CARROLL v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: TANYS E. CARROLL
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 1:2018cv01907
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Columbia
Office: Washington, DC Office
County: 11001
Presiding Judge: Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ztd)
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE ORIGINAL SUMMONS filed by TANYS E. CARROLL.(Farrell, Clifford)
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT re Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Declaration of Non-Member Attorney for Clifford Farrell by TANYS E. CARROLL. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Osterhout, Karl)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice with respect to Clifford M. Farrell, in order for him to appear as counsel or co-counsel for Plaintiff, CONTINGENT on said attorney filing a declaration certifying familiarity with this Court's Local Rules by no later than SEPTMEBER 13, 2018. Counsel shall promptly register for this Court's CM/ECF system. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 9/07/2018. (lcckk3)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 09/07/18. (DM)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Clifford M. Farrell, :Firm- Manring & Farrell, :Address- 167 No. High Street, P.O. Box 15307, Columbus, OH 15037. Phone No. - 614-221-1827. Fax No. - 614-221-8612 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5674851. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by TANYS E. CARROLL (Osterhout, Karl)
September 4, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zmd)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 FIAT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. "Leave to file without prepayment of costs GRANTED." Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/21/2018. (zmd)
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by TANYS E. CARROLL(zsb)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY filed by TANYS E. CARROLL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(zsb)
August 13, 2018 Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 08/13/2018. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the District Of Columbia District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CARROLL v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TANYS E. CARROLL
Represented By: Karl E. Osterhout
Represented By: Clifford M. Farrell
Represented By: Clifford Michael Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?