UNITED MINE WORKERS OF AMERICA 1974 PENSION PLAN et al v. ENERGY WEST MINING COMPANY

Plaintiff: UNITED MINE WORKERS OF AMERICA 1974 PENSION PLAN, MICHEAL W. BUCKNER, MICHAEL HOLLAND, MICHAEL O. MCKOWN and MICHAEL D. LOIACONO
Defendant: ENERGY WEST MINING COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2018cv01905
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: District Of Columbia District Court
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Richard J Leon
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1401(b)(2) Appeal of Arbitration Award
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2018 12 PLAINTIFFS' ANSWER to Counterclaim #8 in Case No. 1:18-cv-1905-RLJ & Complaint in Case No. 18-cv-2085-RJL by MICHEAL W. BUCKNER, MICHAEL HOLLAND, MICHAEL D. LOIACONO, MICHAEL O. MCKOWN, UNITED MINE WORKERS OF AMERICA 1974 PENSION PLAN.(Thall, Olga)
October 3, 2018 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting #11 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Actions and for Extension of Plaintiffs' Time to Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the motions to consolidate and for an extension of time to answer are GRANTED. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a), it is hereby ORDERED that United Mine Workers of America 1974 Pension Plan et al. v. Energy West Mining Company, 18-cv-1905-RJL, is consolidated with Energy West Mining Company v. UMWA 1974 Pension Plan, 18-cv-2085-RJL. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk's Office close 18-cv-2085-RJL and that the parties in that case be transferred to 18-cv-1905-RJL. It is further ORDERED that all filings in the consolidated case shall be filed only in 18-cv-1905-RJL. It is further ORDERED that plaintiffs shall file their answers to the complaint in 18-cv-2085-RJL and to the counterclaim in 18-cv-1905-RJL no later than October 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/3/18. (lcrjl1)
September 21, 2018 11 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases , Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Answer to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM by MICHEAL W. BUCKNER, MICHAEL HOLLAND, MICHAEL D. LOIACONO, MICHAEL O. MCKOWN, UNITED MINE WORKERS OF AMERICA 1974 PENSION PLAN (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thall, Olga)
September 18, 2018 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Moxila A. Upadhyaya on behalf of ENERGY WEST MINING COMPANY (Upadhyaya, Moxila)
September 11, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory James Ossi on behalf of ENERGY WEST MINING COMPANY (Ossi, Gregory)
September 11, 2018 8 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by ENERGY WEST MINING COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ossi, Gregory)
September 4, 2018 7 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ENERGY WEST MINING COMPANY served on 8/21/2018, answer due 9/11/2018 (Thall, Olga)
August 21, 2018 6 SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to ENERGY WEST MINING COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (zmd)
August 15, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Andrew Green on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Green, Paul)
August 15, 2018 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John R Mooney on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mooney, John)
August 15, 2018 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Peter Groppe on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Groppe, Charles)
August 15, 2018 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Stanley F. Lechner on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lechner, Stanley)
August 14, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (zmd)
August 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against ENERGY WEST MINING COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5638438) filed by UNITED MINE WORKERS OF AMERICA 1974 PENSION PLAN, MICHAEL O. MCKOWN, MICHEAL W. BUCKNER, MICHAEL HOLLAND, MICHAEL D. LOIACONO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Thall, Olga) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/16/2018) (zmd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED MINE WORKERS OF AMERICA 1974 PENSION PLAN et al v. ENERGY WEST MINING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED MINE WORKERS OF AMERICA 1974 PENSION PLAN
Represented By: Olga Metelitsa Thall
Represented By: John R Mooney
Represented By: Stanley F. Lechner
Represented By: Charles Peter Groppe
Represented By: Paul Andrew Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHEAL W. BUCKNER
Represented By: Olga Metelitsa Thall
Represented By: John R Mooney
Represented By: Stanley F. Lechner
Represented By: Charles Peter Groppe
Represented By: Paul Andrew Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL HOLLAND
Represented By: Olga Metelitsa Thall
Represented By: John R Mooney
Represented By: Stanley F. Lechner
Represented By: Charles Peter Groppe
Represented By: Paul Andrew Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL O. MCKOWN
Represented By: Olga Metelitsa Thall
Represented By: John R Mooney
Represented By: Stanley F. Lechner
Represented By: Charles Peter Groppe
Represented By: Paul Andrew Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL D. LOIACONO
Represented By: Olga Metelitsa Thall
Represented By: John R Mooney
Represented By: Stanley F. Lechner
Represented By: Charles Peter Groppe
Represented By: Paul Andrew Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENERGY WEST MINING COMPANY
Represented By: Gregory James Ossi
Represented By: Moxila A. Upadhyaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?