COLISEUM MEDICAL CENTER, LLC et al v. AZAR
Plaintiff: GALEN OF FLORIDA, INC., GRAND STRAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF MCKINNEY SUBSIDIARY, L.P., GALEN HOSPITAL ALASKA, INC., EL PASO HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, LTD., COLUMBIA HOSPITAL (PALM BEACHES) LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, BAY AREA HEALTHCARE GROUP, LTD., CENTERPOINT MEDICAL CENTER OF INDEPENDENCE, LLC, DLP MINERS MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, COLISEUM MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, BERKSHIRE MEDICAL CENTER, CENTRA HEALTH, INC., GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, L.P., CENTRAL FLORIDA REGIONAL HOSPITAL, INC., CHCA CLEAR LAKE, L.P., EDWARD WHITE HOSPITAL, INC., CHCA CONROE, L.P., CHCA WEST HOUSTON, L.P., COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF LAS COLINAS, INC., COLUMBIA VALLEY HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, L.P., CHCA BAYSHORE, L.P., BAY HOSPITAL, INC., COLUMBIA OGDEN MEDICAL CENTER, INC., FORT WALTON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER, INC., CARTERSVILLE MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, EASTSIDE MEDICAL, LLC, BOSTON MEDICAL CENTER CORPORATION, DLP MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, COLUMBIA HOSPITAL AT MEDICAL CITY DALLAS SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF ARLINGTON SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA PLAZA MEDICAL CENTER OF FORT WORTH SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA NORTH HILLS HOSPITAL SUBSIDIARY, L.P., FRANKFORT HOSPITAL, INC., COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF LEWISVILLE SUBSIDIARY, L.P., GPCH-GP, INC., EASTERN IDAHO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, COLUMBIA HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF SOUTH BROWARD, GALEN OF KANSAS, INC., DOCTORS HOSPITAL OF AUGUSTA, LLC, COLUMBIA/HCA JOHN RANDOLPH, INC., COLUMBIA RIO GRANDE HEALTHCARE, L.P., COLUBMIA MEDICAL CENTER OF DENTON SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF PLANO SUBSIDIARY, L.P., CHIPPENHAM & JOHNSTON-WILLIS HOSPITALS, INC., GALENCARE, INC., BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ARKANSAS, CENTRAL TENNESSEE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, FAIRVIEW PARK, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, COLISEUM MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as COLISEUM MEDICAL CENTERS, GALENCARE, INC. doing business as BRANDON REGIONAL HOSPITAL doing business as NORTHSIDE HOSPITAL, CHCA BAYSHORE, L.P. doing business as BAYSHORE MEDICAL CENTER, COLUMBIA HOSPITAL AT MEDICAL CITY DALLAS SUBSIDIARY, L.P. doing business as MEDICAL CITY DALLAS HOSPITAL, GALEN OF KANSAS, INC. doing business as COLUMBIA OVERLAND PARK REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF LAS COLINAS, INC. doing business as LAS COLINAS MEDICAL CENTER, GALEN HOSPITAL ALASKA, INC. doing business as ALASKA REGIONAL HOSPITAL, COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF ARLINGTON SUBSIDIARY, L.P. doing business as MEDICAL CITY OF ARLINGTON, CHCA CLEAR LAKE, L.P. doing business as CLEAR LAKE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, COLUMBIA RIO GRANDE HEALTHCARE, L.P. doing business as RIO GRANDE REGIONAL HOSPITAL, EL PASO HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, LTD. doing business as LAS PALMAS MEDICAL CENTER, BAY AREA HEALTHCARE GROUP, LTD. doing business as CORPUS CHRISTI MEDICAL CENTER, BAY HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as GULF COAST MEDICAL CENTER, COLUMBIA PLAZA MEDICAL CENTER OF FORT WORTH SUBSIDIARY, L.P. doing business as MEDICAL CITY FORT WORTH, CENTRAL TENNESSEE HOSPITAL CORPORATION doing business as HORIZON MEDICAL CENTER, COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF MCKINNEY SUBSIDIARY, L.P. doing business as MEDICAL CENTER OF MCKINNEY, COLUMBIA OGDEN MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as OGDEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, GALEN OF FLORIDA, INC. doing business as ST. PETERSBURG GENERAL HOSPITAL, COLUMBIA HOSPITAL (PALM BEACHES) LIMITED PARTNERSHIP doing business as COLUMBIA HOSPITAL, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ARKANSAS doing business as UAMS MEDICAL CENTER, COLUMBIA/HCA JOHN RANDOLPH, INC. doing business as JOHN RANDOLPH MEDICAL CENTER, COLUMBIA HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF SOUTH BROWARD doing business as WESTSIDE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, GRAND STRAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as GRAND STRAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, COLUMBIA VALLEY HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, L.P. doing business as VALLEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, CHCA WEST HOUSTON, L.P. doing business as THE WOMAN'S HOSPITAL OF TEXAS doing business