)
August 7, 2018 Set/Reset Hearings: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 8/14/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 29A before Judge Paul L. Friedman. (gdf)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying without prejudice #27 plaintiffs' renewed motion for temporary restraining order; plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint limited to one remaining claim; parties shall meet and confer and propose briefing schedule with respect to a new preliminary injunction motion plaintiffs intend to file; and the Court will hear oral argument on August 14, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 6, 2018. (MA)
August 6, 2018 Filing 28 Memorandum in opposition to re #27 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Renewed) filed by ALEX AZAR, DANIEL A. BIBLE, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, RONALD VITIELLO. (Yuh, Briana)
August 4, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Renewed) by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B., P.A.P. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bernick, Justin)
August 3, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Extraction of case transferred to USDC for the Southern District of California (zrdj)
August 3, 2018 Filing 25 OPINION granting defendants' motion to transfer venue 19 . Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 3, 2018. (lcplf1)
August 3, 2018 Case transferred as to Counts I, II, and III of the complaint to the USDC for the Southern District of California, pursuant to Court Order entered 08/03/2018. Sent to Court Electronically. (zrdj)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting defendants' motion to transfer venue 19 . Count IV of the complaint is severed from Counts I, II, and III, and this case with those three claims will be transferred immediately, without any waiting period, to the United States District Court for the Southern District of California to be assigned, with his consent, to the Honorable Dana M. Sabraw. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on August 3, 2018. (lcplf1)
August 3, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary W. H. Best on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Best, Zachary)
August 1, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Briana Faith Yuh on behalf of All Defendants (Yuh, Briana)
July 31, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Grant Stewart on behalf of All Defendants (Stewart, Scott) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall appear for a hearing on plaintiff' motion 6 for a temporary restraining order on Tuesday, July 31, 2018 at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 29A. The parties shall be prepared to argue the TRO motion. The parties shall also be prepared to discuss whether the relief sought is already covered by orders issued by Judge Sabraw in the class action pending in San Diego and, relatedly, whether this case should be transferred to Judge Sabraw. Signed by Judge Paul L. Friedman on July 30, 2018. (MA)
July 30, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S Robins on behalf of All Defendants (Robins, Jeffrey)
July 27, 2018 SUMMONS (15) Issued as to ALEX AZAR, DANIEL A. BIBLE, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, RONALD VITIELLO and U.S. Attorney (zrdj) (Entered: 08/06/2018)
July 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by G.C.H., I.A.T., L.C.O., M.M.M, N.B., P.A.P.. Case related to Case No. 18-1458-PLF. (zrdj)
July 27, 2018 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against ALEX AZAR, DANIEL A. BIBLE, L. FRANCIS CISSNA, SCOTT LLOYD, KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, KIRSTJEN NIELSEN, OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, RONALD VITIELLO filed by I.A.T., M.M.M, L.C.O., N.B., P.A.P., G.C.H. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(zrdj)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to File Under Pseudonym FILED IN 18CV1759. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on 7/27/2018. (zrdj) Modified on 8/6/2018 (zrdj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.M.M et al v. SESSIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX AZAR
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL A. BIBLE
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD VITIELLO
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICE OF REFUGEE RESETTLEMENT
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT LLOYD
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIRSTJEN NIELSEN
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. FRANCIS CISSNA
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Represented By: Scott Grant Stewart
Represented By: Briana Faith Yuh
Represented By: Jeffrey S Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.C.O.
Represented By: Justin Bernick
Represented By: T. Clark Weymouth
Represented By: Oliver J. Armas
Represented By: Katherine A. Nelson
Represented By: Zachary W. H. Best
Represented By: Ira M. Feinberg
Represented By: Haley K. Costello Essig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.A.T.
Represented By: Justin Bernick
Represented By: T. Clark Weymouth
Represented By: Oliver J. Armas
Represented By: Katherine A. Nelson
Represented By: Zachary W. H. Best
Represented By: Ira M. Feinberg
Represented By: Haley K. Costello Essig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.C.H.
Represented By: Justin Bernick
Represented By: T. Clark Weymouth
Represented By: Oliver J. Armas
Represented By: Katherine A. Nelson
Represented By: Zachary W. H. Best
Represented By: Ira M. Feinberg
Represented By: Haley K. Costello Essig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P.A.P.
Represented By: Justin Bernick
Represented By: T. Clark Weymouth
Represented By: Oliver J. Armas
Represented By: Katherine A. Nelson
Represented By: Zachary W. H. Best
Represented By: Ira M. Feinberg
Represented By: Haley K. Costello Essig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.B.
Represented By: Justin Bernick
Represented By: T. Clark Weymouth
Represented By: Oliver J. Armas
Represented By: Katherine A. Nelson
Represented By: Zachary W. H. Best
Represented By: Ira M. Feinberg
Represented By: Haley K. Costello Essig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.M.M
Represented By: Justin Bernick
Represented By: T. Clark Weymouth
Represented By: Oliver J. Armas
Represented By: Katherine A. Nelson
Represented By: Zachary W. H. Best
Represented By: Ira M. Feinberg
Represented By: Haley K. Costello Essig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?