TAYLOR et al v. SAGE TITLE GROUP, LLC

Plaintiff: CAROLINE TAYLOR
Defendant: SAGE TITLE GROUP, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01837
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Thomas F Hogan
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2018 Filing 10 REPLY to opposition to motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by SAGE TITLE GROUP, LLC. (Johnson, Vernon)
August 27, 2018 Filing 9 Memorandum in opposition to re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by CAROLINE TAYLOR(individually), CAROLINE TAYLOR(as personal representative of the Estate of John P. Shumate). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Kidder, Elisabeth)
August 22, 2018 Filing 8 Receipt on 8/22/2018 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 18ca4846. (zrdj)
August 13, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by SAGE TITLE GROUP, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1 - 4)(Johnson, Vernon)
August 9, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Elisabeth T. Kidder on behalf of CAROLINE TAYLOR(individually), CAROLINE TAYLOR(as personal representative of the Estate of John P. Shumate) (Kidder, Elisabeth)
August 9, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Vernon Webster Johnson, III on behalf of All Defendants (Johnson, Vernon)
August 9, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian P. Donnelly on behalf of All Defendants (Donnelly, Brian)
August 8, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE to Counsel re #1 Notice of Removal. (zmd)
August 6, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Thomas F. Hogan. (zmd)
August 6, 2018 Filing 2 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SAGE TITLE GROUP, LLC (Donnelly, Brian)
August 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 18ca4846 Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-5623541 filed by SAGE TITLE GROUP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Documents from Superior Court, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Donnelly, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TAYLOR et al v. SAGE TITLE GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAGE TITLE GROUP, LLC
Represented By: Brian P. Donnelly
Represented By: Vernon Webster Johnson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROLINE TAYLOR
Represented By: Elisabeth T. Kidder
Represented By: Richard T. Rossier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?