as WEST HOUSTON MEDICAL CENTER, CENTRAL FLORIDA REGIONAL HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as CENTRAL FLORIDA REGIONAL HOSPITAL, CHCA CONROE, L.P. doing business as CONROE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, GPCH-GP, INC. doing business as GARDEN PARK MEDICAL CENTER, COLUMBIA NORTH HILLS HOSPITAL SUBSIDIARY, L.P. doing business as NORTH HILLS HOSPITAL, CARTERSVILLE MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as CARTERSVILLE MEDICAL CENTER, DLP MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC formerly doing business as MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, FAIRVIEW PARK, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP doing business as FAIRVIEW PARK HOSPITAL, COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF PLANO SUBSIDIARY, L.P. doing business as MEDICAL CENTER OF PLANO, DOCTORS HOSPITAL OF AUGUSTA, LLC doing business as DOCTORS HOSPITAL (AUGUSTA), COLUBMIA MEDICAL CENTER OF DENTON SUBSIDIARY, L.P. doing business as MEDICAL CENTER DENTON, CENTRA HEALTH, INC. doing business as VIRGINIA BAPTIST HOSPITAL LYNCHBURG, DLP MINERS MEDICAL CENTER, LLC formerly doing business as MINERS HOSPITAL, FORT WALTON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as FORT WALTON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER, CENTERPOINT MEDICAL CENTER OF INDEPENDENCE, LLC doing business as CENTERPOINT MEDICAL CENTER, EDWARD WHITE HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as EDWARD WHITE HOSPITAL, COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF LEWISVILLE SUBSIDIARY, L.P. doing business as MEDICAL CENTER OF LEWISVILLE, BOSTON MEDICAL CENTER CORPORATION doing business as BOSTON MEDICAL CENTER, FRANKFORT HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as FRANKFORT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, EASTSIDE MEDICAL, LLC doing business as EMORY EASTSIDE MEDICAL CENTER, GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, L.P. doing business as GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL and CHIPPENHAM & JOHNSTON-WILLIS HOSPITALS, INC. doing business as CJW MEDICAL CENTER
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR
Case Number: 1:2018cv01845
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 88888
Presiding Judge: Amy Berman Jackson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER consolidating case with Albert Einstein Healthcare Network v. Azar, 1:17-cv-1134-ABJ. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/13/18. (DMK)
September 11, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Nonobjection to Consolidation by ALEX M. AZAR (Bryce, Peter)
August 31, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Bryce on behalf of ALEX M. AZAR (Bryce, Peter)
August 29, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall meet and confer and notify the Court by 9/12/2018 of any reason why this case should not be consolidated with related case Albert Einstein Healthcare Network, et al. v. Azar, 17-cv-01134 (ABJ). (jth)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER. It is ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and notify the Court by September 12, 2018 of any reason why this case should not be consolidated with related case Albert Einstein Healthcare Network, et al. v. Azar, 17-cv-01134-ABJ. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/29/18. (DMK)
August 28, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/14/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/13/2018. (Keough, Christopher)
August 28, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/16/2018. (Keough, Christopher)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR served on 8/16/2018 (Keough, Christopher)
August 9, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
August 7, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zmd)
August 7, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by BAY AREA HEALTHCARE GROUP, LTD., BAY HOSPITAL, INC., BERKSHIRE MEDICAL CENTER, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ARKANSAS, BOSTON MEDICAL CENTER CORPORATION, CARTERSVILLE MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, CENTERPOINT MEDICAL CENTER OF INDEPENDENCE, LLC, CENTRA HEALTH, INC., CENTRAL FLORIDA REGIONAL HOSPITAL, INC., CENTRAL TENNESSEE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, CHCA BAYSHORE, L.P., CHCA CLEAR LAKE, L.P., CHCA CONROE, L.P., CHCA WEST HOUSTON, L.P., CHIPPENHAM & JOHNSTON-WILLIS HOSPITALS, INC., COLISEUM MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, COLUBMIA MEDICAL CENTER OF DENTON SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA HOSPITAL (PALM BEACHES) LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, COLUMBIA HOSPITAL AT MEDICAL CITY DALLAS SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF SOUTH BROWARD, COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF ARLINGTON SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF LAS COLINAS, INC., COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF LEWISVILLE SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF MCKINNEY SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF PLANO SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA NORTH HILLS HOSPITAL SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA OGDEN MEDICAL CENTER, INC., COLUMBIA PLAZA MEDICAL CENTER OF FORT WORTH SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA RIO GRANDE HEALTHCARE, L.P., COLUMBIA VALLEY HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, L.P., COLUMBIA/HCA JOHN RANDOLPH, INC., DLP MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, DLP MINERS MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, DOCTORS HOSPITAL OF AUGUSTA, LLC, EASTERN IDAHO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, EASTSIDE MEDICAL, LLC, EDWARD WHITE HOSPITAL, INC., EL PASO HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, LTD., FAIRVIEW PARK, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, FORT WALTON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER, INC., FRANKFORT HOSPITAL, INC., GALEN HOSPITAL ALASKA, INC., GALEN OF FLORIDA, INC., GALEN OF KANSAS, INC., GALENCARE, INC., GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, L.P., GPCH-GP, INC., GRAND STRAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC. Case related to Case No. 17-cv-1134. (Keough, Christopher)
August 7, 2018 Filing 2 LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BAY AREA HEALTHCARE GROUP, LTD., BAY HOSPITAL, INC., BERKSHIRE MEDICAL CENTER, BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ARKANSAS, BOSTON MEDICAL CENTER CORPORATION, CARTERSVILLE MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, CENTERPOINT MEDICAL CENTER OF INDEPENDENCE, LLC, CENTRA HEALTH, INC., CENTRAL FLORIDA REGIONAL HOSPITAL, INC., CENTRAL TENNESSEE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, CHCA BAYSHORE, L.P., CHCA CLEAR LAKE, L.P., CHCA CONROE, L.P., CHCA WEST HOUSTON, L.P., CHIPPENHAM & JOHNSTON-WILLIS HOSPITALS, INC., COLISEUM MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, COLUBMIA MEDICAL CENTER OF DENTON SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA HOSPITAL (PALM BEACHES) LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, COLUMBIA HOSPITAL AT MEDICAL CITY DALLAS SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF SOUTH BROWARD, COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF ARLINGTON SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF LAS COLINAS, INC., COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF LEWISVILLE SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF MCKINNEY SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF PLANO SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA NORTH HILLS HOSPITAL SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA OGDEN MEDICAL CENTER, INC., COLUMBIA PLAZA MEDICAL CENTER OF FORT WORTH SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA RIO GRANDE HEALTHCARE, L.P., COLUMBIA VALLEY HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, L.P., COLUMBIA/HCA JOHN RANDOLPH, INC., DLP MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, DLP MINERS MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, DOCTORS HOSPITAL OF AUGUSTA, LLC, EASTERN IDAHO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, EASTSIDE MEDICAL, LLC, EDWARD WHITE HOSPITAL, INC., EL PASO HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, LTD., FAIRVIEW PARK, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, FORT WALTON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER, INC., FRANKFORT HOSPITAL, INC., GALEN HOSPITAL ALASKA, INC., GALEN OF FLORIDA, INC., GALEN OF KANSAS, INC., GALENCARE, INC., GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, L.P., GPCH-GP, INC., GRAND STRAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC (Keough, Christopher)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5625916) filed by CHCA CLEAR LAKE, L.P., DLP MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF LEWISVILLE SUBSIDIARY, L.P., CENTRA HEALTH, INC., EDWARD WHITE HOSPITAL, INC., BAY HOSPITAL, INC., CENTRAL TENNESSEE HOSPITAL CORPORATION, EASTSIDE MEDICAL, LLC, COLISEUM MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, GRAND STRAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, CENTERPOINT MEDICAL CENTER OF INDEPENDENCE, LLC, COLUMBIA NORTH HILLS HOSPITAL SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA VALLEY HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, L.P., GALEN OF FLORIDA, INC., COLUMBIA OGDEN MEDICAL CENTER, INC., COLUBMIA MEDICAL CENTER OF DENTON SUBSIDIARY, L.P., FAIRVIEW PARK, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, DLP MINERS MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF PLANO SUBSIDIARY, L.P., BERKSHIRE MEDICAL CENTER, CHCA CONROE, L.P., GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, L.P., BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ARKANSAS, COLUMBIA PLAZA MEDICAL CENTER OF FORT WORTH SUBSIDIARY, L.P., COLUMBIA HOSPITAL AT MEDICAL CITY DALLAS SUBSIDIARY, L.P., CHIPPENHAM & JOHNSTON-WILLIS HOSPITALS, INC., COLUMBIA/HCA JOHN RANDOLPH, INC., BOSTON MEDICAL CENTER CORPORATION, CENTRAL FLORIDA REGIONAL HOSPITAL, INC., GPCH-GP, INC., EL PASO HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, LTD., CHCA BAYSHORE, L.P., GALENCARE, INC., GALEN OF KANSAS, INC., EASTERN IDAHO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, DOCTORS HOSPITAL OF AUGUSTA, LLC, FRANKFORT HOSPITAL, INC., FORT WALTON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER, INC., COLUMBIA HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF SOUTH BROWARD, CARTERSVILLE MEDICAL CENTER, LLC, CHCA WEST HOUSTON, L.P., COLUMBIA RIO GRANDE HEALTHCARE, L.P., BAY AREA HEALTHCARE GROUP, LTD., COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF LAS COLINAS, INC., COLUMBIA HOSPITAL (PALM BEACHES) LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF MCKINNEY SUBSIDIARY, L.P., GALEN HOSPITAL ALASKA, INC., COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF ARLINGTON SUBSIDIARY, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Keough, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COLISEUM MEDICAL CENTER, LLC et al v. AZAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GALEN OF FLORIDA, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRAND STRAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF MCKINNEY SUBSIDIARY, L.P.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GALEN HOSPITAL ALASKA, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EL PASO HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, LTD.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA HOSPITAL (PALM BEACHES) LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAY AREA HEALTHCARE GROUP, LTD.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTERPOINT MEDICAL CENTER OF INDEPENDENCE, LLC
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DLP MINERS MEDICAL CENTER, LLC
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLISEUM MEDICAL CENTER, LLC
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BERKSHIRE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTRA HEALTH, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, L.P.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTRAL FLORIDA REGIONAL HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHCA CLEAR LAKE, L.P.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD WHITE HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHCA CONROE, L.P.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHCA WEST HOUSTON, L.P.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF LAS COLINAS, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA VALLEY HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, L.P.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHCA BAYSHORE, L.P.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAY HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA OGDEN MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FORT WALTON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARTERSVILLE MEDICAL CENTER, LLC
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EASTSIDE MEDICAL, LLC
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOSTON MEDICAL CENTER CORPORATION
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DLP MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA HOSPITAL AT MEDICAL CITY DALLAS SUBSIDIARY, L.P.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF ARLINGTON SUBSIDIARY, L.P.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA PLAZA MEDICAL CENTER OF FORT WORTH SUBSIDIARY, L.P.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA NORTH HILLS HOSPITAL SUBSIDIARY, L.P.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANKFORT HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF LEWISVILLE SUBSIDIARY, L.P.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GPCH-GP, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EASTERN IDAHO REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF SOUTH BROWARD
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GALEN OF KANSAS, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOCTORS HOSPITAL OF AUGUSTA, LLC
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA/HCA JOHN RANDOLPH, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA RIO GRANDE HEALTHCARE, L.P.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUBMIA MEDICAL CENTER OF DENTON SUBSIDIARY, L.P.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF PLANO SUBSIDIARY, L.P.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHIPPENHAM & JOHNSTON-WILLIS HOSPITALS, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GALENCARE, INC.
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ARKANSAS
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTRAL TENNESSEE HOSPITAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FAIRVIEW PARK, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLISEUM MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as COLISEUM MEDICAL CENTERS
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GALENCARE, INC. doing business as BRANDON REGIONAL HOSPITAL doing business as NORTHSIDE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHCA BAYSHORE, L.P. doing business as BAYSHORE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA HOSPITAL AT MEDICAL CITY DALLAS SUBSIDIARY, L.P. doing business as MEDICAL CITY DALLAS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GALEN OF KANSAS, INC. doing business as COLUMBIA OVERLAND PARK REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF LAS COLINAS, INC. doing business as LAS COLINAS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GALEN HOSPITAL ALASKA, INC. doing business as ALASKA REGIONAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF ARLINGTON SUBSIDIARY, L.P. doing business as MEDICAL CITY OF ARLINGTON
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHCA CLEAR LAKE, L.P. doing business as CLEAR LAKE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA RIO GRANDE HEALTHCARE, L.P. doing business as RIO GRANDE REGIONAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EL PASO HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, LTD. doing business as LAS PALMAS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAY AREA HEALTHCARE GROUP, LTD. doing business as CORPUS CHRISTI MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BAY HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as GULF COAST MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA PLAZA MEDICAL CENTER OF FORT WORTH SUBSIDIARY, L.P. doing business as MEDICAL CITY FORT WORTH
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTRAL TENNESSEE HOSPITAL CORPORATION doing business as HORIZON MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF MCKINNEY SUBSIDIARY, L.P. doing business as MEDICAL CENTER OF MCKINNEY
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA OGDEN MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as OGDEN REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GALEN OF FLORIDA, INC. doing business as ST. PETERSBURG GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA HOSPITAL (PALM BEACHES) LIMITED PARTNERSHIP doing business as COLUMBIA HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF ARKANSAS doing business as UAMS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA/HCA JOHN RANDOLPH, INC. doing business as JOHN RANDOLPH MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF SOUTH BROWARD doing business as WESTSIDE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRAND STRAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as GRAND STRAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA VALLEY HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, L.P. doing business as VALLEY REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHCA WEST HOUSTON, L.P. doing business as THE WOMAN'S HOSPITAL OF TEXAS doing business as WEST HOUSTON MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTRAL FLORIDA REGIONAL HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as CENTRAL FLORIDA REGIONAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHCA CONROE, L.P. doing business as CONROE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GPCH-GP, INC. doing business as GARDEN PARK MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA NORTH HILLS HOSPITAL SUBSIDIARY, L.P. doing business as NORTH HILLS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARTERSVILLE MEDICAL CENTER, LLC doing business as CARTERSVILLE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DLP MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER, LLC formerly doing business as MEMORIAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FAIRVIEW PARK, LIMITED PARTNERSHIP doing business as FAIRVIEW PARK HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF PLANO SUBSIDIARY, L.P. doing business as MEDICAL CENTER OF PLANO
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOCTORS HOSPITAL OF AUGUSTA, LLC doing business as DOCTORS HOSPITAL (AUGUSTA)
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUBMIA MEDICAL CENTER OF DENTON SUBSIDIARY, L.P. doing business as MEDICAL CENTER DENTON
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTRA HEALTH, INC. doing business as VIRGINIA BAPTIST HOSPITAL LYNCHBURG
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DLP MINERS MEDICAL CENTER, LLC formerly doing business as MINERS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FORT WALTON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER, INC. doing business as FORT WALTON BEACH MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTERPOINT MEDICAL CENTER OF INDEPENDENCE, LLC doing business as CENTERPOINT MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD WHITE HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as EDWARD WHITE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COLUMBIA MEDICAL CENTER OF LEWISVILLE SUBSIDIARY, L.P. doing business as MEDICAL CENTER OF LEWISVILLE
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOSTON MEDICAL CENTER CORPORATION doing business as BOSTON MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANKFORT HOSPITAL, INC. doing business as FRANKFORT REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EASTSIDE MEDICAL, LLC doing business as EMORY EASTSIDE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL, L.P. doing business as GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHIPPENHAM & JOHNSTON-WILLIS HOSPITALS, INC. doing business as CJW MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher L. Keough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR
Represented By: Peter M. Bryce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?